USA v. Estrada-Tepal et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-00105-MKB

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated February 26, 2018 at 12:59 PM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Golub & Golub LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/24/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Mitchell Alan Golub +1 212 693 1000 +1 212 693 0090 mgolub@golublaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law office of Adam D. Perlmutter PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Adam D Perlmutter +1 212 679 1990 +1 212 679 1995 adp@adplegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Brill, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/01/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Steven Gary Brill +1 212 566 1000 +1 212 566 1068 steveb@sullivanbrill.com
TERMINATED: 08/01/2014 James Lee Healy +1 212 566 1000 +1 212 566 1068 james.healy@sullivanbrill.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (159) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal [144] Notice of Appeal and [146] Subsequent/Duplicate Notice of Appeal. Richard B. Lind, counsel for Appellant Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal in 2d Cir. 15-4146, moves for permission to withdraw as counsel pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967), and the Government moves to dismiss the appeal based on the waiver of appellate rights contained in Appellant's plea agreement. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the Anders motion is GRANTED, and the Government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Appellant's appeal of his conviction and term of imprisonment, and is construed as a motion for summary affirmance with respect to his restitution, supervised release, and special assessment, and is GRANTED so construed. Issued as Mandate: 8/17/16. USCA #15-4119, 15-4143, 15-4146. (McGee, Mary Ann)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal [143] Notice of Appeal and [147] Subsequent/Duplicate Notice of Appeal. John S. Wallenstein, counsel for Appellant Ricardo Estrada-Tepal in 2d Cir. 15-4143, moves for permission to withdraw as counsel pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967), and the Government moves to dismiss the appeal based on the waiver of appellate rights contained in Appellant's plea agreement. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the Anders motion is GRANTED, and the Government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Appellant's appeal of his conviction and term of imprisonment, and is construed as a motion for summary affirmance with respect to his restitution, supervised release, and special assessment, and is GRANTED so construed. Issued as Mandate; 8/17/16. USCA #15-4119, 15-4143, 15-4146. (McGee, Mary Ann)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 USCA Mandate
      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal [142] Notice of Appeal and [145] Subsequent/Duplicate Notice of Appeal. Adam D. Perlmutter, counsel for Appellant Jorge Estrada-Tepal in 2d Cir. 15-4119, moves forpermission to withdraw as counsel pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967), and the Government moves to dismiss the appeal based on the waiver of appellate rights contained in Appellant's plea agreement. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the Anders motion is GRANTED, and the Government's motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to Appellant's appeal of his conviction and term of imprisonment, and is construed as a motion for summary affirmance with respect to his restitution, supervised release, and special assessment, and is GRANTED so construed. Issued as Mandate: 8/17/16. USCA #15-4119, 15-4143, 15-4146. (McGee, Mary Ann)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 148 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal held on December 15, 2015, before Judge Margo Brodie. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherry Bryant, Telephone number 718-613-2636. Email address: sbryant102@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2016. (Bryant, Sherry)
          LREF
          Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
          First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [147] Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (McGee, Mary Ann)
            LREF
            Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
            First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [146] Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (McGee, Mary Ann)
              LREF
              Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
              First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [145] Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (McGee, Mary Ann)
                LREF
                Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [144] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [143] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                    Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal sent to US Court of Appeals [142] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                      SUBSEQUENT/DUPLICATE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal re [138] Judgment. No fee paid. Although this Notice of Appeal is being filed Pro Se, Defendant is represented by CJA Counsel. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                        SUBSEQUENT/DUPLICATE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal re [140] Judgment. No fee paid. Although this is being filed Pro Se, the Defendant is represented by CJA Counsel. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                          SUBSEQUENT/DUPLICATE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jorge Estrada-Tepal re [136] Judgment. No fee paid. Although this is being filed Pro Se, Defendant represented by CJA Counsel. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: 12/24/2015 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL from [140] Judgment by Attorney for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. No fee. Defendant represented by CJA Counsel. Service done electronically. (Lind, Richard) Modified on 1/6/2016 (McGee, Mary Ann).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: 12/24/2015 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL from [138] Judgment by Attorney for Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. No fee. Defendant represented by CJA Counsel. Service done electronically. (Wallenstein, John) Modified on 1/6/2016 (McGee, Mary Ann).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: 12/23/2015 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL from [136] Judgment by Attorney for Jorge Estrada-Tepal. No fee. Defendant represented by JCA Counsel. Service done electronically. (Perlmutter, Adam) Modified on 1/6/2016 (McGee, Mary Ann).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 140 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 judgmentCourt Filing
                                  JUDGMENT as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3). On Count(s) 1ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. On Count(s) 5ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS). The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and FIVE (5ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. Supervised release term of FIVE (5) YEARS, with special conditions. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/15/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 138 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 judgmentCourt Filing
                                    JUDGMENT as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2). On Count(s) 1ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS. On Count(s) 4ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS. The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and FOUR (4ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. Supervised release term of FIVE (5) YEARS, with special conditions. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/15/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 136 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 judgmentCourt Filing
