District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Weinig
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:94-cr-00981-KTD

Tags
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 1:35 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lev Louis Dassin +1 212 225 2790 +1 212 225 3999 ldassin@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Goodman +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 mpgoodman@debevoise.com
v.
No Logo Alexander Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Lopez, Defendant
No Logo Donald J. Hayden, Defendant
No Logo Gary Salerno, Defendant
No Logo Harvey Weinig, Defendant
No Logo Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Defendant
No Logo Juliana LNU1-94cr0981-008, Defendant
No Logo Latchezar Christov, Defendant
No Logo Leon Shulum Weinmann, Defendant
No Logo Menashe Leifer, Defendant
No Logo Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Defendant
No Logo Peter, Tohmes, Defendant
No Logo Rachel Weinmann, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 12/13/1994
County NewYork
Terminated 3/22/1996
Reopened
Magistrate Case
194-mj-02385
Citation
Offense Level
18 U.S.C. 1956 AND 1001 MONEY LAUNDERING AND FALSE STATEMENTS TO THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT. [ 1:94-m -2385 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-9999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 FEDERAL STATUTES, OTHER Money Laundering
Count 11s-17s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181956 RACKETEERING
Count 19s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181956 RACKETEERING
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181956 RACKETEERING
Count 26s-31s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181956 RACKETEERING
Count 32s-33s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2314.F
Offense Level 4
182314 TRANSPORTATION STOLEN PROPERTY
Count 34s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 POSTAL, INTERSTATE WIRE, RADIO, ETC.
Count 35s-37s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001 FALSE CLAIMS & STATEMENTS
Count 38s
Citation SD97
Offense Level 1
18982 CRIMINAL FORFEITURE
Count 5s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181956 RACKETEERING
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags APPEAL,PRIOR
  Entries (365) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 251 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012 Remark
Warrant for Arrest as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. (Received on 1/19/11) (jw)
    LREF
    Legal Document 250 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER as to (94-Cr-981-03) Juan Guillermo Ocampo. Juan Guillermo Ocampo was convicted of conspiracy to commit money laundering and sentenced to seventy-two (72) months of imprisonment on July 18, 2006. His conviction and sentence were affirmed by the Second Circuit on February 25, 2008. in a motion dated January 22, 2009, Ocampo petitioned for resentencing pursuant to N.Y. PENAL LAW Section 70.71, as amended by the Drug Law Reform Act ("DLRA"). However, the DLRA only applies to those convicted of class A-I and A-II felony drug offenses. Ocampo was not convicted here of such a crime. Therefore, his motion is DENIED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 6/29/09)(bw)
      LREF
      Blank  Payment of Fine
      Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 6/25/09. (mn)
        LREF
        Blank  Payment of Fine
        Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 6/25/09. (mn)
          LREF
          Blank  Payment of Fine
          Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 4/28/09. (mn)
            LREF
            Blank  Payment of Fine
            Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 1/14/09. (mn)
              LREF
              Legal Document 249 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
              MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: Appeal Remark, [247] USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal, USCA Case Number 06-3549-cr. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 11/10/2008. (nd)
                LREF
                Blank  Payment of Fine
                Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 10/2/08. (mn)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Payment of Fine
                  Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 06/27/2008. (jd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 248 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                    FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Harvey Weinig. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECRRED THAT: The US of America shall and is hereby deemed to have clear title to the Weinig Account, and the same are hereby forfeited to the US for deposition according to law. The US Marshals Service shall take possession of the Weinig Account, and dispose of the same according to law, in accordance with 21 USC 853(h). (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 4/16/08)(jw)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Appeal Remark
                      Appeal Remark as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: [238] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment USCA Case Number 06-3549-cr. An order has been entered by this court recalling and staying the mandate reissuance of the mandate of this court. Re: [247] USCA Mandate returned back to the US Court of appeals to the attention of R. Obas on 4/10/2008. (nd)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 247 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                        MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: [238] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. USCA Case Number 06-3549-cr. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the petition for review is hereby DENIED.... For the foregoing reasons, Ocampo's conviction and sentence are AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 3/19/08. (bw)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                          Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge (Duffy, J.) on 3/27/08 re: [247] USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal. (bw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 246 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Service by Publication
