Brown v. Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00678

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 1:50 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Donald Barnhorn +1 631 756 0400 dbarnhorn@laborlaws.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
v.
No Logo Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lipman & Plesur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D Lipman +1 516 931 0050 +1 516 931 0030 lipman@lipmanplesur.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Robins +1 516 931 0050 robins@lipmanplesur.com
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Selection of Mediator
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Compel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Continue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by David Donald Barnhorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Barnhorn, David) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Order Certifying Discovery is complete. The joint proposed pretrial order 18 is accepted for filing and the action is deemed ready for trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 4/10/2014. (Disbrow, Sandra) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                          Proposed Pretrial Order by Mark Brown (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robins on behalf of Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Robins, David) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER re 15 Letter to Reopen Case filed by Mark Brown. Request granted. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 4/9/2014.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                Letter MOTION to Reopen Case by Mark Brown. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; re: 13 Stipulation of Dismissal; That pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) all claims pursuant to the Family and Medical Leave Act ("FMLA"), 29 U.S.C. § 2601 et seq. are hereby dismissed with prejudice; and that that each party is to bear its own fees and costs with regards to the dismissed cause of action. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 1/24/2014.) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of FMLA Claims by Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                      Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd.. (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Completion of discovery by 1/10/14; see attached order for additional deadlines. Next pretrial conference will be held on 2/7/14. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 4/22/2013. (Disbrow, Sandra) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2013, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Mark Brown. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 04/21/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference has been tentatively scheduled in this matter. Counsel are directed to carefully read all three documents associated with this entry - the Initial Conference Order, the Proposed Scheduling Order and the Individual Rules - and to inform the court of their decision pursuant to the directions in the Initial Conference Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 4/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Sched. Order, # 2 WDW Rules) (Disbrow, Sandra) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd.. (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Lipman on behalf of Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. (notification declined or already on case) (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd.. (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Lipman on behalf of Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Lipman, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Summons Issued as to Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd.. (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against Tuttnauer U.S.A. Co., Ltd. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Mark Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (McMahon, Carol) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 383 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?