                                      JUDGMENT as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), on Count(s) 1ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. On Count(s) 2ss of the Second Superseding Indictment, the defendant was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and TWO (2ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. Supervised release term of FIVE (5)YEARS, with special conditions. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/15/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 135 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 sentencingCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie: Sentencing was held on December 15, 2015 for Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), on Count(s) 1ss and 2ss of the Second Superseding Indictment; Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) on Count(s) 1ss and Count(s) 4ss of the Second Superseding Indictment; Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) on Count(s) 1ss and Count(s) 5ss of the Second Superseding Indictment. AUSAs Taryn Merkl and Melody Wells appeared on behalf of the government along with Special Agent Christopher Davies. CJA counsel Adam Perlmutter appeared on behalf of defendant Jorge Estrada-Tepal. CJA counsel John Wallenstein appeared on behalf of defendant Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. CJA counsel Richard Lind appeared on behalf of defendant Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. Defendant Jorge Estrada-Tepal was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS on Count ONE (1ss). TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS on Count TWO (2ss). The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and TWO (2ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. Supervised release term of FIVE (5) YEARS, with special conditions. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). As to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, the defendant was sentenced to TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS on Count ONE (1ss). TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS on Count FIVE (5ss). The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and FIVE (5ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of TWO HUNDRED TEN (210) MONTHS. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. Supervised release term of FIVE (5) YEARS, with special conditions. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). As to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, the defendant was sentenced to ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS on Count ONE(1ss). ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS on Count FOUR (4ss). The sentence imposed on Counts ONE (1ss) and FOUR (4ss) are to run concurrently for a total term of imprisonment of ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY (180) MONTHS. A Mandatory Special Assessment of TWO ($200) HUNDRED dollars. Supervised release term of FIVE (5) YEARS, with special conditions. No Fine. Restitution in the amount of $1,033,336.00 (jointly and severally with the co-defendants). All of the defendants was advised of their right to an appeal. Upon a motion made by the government, all open and underlying counts was dismissed by the Court. Proceedings were interpreted in Spanish by Rosa Olivera. (Court Reporter Sherry Bryant.) (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 letter
                                          Letter enclosing victim impact statement as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Wells, Melody)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                            ORDER granting [131] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2), Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3). Sentencing is RESCHEDULED for December 15, 2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/9/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Reply to Response
                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [131] MOTION to Continue Sentencing (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015 Response In Opposition
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [131] MOTION to Continue Sentencing (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Wells, Melody)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/8/2015, Terminated: 12/9/2015 Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                                  MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Jorge Estrada-Tepal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. The sentencing proceedings scheduled for September 17, 2015 is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/16/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 letter
                                                      Letter enclosing victim impact statement submitted to the government by Jane Doe #2 as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Jane Doe #2 Victim Impact Statement) (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: 9/14/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Jorge Estrada-Tepal Plea Agreement, # (2) Exhibit Ricardo Estrada-Tepal Plea Agreement, # (3) Exhibit C - Victor Estrada-Tepal Plea Agreement, # (4) Exhibit Jane Doe #5 Victim-Impact Statement) (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Lind, Richard)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Wallenstein, John)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. Sentencing is scheduled for September 17, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015, Terminated: 4/29/2015 Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                                                  Letter MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. (Wallenstein, John)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                                                    ORDER granting [118] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2). Sentencing is scheduled for 8/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/29/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                                                      ORDER granting [117] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1). Sentencing is scheduled for August 11, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/28/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015, Terminated: 4/28/2015 Motion to Continue Sentencing
                                                                        MOTION to Continue Sentencing by Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                          JUDGMENT as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4), on Count(s) FIVE (5) of the underlying Indictment. The defendant was sentenced to TIME SERVED. A Supervised Release term of ONE (1) YEAR with Special Conditions of Supervised Release. A Mandatory Special Assessment of ONE HUNDRED ($100) DOLLARS. No Fine. No Restitution. All open counts were dismissed upon a Motion made by the government. The defendant was advised of her right to appeal. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/6/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 sentencingCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie: Sentencing was held on March 6, 2015 for Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4), on Count (s) FIVE (5) of the Underlying Indictment. AUSA Taryn Merkl appeared on behalf of the government. USPO John Lanigan appeared on behalf of the United States Probation Department. Federal Defenders of New York by Michelle Gelernt appeared on behalf of Ms. Navarrete-Castro. Ms. Navarrete-Castro was sentenced to TIME SERVED. A Supervised Release term of ONE (1) YEAR withSpecial Conditions of Supervised Release. A Mandatory Special Assessment of ONE HUNDRED ($100)DOLLARS. No Fine. No Restitution. All open counts were dismissed upon a Motion made by the government. The defendant was advised of her right to appeal. (Court Reporter Wendy Ricard.) (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal held on 1/14/15, before Judge Levy. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal held on 1/15/15, before Judge Levy. Court Reporter/Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2015. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Defendant's Objections to the Presentence Report) (Gelernt, Michelle)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal held on January 13, 2015, before Judge Levy. Court Transcriber: TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Rocco, Christine)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                        Letter re Appointment of Paralegal as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Arraignment as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1) Count 1ss,2ss,6ss,7ss-8ss,10ss,11ss-12ss,13ss held on 1/15/2015, Allocution as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal held on 1/15/2015, Plea entered by Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1) Guilty Count 1ss,2ss. ( Sentencing set for 5/5/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margo K. Brodie.) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy to administer plea allocution as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal.( Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/15/2015 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Case No Longer Referred