                            SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of First Order of Forfeiture/Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property was published in the International Herald Tribune and New York Law Journal on February 7, 2008, February 14, 2008, and February 21, 2008. Document filed by United States Of America as to Harvey Weinig. (Arreola, Anna)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Payment of Fine
                              Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 2/15/08. (mn)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Payment of Fine
                                Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $50.00. Date Received: 8/23/07. (mn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Payment of Fine
                                  Payment of Fine from Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $25.00. Date Received: 2/1/07. (mn)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 245 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Judgment Returned Executed
                                    Judgment Returned Executed for [237] Judgment, as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo on 8/21/06. Defendant committed to TMUCC. (pr, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 244 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 12/18/2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                      Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: [238] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment USCA Case Number 06-3549, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  USCA Scheduling Order
                                        USCA SCHEDULING ORDER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo related to [238] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Juan Guillermo Ocampo,, USCA Case Number 06-3549-cr. Defendant Brief due by 11/6/2006. Government Brief due by 12/6/2006. Appeal Record due by 10/5/2006. (nd, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 243 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 7/18/2006 before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. (jar, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 242 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 4/18/2006 before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. (jar, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Received Returned Mail
                                              Received returned mail as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: [237] Judgment. Mail was addressed to Lev Louis Dassin of Keating, Muething & Klekamp, P.L.L. at 1400 Provident Tower, One East 4th Street, Cinncinatti, OH 45202 and was returned for the following reason(s): not at this address - please return to sender. (tve, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo to US Court of Appeals re: [238] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (nd, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Juan Guillermo Ocampo from [237] Judgment. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 585729. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: A.U.S.A. and Court Reporters. (nd, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 241 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 LetterCourt Filing
                                                    Letter by United States Of America as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from AUSA Virginia Chavez Romano dated 4/12/06 re: submitted to enclose a stipulation entered into by the parties in this case. [*** Accepted for filing by Judge Duffy on 7/26/06 ***] (bw, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in further Opposition by United States Of America as to (S4-94-Cr-981) Juan Guillermo Ocampo's motion to dismiss the Indictment. Dated 9/20/05. [Accompanied by document "Government Exhibits A Through T] (bw, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 239 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by United States Of America as to (S4-94-Cr-981) Juan Guillermo Ocampo's motion to dismiss the Indictment. Dated 4/29/05. (bw, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                          FILED JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3), Count(s) 1 and 38s are dismissed on the motion United States. Defendant Juan Guillermo Ocampo was found guilty on Count(s) 1s after a plea of not guilty, Imprisonment: 72 months. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Supervised Release: 2 years. Fine: $50,000.00. SA: $50.00. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 7/18/06)(ja, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Judgment Entered in Money Book
                                                            Judgment entered in money judgment book as #06,1680 as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo in the amount of $ 50,050.00, re: [237] Judgment. (dt, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                              DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3) Counts 1 and 38s.(ja, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy :Sentencing held on 7/18/2006 for Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3) Count 1s. (ja, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 236 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                  Letter by United States Of America as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from Virginia Chavez Romano dated 7/13/06 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter in connection with the sentencing of Juan Guillermo Ocampo, scheduled to take place on July 18, 2006 at 2:30pm. For all the reasons stated herein, the Government submits that a sentence within the applicable Guidelines range of 97 to 121 months imprisonment is appropriate and reasonable under 18 USC 3553(a). (jw, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 235 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER GRANTING AUTHORIZATION TO BRING LAPTOP COMPUTER INTO COURT. as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. Ordered and adjudged tht the deft's motion is hereby granted. Deft's counsel, Oscar Arroyave, shall be allowed to bring a laptop computer into the federal Courthouse on 7/18/06 for the sentence hearing in the instant cause.. . (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 7/14/06)(pr, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from Virginia Chavez Romano, AUSA dated 6/8/06 re: Adjournment of sentence..Sentence adjourned to 7/18/06 @ 2:30 pm. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 6/8/06)(pr, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                        Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo: Sentencing set for 7/18/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy..(pr, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 233 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 4/18/2006 before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. (jar, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Bench Trial Completed
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy :Bench Trial as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo completed on 4/18/2006. (bw, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Oral Order
                                                                              ORAL ORDER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. Sentencing set for 6/19/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy.(bw, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                ORDER FOR PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo.(bw, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Court Verdict
                                                                                  COURT VERDICT as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3): Guilty on Count 1s,38s.(bw, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Bench Trial - Begun
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy :Bench Trial begun on 4/18/2006 as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3) Count 1,1s,38s. Deft Juan Guillermo Ocampo present w/atty Oscar Arroyave. AUSA present Virginia Chavez Romano. Trial w/stipulated facts began & concluded. Deft found guilty. PSI ordered. Sentencing date set for 6-19-06 at 2:30. Deft continued remanded. (bw, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 232 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from Virginia Chavez Romano, AUSA dated 2/15/06 re: Adjournment of the 2/16/06 conference & exclusion of time until the new conference date..OK. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 2/15/06)(pr, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from Virginia Chavez Romano re: Reschedule Conference., as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo, ORDER EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. Time excluded from 1/27/06 until 2/16/06; Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. Judge Memo-endorsed...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 1/25/06)(jw, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo:Conference set for 1/26/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy..(jp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy :Conference as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 11/30/2005. Deft present w/atty Oscar Arroyave. AUSA Virginia Chavez present. Next conference set for 1/26/2006 at 2:30 p.m. Deft continued remanded. Time excluded. (jp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Kevin T. Duffy from Virginia L. Chavez dated 11/22/05 re: requesting an exclusion of time from 11/10/05 to 11/29/05. Ok. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 11/28/05)(kw, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. In late 1994, Dft Juan Guillermo Ocampo was indicted in this district for various crimes including conspiracy and money laundering. Ocampo is a citizen of Colombia and resided there prior to the time of the indictment until 11/25/04... On 11/25/04, Ocampo traveled to the U.S. for the first time since 1991 and was arrested immediately upon entry into the country. He now moves to dismiss the Indictment on the basis that he has been denied a speedy trial. The motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 11/10/05)(ja, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 228 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from AUSA Virginia L. Chavez dated 11/2/05 re: submitted to request that time be excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(8)(A) from 11/2/05 until the Court issues its decision on the pending motion, deft's motion to dismiss the indictment on Speedy Trial grounds. Judge Endorsed - Application granted. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 11/7/05)(bw, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Donald J. Hayden held on 6/06/96 before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. (jno, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief by Juan Guillermo Ocampo in support of motion to dismiss. (kw, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 06/22/05 before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. (es, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from AUSA Virginia L. Chavez dated 5/2/05 re: submitted to request an exclusion of time between now and 6/1/05, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(8)(A), to permit the defense to review the Govt's opposition papers and file a reply brief. JUDGE SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy) [Microfilm 7/14/05 9am](bw, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Case Error
