USA v. Buryakov et al
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00073-RMB-1

Tags
Last Updated May 26, 2017 at 12:06 AM EDT (4.7 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emil Joseph Bove, III +1 212 637 2444 +1 212 637 2443 Emil.Bove@usdoj.gov
Space Ian Patrick McGinley +1 212 637 2257 patrick.mcginley@usdoj.gov
Space Brendan Francis Quigley +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2390 Brendan.Quigley@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen J Ritchin +1 212 636 2200 +1 914 993 1980 Stephen.Ritchin@usdoj.gov
Space Anna Margaret Skotko +1 914 993 1939 +1 914 993 9036 anna.skotko@usdoj.gov
No Logo Evgeny Buryakov, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Maria A. Barton +1 212 906 4552 +1 212 751 4864 maria.barton@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Benjamin Naftalis +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 751 4864 benjamin.naftalis@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/06/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Sean M. Maher, PPLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Sean Michael Maher +1 212 661 5333 +1 212 661 5255 smaher@seanmaherlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Kimberly Anne Haviv +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 kim.haviv@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Scott Edward Hershman +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 SHershman@whitecase.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 2/9/2015
County NewYork
Terminated 5/26/2016
Reopened
Magistrate Case
115-mj-00215-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO ACT AS AN UNREGISTERED FOREIGN AGENT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18951.F & 2 IMPERSONATING AGENTS OF FOREIGN GOVERNMENTS (ACTING AS AN UNREGISTERED AGENT OF A FOREIGN GOVERNMENT AND AIDING AND ABETTING SAME)
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO ACT AS AN UNREGISTERED FOREIGN AGENT
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 951.F
Offense Level 4
18951.F IMPERSONATING AGENTS OF FOREIGN GOVERNMENTS AND AIDING AND ABETTING SAME
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags ECF,PRIOR
  Entries (198) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: 3/30/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov on first page of Transcript for proceeding held before Judge Richard M. Berman on June 1, 2015 2:10 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/30/2017)(bw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Payment of Restitution
    Payment of Fine from Evgeny Buryakov in the amount of $10,000.00. Date Received: 7/12/2016. (aa) Modified on 7/13/2016 (cde).
      LREF
      Blank  Payment of Special Assessment
      Payment of Special Assessment from Evgeny Buryakov in the amount of $100.00. Date Received: 6/23/2016. (cde) Modified on 7/12/2016 (cde).
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/28/2016 Remark
        ADVICE OF RIGHTS FORM as to Evgeny Buryakov. (ft)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/25/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: 6/27/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Sentence held on 5/25/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Payment of Special Assessment
              Payment of Special Assessment from Evgeny Buryakov in the amount of $100.00. Date Received: 6/23/2016. (aa)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 05/25/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Sentence held on 05/25/2016 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: 5/26/2016 JudgmentCourt Filing
                    JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S1-15-Cr-73). Date of Imposition of Judgment: 5/25/2016. Defendant Evgeny Buryakov (1) pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1s. Count(s) any open are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: 30 months. (This is the agreed to sentence by Government and Defense. There is no guideline range for this offense.) -The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: It is recommended that the defendant be placed in the Fort Dix facility. -The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. SUPERVISED RELEASE: Three years. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. Additional Supervised Release Terms: 1- Defendant shall cooperate with the Department of Homeland Security - Bureau of Citizenship and Immigration Services (BCIS), proceedings to determine his status in the United States and abide by its rules, regulations and laws; 2- Defendant shall be supervised in his district of residence; 3- Defendant shall report to probation within 48 hours of release from custody. ASSESSMENT: $100.00, due immediately. FINE: $10,000.00. Special instructions regarding the payment of criminal monetary penalties: Fine is due within six months of release from prison. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/26/2016)(bw)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER OF JUDICIAL REMOVAL: as to (S1-15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. Upon the application of the United States of America, by Emil J. Bove III, Brendan F. Quigley, and Stephen J. Ritchin, Assistant United States Attorneys, Southern District of New York; upon the Factual Allegations in Support of Judicial Removal; upon the consent of EVGENY BURYAKOV, a/kla "ZHENYA" (the "defendant") and upon all prior proceedings and submissions in this matter; and full consideration having been given to the matter set forth herein, the Court finds: 1. The defendant is not a citizen or national of the United States. 2. The defendant is a native of the former USSR and a citizen of the Russian Federation....[See this Order]... 10. The defendant has waived the opportunity to pursue any and all forms of relief and protection from removal. THEREFORE, it is ordered that, pursuant to Section 238(c) of the INA, 8 U.S.C. § 1228(c), the defendant be removed from the United States to the Russia Federation promptly upon the satisfaction of any sentence of imprisonment, or, if the defendant is not sentenced to a term of imprisonment, promptly upon his sentencing. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/25/2016)(bw)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                        DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) Count 1,2,2s. (bw)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Sentencing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Sentencing held on 5/25/2016 for Evgeny Buryakov (1) Count 1s. [*** See Judgment filed on 5/26/2016. ***] (bw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: 5/24/2016 Letter - Sentencing
                            Sentencing Letter by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to The Honorable Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated May 24, 2016 re: a letter from Andrey Saratov regarding the sentencing of Evgeny Buryakov. (Attachments: # (1) Letter from Andrey Saratov dated May 6, 2016)(Hershman, Scott)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 154 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 Declaration in Support
                              DECLARATION of Scott Hershman in Support as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [153] Sentencing Submission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Hershman, Scott)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: 5/19/2016 Sentencing Submission
                              SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Evgeny Buryakov. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Hershman, Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 152 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016 Sentencing Submission
