Dolores Comstock v. UPS Ground Freight, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 13-2773

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 6:55 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802594233 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED. [4236029] [13-2773] (DMS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802581507 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion.. KERMIT E. BYE, STEVEN M. COLLOTON and RAYMOND W. GRUENDER Hrg Sep 2014 [4230094] [13-2773] (DMS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802581493 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
      OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Kermit E. Bye, Steven M. Colloton and Raymond W. Gruender AUTHORING JUDGE:Raymond W. Gruender (PUBLISHED) [4230090] [13-2773] (DMS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802506138 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ARGUED & SUBMITTED in St. Louis to Judges Kermit E. Bye, Steven M. Colloton, Raymond W. Gruender on 09/08/2014 Mr. Brian Gene Brooks for Appellant Dolores Comstock and Ms. Ronna D. Kinsella for Appellees UPS Ground Freight, Inc. and Allen Howard. Rebuttal by Mr. Brian Gene Brooks for Dolores Comstock RECORDED [4194127] [13-2773] (JMH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802486898 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
          ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Ms. Ronna D. Kinsella for UPS Ground Freight, Inc. and Allen Howard for argument in September, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4185103] [13-2773] (RAC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802486416 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
            ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Brian Gene Brooks for Dolores Comstock for argument in September, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4184877] [13-2773] (BGB)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802410763 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
              LETTER from Appellees Allen Howard and UPS Ground Freight, Inc. regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 04/29/2014 [4148764] [13-2773] (RAC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 144 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?