                                                                                              Case as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Arraignment on superseding as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) Count 1ss,3ss-4ss,6ss,7ss-9ss,10ss,11ss-12ss,14ss held on 1/14/2015, Allocution as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal held on 1/14/2015, Change of Plea Hearing as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal held on 1/14/2015, Plea entered by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) Guilty Count 1ss,4ss. ( Sentencing set for 5/8/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margo K. Brodie.) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy to administer plea allocution as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/14/2015 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Case No Longer Referred
                                                                                                    Case as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 AllocutionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Arraignment on superseding indictment as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) Count 1ss,2ss-3ss,5ss,6ss,7ss-8ss,10ss,11ss-12ss held on 1/13/2015, Allocution, Change of Plea Hearing as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal held on 1/13/2015, Plea entered by Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) Guilty Count 1ss,5ss. ( Sentencing set for 4/28/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margo K. Brodie.) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy to administer the plea allocution as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/13/2015 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Case No Longer Referred
                                                                                                          Case as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                            PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM in Further Support of the Government's Letter Dated November 15, 2014, Providing Notice of the Government's Intention to Introduce Inextricably Intertwined Evidence as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [61] Motion in Limine, Sealed,, (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 letter
                                                                                                                Letter Supplementing Defendant's Response to Government Motion as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Lind, Richard)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 letter
                                                                                                                  Letter informing court of decision not to supplement the record as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Wallenstein, John)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal [85] granting Letter Application. Counsel has until December 15, 2014 to decide whether he will file additional papers. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/9/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal re [86] granting Letter Application. Counsel has until December 15, 2014 to decide whether he will make any additional submission in opposition to the government's motion in limine. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/9/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                        SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT(S-2) as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 6ss, 7ss-8ss, 10ss, 11ss-12ss, 13ss, Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) count(s) 1ss, 3ss-4ss, 6ss, 7ss-9ss, 10ss, 11ss-12ss, 14ss, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) count(s) 1ss, 2ss-3ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-8ss, 10ss, 11ss-12ss. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 letter
                                                                                                                          Letter as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 letter
                                                                                                                            Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery and 3500 material as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 letter
                                                                                                                              Letter as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                Letter re: supplementing the record as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Wallenstein, John)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                  Letter In Compliance with Court's Directive as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Lind, Richard)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                    . (Perlmutter, Adam)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal re [84] granting Letter Application. Counsel for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal has until December 15, 2014 to supplement former counsel's response to the government's motion in limine. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/8/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                        Letter re:bilingual paralegal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Wallenstein, John)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  1 - Exparte Document CR
                                                                                                                                          (Wallenstein, John)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Richard B. Lind for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              CJA 20 as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney John S. Wallenstein for Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                CJA 20 as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Adam D. Perlmutter for Jorge Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                  A Status Conference as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal was held before Judge Margo K. Brodie on December 1, 2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl and Melody Wells appeared on behalf of the government. The Court appointed CJA attorney Adam Perlmutter to represent Jorge Estrada-Tepal. CJA counsel John S. Wallenstein was appointed to represent Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. CJA counsel Richard B. Lind was appointed to represent Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. The government informed new counsel that additional 3500 materials will be turned over to counsel. The newly appointed counsels are to notify the Court by December 8, 2014 if they will be supplementing the current record, if so, submissions are due by December 15, 2014. The parties are to submit voir dire and jury charges by January 23, 2015. Jury selection and trial will begin on February 2, 2015 at 9:30 am. The current protective orders will be carried forward to new counsel. Time has already been excluded due to pending motions. Estrellita Plested interpreted the proceedings in Spanish. Custody is continued for all defendants.(Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. Attorney Jonathan Marks; Michael H. Gold and Mitchell Alan Golub terminated. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                      Letter disclosing discovery pursuant to Rule 16, preliminary 3500 material and selected government trial exhibits as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [61] Motion in Limine, Sealed,, in further support of the government's motion to preclude evidence of victims' sexual histories under Federal Rule of Evidence 412 (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014, Terminated: 11/20/2014 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 75 Letter due to the fact that the letter reveals identifying information for sex trafficking victims by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  order on motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [76] Motion to Seal Document as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3).Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/20/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 10/20/14 from defendant Victor Estrada-Tepal as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014, Terminated: 11/19/2014 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document 73 Letter, 72 Letter due to the fact that the letters reveal identifying information for sex trafficking victims by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [74] Motion to Seal Document as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2), Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal(3). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/19/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 10/21/14 from defendant Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 10/21/14 from defendant Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter reply to government letter dated November 15, 2014 as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Gold, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter responding to government letter apprising Court of certain evidence it seeks to introduce at trial as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Golub, Mitchell)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro. Sentencing is rescheduled for February 19, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: 11/15/2014 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to apprise the Court of certain testimony and evidence as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [61] Motion in Limine, Sealed,, (Golub, Mitchell)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter disclosing experts the government may call at trial as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: 11/4/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro re: [61] Motion in Limine. Defendants are ordered to file a reply, if any, by November 10, 2014. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/3/2014. (Bronn, Natasha)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014, Terminated: 2/6/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Victims' Sexual Histories and to Protect Victims' Identity Information by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014, Terminated: 10/24/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Suppression Hearing by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. (Marks, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [60] Motion to Continue as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 10/24/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter enclosing 3500 material as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro held on 8/21/14, before Judge Levy. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2015. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Order on motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal Arraignment on the superseding indictment is scheduled for 10/3/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT (S-1) as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 9s, 10s, 11s, 12s, Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) count(s) 1s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 8s, 9s, 10s, 11s, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 9s, 10s, 11s. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/29/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter enclosing a superseding indictment returned by the Grand Jury on September 29, 2014 as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Attachments: # (1) Indictment with foreperson signature) (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: 9/25/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [49] Motion to Continue as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/22/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  A Status Conference as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal was held before Judge Margo K. Brodie on August 22, 2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl and Melody Wells appeared on behalf of the government. CJA attorney Mitchell Golub appeared on behalf of Jorge Estrada-Tepal. CJA attorney Jonathan Marks appeared on behalf of Mr. Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. CJA attorney Michael Gold appeared on behalf of Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. The trial scheduled for September 15, 2014 has been adjourned. Jury Selection and Trial are now scheduled for December 1, 2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. As to the Motion to Suppress Hearing, Judge Brodie's Courtroom Deputy will contact the parties to reschedule. Time is excluded based on the pending Motions before the Court. Proceedings were interpreted by Spanish interpreters Mario Michelena and Maristela Verastigui. Custody is continued.(Court Reporter Michele Nardone.) (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Change of Plea Hearing as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro held on 8/21/2014, Plea entered by Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4) Guilty Count 5. ( Sentencing set for 11/21/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margo K. Brodie.) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro. ( Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/21/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case No Longer Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal re [50] Letter Application. Status Conference is scheduled for August 22, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/19/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter requesting a status conference to address scheduling as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014, Terminated: 8/22/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Trial date and to adopt pretrial motions by Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Golub, Mitchell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Jonathan Marks for Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Michael H. Gold for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Mitchell Alan Golub for Jorge Estrada-Tepal. ( Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/1/2014 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        A Status Conference as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal was held before Judge Margo K. Brodie on August 1, 2014. AUSA Melody Wells appeared on behalf of the government. CJA counsels Steven Brill, Matthew Keller and David Gordon appeared on behalf of their clients. The Court GRANTED [42] the defendants Motion to relieve their current counsels. The Court appointed CJA attorney Mitchell Golub as new counsel for Jorge Estrada-Tepal. CJA attorney Jonathan Marks was appointed as new counsel for Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. CJA attorney Michael Gold was appointed as new counsel for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. The Court Ordered all newly appointed counsels to adhere to the Protective Order currently in place so they may retrieve their client's files from the prior counsels, and until they have had an opportunity to view the Protective Order. The parties are to contact the Court in a week in writing to inform the Court whether or not they will be going forward with the current Motions pending before the court on behalf of their individual clients. The parties are also to inform the Court whether or not they will be able to go forward with the scheduled trial date of September 15, 2014. Proceedings were interpreted by Spanish Interpreter Mario Michelena. Custody is continued.(Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. Status Conference set for July 31, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/30/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 7/29/2014 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing or Status Conference by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 7/29/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Suppression Hearing by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Keller, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [43] Motion to Continue as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal(2). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/29/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2014, Entered: 7/26/2014 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re [37] First MOTION to Suppress First MOTION to Dismiss Sex Trafficking Counts (Keller, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [37] Motion to Suppress as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal(2). The Court grants defendant Ricardo Estrada-Tepal's request for a hearing regarding his motion to suppress evidence and statements. A suppression hearing is scheduled for Wednesday, July 30, 2014 at 11:00 AM. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/26/2014. (Brodie, Margo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal re [40] First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document Ex Parte (Letter re: Interim CJA Billing) filed by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. Application granted. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/25/2014. (Brodie, Margo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [36] MOTION for Discovery , [37] First MOTION to Suppress First MOTION to Dismiss Sex Trafficking Counts (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/3/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014, Terminated: 7/3/2014 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the defendant's pre-trial motions, requesting a one-week extension by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014, Terminated: 7/26/2014 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Suppress , First MOTION to Dismiss Sex Trafficking Counts by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Affidavit in Support, # (3) Affidavit in Support, # (4) Affidavit of Service) (Keller, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/24/2014, Terminated: 10/3/2014 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery by Jorge Estrada-Tepal. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration declaration in support, # (2) Memorandum in Support Memorandum in support, # (3) Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Healy, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/22/2014, Entered: 6/22/2014 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Law Firm by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Keller, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014, Terminated: 6/20/2014 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motions by Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Gelernt, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro(4). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/20/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: 6/6/2014 1 - Exparte Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Requesting Permission for CJA Funds for Investigator as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Brill, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014, Terminated: 4/22/2014 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue the status conference scheduled for April 25, 2014 until May 9, 2014, and to exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act, on consent of all parties, by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Merkl, Taryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter enclosing Rule 16 discovery as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [23] Motion for Protective Order as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1), Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2), Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3), Araceli Navarrete-Castro(4). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/24/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014, Terminated: 3/24/2014 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal, Jorge Estrada-Tepal, Araceli Navarrete-Castro. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Wells, Melody)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5-6, Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (2) count(s) 1, 3-4, 5-6, Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (3) count(s) 1, 3, 5-6, Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4) count(s) 5-6. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Araceli Navarrete-Castro (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Arraignment as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4) Count Complaint held on 1/31/2014, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro held on 1/31/2014, Initial Appearance as to Araceli Navarrete-Castro held on 1/31/2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl present. Dft present w/federal defender Michelle Gelernt. Spanish interpreters Alfredo Garcia and Daniel Sherr present. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Order of detention entered. (Log # 1/31/14 3:56-4:10.) (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Steven Gary Brill for Jorge Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jorge Estrada-Tepal (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Arraignment as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal (3) Count Complaint held on 1/31/2014, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014, Initial Appearance as to Jorge Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl present. Dft present w/cja counsel Steven Brill. Spanish interpreters Alfredo Garcia and Daniel Sherr present. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Order of detention entered. (Log # 1/31/14 3:56-4:10.) (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney David Gordon for Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Arraignment as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (2) Count Complaint held on 1/31/2014, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014, Initial Appearance as to Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl present. Dft present w/cja counsel David Gordon. Spanish interpreters Alfredo Garcia and Daniel Sherr present. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Order of detention entered. (Log # 1/31/14 3:56-4:10.) (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal: Appointment of Attorney Matthew B. Keller for Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/31/2014. (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Arraignment as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (1) Count Complaint held on 1/31/2014, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014, Initial Appearance as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal held on 1/31/2014. AUSA Taryn Merkl present. Dft present w/cja counsel Matthew Keller. Spanish interpreters Alfredo Garcia and Daniel Sherr present. Dft arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived. Order of detention entered. (Log # 1/31/14 3:56-4:10.) (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT as to Ricardo Estrada-Tepal (1), Victor Leonel Estrada-Tepal (2), Jorge Estrada-Tepal (3), Araceli Navarrete-Castro (4). (Chin, Felix)[1:14-mj-00095-RLM]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 458 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?