                                SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Mar. 29, 2016 Gov't Ltr. to Probation Office, # (2) Exhibit B. Notice of Intent to Request Judicial Removal, # (3) Exhibit C. Concurrence of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # (4) Exhibit D. Defendants Plea Statement in Support of Judicial Removal (Unsigned), # (5) Exhibit F. Proposed Order of Judicial Removal)(Bove, Emil)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: 5/17/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. Counsel for Defendant, under cover of a letter dated May 11, 2016, has sought permission to redact several items from its sentencing submission. See Letter dated May 11, 2016. The Court's response is as follows: 1) As stated in the Court's Individual Rules of Practice for Criminal Case Sentencing Proceedings, five categories of "sensitive information," i.e., social security numbers, names of minor children, dates of birth, financial account numbers, and home address are to be excluded or redacted from the public files and six other categories of information, i.e., personal identifying number, medical records, treatment and diagnosis, employment history, individual financial information, proprietary or trade secret information, and information regarding an individual's cooperation with the government may be excluded from the public files. Final and draft presentence investigation reports ("PSR") prepared by the Department of Probation are also excluded from public disclosure. See, e.g. United States v. Charmer Industries, 711 F.2d 1164 (2d Cir. 1983) and United States v. Munir, 953 F.Supp.2d 470 (E.D.N.Y. 2013). 2) The Court agrees with the defense that the following materials are properly redacted: draft PSR and objections (and clarifications) to draft PSR. 3) The financial information contained in Exhibit D to Defense counsel Hershman's Declaration, dated May 11, 2016, and the Defendant's Sentencing Memorandum, dated May 11, 2016, are appropriately to be filed on the public docket. Such information does not contain personal identifying account information and the Sentencing Memorandum refers specifically to items already on the public docket and only peripherally to the draft PSR. Defense counsel is requested to refile its sentencing submission(s) in accordance with the above determinations by May 19, 2016. Counsel may contact Chambers to schedule a conference if they wish to be heard further prior to the refiling. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/17/2016)(bw)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Sentencing Submission
                                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Evgeny Buryakov. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Hershman, Scott)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Evgeny Buryakov: Notice to Attorney Scott Edward Hershman to RE-FILE Document [147] Memorandum of Law. Use the event type Sentencing Submission found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016 Declaration
                                      DECLARATION of Scott Hershman by Evgeny Buryakov. /IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM [Redacted] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Hershman, Scott)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016 Memorandum of Law
                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Evgeny Buryakov DEFENDANT EVGENY BURYAKOVS SENTENCING MEMORANDUM [Redacted]. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Hershman, Scott) Modified on 5/12/2016 (ka).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: 5/11/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated 05/11/2016 re: Request to file under seal Portions of Defendant's Sentencing Memorandum and three exhibits to the Declaration of Scott Hershman in Support of Defendant's Sentencing Memorandum. Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 145 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 3/2/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2016. (Siwik, Christine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy re: Conference held on 3/3/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 3/11/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Plea held on 3/11/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report
                                                      Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Evgeny Buryakov. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/11/16)(jbo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                        Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) Count 1s. (jbo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Change of Plea Hearing as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 3/11/2016. Plea entered by Evgeny Buryakov (1) Guilty as to Count 1s. AUSA Brendan Quigley present; AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; AUSA Emil Bove present; Also present is paralegal Brandon DeShields; Defense attorney Scott Hershman present; Defense attorney Daniel Levin present; Defense attorney Kelly Newman present; Russian Interpreter Nelly Alishaev present for standby interpretation; Court Reporter Jennifer Thun present; Court receives signed advice of rights form; Court receives signed copy of plea agreement; Defendant is sworn; Defendant pleads guilty to Count One of the S1 Indictment; Court accepts the guilty plea; PSR is ordered on an expedited basis (at request of defendant); Defense attorney to be present for interview; sentence is scheduled for 5/25/16 at 11:00; defense submission is due 5/11/16; government submission is due 5/18/16; defense motion for bail is withdrawn; remand continues. (Sentencing set for 5/25/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Evgeny Buryakov on re: [139] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Brendan Quigley dated 3/9/16 re: Adjournment of Response Deadline filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: We can discuss at the conference on March 11, 2016. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/10/2016)(ft)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Brendan Quigley dated 3/9/16 re: Adjournment of Reponse Deadline . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov ( Response deadline due by 3/11/2016) The Court is rescheduling the March 10, 2016 conference to March 11, 2016 at 9:15am. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/9/16)(jw)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy re: [126] MOTION in Limine / Notice of Motion in Limine.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Evgeny Buryakov re [129] MOTION in Limine .. /Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Opposition and Response to the Motions in Limine by the United States (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                      DECLARATION of Scott Hershman in Support as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [126] MOTION in Limine / Notice of Motion in Limine.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Park Final Jury Instructions, # (2) Exhibit B-Hernandez Final Jury Instructions, # (3) Exhibit C- Shaaban Instructions, # (4) Exhibit D- Transcript of May 12 Hearing, # (5) Exhibit E- Motion to Dismiss Hearing Transcript)(Hershman, Scott)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov on re: [133] MOTION / Defendant Evgeny Buryakov's Application for Pretrial Release. ENDORSEMENT: Government to respond by 3-10-16. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/8/2016)(bw)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          MOTION /Defendant Evgeny Buryakov's Application for Pretrial Release . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Arraignment
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Arraignment as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) Count 1s,2s held on 3/3/2016. Plea entered by Evgeny Buryakov Not Guilty. AUSA Emil Bove present; AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; AUSA Brendan Quigley present; paralegal Brandon DeShields present; Defendant present with defense attorney Scott Hershman present; Defense attorneys Greg Little and Kimberly Haviv present; Court Reporter Sonya Huggins present; defendant arraigned on S1; defendant waives a public reading and a plea of not guilty is entered on behalf of defendant; Court directs that no more submissions be made by the parties with the exception of a possible bail application and the responses to motions previously filed; next conference is on 3/10/16. (jbo)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. At the arraignment (regarding S1 15 Cr 73), on March 3, 2016 at 11:00 am, the Court will, among other things, also inquire of counsel whether the issues raised in Missouri v. Frye, 132 S.Ct. 1399 (2012) and Lafler v. Cooper, 132 S.Ct. 1376 (2012) have been fully explored with Mr. Buryakov. In particular, the Court will inquire whether Mr. Buryakov is fully aware of any options he may have to resolve this case rather than going to trial. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/2/2016)(ft)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Brendan Quigley dated 3/2/2016 re: Corrected Request 10 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Request)(Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 3/2/2016. AUSA Emil Bove present on telephone; AUSA Stephen Ritchin present on telephone; Defense attorney Scott Hershman present on telephone; Defense attorney Daniel Levin present on telephone; Defendant not present; Defendant's appearance is waived; Court reporter Raquel Robles present; conference held re: items to be addressed at conference on 3/3/16. (jbo)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Motion in Limine
