David Neto v. Takata Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 1:14-cv-24446
District Judge Darrin P. Gayles, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 2:18 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amanda J. Revelia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo David Neto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo David W. Ellis, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Howard G. Frey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Macy A. Flett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Margaret Bace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Milton Diaz Soto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RIVERO MESTRE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Whorton +1 305 445 2500 +1 305 445 2505 cwhorton@riveromestre.com
No Logo Philip Bace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Scott T. Strachan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
v.
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co., Inc."
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Highland Industries, Inc., Defendant
Honda Motor Honda Motor, Defendant
Honda Motor Company, Ltd. Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Honda Motor Co., Ltd."
No Logo Takata Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Bernick +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 david.bernick@dechert.com
No Logo Tk Holdings Inc., Defendant
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (23 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 59 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 50 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 40 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 39 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 39 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 21 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 21 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 22 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 11 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 54 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 40 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 34 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 3 in FLM/6:14-cv-02071, 16 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 17 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 20 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 70 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 59 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 37 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 36 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 46 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24931, 41 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 10 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 18 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 39 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 34 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 301 in MDL No. 2599, 56 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 40 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 4 in MOW/4:15-cv-00026, 34 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 40 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 23 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 40 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 21 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 29 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 18 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 31 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 53 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 21 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 40 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 13 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 10 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 44 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 42 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 28 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 10 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 39 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 11 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 3 in PR/3:14-cv-01671, 25 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 47 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 5 in SC/3:15-cv-00112, 20 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 17 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mallow, Michael) Modified on 1/29/2015 (LAH). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 01/28/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
    SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599), ( 148 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Subaru of America Inc. [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mallow, Michael) Modified on 1/27/2015 (LAH). ADDED MDL LINK, DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM AND DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 1/28/2015 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 01/26/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by LARRY E. COBEN on behalf of Plaintiffs JAMES MCDONOUGH, et al.TED PEPIN, HELEN POKINIEWSKI, STEPHEN POKINIEWSKI, MICHAEL SCHAFLE, SIAN SCHAFLE, KAREN SERRANO [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Proof of Service Proof Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (COBEN, LARRY) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
        WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (11 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 53 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 44 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 12 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 9 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 16 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 6 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 46 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 33 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 27 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 11 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 12 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 15 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 64 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 51 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 40 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 35 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 5 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 13 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 33 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 28 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 14 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 272 in MDL No. 2599, 50 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 34 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 29 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 34 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 34 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 16 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 24 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 13 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 26 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 47 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 16 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 34 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 8 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 5 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 38 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 23 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 34 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 6 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 20 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 40 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 15 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 12 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Plaintiff Milton Diaz Soto FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Wrong event selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Whorton, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (11 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 53 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 44 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 12 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 9 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 5 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 16 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 6 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 46 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 33 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 27 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 11 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 12 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 15 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 20 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 64 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 51 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 40 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 33 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 25 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 35 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 5 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 13 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 33 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 28 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 14 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 280 in MDL No. 2599, 50 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 34 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 29 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 34 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 34 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 16 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 24 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 13 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 26 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 