David Takeda et al v. Takata Corporation et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 2:14-cv-08324
District Judge Consuelo Bland Marshall, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Consuelo Bland Marshall
Last Updated September 2, 2017 at 11:44 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coleman Haklar, Plaintiff
No Logo David Takeda, Plaintiff

Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Fernandes +1 818 839 2333 dfernandes@baronbudd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Burton LeBlanc +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 bleblanc@baronbudd.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martis Ann Alex +1 212 907 0870 +1 212 818 0477 malex@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Scott Asciolla +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7527 gasciolla@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric James Belfi +1 212 907 0878 +1 212 818 0477 ebelfi@labaton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric David Gottlieb +1 212 907 0623 +1 212 883 7019 egottlieb@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Walter Stocker +1 212 907 0882 +1 212 883 7082 mstocker@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A Sucharow +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7056 lsucharow@labaton.com
No Logo Milton Diaz Soto, Plaintiff

Represented by RIVERO MESTRE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Whorton +1 305 445 2500 +1 305 445 2505 cwhorton@riveromestre.com
No Logo Susan Nattrass, Plaintiff
No Logo Teresa Lemke, Plaintiff
No Logo William Dougherty, Plaintiff
v.
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co., Inc."

Represented by Law Offices of American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L Mallow +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 mmallow@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Mattson +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7000 emattson@sidley.com
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Defendant

Represented by BMW AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
No Logo BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, Defendant

Represented by C.T. Corporation Systems

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC
BMW of North America LLC BMW of North America LLC, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of BMW of North America LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BMW of North America LLC

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Y. Kizirian +1 312 580 3981 +1 213 250 7900 eric.kizirian@lewisbrisbois.com
No Logo Highland Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by David Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Highland Industries, Inc.
Honda Motor Company, Ltd. Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Honda Motor Co., Ltd."

Represented by 2-1-1 Minami-Ayoyama, Minato-Ku

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Nissan Motor Co., Ltd."

Represented by Yokohamashi, Hanagawa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jia-Ming Shang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natassia Kwan +1 415 781 7900 +1 415 781 2635 natassia.kwan@sedgwicklaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Nissan North America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nissan North America, Inc.

Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Paul Cauley +1 469 227 8200 +1 469 227 8004 paul.cauley@sedgwicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Riehle +1 415 781 7900 +1 415 781 2635 paul.riehle@sdma.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jia-Ming Shang +1 415 781 7900 +1 415 781 2635 jiaming.shang@sedgwicklaw.com
No Logo Takata Cororation, Defendant

Represented by ARK Hills South Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Takata Corp.

Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Bernick +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 david.bernick@dechert.com
No Logo Tk Holdings Inc., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of TK Holdings Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY TK Holdings Inc.
Toyota Motor Corporation Toyota Motor Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Toyota Motor Corporation (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Toyota Motor Corporation
Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by C.T. Corporation Systems

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North Ame

Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara A Bush +1 213 457 1815 +1 213 457 1850 tbush@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dommond E Lonnie +1 213 457 1800 +1 213 457 1850 dlonnie@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S Whitefield +1 213 457 1800 +1 213 456 1850 dwhitefield@dykema.com
Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Steinhaus Reiskin +1 202 906 8600 +1 202 906 8669 treiskin@dykema.com