                                                                                      MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Bove, Emil)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Evgeny Buryakov re [126] MOTION in Limine / Notice of Motion in Limine.. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Scott Hershman in Support as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [126] MOTION in Limine / Notice of Motion in Limine.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Motion in Limine
                                                                                            MOTION in Limine / Notice of Motion in Limine. Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Brendan Quigley dated 3/1/16 re: Joint Verdict Form Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Verdict Form)(Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Proposed Examination of Jurors
                                                                                                PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Request to Charge
                                                                                                  Request To Charge by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov on re: [121] LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated February 22, 2016 re [117] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 18, 2016 re: a date, set by the Court, by which the Government must make expert disclosures under Rule 16(a)(1)(G). ENDORSEMENT: 1) Government to make full expert disclosures by 4 P.M. on 2/29/16. 2) Arraignment re: S1 on 3/3/16 at 11:00 A.M. 3) Defense to make full expert disclosures by 3/2/16 at 4:00 P.M. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/25/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 22, 2016 re [117] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 18, 2016 re: a date, set by the Court, by which the Government must make expert disclosures under Rule 16(a)(1)(G) .. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Brendan F. Quigley dated 2/19/2016 re: [117] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 18, 2016 re: a date, set by the Court, by which the Government must make expert disclosures under Rule 16(a)(1)(G) .. (Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [117] LETTER MOTION to request the Court to set a date by which the Government must make expert disclosures under Rule 16(a)(1)(G). Despite Defendant's repeated requests for such disclosure and the rapidly approaching trial date, the Government has still not identified its expert witnesses or provided the disclosure required by Rule 16. Accordingly, Defendant respectively moves to compel the Government to disclose the names of its expert witnesses and their qualifications, opinions and the bases and reasons for their opinions by March 4, 2016 or to be precluded from presenting expert testimony at trial from any witness for whom the "Government has failed to fulfill its Rule 16 obligations prior to this deadline...ENDORSEMENT...Government to respond in writing by 2/19/16 at 5:00pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/18/2016) (jw)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016, Terminated: 2/18/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 18, 2016 re: a date, set by the Court, by which the Government must make expert disclosures under Rule 16(a)(1)(G) . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Indictment
                                                                                                              (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Igor Sporyshev (2) count(s) 1s, Victor Podobnyy (3) count(s) 1s. (jm)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated February 12, 2016 re: the testimony of Ms. Marina Buryakova (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [114] LETTER MOTION Modification of Protective Order as to Evgeny Buryakov (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/9/2016) (ft)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016, Terminated: 2/9/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Kimberly A. Haviv dated February 8, 2016 re: [21] Protective Order,,,,,,,,, re: requesting the court authorize a modification to the Protective Order . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Haviv, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Owen C. Pell dated January 29, 2016 re: The Irish High Court Order granting the ex parte application based on the Order and Letter of Request entered by Your Honor [101][102] (Attachments: # (1) Ex Parte Application and High Court Order)(Pell, Owen)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott E. Hershman dated January 27, 2016 re: A Former Judicial Intern (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/12/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 1/12/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/20/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 1/20/16 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [104] LETTER MOTION as to Evgeny Buryakov (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted On Consent. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/25/2016) (ft)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [105] LETTER MOTION as to Evgeny Buryakov (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted On Consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/25/2016) (ft)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016, Terminated: 1/25/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated January 21, 2016 re: [21] Protective Order,,,,,,,,, re: requesting permission to produce documents at Buryakova deposition that are subject to the current protective order . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016, Terminated: 1/25/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated January 21, 2016 re: [21] Protective Order,,,,,,,,, re: requesting the court authorize a modification to the Protective Order (Dkt. No. 21) . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 1/20/2016. AUSA Steve Ritchin present; AUSA Emil Bove present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hirshman, Owen Pell, and Martin Sawyer; Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski present; Russian Interpreter Nelly Alishaev present standby interpretation; conference held re: deposition; stipulations; declassifying information; and pending civil matter; deposition of Marina Buryakova will likely be scheduled for 2/23, 2/24 and 2/25. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated January 15, 2016 re: We write to ask the Court to authorize a modification of the Protective Order in this case [Dkt. No. 21] in connection with a civil action brought against Mr. Buryakov by his former landlord. Accordingly, we request that the Court except from the Protective Order (i) the enclosed materials, and (ii) any future photographs of the Buryakov rental property that are cleared by the Government. The Government has reviewed the photographs on the DVD, and is satisfied that no other materials subject to the Protective Order will be disclosed. The Government hasconsented to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted on consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/19/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER OF REQUEST TO THE HIGH COURT OF IRELAND FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE: as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. Conclusion: In the spirit of comity and reciprocity, this Court hereby requests international judicial assistance of Ireland, through the High Court of Ireland, in fulfilling the above request for the preservation of evidence for trial as expeditiously as possible. This Court expresses its sincere willingness to provide similar assistance to the High Court of Ireland if future circumstances should require. Please accept the assurance of our highest esteem. ENDORSEMENT: ON CONSENT OF PARTIES. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/15/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. Upon review of Defendant Evgeny Buryakov's Motion for an Order Authorizing the Deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova; all submissions and appearances with respect thereto; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Motion for an Order Authorizing the Deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall docket the letter of request addressed to the High Court of Ireland that is attached hereto. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, that all issues relating to the admissibility of any deposition testimony are reserved until trial in this matter; IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, that the deponent shall produce to the Government at the deposition any book, paper, document, record, recording and data in her possession, custody or control related to the subject or subjects of her anticipated testimony; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED, that the defendant shall produce to the Government at the deposition any writing that was used to refresh the deponent's memory before testifying, as well as any writing that was used to refresh the deponent's memory while testifying. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/15/2016); Copy Sent By Chambers to: AUSA Brendan F. Quigley, Attorney Scott Hershman. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-73-1) Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated January 14, 2016 re: We are counsel to Defendant Evgeny Buryakov in this action and write to ask the Court to authorize the following modification to the Protective Order entered in this case [Dkt. No. 21]. Specifically, the Government has consented to permitting Kimberly Haviv, a non-U.S. person who is a lawyer at White & Case in New York, to be provided materials otherwise subject to the Protective Order. Ms. Haviv is a part of the defense team, and providing her access to the case materials is necessary for the purpose of preparing the defense in this case. Ms. Haviv shall be provided with a copy of the Protective Order and shall be vised that she shall not further disseminate or discuss the materials, and must otherwise follow the terms of the Protective Order. Ms. Haviv will execute a copy of the protective order indicating that she agrees to abide by its terms. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted On Consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/15/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil Bove dated January 14, 2016 re: Revised Letter of Request to Ireland Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Letter of Request)(Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. Regarding the proposed Order and Letter to the High Court of Ireland for International Judicial Assistance, submitted to the Court on January 13, 2016, the Court suggests that counsel make the changes in the letter attached hereto, if agreeable to both sides. Please meet and confer and provide an updated draft to the Court today. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/14/2016)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated January 14, 2016 re: Requesting that the Court authorize a modification to the Protective Order [21] . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil Bove dated January 13, 2016 re: Proposed Rule 15 Deposition Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit Proposed Letter of Request)(Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 1/12/2016. AUSA Steve Ritchin present; AUSA Emil Bove present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Owen Pell and Kelly Newman; Court Reporter Pamela Utter present; Russian Interpreter Anna Mazurova present for standby interpretation; conference held re: Rule 16 deposition; government to respond/submit modifications to defense proposal by 1/13/16; next conference is scheduled for 1/20/16 at 11:00 am. (Status Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil Bove dated January 8, 2016 re: Joint Status Letter Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/21/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 12/21/15 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil J. Bove III, Brendan F. Quigley dated 1/4/2016 re: The Government writes to respectfully request, with the consent of defense counsel, a two-week adjournment of the tiling deadline for the Government's response to the defendant's November 24, 2015 First Notice (the "First Notice") pursuant to Section 5 of the Classified Information Procedures Act, 18 U.S.C. App. 3 ("CIPA")..ENDORSEMENT: Extension granted to 1/11/16. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 1/4/16)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil Bove dated January 4, 2016 re: Adjournment Request Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Evgeny Buryakov re: [22] Protective Order,,,,,,,,,,,, / Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Receipt of Classified Information. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 12/21/2015. AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; AUSA Emil Bove present; AUSA Brendan Quigley present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman, Martin Sawyer and Owen Pell; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present for standby interpretation; Court Reporter Jerry Harrison present; conference held re: Rule 15 deposition; counsel to report to the Court by letter by 1/8/16 the status of the discussions re: Rule 15 deposition; conference scheduled for 1/12/16 at 10:30 am. (Status Conference set for 1/12/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/3/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 12/3/15 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                  As to Evgeny Buryakov: Status Conference set for 12/21/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/3/15)(ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                    As to Evgeny Buryakov: Pretrial submissions including joint jury charges; motions in limine; list of names and places to be mentioned at trial; and proposed voir dire questions are due by 3/1/2016. Responses to motions in limine due by 3/8/2016. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 12/3/15)(ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 12/3/2015. AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; AUSA Emil Bove present; AUSA Brendan Quigley present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman, Kelly Newman and MartinSawyer; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present for standby interpretation;Court Reporter Alena Lynch present; Court reviews pretrial submission schedule;pretrial submissions including joint jury charges; motions in limine; list of names and places to be mentioned at trial; and proposed voir dire questions are due 3/1/16; responses to motions in limine are due 3/8/16; hearing held re: Rule 15 deposition; see transcript of proceedings held for a complete record;parties to meet and confer re: proposed Rule 15 deposition; next conference is scheduled for 12/21/15 at 9:00 am. (ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/19/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 10/19/15 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [83] LETTER MOTION We are writing to ask the Court to authorize the following modification to the Protective Order entered in this case as to Evgeny Buryakov...ENDORSEMENT..Application Granted, on consent. Have those persons sign off in writing that they will abide by the terms of the confidentiality agreement. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/24/15) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015, Terminated: 11/24/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated November 24, 2015 re: Requesting that the Court authorize a modification to the Protective Order [21] . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of / Defendant Evgeny Buryakov's First CIPA § 5 Notice [Cover Sheet] as to Evgeny Buryakov (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to (15-Cr-73-1) Evgeny Buryakov. The Court will hear brief (10 minutes per side) oral argument on December 3, 2015 at 12:00 noon on the pending motion for the Rule 15(a) deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova. Counsel should be prepared to address, among other things, their positions regarding Defendant's appearing (or waiving his appearance, etc.) at the deposition. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/19/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated 11/16/2015 re: We respectfully request that the Court exclude these files from the scope of the Protective Order..ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Counsel to pick up CD in chambers ASAP. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/18/2015)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 09/30/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 09/30/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2016. (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stephen J Ritchin appearing for USA. (Ritchin, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [72] LETTER MOTION to respectfully request that the Court grant leave for my withdrawal from the above-referenced case as attorney of record for the United States of America as to Evgeny Buryakov..ENDORSEMENT..Application granted. Mr. Fee shall be removed as a attorney of record in this case. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/12/15) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [74] LETTER MOTION to request an extension of the Classified Information Procedures Act ("CIPA") filing schedule that the Court set at the October 19 status conference, under which Defendant is to file his CIPA Section 5 notice by November 12, 2015. At that conference we said we would use our best efforts to meet the November 12 date suggested by the Court. That commitment was one we thought we could meet based on the Government's statement to us before the hearing that they had completed production of classified information...Defense application re; production by Govt and new filing dates is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/12/2015) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney update in case as to Evgeny Buryakov. Attorney Adam Fee terminated (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015, Terminated: 11/12/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated November 10, 2015 re: requesting an extension of the Classified Information Procedures Act ("CIPA") filing schedule that the Court set at the October 19 status conference, under which Defendant is to file his CIPA Section 5 notice by November 12, 2015. . Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated November 9, 2015 re [66] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated October 26, 2015 re: An Order authorizing the deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova in Russia to preserve her testimony for trial.. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015, Terminated: 11/12/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Adam Fee dated 11/6/15 re: to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015, Terminated: 11/6/2015 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for AUSA Adam Fee to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Fee, Adam) Modified on 11/6/2015 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Evgeny Buryakov: Notice to Attorney Adam Fee to RE-FILE Document [71] MOTION for AUSA Adam Fee to Withdraw as Attorney. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated November 3, 2015 re: We write regarding the Protective Order Pertaining to Unclassified Discovery (the "Protective Order"). (Dkt. No. 21). We have conferred with the Government, and with the consent of the Government, we request that the Protective Order be modified so as to remove from its scope the documents identified in Exhibit A, attached to this letter. These documents consist of personal photographs, home videos, and medical records of Mr. Buryakov and his family. As such, the Government has consented to except the enumerated documents from the scope of the protective order. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has no conceptional objection to the parties' agreement to exclude documents from the Protective Order -- but it is unable to "approve" exclusion of documents which it hasn't seen. Perhaps the Govt can respond to this Letter and suggest a solution with input from Mr. Hershman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/4/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Emil Bove dated Nov. 4, 2015 re: [66] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated October 26, 2015 re: An Order authorizing the deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova in Russia to preserve her testimony for trial.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Declaration of William P. Fritzlen)(Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Emil Joseph Bove, III appearing for USA. (Bove, Emil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated October 26, 2015 re: An Order authorizing the deposition of Mrs. Marina Buryakova in Russia to preserve her testimony for trial. Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 10/19/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; AUSA Brendan Quigley present; Also present is Vanessa Quinones, paralegal; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman, Daniel Levin and Kelly Newman; Court Reporter Pamela Utter present; Russian Interpreter (standby) Galya Korovina present; conference held; defense letter re: Rule 15 depositions is due by October 26, 2015; government response is due November 4, 2015; defense notice (CIPA) is due 11/12/15; government response is due 12/21/15; defense reply is due 1/21/16; final pretrial conference is scheduled for 3/10/15 at 10:00 am; speedy trial time was previously excluded to the trial date. (Status Conference set for 3/10/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brendan Francis Quigley appearing for USA. (Quigley, Brendan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov on re: [63] LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Adam Fee, Anna Skotko, Stephen Ritchin dated September 29, 2015 re: Status of Pretrial Motions. Last week, the parties concluded discussions concerning a potential resolution of the above-referenced case without success. Pursuant to the Court's direction at the proceedings held on July 29, 2015, the Government and defense counsel have conferred about anticipated motions pursuant to the Classified Information Procedure Act (ClPA), and write to update the Court on those discussions, as well as another anticipated motion by the defense. ENDORSEMENT: See Court's rules re: no motions (and no need for suggested schedule) absent prior conference and approval by the Court. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/30/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 9/30/2015. AUSA Adam Fee, AUSA Anna Skotko, AUSA Stephen Ritchin present; Also present is paralegal Vanessa Quinones; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman, Kelly Newman and Dan Levin; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present (on standby basis); Court Reporter Patricia Nilsen present; conference held; next conference is scheduled for 10/19/15 at 11:30 am; 12/1/15 conference date is vacated; 12/7/15 trial date is vacated; trial is adjourned to 4/4/16; pretrial submissions are now due 3/1/16; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B). (Status Conference set for 10/19/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSAs Adam Fee, Anna Skotko, Stephen Ritchin dated September 29, 2015 re: Status of Pretrial Motions Document filed by USA. (Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/2/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 9/2/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 9/2/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; Defendant present with defense attorney Scott Hirshman and C. Kelly Newman; Russian Interpreter Nelly Alishaev present (standby); Court Reporter Jerry Harrison present; conference held; next conference is scheduled for 9/30/15 at 11:00 am. (Status Conference set for 9/30/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 07/29/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Arraignment held on 07/29/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2015. (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Oral Argument as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 7/29/2015 re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss. Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars filed by Evgeny Buryakov. AUSA Anna Skotko present; AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Ian McGinley present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman, Owen Pell and Kelly Newman present; Russian Interpreter Andrew Tarutz present in a standby capacity; oral argument held; -------------------: case recesses -------------------: case recalled: all appearances remain the same except for AUSA Fee and AUSA McGinley who are not present; Court issues ruling on motion to dismiss: motion to dismiss is denied; With regard to the motion for a bill of particulars, Court directs the parties to meet and confer; next conference is scheduled for 9/2/15 at 2:00 pm; trial is scheduled for 12/7/15 at 9:00 am; final pretrial conference is scheduled for 12/1/15 at 12:00 noon; pretrial submissions including (joint jury charges, joint verdict sheet, motions in limine, one sentence description of case, list of names and places) are due 11/6/15; response to motion in limine due 11/13/15; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record; see transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (Jury Trial set for 12/7/2015 at 09:00 AM, Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2015 at 12:00 PM, Status Conference set for 9/2/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. The Court will hold brief oral argument (15-20 minutes per side) on the pending motion(s) at the conference on July 29, 2015 at 11:00 am. (Oral Argument set for 7/29/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/22/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING REGARDING RECEIPT OF CLASSIFIED INFORMATION as to Evgeny Buryakov, on re: [22] Protective Order...ENDORSEMENT...Clerk's Office to Docket File (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/20/15)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars. . (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Evgeny Buryakov re: [22] Protective Order,,,,,,,,,,,, /Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Receipt of Classified Information. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/9/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 6/9/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov re [44] MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [48] LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov (1), addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, Anna M. Skotko, dated June 30, 2015 re: Adjournment of Briefing Deadlines. The Government respectfully writes to request a brief adjournment of the Government's deadline for filing its opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss from July 2, 2015, to July 6, 2015. The parties also jointly request that, in the event the Court extends the Government's filing deadline, the Court also adjourn the defendant's deadline for filing his reply from July 14, 2015, to July 17, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. July 23, 2015 conference is adjourned to July 29, 2015 at 11:00 to enable Court adequately to review counsels' submissions and time is excluded under Speedy Trial Act (motion). SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/1/2015) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/1/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 6/1/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Evgeny Buryakov (1): Responses (by Government) due by 7/6/2015. Replies (by Defendant) due by 7/17/2015. Oral Argument set for 7/29/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015, Terminated: 7/1/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, Anna M. Skotko dated June 30, 2015 re: Adjournment of Briefing Deadlines . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov. (Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Scott Hershman in Support as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Evgeny Buryakov re [44] MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars.. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015, Terminated: 7/29/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Indictment and for a Bill of Particulars. Document filed by Evgeny Buryakov. Return Date set for 7/23/2015 at 11:00 AM. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. Counsel should be aware that all pleadings and documents will appear on the public docket, with limited exceptions. See Court's Individual Practices. Also, the Protective Order, dated April27, 2015, between the Government and Scott Hershman and Kim Haviv of White & Case, signed by the Court on April29, 2015, pertains to material that could "implicate national security concerns and impede ongoing investigations." In addition, the parties should adhere to the Southern District of New York's ECF Privacy Policy and the E-Government Act of 2002, which provide that the following personal identifiers should be redacted from a publicly filed document: social security numbers; names of minor children; dates of birth; financial account numbers; home addresses. The redacted version should be filed electronically in the public file and the unredacted version may be filed under seal. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/9/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/12/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 5/12/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 6/9/2015. AUSA Anna Skotko present; AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Ian McGinley present; Defendant present with defense attorney Hershman; Court Reporter Jennifer Thun present; Russian Interpreter Andrew Tarutz present (standby); conference held; defense counsel to file motion by 6/11/15; government to respond by 7/2/15; defense to reply by 7/14/15; defense counsel would like oral argument; oral argument scheduled for 7/23/15 at 11:00 am; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 6/9/15 through 7/23/15 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B). (Oral Argument set for 7/23/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated June 2, 2015 re: the Court's memorandum endorsement of Defendant's May 21, 2015, letter and enclosing Defendant's revised engagement letter with White & Case LLP [37] (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Evgeny Buryakov dated 5/21/2015 re: We confirm the engagement by you of our firm. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk to docket. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. C.J.A. attorney Sean Maher is appointed to represent the Defendant effective May 18, 2015 for Curcio hearing purposes (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/15)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated May 21, 2015 re: As directed by the Court at the May 18, 20 15 conference, Defendant now submits a revised engagement letter with Mr. Buryakov. This letter addresses the questions and concerns raised by the Court at the May 18 conference, and deletes certain paragraphs questioned at that conference. Everything in the engagement letter is consistent with what we have said in our prior letters and on the record. We respectfully submit that the engagement letter now resolves any conflict issues raised by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Court would ask defense counsel to secure signature of VEB official on retainer agreement, e.g. "Agree to and accepted by... this... day of... 2015." (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/1/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Curcio Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Curcio Hearing as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 6/1/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Anna Skotko present; Defendant present with defense attorney Scott Hershman present; Russian Interpreter Andrew Tarutz present (standby); CJA counsel Sean Maher present; Court Reporter Pamela Utter present; Curcio hearing continued; Court recesses while defendant speaks with CJA counsel Sean Maher; Court resumes; Defendant wishes to proceed with Mr. Hershman and the firm of White & Case; Court concludes defendant knowingly and voluntarily waived having conflict free counsel and permits Mr. Hershman and the firm of White & Case to continue representation; next conference is scheduled for 6/9/15 at 12:00 noon; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 6/1/15 to 6/9/15 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B). (Status Conference set for 6/9/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Evgeny Buryakov. Attorney Sean Michael Maher for Evgeny Buryakov added. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/18/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 5/18/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2015. (Grant, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated May 28, 2015 re: Response to a revised Curcio Letter and Proposed Questions filed by the Government on May 26 (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Adam Fee dated May 26, 2015 re: Enclosing Revised Proposed Curcio Hearing Questions Document filed by USA. (Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Evgeny Buryakov: Notice to Attorney Adam Fee to RE-FILE Document [32] Letter. ERROR(S): s/ signature or original signature missing from document. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - LETTER by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from AUSA Adam Fee dated May 26, 2015 re: Enclosing Revised Curcio Questions Document filed by USA. (Fee, Adam) Modified on 5/27/2015 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 5/18/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Anna Skotko present; AUSA Ian McGinley present; Defendant present with defense attorneys Scott Hershman and Spencer Willig; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present (standby); CJA counsel Sean Maher also present; Court Reporter Tom Murray present; conference held; Court inquires of counsel re: Curcio issues; defense counsel to submit new agreement by 5/21/15; government to submit proposed Curcio questions by 5/26/15; defense counsel to respond to government questions by 5/28/15; next conference is scheduled for 6/1/15 at 2:00 pm; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 5/21/15 to 6/1/15 pursuant to 18 USC 3161 h(7)(A) and (B). (Status Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Response in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support of Motion by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov re: [23] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, & Anna Skotko dated May 7, 2015 re: Curcio Hearing .. (McGinley, Ian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated May 14, 2015 re: [23] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, & Anna Skotko dated May 7, 2015 re: Curcio Hearing .. and as per [29] ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. The Court is revising the submission schedule as follows: Defense submissions (both retainer agreement for in camera review and counsel's letter for the docket) are due May 14, 2015 by 5:00pm. Government response, if any, is due on May 15,2015 by 12:00 noon. (Brief due by 5/14/2015, Responses due by 5/15/2015) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/13/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL: as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. IT IS HEREBY STlPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Scott Edward Hershman and Kimberly Anne Haviv of the law firm White & Case LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant Evgeny Buryakov in the place of Maria A. Barton and Benjamin Naftalis of Latham & Watkins LLP. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/12/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Mr. Evgeny Buryakov from White & Case LLP (New York, NY) dated April 24, 2015 re: New York law requires us to send you an "Engagement Letter" addressing the issues set forth below. By this letter we confirm the engagement by you of our firm, White & Case LLP ("White & Case" or "the Firm"), to act as your lawyers and to perform legal services on your behalf in the matter of United States vs. Buryakov, et al., Case No. 15-cr-73 in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (the "Services"). By separate agreement, Vnesheconombank has agreed to be responsible for White & Case's fees and expenses in this matter. Accordingly, we will invoice Vnesheconombank directly for these fees and expenses. As a condition of the Firm undertaking this matter, it should be understood that the Firm may continue to represent or undertake to represent existing or new clients even if those clients' interests are directly adverse to yours in matters substantially unrelated to this engagement regardless of their magnitude and importance. This shall include arbitration and litigation. No attorney or staff member working on this engagement shall be involved in such an adverse representation. Please be advised that if we do not receive additional assignments within 90 days of the conclusion of the last assignment for which you have engaged us, we will consider our attorney-client relationship to have been terminated upon the completion of the specific services you have engaged us to perform. ENDORSEMENT: Clerk is requested to docket this letter under 15 Crim 73, on consent. See Tr of conference held 5/12/15. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/12/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 5/12/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Anna Skotko present; AUSA Ian McGinley present; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present (standby); Court Reporter Carol Ganley present; Defendant present with defense attorney Scott Hershman; Court discusses counsel issue with the parties; defense counsel Hershman submits substitution of counsel papers to the Court; Court reviews/discusses engagement/retainer agreement; defense counsel addresses certain issues with the court including discovery; possible motion to dismiss; possible request for a bill of particulars; defense counsel to submit to the Court additional correspondence by 5/15/15 re: counsel issue; next conference is scheduled for 5/18/15 at 11:00 am; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 5/12/15 to 5/18/15 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B). (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov on re: [25] LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Attorney Scott Hershman dated May 10, 2015 re: We represent the defendant in the above-referenced action. We write in response to the Government's letter of May 7, 2015, requesting a hearing under United States v. Curcio, 680 F.2d 881 (2d Cir. 1982), in order for the Court to "question[] Mr. Hershman about who is paying him to represent the defendant and what, if any, instructions or advice he has received from such third party with respect to his representation of the defendant." [Dkt. No. 23, at 2]. The Government's letter does not raise a Curcio issue, and indeed, no Curcio issue exists, but in any event, we would be prepared to make an in camera proffer to the Court that will confirm that there is no basis for a Curcio hearing. ENDORSEMENT: In prior similar proceedings, the Curcio hearing and the basis therefore were public proceedings. The in camera proceeding was limited to the Court's review of the applicable retainer agreement. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/11/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Evgeny Buryakov addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Scott Hershman dated May 10, 2015 re: [23] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, & Anna Skotko dated May 7, 2015 re: Curcio Hearing .. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Evgeny Buryakov on re: [23] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, & Anna Skotko dated May 7, 2015 re: Curcio Hearing filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: Defense is requested to respond by letter on or before NOON on 5/11/15. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 5/7/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Adam Fee, Ian McGinley, & Anna Skotko dated May 7, 2015 re: Curcio Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (Skotko, Anna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER PERTAINING TO CLASSIFIED INFORMATION: as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. This matter comes before the Court upon the Government's Motion for a Protective Order pursuant to Section 3 of the Classified Information Procedures Act ("CIPA"), 18 U.S.C. App. 3, to protect against the disclosure in this case of any classified information disclosed by the Government to, or otherwise in the possession of, the Defendant or the Defense. Pursuant to the authority granted under CIPA Section 3, the Security Procedures Established Pursuant to Pub. L. No. 96-456, 94 Stat. 2025, by the Chief Justice of the United States for the Protection of Classified Information (reprinted following CIPA ' 9), Rules 16(d) and 57 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and the general supervisory authority of the Court, and to protect the national security, the following Protective Order is entered. General Provisions: 1. The Court finds this case will involve information classified in the interest of national security of the United States pursuant to Executive Order 13526, as amended. The storage, handling and control of this information will require special security precautions mandated by statute, executive order, and regulation, and access to which requires the appropriate security clearances, and a "need to know" determination pursuant to Executive Order 13526. 2. The purpose of this Order is to establish procedures that must be followed by the Defense and the Government, and any other person who receives access to, or otherwise is in possession of, classified information as a result of their participation in this case. The procedures set forth in this Order, CIPA and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978, as amended, 50 U.S.C. §§ 1801, et. Seq., ("FISA"), will apply to all pretrial, trial, post-trial, and appellate matters concerning classified information, and may be modified from time to time by further order of the Court pursuant to Rule 16(d) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, CIPA Section 3, and the Court's inherent supervisory authority to ensure a fair and expeditious trial....[See this Protective Order]... 25. A copy of this Order shall be issued forthwith to counsel for the Defendant who shall be responsible for advising the Defendant and representatives of the Defense of this Order. Counsel for the Defendant, and any other representatives of the Defense who will be provided access to the classified information, shall execute the Memorandum of Understanding described in paragraph 12 of this Order, and counsel for the Defendant shall file executed originals of such documents with the Court and the CISO and serve an executed original upon the Government. The execution and filing of the Memorandum of Understanding is a condition precedent for counsel for the Defendant and any other representative of the Defense to have access to classified information. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/23/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER PERTAINING TO UNCLASSIFIED INFORMATION: as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov. UPON application of the Government, and with consent of the defense: WHEREAS, the defendant, Evgeny Buryakov, a/k/a "Zhenya," has been charged in an indictment with acting as an unregistered agent of a foreign government and conspiring to do the same, violation of Title 18, United States Code, Sections 371, 951, and 2; WHEREAS, the defendant has certain rights under the United States Constitution, federal statutes, and the federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, to pre-trial discovery; WHEREAS, the Government recognizes its obligation to provide such discovery materials to the defendant, consistent with national security concerns and the confidentiality of ongoing investigations; WHEREAS, the discovery materials that the Government intends to provide to the defendant contains cer1ain materials that, if disseminated to third parties, could, among other things, implicate national security concerns and impede ongoing investigations; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), that discovery materials provided by the Government to defense counsel of record shall not be further disseminated by the defendant or his counsel to any individuals, organizations or other entities, other than members of the defense team (limited to: co-counsel, paralegals, investigators, translators, litigation support personnel, secretarial staff, and the defendant); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each of the individuals to whom disclosure of discovery materials is made shall be provided a copy of this Protective Order by defense counsel of record and will be advised by defense counsel of record that he or she shall not further disseminate or discuss the materials and must follow the terms of this Protective Order;...[See this Protective Order]... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that nothing in this Order prohibits the media from requesting copies of any items that are received by the Court as public exhibits at a hearing, trial, or other proceeding; and FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that nothing in this Order shall preclude the Government from seeking a further protective order pursuant to Rule 16(d) as to particular items of discovery material. SO ORDERED: On Consent: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/29/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/23/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 3/23/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kimberly Anne Haviv appearing for Evgeny Buryakov. Appearance Type: Retained. (Haviv, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott Edward Hershman appearing for Evgeny Buryakov. Appearance Type: Retained. (Hershman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of INTENT TO USE FOREIGN INTELLIGENCE SURVEILLANCE ACT INFORMATION as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy (Fee, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address as to Evgeny Buryakov. New Address: Latham & Watkins LLP, 885 Third Avenue, New York, New York, U.S.A. 10022, 212.906.1200. (Naftalis, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: 3/23/2015 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER PERTAINING TO UNCLASSIFIED INFORMATION as to (15-Cr-73-01) Evgeny Buryakov....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), that discovery materials provided by the Government to defense counsel of record shall not be further disseminated by the defendant or his counsel to any individuals, organization or other entities, other than members of the defense team (limited to co-counsel, paralegals, investigators, translators, litigation support personnel, secretarial staff, and the defendant); IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each of the individuals to whom disclosure of discovery materials is made shall be provided a copy of this Protective Order by defense counsel of record and will be advised by defense counsel of record that he or she shall not further disseminate or discuss the materials and must follow the terms of this Protective Order;....[See this Protective Order]... FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that nothing in this Order shall preclude the Government from seeking a further protective order pursuant to Rule 16(d) as to particular items of discovery material. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/23/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Evgeny Buryakov: Status Conference set for 5/12/2015 at 12:00 PM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 3/23/2015. AUSA Adam Fee present; AUSA Anna Skotko present; Defendant Buryakov present with defense attorney Benjamin Naftalis and Irina Sivachenko; Russian Interpreter Yana Agoureev present (standby); Court Reporter Eve Giniger present; conference held; Court discusses with counsel proposed protective order; Court signs protective order with consent of defendant; 3/26/15 conference is vacated; next conference is scheduled for May 12, 2015 at 12:00; speedy trial time is excluded for the reasons set forth on the record from 3/23/15 to 5/12/15 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (B). (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. The Court is in receipt of a proposed protective order pertaining to unclassified information in the above case, The Court will hold a conference on Monday, March 23, 2015 at 11:00 am to discuss this matter. (Status Conference set for 3/23/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman.) (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 3/17/2015)(ft) Modified on 3/17/2015 (ft).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Evgeny Buryakov. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/11/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Evgeny Buryakov re: Conference held on 2/11/2015 before Judge Richard M. Berman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              As to Evgeny Buryakov: Status Conference set for 3/26/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/11/15) (ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Arraignment as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) Count 1,2 held on 2/11/2015. AUSA Anna Skotko present;Also present is SA FBI Gregory Monaghan;Defendant Buryakov present with defense attorney Benjamin Naftalis and Irina Sivachenko;Russian Interpreter Nelly Alishaev present (for standby interpretation);Court Reporter Carol Ganley present;conference held;Defendant is arraigned on the Indictment;Defense counsel waives a public hearing and requests that a plea of not guilty be entered;next conference is scheduled for 3/26/15 at 10:00 am. (ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT FILED as to Evgeny Buryakov (1) count(s) 1, 2, Igor Sporyshev (2) count(s) 1, 2, Victor Podobnyy (3) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF as to Evgeny Buryakov, Igor Sporyshev, Victor Podobnyy. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Maria A. Barton appearing for Evgeny Buryakov. (dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Benjamin Naftalis appearing for Evgeny Buryakov. (dif) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/6/2015) (dif).[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Evgeny Buryakov. Attorney Maria A. Barton for Evgeny Buryakov added.. (dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Attorney update in case as to Evgeny Buryakov. Attorney Benjamin Naftalis for Evgeny Buryakov added. Attorney Sabrina P. Shroff terminated. (dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Initial Appearance as to Evgeny Buryakov held on 1/26/2015., Deft Appears with Federal Defender Sabrina Shroff and AUSA Adam Fee for the government. Detention; Defendant is Detained on Risk of Flight. The Nature of the Allegations Suggest that He Will Have Every Resource Available to Flee the Country and Avoid Facing the Charges; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 2/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Evgeny Buryakov. Sabrina P. Shroff for Evgeny Buryakiov appointed.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/26/2015)(dif) Modified on 1/28/2015 (dif).[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Evgeny Buryakov. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Federal Defender Sabrina Shroff Appointed) (dif) Modified on 1/28/2015 (dif).[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Evgeny Buryakov. (dif) Modified on 1/28/2015 (dif).[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT as to Evgeny Buryakiov (1), Igor Sporyshev (2), Victor Podobnyy (3). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 371, 951 and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas) (dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 1/23/2015)(dif)[1:15-mj-00215-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2,402 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?