47 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 16 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 34 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 8 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 5 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 38 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 23 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 34 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 6 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 20 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 40 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 15 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 12 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392), ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Charles E Whorton on behalf of Plaintiffs Milton Diaz Soto (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Whorton, Charles) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES AND ADDED LINK Modified on 1/20/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (10 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 52 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 43 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 15 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 11 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 8 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 4 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 15 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 5 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 45 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 32 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 26 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 10 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 11 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 14 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 63 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 50 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 24 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 17 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 14 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 34 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 4 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 12 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 32 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 27 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 13 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 271 in MDL No. 2599, 49 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 33 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 28 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 33 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 17 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 33 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 15 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 23 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 12 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 25 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 46 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 15 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 33 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 7 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 4 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 37 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 35 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 22 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 33 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 5 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 19 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 39 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 14 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 11 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392), (9 in ALN/2:14-cv-02407, 51 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 42 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 32 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 31 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 31 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-08970, 13 in CAC/2:14-cv-09037, 14 in CAC/2:14-cv-09065, 10 in CAC/2:14-cv-09127, 3 in CAC/2:14-cv-09315, 7 in CAC/2:14-cv-09357, 3 in CAC/2:14-cv-09562, 14 in CAC/5:14-cv-02346, 4 in CAC/8:15-cv-00026, 44 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 31 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 25 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 9 in FLM/8:14-cv-02958, 10 in FLN/4:14-cv-00635, 13 in FLS/0:14-cv-62669, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 62 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 49 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 38 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 31 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 12 in FLS/1:14-cv-24445, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24449, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24492, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24494, 13 in FLS/1:14-cv-24497, 33 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 3 in ILS/3:15-cv-00011, 11 in KS/6:14-cv-01388, 31 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 26 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 12 in LAE/2:14-cv-02703, 269 in MDL No. 2599, 48 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 27 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 32 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 16 in NCM/1:14-cv-01001, 32 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 14 in NJ/2:14-cv-07244, 22 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 11 in NYE/1:14-cv-07004, 24 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 45 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 14 in NYS/1:14-cv-09396, 31 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 6 in NYS/7:14-cv-09459, 3 in NYW/1:14-cv-01005, 36 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 34 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 21 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 3 in PAE/2:14-cv-07000, 32 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 4 in PAW/2:14-cv-01756, 18 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 38 in SC/2:14-cv-04433, 13 in SC/5:14-cv-04485, 10 in TXS/4:14-cv-03392) Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 1/13/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
              PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 278 in MDL No. 2599)) MOTION TO TRANSFER with Brief in Support. -- 7 Action(s) -- from South Carolina District Court (3:15-cv-00112,3:14-cv-04485), Florida Middle District Court (6:14-cv-02071), Puerto Rico District Court (3:14-cv-01671) - Suggested Transferee Court: Southern District of Florida; Filed by: Milton Diaz Soto, Amrica Diaz Vega, Isabel Diaz Diaz, and Juan Diaz Diaz (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Complaint SC 15-cv-0112, # 5 Complaint FLM 14-cv-2071, # 6 Complaint PR 14-cv-1671)Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al.(Whorton, Charles) Modified on 1/13/2015 (LAH). ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (36 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 29 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 31 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 16 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 12 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 41 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 11 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 26 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 10 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 20 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 10 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 148 in MDL No. 2599, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 18 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 14 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 19 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 20 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 12 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 9 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 27 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 20 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 20 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 7 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 13 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 7 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 17 in SC/2:14-cv-04433), ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW on behalf of Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc. [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES Modified on 1/13/2015 (RH). (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by MICHAEL LAWRENCE MALLOW on behalf of Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions Attachment A: Short Case Captions) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (MALLOW, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/21/2015 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by Seth Eric Miles on behalf of Plaintiffs Yessica Martinez, Eric Anthony Rosson (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Miles, Seth) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 177 in MDL No. 2599), ( 217 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Jodi Westbrook Flowers on behalf of Plaintiff David Neto (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446 (Flowers, Jodi) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (48 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 38 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 58 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 44 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 217 in MDL No. 2599, 44 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209) Filed by David Bernick on behalf of Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 150 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC., BMW of North