Represented by Law Offices of Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Transferring 3 action(s) to Judge Federico A. Moreno in the S.D. Florida.Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 2/5/2015. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (LAH) Modified on 2/5/2015 (dld). (Entered: 02/05/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (23 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 59 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 50 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 40 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 39 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 39 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 21 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 21 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 22 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 11 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 54 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 40 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 34 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 3 in FLM/6:14-cv-02071, 16 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 17 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 20 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 70 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 59 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 37 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 36 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 46 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24931, 41 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 10 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 18 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 39 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 34 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 301 in MDL No. 2599, 56 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 40 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 4 in MOW/4:15-cv-00026, 34 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 40 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 23 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 40 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 21 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 29 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 18 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 31 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 53 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 21 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 40 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 13 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 10 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 44 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 42 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 28 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 10 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 39 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 11 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 3 in PR/3:14-cv-01671, 25 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 47 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 5 in SC/3:15-cv-00112, 20 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 17 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mallow, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2015 (LAH). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599), ( 148 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Subaru of America Inc. [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mallow, Michael) Modified on 1/27/2015 (LAH). ADDED MDL LINK, DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM AND DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 1/28/2015 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 01/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by LARRY E. COBEN on behalf of Plaintiffs JAMES MCDONOUGH, et al.TED PEPIN, HELEN POKINIEWSKI, STEPHEN POKINIEWSKI, MICHAEL SCHAFLE, SIAN SCHAFLE, KAREN SERRANO [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proof of Service Proof Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (COBEN, LARRY) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (15 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 13 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 6 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 11 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 6 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 6 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 4 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 74 in MDL No. 2599, 14 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 4 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 5 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 6 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 6 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 4 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 3 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06628 (Mallow, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2015 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (11 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 53 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 44 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 12 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 9 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 16 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 6 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 46 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 33 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 27 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 11 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 12 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 15 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 64 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 51 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 40 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 35 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 5 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 13 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 33 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 28 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 14 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 272 in MDL No. 2599, 50 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 34 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 29 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 34 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 34 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 16 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 24 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 13 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 26 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 47 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 16 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 34 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 8 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 5 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 38 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 23 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 34 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 6 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 20 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 40 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 15 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 12 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Plaintiff Milton Diaz Soto FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Wrong event selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Whorton, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (11 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 53 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 44 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 12 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 9 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 16 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 6 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 46 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 33 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 27 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 11 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 12 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 15 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 64 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 51 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 40 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 35 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 5 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 13 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 33 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 28 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 14 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 280 in MDL No. 2599, 50 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 34 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 29 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 34 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 34 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 16 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 24 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 13 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 26 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 47 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 16 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 34 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 8 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 5 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 38 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 23 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 34 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 6 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 20 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 40 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 15 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 12 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392), ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Charles E Whorton on behalf of Plaintiffs Milton Diaz Soto (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Whorton, Charles) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES AND ADDED LINK Modified on 1/20/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (10 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 52 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 43 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 11 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 8 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 15 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 5 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 45 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 32 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 26 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 10 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 11 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 14 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 63 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 50 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 24 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 17 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 34 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 4 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 12 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 32 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 27 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 13 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 271 in MDL No. 2599, 49 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 33 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 28 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 33 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 17 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 33 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 15 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 23 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 12 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 25 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 46 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 15 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 33 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 7 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 4 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 37 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 35 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 22 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 33 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 5 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 19 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 39 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 14 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 11 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392), (9 