Washington State v. Steven Chu
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-05085

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 2:41 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Washington State, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/17/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy Harris Jaffe +1 360 586 3158 +1 360 586 4637 dorij@atg.wa.gov
TERMINATED: 05/19/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold Lee Overton +1 360 586 6770 leeo1@atg.wa.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly T Wood +1 360 586 6766 +1 360 586 6760 kellyw1@atg.wa.gov
TERMINATED: 08/26/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allyson Zipp +1 360 586 2669 +1 360 586 6760 AllysonZ@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A Fitz +1 360 459 6320 +1 360 586 6760 AndyF@atg.wa.gov
TERMINATED: 08/26/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nels Johnson +1 360 586 3514 +1 360 586 6760 ECYOLYEF@ATG.WA.GOV
TERMINATED: 10/16/2014 Mary Sue Wilson +1 360 586 6770 marysuew@atg.wa.gov
v.
No Logo Samuel W Bodman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Boucher Dawson +1 202 514 8293 +1 202 514 8865 elizabeth.dawson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH C. AMADITZ +1 202 514 2219 +1 202 514 8865 kenneth.amaditz@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Kaplan +1 202 514 0997 david.kaplan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia J. Morris +1 202 616 7554 +1 202 514 8865 c.j.morris@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin David Saylor +1 202 514 1880 +1 202 598 7868 austin.saylor@usdoj.gov
No Logo Steven Chu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Boucher Dawson +1 202 514 8293 +1 202 514 8865 elizabeth.dawson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH C. AMADITZ +1 202 514 2219 +1 202 514 8865 kenneth.amaditz@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Kaplan +1 202 514 0997 david.kaplan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chloe H. Kolman +1 202 514 9277 +1 202 514 8865 chloe.kolman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia J. Morris +1 202 616 7554 +1 202 514 8865 c.j.morris@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin David Saylor +1 202 514 1880 +1 202 598 7868 austin.saylor@usdoj.gov
No Logo US Dept Energy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben Franklin Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Boucher Dawson +1 202 514 8293 +1 202 514 8865 elizabeth.dawson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KENNETH C. AMADITZ +1 202 514 2219 +1 202 514 8865 kenneth.amaditz@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMANDA SHAFER BERMAN +1 202 514 1950 amanda.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Kaplan +1 202 514 0997 david.kaplan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chloe H. Kolman +1 202 514 9277 +1 202 514 8865 chloe.kolman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia J. Morris +1 202 616 7554 +1 202 514 8865 c.j.morris@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin David Saylor +1 202 514 1880 +1 202 598 7868 austin.saylor@usdoj.gov
No Logo Hanford Communities, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Reuter +1 509 777 1600 +1 509 777 1616 todd.reuter@foster.com
No Logo Tri-City Development Council, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Reuter +1 509 777 1600 +1 509 777 1616 todd.reuter@foster.com
No Logo Oregon, State Of, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A Fitz +1 360 459 6320 +1 360 586 6760 AndyF@atg.wa.gov
TERMINATED: 10/16/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Sue Wilson +1 360 586 6770 marysuew@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Oregon Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina R. Englander +1 971 673 1880 +1 971 673 5000 nina.englander@doj.state.or.us
TERMINATED: 07/20/2015, PRO HAC VICE Stephanie M. Parent +1 971 673 1880 +1 971 673 5000 stephanie.m.parent@doj.state.or.us

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2014, PRO HAC VICE Roger J. DeHoog +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4793 roger.dehoog@doj.state.or.us
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331ev
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (245) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Association of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Association of Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Attorney Withdrawal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Kelly T Wood on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Elizabeth B Dawson on behalf of Defendant US Dept Energy (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Sealed Document. The Court notes for the record that the Court has neither reviewed nor relied upon any anonymous filings or any non-pleadings in any manner during this proceeding. (SK, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    SECOND AMENDED CONSENT DECREE BETWEEN DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY AND STATE OF WASHINGTON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      SECOND AMENDED CONSENT DECREE BETWEEN DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY AND STATE OF OREGON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Granting 229 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Modifications to Amended Consent Decrees. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Joint MOTION Entry of Stipulated Modifications to Amended Consent Decrees re 222 Consent Decree, 223 Consent Decree by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Denying 227 Motion to Obtain Record of Technical Advisor Proceedings. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Consent MOTION to Obtain Record of Technical Advisor Proceedings (Unopposed) by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE by All Defendants re 219 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Compliance With Court Order Regarding Technical Advisor Contracts) (Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  AMENDED CONSENT DECREE BETWEEN DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY AND STATE OF OREGON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    AMENDED CONSENT DECREE BETWEEN DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY AND STATE OF WASHINGTON. