Peter v. U.S.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-07492-KTD
District Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:38 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter, Tohmes, Petitioner
Officially listed as "Tohmes Peter"
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/4/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 4/20/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Order
ORDER, dismissing [1-1] 2255 motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. ( signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in case no. 94 Cr. 981, as doc. #213) (ae)
    LREF
    Blank  Terminated Case
    Case closed. (mr) Modified on 04/20/2001
      LREF
      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
      NOTICE OF MOTION by Tohmes Peter to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 . No further entries. See criminal docket # 94cr981-002 (KTD). (bm) Modified on 10/10/2000
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 106 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?