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 51 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 42 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 31 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 31 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 13 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 3 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 7 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 3 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 14 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 4 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 44 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 31 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 25 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 9 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 10 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 13 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 62 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 49 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 38 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 12 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 33 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 3 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 11 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 31 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 26 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 12 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 269 in MDL No. 2599, 48 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 27 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 32 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 16 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 32 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 14 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 22 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 11 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 24 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 45 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 14 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 31 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 6 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 3 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 34 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 21 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 3 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 32 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 4 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 18 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 38 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 13 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 10 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 1/13/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 278 in MDL No. 2599)) MOTION TO TRANSFER with Brief in Support. -- 7 Action(s) -- from South Carolina District Court (3:15-cv-00112,3:14-cv-04485), Florida Middle District Court (6:14-cv-02071), Puerto Rico District Court (3:14-cv-01671) - Suggested Transferee Court: Southern District of Florida; Filed by: Milton Diaz Soto, Amrica Diaz Vega, Isabel Diaz Diaz, and Juan Diaz Diaz (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Complaint SC 15-cv-0112, # 5 Complaint FLM 14-cv-2071, # 6 Complaint PR 14-cv-1671)Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al.(Whorton, Charles) Modified on 1/13/2015 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (36 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 29 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 31 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 16 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 12 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 41 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 11 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 26 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 10 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 20 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 10 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 148 in MDL No. 2599, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 18 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 14 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 19 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 20 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 12 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 9 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 27 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 20 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 20 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 7 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 13 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 7 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 17 in SC/2:14-cv-04433), ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW on behalf of Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES Modified on 1/13/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW on behalf of Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions Attachment A: Short Case Captions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/21/2015 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by Seth Eric Miles on behalf of Plaintiffs Yessica Martinez, Eric Anthony Rosson (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Miles, Seth) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by David Bernick on behalf of Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 1/29/2015 in Miami, Florida. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 1/12/2015.Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 12/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (RH) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 150 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc. [Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LAH). (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAC/2:14-cv-08970, CAC/2:14-cv-09037, CAC/2:14-cv-09065, CAC/2:14-cv-09127, CAC/5:14-cv-02346, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLM/8:14-cv-02958, FLN/4:14-cv-00635, FLS/0:14-cv-62669, FLS/1:14-cv-23944, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24343, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, FLS/1:14-cv-24445, FLS/1:14-cv-24446, FLS/1:14-cv-24449, FLS/1:14-cv-24453, FLS/1:14-cv-24492, FLS/1:14-cv-24494, FLS/1:14-cv-24497, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, KS/6:14-cv-01388, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, LAE/2:14-cv-02551, LAE/2:14-cv-02703, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, MOW/6:14-cv-03487, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCM/1:14-cv-01001, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NJ/2:14-cv-07244, NJ/3:14-cv-07227, NYE/1:14-cv-07004, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/1:14-cv-09396, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, PAE/2:14-cv-06648, PAW/2:14-cv-01562, PR/3:14-cv-01778, SC/2:14-cv-04433, SC/5:14-cv-04485, TXS/4:14-cv-03392 (Bernick, David) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 146 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 27 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 18 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 29 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 14 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 10 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 5 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 17 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 8 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 145 in MDL No. 2599, 30 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 16 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 12 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 17 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 10 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 7 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 25 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 18 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 18 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 15 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 11 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 5 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 15 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Plaintiff Kristen Go FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Lee, Jack) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 26 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 28 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 13 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 9 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 38 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 22 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 17 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 16 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 7 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 144 in MDL No. 2599, 29 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 15 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 11 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 16 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 17 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 9 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 6 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 24 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 17 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 14 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 10 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 4 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 14 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Incorrect case number(s) selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 75 in MDL No. 2599), ( 74 in MDL No. 2599), ( 76 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). ADDED MDL LINK AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) - re: pldg. (14 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 22 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 72 in MDL No. 2599, 13 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 5 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 6 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391) Identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24343, FLS/1:14-cv-24449, LAE/2:14-cv-02551, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, PAW/2:14-cv-01562, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) - re: pldg. (13 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 70 in MDL No. 2599, 12 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 4 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391) Identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America Inc, Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A.,Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24343, FLS/1:14-cv-24449, LAE/2:14-cv-02551, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, PAW/2:14-cv-01562, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(12 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 69 in MDL No. 2599, 11 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 3 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391) Filed by Terri Steinhaus Reiskin Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions Appendix 1, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24343, FLS/1:14-cv-24449, LAE/2:14-cv-02551, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, PAW/2:14-cv-01562, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (36 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 29 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 31 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 16 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 12 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 41 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 11 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 26 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 10 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 20 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 10 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 148 in MDL No. 2599, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 18 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 14 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 19 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 20 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 12 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 9 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 27 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 20 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 20 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 7 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 13 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 7 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 17 in SC/2:14-cv-04433), ( 149 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., FORD MOTOR COMPANY. [Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LAH). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (JOINDER) -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., FORD MOTOR COMPANY [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/2/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM, ADDED JOINDER AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 181 in MDL No. 2599)) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiff Kristen Go - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Lee, Jack) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 175 in MDL No. 2599)) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.,Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Linsey Meade, Joseph Przybyszewski - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Meltzer, Joseph) Modified on 12/1/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM Modified on 12/5/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (20 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 16 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 28 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 79 in MDL No. 2599, 19 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 11 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963), (18 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 14 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 26 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 77 in MDL No. 2599, 17 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 9 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963), (19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 15 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 27 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 78 in MDL No. 2599, 18 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 10 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963) Filed by Defendants BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAW/2:14-cv-01562 (Kizirian, Eric) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Barry Balmuth, et al.Connie Collins, Shelley Shader [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Scarola, John) Modified on 11/26/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTD PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs David Kopelman, Michael Sanchez - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Peter Breschnev, et al.Howard Morris, Avis Scott, Adam Wishkovsky, Cyndee Wishkovsky [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Clobes, Bryan) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 85 in MDL No. 2599), ( 84 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324 (Cauley, E.) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599), ( 66 in MDL No. 2326), ( 100 in MDL No. 2326) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Paul Day, et al.Thomas R. Rickert, Robert Schmidt [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Schmidt, Alexander) Modified on 11/25/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME, REMOVED WITH MEMORANDUM AND ADDED MDL LINKS (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (9 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 8 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 3 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 6 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 17 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 3 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 3 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 34 in MDL No. 2599, 8 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by Plaintiff Shelley Shader FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Wrong event selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Scarola, John) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Other Case Caption, # 2 Proof of Service for Corporate Disclosure Statement) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324 (Cauley, E) Modified on 11/21/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by E Paul Cauley, Jr on behalf of Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service for Notice of Appearance) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324 (Cauley, E) Modified on 11/21/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Takata Corporation for HIGHLAND INDUSTRIES, INC., TK HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by David Bernick on behalf of Defendants HIGHLAND INDUSTRIES, INC., TK HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628 (Bernick, David) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Bayerische Motoren Werke AG for BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC. Identifying Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW (US) Holding Corp, Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Non-Party/Financial Interest INTEC GmbH, Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW International Holding B.V. for BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit list of cases and corporate parent attachment, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963 (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LH). ADDED FINANCIAL INTEREST (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Bayerische Motoren Werke AG for BMW of North America, LLC., Identifying Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW (US) Holding Corp, Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Non-Party/Financial Interest INTEC GmbH, Non-Party/Financial Interest BMW International Holding B.V. for BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix list of cases and corporate parent attachment, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963 (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LH). ADDED FINANCIAL INTEREST (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Michael Kenneth Johnson for Eric Kizirian on behalf of Defendants BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Appendix list of cases, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963 (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 11/26/2014 (LAH). ADDED ATTORNEY NAME (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (15 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 13 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 6 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 11 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 6 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 6 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 4 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 74 in MDL No. 2599, 14 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 4 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 5 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 6 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 6 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 4 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 3 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628), (16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 6 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 7 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 12 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 24 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 17 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 5 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 5 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 5 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 7 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 5 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 75 in MDL No. 2599, 15 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 5 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 1 in MOW/6:14-3487-00000, 6 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 7 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 7 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 5 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 1 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co Inc -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, MOW/6:14-3487-00000, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Mattson, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 A - Short Case Captions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, MOW/6:14-3487-00000, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Mattson, Eric) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 269 in MDL No. 2599)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Eric S Mattson on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co Inc (Attachments: # 1 A - Short Case Captions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06628 (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 1/15/2015 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION Modified on 1/28/2015 (LAH). EDITED MDL LINK (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
SEE CORRECTED PLDG. 157 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) Modified on 12/9/2014 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
SEE CORRECTED PLDG. 156 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) Modified on 12/9/2014 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
SEE CORRECTED PLDG. 155 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Terri Steinhaus Reiskin on behalf of Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A.,Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Appendix List of Cases, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, PAE/2:14-cv-06391 (Reiskin, Terri Steinhaus) Modified on 12/9/2014 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(1 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 63 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by LARRY E. COBEN on behalf of Plaintiffs JAMES MCDONOUGH, et al.TED PEPIN, HELEN POKINIEWSKI, STEPHEN POKINIEWSKI, MICHAEL SCHAFLE, SIAN SCHAFLE, KAREN SERRANO, JAMES THOMPSON, RUTH THOMPSON, NANCY WADE [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628 (COBEN, LARRY) Modified on 11/20/2014 (LH). REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). ADDED MDL LINK (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs JAMES MCDONOUGH, et al.TED PEPIN, HELEN POKINIEWSKI, STEPHEN POKINIEWSKI, MICHAEL SCHAFLE, SIAN SCHAFLE, KAREN SERRANO [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628 (COBEN, LARRY) Modified on 11/26/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAMES Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 96 in MDL No. 2599)) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(4 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 6 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 7 in MDL No. 2599, 4 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by John Scarola on behalf of Plaintiff Shelley Shader (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Scarola, John) Modified on 11/21/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (7 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 6 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 4 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 6 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 21 in MDL No. 2599, 6 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by Plaintiffs Chanteil Walter, et al.John Zion, Chanteil Walter, John Zion [Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Filed in error. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Carmody, William) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. 26 in MDL No. 2599)RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Lauryn Sanchez, et al.Chanteil Walter, John Zion, Amir Bishara [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Subramanian, Arun) Modified on 11/14/2014 (JG). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Roland K Tellis on behalf of Plaintiffs William Dougherty, et al.Coleman Haklar, Teresa Lemke, Susan Nattrass, David Takeda [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, FLS/1:14-cv-24009 (Tellis, Roland) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Bryan L. Clobes on behalf of Plaintiffs Peter Breschnev, et al.Howard Morris, Avis Scott, Adam Wishkovsky, Cyndee Wishkovsky [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Clobes, Bryan) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Keile Allen, et al.Ellen Bonet, Meliza Gurian, Gerson Joseph, Deborah Morgan, Angela Ruffin, Idotenyin Umoh [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Moskowitz, Adam) DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM. Modified on 11/6/2014 (JG). (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Adam M. Moskowitz on behalf of Plaintiffs Keile Allen, et al.Ellen Bonet, Meliza Gurian, Gerson Joseph, Deborah Morgan, Angela Ruffin, Idotenyin Umoh. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (Moskowitz, Adam) ADDED ADDITIONAL FILING PARTIES. Modified on 11/7/2014 (JG). (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 11/19/2014. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 11/19/2014. Responses due on or before 11/26/2014. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi, on 11/5/2014. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (JG) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
MDL Number 2599 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 131) Associated Cases: Pending No. 131, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, MIE/2:14-cv-14209 (JG) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 217 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?