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      THIRD ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO MODIFY CONSENT DECREES; granting in part and denying in part 75 State of Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree; granting in part and denying in part 76 United States' Motion to Modify Consent Decree; granting in part and denying in part 99 State of Oregon's Motion to Modify Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER DISCHARGING TECHNICAL ADVISORS. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER Denying 217 Motion to Remove Technical Advisor. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Granting 216 Motion to Strike Anonymous Filings. ECF Nos. 165 , 172 , 210 , and 215 are stricken from the docket. These documents have not been reviewed nor relied upon by the Court in any manner. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MOTION to Remove Technical Advisor by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit January 25, 2016 Letter from U.S. to State, # 2 Exhibit February 12, 2016 Letter from State to U.S., # 3 Affidavit of Benton J. Harp, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Consent MOTION to Strike 210 Sealed Document, 215 Sealed Document, 165 Letter, 172 Sealed Document by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Sealed Anonymous Letter to Judge Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(MS, Judicial Assistant). This document has been stricken from the docket. See ECF No. 218 . Modified on 3/11/2016 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT Regarding Technical Advisor Contracts (Second, Joint) by All Defendants. (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      STATUS REPORT Regarding Technical Advisor Contracts (Joint Report) by US Dept Energy. (Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffery Lyon (re-submitted with signature) re 208 Response, by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Dorothy Harris Jaffe on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Jaffe, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Sealed Document. Anonymous Letter to Chief Judge Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2015: # 1 Attachments) (PL, Case Administrator). This document has been stricken from the docket. See ECF No. 218 . Modified on 3/11/2016 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE re 198 Memorandum, State of Washington's Supplemental Memorandum by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Fourth Supplemental Declaration of Benton J. Harp, # 2 Affidavit Sixth Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Fletcher)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE re 196 Brief, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Third Declaration of Dan McDonald, # 2 Affidavit Seventh Declaration of Jeffery Lyon, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Kelly Wood Re: Seventh Decl. of Lyon)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE re 196 Brief, by Oregon State of. (Englander, Nina) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER APPOINTING PANEL OF TECHNICAL ADVISORS. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR DR. PER F. PETERSON. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Dan McDonald (re-submitted with signature) re 198 Memorandum, by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR SUZANNE L. DAHL-CRUMPLER. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Suzanne L. Dahl-Crumpler)(PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR JEFFREY S. TRENT. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Letter from Chief Judge Peterson to Jeffrey S. Trent dated November 16, 2015 (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2015: # 1 Affidavit of Technical Advisor Jeffrey S. Trent) (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Letter from Chief Judge Peterson to Per D. Peterson, Ph.D. dated November 17, 2015 (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2015: # 1 Affidavit of Technical Advisor Dr. Per F. Peterson) (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Letter from Chief Judge Peterson to Suzanne Dahl-Crumpler dated November 17, 2015 (MS, Judicial Assistant) (PL, Case Administrator). Modified on 11/20/2015 to redact address (PL, Case Administrator). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/24/2015: # 1 Affidavit of Technical Advisor Suzanne L. Dahl-Crumpler) (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM In Support of Washington's Second Revised Proposed Order Amending Consent Decree by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Second Revised Proposed] Order Amending Consent Decree, # 2 Affidavit Second Declaration of Dan McDonald, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Andy Fitz Re: Second Decl. of McDonald, # 4 Affidavit Sixth Declaration of Jeffery Lyon)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of State of Oregon's Revised Proposed Order Modifying Consent Decree by Oregon State of. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment: Amended [Proposed] Order)(Englander, Nina) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        BRIEF In Support of Second Proposed Consent Decree Modification by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Third Supplemental Declaration of Benton J. Harp, # 3 Affidavit Fifth Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Fletcher and Exhibits)(Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Austin David Saylor on behalf of Steven Chu, US Dept Energy (Attorney Austin David Saylor added to party Steven Chu(pty:dft), Attorney Austin David Saylor added to party US Dept Energy(pty:dft))(Saylor, Austin) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Washington State re 193 Stipulation Notice re: Parties' Joint Proposal on Technical Advisor Compensation (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 192 Order Parties' Joint Proposal Re Technical Advisor Compensation by Washington State. (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER CONCERNING PANEL OF TECHNICAL ADVISORS. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 184 Objections to Washington's Proposed Technical Advisor by Washington State. (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS re 184 Objections, 181 Sealed Document to the State of Washington's Proposed Technical Advisor on the Basis of Qualifications by All Defendants. (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT re 180 Sealed Document United States' Proposal Regarding Panel of Technical Advisors (Unsealed) by All Defendants. (Dawson, Elizabeth) () (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT re 177 Sealed Document, 181 Sealed Document Attachments A & B to Washington's Proposed Technical Advisor Contact Information (Redacted) by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Regarding 184 and 185 Objections to Proposed Technical Advisors. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 182 United States' Motion to Unseal Parties Proposals Regarding Technical Advisors. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS re 180 Sealed Document Department of Energy's Proposed Technical Advisors by Washington State. (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS re 181 Sealed Document State of Washington's Proposed Technical Advisor Submission by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 180 Sealed Document, 181 Sealed Document Regarding Appointment of Technical Advisor by All Defendants. (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Unseal Document 180 Sealed Document, 179 Sealed Order, 181 Sealed Document by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (CC, Case Administrator). Document unsealed per Order entered at ECF No. 186 . Modified on 9/22/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. (CC, Case Administrator). Document unsealed per Order entered at ECF No. 186 . Modified on 9/22/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Order signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CC, Case Administrator). Document unsealed per Order entered at ECF No. 186 . Modified on 9/22/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ***PROPOSED Sealed Documents . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Wash.'s Proposed Technical Advisor Submission)(Fitz, Andrew). Document unsealed per Order entered at ECF No. 186 . Modified on 9/22/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 175 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 173 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Objection to the filing of the Anonymous Letter [ECF No. 172]. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Letter from Anonymous to Chief Judge Peterson dated August 16, 2015. (MF, Courtroom Deputy). This document has been stricken from the docket. See ECF No. 218 . Modified on 3/11/2016 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SECOND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO MODIFY CONSENT DECREE; granting 168 Joint Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting a continuance to file names of selected experts to serve on the expert panel until twenty-one days after the filing date of the forthcoming Order. A more detailed Order is to follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Clarify re 166 Motion Hearing,, by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on July 23, 2015 in Richland before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Page Numbers: 1-143 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly J. Allen by telephone at 509-943-8175 . Redaction Request due 8/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2015. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2015 re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State, 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy, 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree filed by Oregon State of. (Reported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen) (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Anonymous to Chief Judge Peterson dated July 8, 2015 (MS, Judicial Assistant). This document has been stricken from the docket. See ECF No. 218 . Modified on 3/11/2016 (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Stephanie Marie Parent on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Oregon State of (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Denying in Part 55 Washington's Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM re 155 MOTION to Strike 149 Submission of Proposed Order filed by Washington State. (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 157 Washington's MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Strike (ECF No. 155 ). Motion Hearing on ECF No. 155 set for 7/9/2015 at 6:30 PM Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 155 MOTION to Strike 149 Submission of Proposed Order filed by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 at 12:30 PM Richland Courtroom 189 before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM re 157 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Strike (ECF No. 155) filed by Washington State. (Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 157 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Strike (ECF No. 155) filed by All Defendants. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Strike (ECF No. 155) by Washington State. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Andrew Fitz in Support re 155 MOTION to Strike 149 Submission of Proposed Order filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 149 Submission of Proposed Order by Washington State. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Jeffery Lyon in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Thomas Fletcher in Support re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by All Defendants. (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. 151 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nina R Englander, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Nina R. Englander. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number SPO024350. by Oregon State of. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Jeffery Lyon in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of Proposed Order Re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy ; filed by All Defendants. (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Thomas Fletcher in Support re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Delmar L. Noyes in Support re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree , 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree , 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree : Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 at 12:30 PM Richland Courtroom 189 before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by All Defendants All Parties' Joint Notice Proposing Argument Time and Format (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY ORDER memorializing telephonic hearing held on 5/13/2015, 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 at 11:00 AM in Richland, WA, with oral argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. The parties may submit supplemental materials regarding the suitability of their respective proposals no later than June 5, 2015, and rebuttal materials no later than June 19, 2015. Each filing may not exceed twenty (20) pages, exclusive of exhibits. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Kelly T Wood on behalf of Washington State (Attorney Kelly T Wood added to party Washington State(pty:pla))(Wood, Kelly) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Harold Lee Overton on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Overton, Harold) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Telephonic Hearing held on 5/13/2015. (Reported/Recorded by: Ronelle F. Corbey) (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: Telephonic Conference set for 5/13/2015 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. The parties shall call the Court's toll free conference line at 888-363-4749 and enter access code 6699898 to be connected to the hearing. Please follow the automated directions carefully so that you will be added to the conference in a timely manner. Cell phones and speaker phones are not compatible with the Court's sound system and may not be used. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter.(CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Regarding 75 , 76 and 99 Motions to Amend Consent Decrees. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT re 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree by Oregon State of. (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNITED STATES' POST-HEARING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by US Dept Energy. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 130 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 130 MOTION for Leave to File United States' Post-Hearing Supplemental Brief filed by Oregon State of. (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 130 MOTION for Leave to File United States' Post-Hearing Supplemental Brief filed by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 131 Defendants' Motion for Expedited Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule. Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief, ECF No. 130 , is reset to 03/25/15, without oral argument. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite United States' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File United States' Post-Hearing Supplemental Brief by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief)(Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on 2/19/2015 in Richland, WA before Judge Honorable Rosanna Malouf Peterson. Page Numbers: 1 to 105 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly Allen by telephone at 509-943-8175 . Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2015 re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State, 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy, 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree filed by Oregon State of. (Reported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen) (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Praecipe filed by US Dept Energy: Re 124 Declaration,. Description: Correction to Exhibit 3. (Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Praecipe filed by US Dept Energy: Re 124 Declaration,. Description: Correction to Exhibit 3. (Dawson, Elizabeth). This document will not open - it has been re-filed at ECF No. 127 . Modified on 2/19/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER regarding Notice by Washington State 123 re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 119 , and Order on Motion to Expedite. The Court will expand the scope of oral argument regarding the two additional topics proposed by Washington, in addition to those topics identified in the Court's Order, ECF No. 119, at the hearing scheduled on February 19, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Richland, WA. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Delmar L. Noyes (Second Supplemental) by US Dept Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Dawson, Elizabeth). Exhibit 3 to this document is blank. Counsel to file a praecipe and attach Exhibit 3. Modified on 2/19/2015 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Washington State re 119 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Expedite, Washington's Proposed Agenda for Hearing (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Steven Chu By All Parties; Notice Proposing Argument Time and Format (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT (Notice of Supplemental Authority) by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Authority)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 118 Declaration,,,, Exhibit 42 by US Dept Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43, # 2 Exhibit 44, # 3 Exhibit 45, # 4 Exhibit 46, # 5 Exhibit 47, # 6 Exhibit 48, # 7 Exhibit 49, # 8 Exhibit 50, # 9 Exhibit 51, # 10 Exhibit 52, # 11 Exhibit 53, # 12 Exhibit 54, # 13 Exhibit 55, # 14 Exhibit 56)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDICIAL SITE VISIT AT THIS TIME. Denying 114 Motion for Judicial Site Visit ; Granting 115 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Elizabeth B. Dawson by US Dept Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit Exhibit 41)(Dawson, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 114 MOTION Judicial Site Visit filed by Oregon State of. (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 114 MOTION Judicial Site Visit filed by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite (Unopposed) by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Kolman, Chloe) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Judicial Site Visit by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Kolman, Chloe) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A Supplemental Declaration of Delmar L. Noyes, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B Second Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Fletcher)(Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Jeffery Lyon in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by Jane Hedges in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Suzanne Dahl-Crumpler in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Andrew Fitz in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Revised)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM re 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree filed by Oregon State of. (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Robert A. Gilbert, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Delmar Noyes, # 3 Exhibit C - Supplemental Declaration of Benton J. Harp, # 4 Exhibit D - Supplemental Declaration of Thomas Fletcher, # 5 Exhibit E - Supplemental Declaration of Todd Shrader, # 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of James Owendoff, # 7 Exhibit G - Tri-Party Agreement Appendix)(Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Jeffery Lyon in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Suzanne Dahl-Crumpler in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33, # 2 Exhibit 34, # 3 Exhibit 35, # 4 Exhibit 36, # 5 Exhibit 37, # 6 Exhibit 38)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by Andrew Fitz in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION in Support re 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree filed by Oregon State of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex.1 to Parent Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Parent Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Parent Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Parent Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Parent Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Parent Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Parent Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Parent Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Parent Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Parent Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Parent Declaration)(Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Errata filed by Hanford Communities, Tri-City Development Council: Re 96 Brief Corrected Signatures. (Reuter, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 76 Motion to Amend/Correct,, 59 Consent Decree, 60 Consent Decree and Combined Response to Washingtons' and United States' Motions to Modify Consent Decree by Oregon State of. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2015 at 02:00 PM Richland Courtroom 189 before Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Amending Consent Decree)(Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Gary Petersen In Support of Amicus re 96 Brief by Hanford Communities, Tri-City Development Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1 (pp 9-10), # 2 Exhibit #2 (pp 11-15), # 3 Exhibit #3 (pp 16-19), # 4 Exhibit #4 (pp 20-21), # 5 Exhibit #5 (pp 22-25), # 6 Exhibit #6 (pp 26-31), # 7 Exhibit #7 (pp 32-37), # 8 Exhibit #8 (pp 38-40), # 9 Exhibit #9 (pp 41-43), # 10 Exhibit #10 (pp 44-47))(Reuter, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Pamela A. Larsen in Support of Amicus re 96 Brief by Hanford Communities, Tri-City Development Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (pp 4-6))(Reuter, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree Amicus Brief by Tri-City Development Council, Hanford Communities. (Reuter, Todd) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Oregon State of. Stephanie Marie Parent is substituted as counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff. (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Praecipe filed by All Defendants : Re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree . Description: Incorrect version of document inadvertently filed. (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe Hamity Kolman on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Chloe Hamity Kolman added to party Steven Chu(pty:dft), Attorney Chloe Hamity Kolman added to party US Dept Energy(pty:dft))(Kolman, Chloe) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 73 Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule and 74 Joint Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff's Petition to Amend Consent Decree, ECF No. 75 , and Defendants' Motion to Amend/Correct Consent Decree are reset for hearing on February 9, 2015 at 2:00 p.m., in Richland, Washington. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Dorothy Harris Jaffe on behalf of Washington State (Attorney Dorothy Harris Jaffe added to party Washington State(pty:pla))(Jaffe, Dorothy) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Harold Lee Overton on behalf of Washington State (Attorney Harold Lee Overton added to party Washington State(pty:pla))(Overton, Harold) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Mary Sue Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Wilson, Mary) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL of Senior United States District Judge Fred Van Sickle. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C Amaditz on behalf of All Defendants (Amaditz, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Dan McDonald in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by Jeffery Lyon in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Jane Hedges in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Andrew Fitz in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re 77 Declaration in Support of Motion, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29, # 2 Exhibit 30, # 3 Exhibit 31, # 4 Exhibit 32)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 77 Declaration in Support of Motion, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re 77 Declaration in Support of Motion, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19.1, # 3 Exhibit 19.2)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re 77 Declaration in Support of Motion, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16.1, # 3 Exhibit 16.2)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Suzanne Dahl-Crumpler in Support re 75 MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2015 at 09:00 AM Spokane before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Benton J. Harp, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Thomas Fletcher, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Kevin W. Smith, # 5 Exhibit E -- Declaration of Todd Shrader, # 6 Exhibit F -- Declaration of Robert A. Gilbert)(Amaditz, Kenneth). Attachment #3, Exhibit C, was sealed as it was an incorrect version of the document. Counsel to re-file Attachment 3, Exhibit C, using the Praecipe event. Modified on 10/20/2014 (PL, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Washington's Petition to Amend Consent Decree re 59 Consent Decree by Washington State. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Amend Consent Decree, # 2 Exhibit Revised Ex. A to Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Ex. D to Proposed Order)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Expedite for Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2014 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated MOTION Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2014 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Stephanie Marie Parent for State of Oregon. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Thomas J Young on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Young, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Allyson Zipp on behalf of Plaintiff Washington State (Zipp, Allyson) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Stephanie Parent. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number SPO022154. by Oregon State of. (Wilson, Mary) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING CONSENT DECREE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PERIODS. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER (NO PDF) granting 65 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 66 Motion to Expedite Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Expedite RE Unopposed Stipulation Extending Dispute Resolution Periods by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2014 at 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 59 Consent Decree by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 at 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 61 Stipulation Extending Consent Decree Dispute Resolution Period. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER (NO PDF) granting 62 Motion to Expedite Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Unopposed Stipulation Extending Consent Decree Dispute Resolution Period by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2014 at 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Expedited Hearing)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 Consent Decree by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2014 at 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Consent Decree Dispute Resolution Period)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT DECREE BETWEEN DEFENDANTS SECRETARY OF ENERGY STEVEN CHU AND THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY AND INTERVENOR STATE OF OREGON. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (LE, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (LE, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; granting 54 Joint Motion to Enter Consent Decree; granting 56 Joint Motion to Enter Consent Decree Between the Dfts Secretary of Energy Steven Chu and the U.S. Dept of Energy and Intervenor State of Oregon; DCE to close file. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (LE, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 56 Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Consent Decree Between the Department of Energy and Oregon : Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2010 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Consent Decree Between the Department of Energy and Oregon by Steven Chu, Oregon State of, US Dept Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Decree Between the Department of Energy and Oregon)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 54 Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Consent Decree : Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2010 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Settlement Entry of Consent Decree by Steven Chu, US Dept Energy, Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Decree)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger J DeHoog (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VACATING DATES AND STAYING CASE Granting 49 Joint MOTION to Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling Order and to Hold this Case in Abeyance. The dates in the Scheduling Conference Order 41 and Order 47 are Vacated. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 49 Joint MOTION to Vacate 41 Scheduling Order, 47 Order -- To Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION to Stay -- To Hold this Case in AbeyanceJoint MOTION to Vacate 41 Scheduling Order, 47 Order -- To Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 Joint MOTION to Vacate 41 Scheduling Order, 47 Order -- To Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION to Stay -- To Hold this Case in AbeyanceJoint MOTION to Vacate 41 Scheduling Order, 47 Order -- To Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling Order filed by all parties. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Vacate 41 Scheduling Order, 47 Order -- To Vacate Dates in the Court's Scheduling Order, Joint MOTION to Stay -- To Hold this Case in Abeyance by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Washington State, Steven Chu, US Dept Energy of Lodging of Consent Decree (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Consent Decree)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 43 Joint MOTION to Extend the Date for Initial Disclosures. Date is extended to, and including, September 14, 2009. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 43 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Disclosure : Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Morris, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Disclosure filed by all parties. (Morris, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, MOTION for Disclosure by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morris, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (State of Washington's First Amended Complaint) by all defendants.(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2012 10:00 AM in Telephonic Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. Bench Trial set for 3/12/2012 09:00 AM in Richland before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Annotation - AMENDED 39 Scheduling Conference MINUTES ATTACHED. (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle: Scheduling Conference held on 4/17/2009. (Not Reported) (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Amended Joint Status Certificate and Proposed Discovery Plan by all parties. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia J Morris on behalf of all defendants (Morris, Cynthia) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Shafer Berman on behalf of all defendants (Berman, Amanda) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - granting 12 Motion to Intervene; and granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (CS, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle: Scheduling Conference held on 4/3/2009. (Not Reported) (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Intervene Defendants' Conditional Non-Opposition to Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by all defendants. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Errata filed by Washington State, Steven Chu, US Dept Energy: Re 30 Status Report, and Proposed Discovery Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Plaintiff State of Washington's Proposed Case Schedule, # 2 Appendix B - DOE's Proposed Discovery Timetable)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER (no pdf) granting 28 Motion to Expedite; granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan by Washington State, Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Plaintiff State of Washington's Proposed Case Schedule, # 2 Appendix B - DOE's Proposed Discovery Timetable)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 28 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Intervene by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES Granting 23 Motion to Expedite; Granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 23 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of DOE'S Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time : Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite Consideration of DOE'S Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOE's Unopposed Motion for Expedited Consideration of its Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 12 MOTION to InterveneFirst MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 12 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 12 MOTION to Intervene by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting DOE An Extension of Time to File its Response to Oregon's Motion to Intervene)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Chu, US Dept Energy. Filed by Washington State.(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 06:00 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER (no pdf) granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Roger J DeHoog for Oregon State of. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Oregon State of re 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Roger J. DeHoog, 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 12 MOTION to Intervene, 13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, and 15 Intervenor Complaint. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Filed by Intervenor Plaintiff Oregon State of.(SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 12 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Oregon State of. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene by Oregon State of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Roger J. DeHoog. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number SPO008423: Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2009 06:30 PM in Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Roger J. DeHoog. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number SPO008423. by Oregon State of. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SAP, Case Administrator) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER (no pdf) granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file a joint status certificate by 3/23/09. The scheduling conference is reset for 4/3/09 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone conference call. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 509-458-6382.. Signed by Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (KJH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Certificate and Proposed Discovery Plan, And the Scheduling Conference by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry;no PDF document. - By Court: Telephonic Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/5/2009 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (moved from 2/23/2009) The parties shall file a Joint Status Certificate shall be filed on or before 3/2/2009. The parties shall call the Court's conference line 509-458-6382. (CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2009 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(CP, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by Samuel W Bodman, US Dept Energy.(Kaplan, David) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Washington State re Samuel W Bodman. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Washington State re US Dept Energy. (Fitz, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Samuel W. Bodman, Atty General Michael B. Mukasey, U.S. Dept of Energy, James A. McDevitt, filed by Washington State. (VR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Samuel W Bodman and United States Department of Energy ( Filing fee $ 350; Receipt # SPO007919). Summons issued. Filed by Washington State. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?