America, LLC., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc. [Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LAH). (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                            SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, CAC/2:14-cv-08324, CAC/2:14-cv-08447, CAC/2:14-cv-08565, CAC/2:14-cv-08677, CAC/2:14-cv-08727, CAC/2:14-cv-08970, CAC/2:14-cv-09037, CAC/2:14-cv-09065, CAC/2:14-cv-09127, CAC/5:14-cv-02346, CAS/3:14-cv-02618, FLM/3:14-cv-01420, FLM/3:14-cv-01427, FLM/8:14-cv-02958, FLN/4:14-cv-00635, FLS/0:14-cv-62669, FLS/1:14-cv-23944, FLS/1:14-cv-24009, FLS/1:14-cv-24087, FLS/1:14-cv-24182, FLS/1:14-cv-24343, FLS/1:14-cv-24346, FLS/1:14-cv-24365, FLS/1:14-cv-24366, FLS/1:14-cv-24445, FLS/1:14-cv-24446, FLS/1:14-cv-24449, FLS/1:14-cv-24453, FLS/1:14-cv-24492, FLS/1:14-cv-24494, FLS/1:14-cv-24497, GAN/1:14-cv-03556, KS/6:14-cv-01388, LAE/2:14-cv-02520, LAE/2:14-cv-02551, LAE/2:14-cv-02703, MIE/2:14-cv-14209, MIE/2:14-cv-14338, MOW/6:14-cv-03487, NCE/7:14-cv-00267, NCM/1:14-cv-01001, NCW/1:14-cv-00298, NJ/2:14-cv-07244, NJ/3:14-cv-07227, NYE/1:14-cv-07004, NYS/1:14-cv-08960, NYS/1:14-cv-08963, NYS/1:14-cv-09396, NYS/7:14-cv-08920, PAE/2:14-cv-06391, PAE/2:14-cv-06628, PAE/2:14-cv-06648, PAW/2:14-cv-01562, PR/3:14-cv-01778, SC/2:14-cv-04433, SC/5:14-cv-04485, TXS/4:14-cv-03392 (Bernick, David) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 146 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (34 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 27 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 18 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 29 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 14 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 10 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 5 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 39 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 30 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 9 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 23 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 16 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 18 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 17 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 8 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 145 in MDL No. 2599, 30 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 16 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 12 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 17 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 18 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 10 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 7 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 25 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 18 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 18 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 15 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 5 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 11 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 5 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 15 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Plaintiff Kristen Go FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Lee, Jack) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                  INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Horton, et al.Richard E H Howells, Mary B Johnston, David Bear McLaughlin, Corene L Quirk, Mary Christine Rapoza, Joyce M Wichmann, Jennifer Burch, Keith Gauchet, Robert E Lyon, Jr, David Neto [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446, LAE/2:14-cv-02703, SC/2:14-cv-04433, SC/5:14-cv-04485 (Rice, Joseph) Modified on 12/5/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                    WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (5 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 140 in MDL No. 2599, 13 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Horton, et al.Richard E H Howells, Mary B Johnston, David Bear McLaughlin, Corene L Quirk, Mary Christine Rapoza, Joyce M Wichmann, David Neto [Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Rice, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                        WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. (33 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 26 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 16 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 17 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 28 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 13 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 9 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 4 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 38 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 29 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 8 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 22 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 15 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 17 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 16 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 7 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 144 in MDL No. 2599, 29 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 15 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 11 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 16 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 17 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 9 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 6 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 24 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 17 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 14 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 4 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 10 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 4 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 14 in SC/2:14-cv-04433) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Incorrect case number(s) selected. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (36 in CAC/2:14-cv-08324, 29 in CAC/2:14-cv-08447, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08565, 19 in CAC/2:14-cv-08677, 20 in CAC/2:14-cv-08727, 31 in CAS/3:14-cv-02618, 16 in FLM/3:14-cv-01420, 12 in FLM/3:14-cv-01427, 7 in FLS/1:14-cv-23944, 41 in FLS/1:14-cv-24009, 32 in FLS/1:14-cv-24087, 18 in FLS/1:14-cv-24182, 11 in FLS/1:14-cv-24343, 21 in FLS/1:14-cv-24346, 26 in FLS/1:14-cv-24365, 19 in FLS/1:14-cv-24366, 10 in FLS/1:14-cv-24446, 20 in GAN/1:14-cv-03556, 19 in LAE/2:14-cv-02520, 10 in LAE/2:14-cv-02551, 148 in MDL No. 2599, 32 in MIE/2:14-cv-14209, 18 in MIE/2:14-cv-14338, 14 in MOW/6:14-cv-03487, 19 in NCE/7:14-cv-00267, 20 in NCW/1:14-cv-00298, 12 in NJ/3:14-cv-07227, 9 in NYS/1:14-cv-08960, 27 in NYS/1:14-cv-08963, 20 in NYS/7:14-cv-08920, 20 in PAE/2:14-cv-06391, 17 in PAE/2:14-cv-06628, 7 in PAE/2:14-cv-06648, 13 in PAW/2:14-cv-01562, 7 in PR/3:14-cv-01778, 17 in SC/2:14-cv-04433), ( 149 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., FORD MOTOR COMPANY. [Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/8/2014 (LAH). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION (JOINDER) -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., et al.Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., FORD MOTOR COMPANY [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Mattson, Eric) Modified on 12/2/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM, ADDED JOINDER AND REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Defendants Highland Industries, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc. - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Bernick, David) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 181 in MDL No. 2599)) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiff Kristen Go - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Lee, Jack) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                  PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 175 in MDL No. 2599)) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Ryvania Mercedes Fuentes, et al.,Lidice C Santos, Steven P Schneider [Suppress List] (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Gilbert, Robert) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 112 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Jodi Westbrook Flowers on behalf of Plaintiff David Neto (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446 (Flowers, Jodi) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                      PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. ( 177 in MDL No. 2599)) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Kimberly Horton, et al.Richard E H Howells, Mary B Johnston, David Bear McLaughlin, Corene L Quirk, Mary Christine Rapoza, Joyce M Wichmann, David Neto [Suppress List] - WITH RELATED ACTION(S): ) (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446, SC/2:14-cv-04433 (Rice, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM AND ADDED NOTATION (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                        INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Linsey Meade, Joseph Przybyszewski - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Meltzer, Joseph) Modified on 12/1/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM Modified on 12/5/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                          INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Barry Balmuth, et al.Connie Collins, Shelley Shader [Suppress List] - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Scarola, John) Modified on 11/26/2014 (LAH). DELETED WITH MEMORANDUM Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                            INTERESTD PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2599) ) Filed by Plaintiffs David Kopelman, Michael Sanchez - (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599 et al. (Ostrow, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/4/2014 (LAH). EDITED EVENT NAME (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 112 in MDL No. 2599) Filed by Plaintiff David Neto -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2599, FLS/1:14-cv-24446 (Rice, Joseph) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?