                                                                                                            ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Merrill Rubin as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Motion # 221 and Reply Memorandum of Law # 222. This case is not ECF. (gf, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Letter by United States Of America as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo addressed to Judge Duffy from AUSA Virginia L. Chavez dated 5/20/05 re: submitted on behalf of both parties, to request an adjournment of the conference presently scheduled for 6/1/05 at 2:30 p.m. (bw, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo re: [221] MOTION to Dismiss on Speedy Trial.. (Attachments: # (1) Affirmation of Service)(Rubin, Merrill) Modified on 7/8/2005 (gf, ).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 221 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005, Terminated: 5/24/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Dismiss on Speedy Trial. Document filed by Juan Guillermo Ocampo. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss# (2) Affirmation of Counsel in Support of Motion to Dismiss# (3) Affirmation of Service)(Rubin, Merrill) Modified on 7/8/2005 (gf, ).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 220 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                  Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida, Miami, FL. [Original file SUPP #14 TRANSCRIPT, and Magistrate Proceedings] (ja, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                    Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Florida, Miami, FL. [Original file SUPP. #12, Magistrate Proceedings] (ja, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo on 'Motion To Admit Attorney Oscar Arroyave, Esq. Pro Hac Vice' filed by Merrill Rubin, attorney for deft, dated 2/20/05. JUDGE ENDORSED - Application granted. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 2/22/05)(bw, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 2/20/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by Juan Guillermo Ocampo for Oscar Arroyave, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Dated 2/20/05. (bw, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 216 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Transfer In/Supervised Release - Documents Received
                                                                                                                          TRANSFER IN SUPERVISED RELEASE DOCUMENTS RECEIVED as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo transferred from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida, Case Number: 04-3530-McAliley. The following documents were received: Certified copy of the indictment/information, certified copy of the docket sheet, and letter of acknowledgment. (jw, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2005 02:30 PM before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy.(bw, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy :Pretrial Conference as to (S4-94-Cr-981-03)Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 1/11/2005. Deft present w/atty Ronald Garnett. AUSA present Virginia Chavez. Next conference set for 4/11/05 at 2:30 p.m. Deft continued remanded. (bw, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 215 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 1/4/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Merrill Neil Rubin appearing for Juan Guillermo Ocampo. (jw, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Merrill Neil Rubin appearing for Juan Guillermo Ocampo. (Rubin, Merrill)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank Maas : as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo; Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2005 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (jw, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frank Maas :Initial Appearance on Disposition Sheet as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo held on 12/23/2004. Deft present with atty Merrill Rubin. AUSA Virginia Chavez present. Detention on consent without prejudice. Time through 1/11/05 is excluded. Next conference set for 1/11/05 at 9:30am. (jw, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Peter Tohmes dismissing [0-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 as to Peter Tohmes (2) ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (mr)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER filed by U.S.A. as to Harvey Weinig From Mark P. Goodman, AUSA, Dated 3/21/96, Addressed to: Judge Duffy Re: Letter in connection with the sentencing of Harvey Weinig scheduled for 3/22/96 at 9:30 a.m. (mb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER filed by U.S.A. as to Harvey Weinig From Lev L. Dassin, AUSA, Dated 3/19/96, Addressed to: Judge Duffy Re: The sentencing for the dft. Weinig has been scheduled for Friday, March 22, 1996, at 9:30 a.m. (mb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Satisfaction of Judgment
                                                                                                                                              SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Peter Tohmes Re: [203-1] judgment order in the amount of Amount $ 15,050.00; Judgment satisfied on 9/29/00. (sl)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Peter Tohmes to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 . Return date 6/2/00. ( Civil Action # 00 Civ. 7492) (mb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                  Payment of Fine by Peter Tohmes in the amount of $450.00: Date Received: 09/22/2000. (cde)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                    Payment of Fine by Peter Tohmes in the amount of $2,575.42: Date Received: 9/26/00. (mn)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                      Payment of Fine by Peter Tohmes in the amount of $7,400.00: Date Received: 9/25/00. (mn)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                        Payment of Fine by Peter Tohmes in the amount of $1,500.00: Date Received: 9/5/00. (mn)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                          Payment of Fine by Peter Tohmes in the amount of $3820.00: Date Received: 8/14/00. (mn)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 209 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation and Order as to Harvey Weinig. It is hereby stipulated, ordered, adjudged and decreed that: 1. Bart M. Schwartz shall dispose of approximately two hundred to two hundred fifty (200-250) boxes of files at a cost not to exceed $600.00. 2. Bart M. Schwartz, dft. Harvey wenig and his counsel, John R. Wing are hereby barred from asserting any claim against the U.S. or any of its agents and employees, including the Drug Enforcement Administration("DEA"), the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI"), or U.S. Attorney's office ("USAO"), in connection with the disposal of the boxes of files. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy). (mb)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 208 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) as to Peter Tohmes Re: [204-1] appeal to withdraw [204-1] appeal (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 207 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                Judgment Returned Executed as to Peter Tohmes ; on 10/29/99 (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Peter Tohmes for dates of 9/22/99 before Judge Duffy. (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 205 Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/14/1999 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                    File notice that the record on appeal as to Peter Tohmes has been certified and transmitted to USCA on 10/14/99 [204-1] appeal. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number as to Peter Tohmes Re: [204-1] appeal USCA NUMBER: 99-1567. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/28/1999, Terminated: 2/29/2000 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Peter Tohmes Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s ; from ; the Judgment entered in this action on September 22, 1999. Copies mailed to the attorneys of record: A.U.S.A. and Court Reporters. Filing Fee $ 105.00 Receipt # E 355677. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appeal with copy of order/judgment and two copies of docket entries as to Peter Tohmes transmitted to USCA re: [204-1] appeal on 9/28/99. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/24/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL. Dft. Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s. The dft. is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 4 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. It is ordered that the dft. shall pay a special assessment of $50.00 which shall be due immediately. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dft. shall notify the U.S. Attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines, restitution, costs, and special assessments imposed by this judgment are fully paid. The dft. is hereby committed to the custody of the U.S. Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 97 month(s). , Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1, 38s . All open counts are dismissed on the motion of the U.S. The dft. is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, the dft. shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 years. The dft. is cooperate with the Immigration and Naturalization Service. Should he not be excluded from the country, the dft. should be placed on supervised release as indicated. The dft. shall not possess a firearm as defined in 18 U.S.C. SS 921. Statement of reasons attached. Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); [ Docketed as a Judgment #99,2245 on 9/27/99. ] (mb) Modified on 09/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Peter Tohmes Terminated motions: [193-1] motion to grant a continuance of the sentencing date in the above referenced matter. as to Peter Tohmes (2) Counts Dismissed: Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1, 38s (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing held Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PLEADING TO SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Peter Tohmes (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER filed by Harvey Weinig From Thomes Peter, Dated 8/10/99, Addressed to: Judge Duffy Re: Sentencing Memorandum (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Peter Tohmes (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and Order as to Peter Tohmes, Whereas, the parties wish to resolve this matter without resort to further ligitation It is hereby stipulated, ordered, adjudged and decreed that: 1. $48,500.00 shall be released to Maurice H. Sercarz, the atty. for Tohmes Peter, to be held in escrow for his client. 2.$ 7,500.00 shall be released to Michael Bachner. 3. Tohmes Peter and Michael Bachner agrees not to contest the administrative or civil forfeiture of the remainder of The Account, $37,000.00 under Title 18, U.S.C., Section 981. 4. Tohmes Peter and Michael Bachner are hereby barred from asserting anything against the U.S. or any of its agents and employees, including the Federal Bureau Investigation("FBI") or U.S. Attorneys Office ("USAO"), in connection with, or out of, the U.S. restraint, seizure and/or forfeiture of The Account, including but not limited to any claim that the U.S. did not have probable cause to restrain, seize and/por forfeit The Account. 5. Tohmes Peter and Michael Bachner further agree to hold harmless the U.S. and all of the U.S. agents and employees, including the FBI and USAO from any and all claims, including third party claims regarding The account, in connection with this action, including but not limited to any claim of ownership. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) Copies mailed. (mb) Modified on 04/01/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Peter Tohmes for dates of 3/3/98 before Judge Duffy. (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Before Judge Rakoff; TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Peter Tohmes for dates of 8/27/98. (cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sentencing set for 9:30 11/17/98 for Peter Tohmes , Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Peter Tohmes. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA entered by Peter Tohmes . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s . (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea by Peter Tohmes Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Change of Plea Hearing as to Peter Tohmes held before Magistrate Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Defendant pres. w/atty Maurice Sercarz. AUSA Robert Buehler pres. Court reporter Jerry Harrison and Hebrew Interpreter Meir Turner. Deft. withdrew plea of not guilty and entered a plea of guilty to Count 1 of S4 94 Cr. 981 Indictment. PSI Ordered. Sentencing set for November 17, 1998 at 9:30 a.m. Deft. cont'd detained. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance for Peter Tohmes by Attorney Maurice H. Sercarz (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 8/21/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation as to Peter Tohmes, It is hereby Stipulated, by and between the Government and Tohmes Peter as follows: 1. The Court shall release all prior restraints and seizure notices filed against The Account; 2. All funds contained in The Account shall be deposited into the United States Marshal's Service Seized Assets Account and shall thereby be deemed subject to forfeiture; 3. Simultaneous with teh execution of this Stipulation the Parties shall execute an agreement providing for the use of these funds to pay legal fees of Maurice H. Sercarz in accordance with a schedule to be agreed upon between the parties; 4. This Stipulation is without prejudice to the defendant's rights to contest the forfeiture of all sums not expended for the payment of legal fees to Maurice H. Sercarz; It is further Stipulated that the defendant will not raise any further claum to the remainder of the funds pursuant to United States v. Monsanto. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation as to Peter Tohmes, It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the Parties that the funds previously held by the defendant in the Account of Guardian Funding Group, Inc., Account No. 13048481-01 at Bank Leumi USA, formerly known as Bank Leumi Trust Company of New York and currently deposited into the United States Marshall's Service Seized Asset Accounts shall be released to Maurice H. Sercarz to pay for his legal fees in connection with the above-referenced matter according to the following schedule: 1. Upon the execution this document $20,000 shall be released to the account of Maurice H. Sercarz; 2. Upon the filing of pre-trial motions an additional $25,000 shall be released to the account of Maurice H. Sercarz; and 3. Upon the commencement of the trial, an additional $30,000 shall be released to the account of Maurice H. Sercarz ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Peter Tohmes to grant a continuance of the sentencing date in the above referenced matter. (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/15/1998 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Peter Tohmes for dates of 3/25/98. (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Payment of Fine in the amount of $50.00 by Gary Salerno . Date received: 4/21/98 (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sentencing set for 10:30 7/7/98 for Peter Tohmes , Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA entered by Peter Tohmes . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea by Peter Tohmes Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of Plea Hearing as to Peter Tohmes held. Deft. pres. w/atty Paul Kurtz. AUSA, James Benjamin and AUSA, Robert Buehler pres. Interpreter Meir Turner (Hebrew). Deft. w/draws prior plea of not guilty and pleads guilty. Court accepts plea. PSI ordered. Sentence July 7, 1998 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Duffy. Deft. cont'd detained. (Judge Sand) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 190 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998, Terminated: 9/29/2099 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA as to Peter Tohmes for the issuance of a letter rogatory directed to the appropriate judicial authorities in the Federal Republic of Germany. The letter rogatory requests the judicial authorities of the Federal Republic of Germany to preserve and make available all seized evidence, tape recorded telephone conversations and facsimile ("fax") transmissions in the possession of German law enforcement authorities, as well as interviews and testimony of German law enforcement officers, that relate to the prosecution of Tohmes Peter, a/k/a "Peter Thomas." The letter rogatory (which is hereby incorporated into this motion), a memorandum of law, and a proposed order are attached. , Return date **/**/** (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law by USA as to Peter Tohmes in support of [190-1] motion for the issuance of a letter rogatory directed to the appropriate judicial authorities in the Federal of Germany. The letter rogatory requests the judicial authorities of the Federal Republic of Germany to preserve and make available all seized evidence, tape recorded telephone conversations and facsimile ("fax") transmissions in the possession of German law enforcement authorities, as well as interviews and testimony of German law enforcement officers, that relate to the prosecution of Tohmes Peter, a/k/a "Peter Thomas." The letter rogatory (which is hereby incorporated into this motion), a memorandum of law, and a proposed order are attached. (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pre-trial conference as to Peter Tohmes set at 9:30 4/9/98 for Peter Tohmes (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pre-trial conference as to Peter Tohmes held. Deft. Thomes Peter pres. w/atty Paul Kurtz. Next PTC is scheduled for Thursday 4/9/98 at 9:30 a.m. All time is to be excluded. Deft. cont'd remanded. (Judge Duffy) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pre-trial conference as to Peter Tohmes set at 9:30 3/3/98 for Peter Tohmes (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pre-trial conference as to Peter Tohmes held. Deft. Peter Thomes pres. w/atty Daniel Nobel. Next PTC is scheduled for Tuesday 3/3/98 at 9:30 a.m. All time is excluded. Deft. cont'd remanded. (Judge Duffy) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 1/20/1998, Entered: 1/21/1998 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed Memo-Endorsement on motion as to Harvey Weinig, denying motion for a correction or reduction of Mr. Weinig's sentence pursuant to Rule 35 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Peter Tohmes, ...therefore it is Ordered that the request for an exclusion of time ...from 12/19/97 through the date of the first pretrial conference is hereby granted to Continue in Interests of Justice ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ba) Modified on 01/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/13/1998 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case. The deft. pres. w/atty David Greenfield. The deft. Gary Salerno (10) pleaded guilty to count(s) 1s. The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 4 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. It is further Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States Attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines, restitution, costs, and special assessments imposed by this judgment are fully paid. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 108 months. The imprisonment on S4 94 Cr 981 is to run concurrent with the term of imprisonment on S1 95 Cr 167. The term of imprisonment on S4 94 Cr 981 is also to run concurrent with the term of imprisonment imposed in the Eastern District of New York. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 years. The term of supervised release on S4 94 Cr. 981 is to run concurrent with the term of supervised release on S1 95 Cr 167. Special Assessment of $50.00. Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1, 2s , 9s , 18s , 20s -22s , 38s . Underlying Indictments are Nolled as to Salerno only on motion of govt. Docketed as a judgment # 98,0089 on 1/14/98 Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ba) Modified on 01/15/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Gary Salerno Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1, 2s, 9s, 18s, 20s-22s, 38s (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing held Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1s (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Appearance as to Peter Tohmes held. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Detention hearing as to Peter Tohmes held. Deft. pres. w/CJA atty Dan Nobel. (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Detention hearing as to Peter Tohmes reset for 12/18/97 for Peter Tohmes (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/24/1997 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Peter Tohmes : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis ) (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Detention hearing as to Peter Tohmes set for 11:00 12/16/97 for Peter Tohmes (ba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 185 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/9/1997 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed letter by Benjamin Brafman, dtd 4/9/97 to Judge Duffy re: as to Alexander Schwartz ... request that Your Honor treat as the basis for a motion for renewal herein, perhaps purs. to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(6).... (rec. in chambers on 4/10/97) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 184 Filed: 6/30/1997, Entered: 7/2/1997 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Memo-Endorsement on Endorsement as to Alexander Schwartz .... Petitioner submits this motion to renew argument of his petition. Though not in proper form, the letter submitted by counsel, dated April 9, 1997, will be considered under Rule 60 (b)(6).... Accordingly, any relief requested in the April 9 letter is denied. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy). (ref. 96 civ. 5424 (KTD) (ys) Modified on 07/02/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 183 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation in Order as to Donald J. Hayden... that the cash bail in the amount of $10,000 currently in the custody of the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York be exonerated and released to the original surety, Kevin Richards, of 1537 Wellesley Avenue, Los Angeles, CA. 90025. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 182 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation in Order as to Latchezar Christov... that the above noted case has been resolved with respect to Christov, and therefore, the terms and conditions of the Temporary Restraing Order dated Nov. 29, 1994, as extended Dec. 12. 1994, are no longer required, and, thus the TRO, insofar as it related to Christov is hereby vacated. Thus. subject to the term of this Stipulation and Order is "So Ordered" and/or served upon Laidlaw Equities, Inc., Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall release to Latchezar Christov the balance of the cash and securities in Account numbered 7M9-900015, the contents of which have been under restraint pursuant to the TRO. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed Memo-Endorsement... as to Alexander Schwartz denying [0-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 as to Alexander Schwartz (11) ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy) (Original dkt and file in 96 civ. 5424 doc #3.) (ys) Modified on 01/13/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Latchezar Christov for dates of 4/17/96 before Judge Duffy. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: 9/18/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Alexander Schwartz....seeks a writ of habeas corpus. After my review of the Petition, I direct Respondent to file a response within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The clerk of the Court is directed to serve copy of this Order and the underlying Petition on the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed cert #P146572497 to Mary Jo White, U.S. District Attorney, S.D.N.Y., U.S.District Attorney Office, One St. Andrews Plaza, New York, N.Y. 10007. (ys) Modified on 09/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER.... as to Latchezar Christov...that purs. to the terms of the Stipulation and Order, dated Dec. 1994 (a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit 1), and pursuant to sebsequent Stipulation and Orders, the most recent of which, dated Jan. 16, 1995 (a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit 2), the remainder of the escrow account has been established and maintained for the purpose of payment and pre-payment of fees, expenses, or other costs billed by Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C., which escrow account has been established and maintain for the purpose of payment and pre-payment of fees, expenses, or other costs billed by Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. solely in connection with its representation of defendant Latchezar Christov.... (Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 8/13/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation in Order as to Donald J. Hayden... that certain of the defendant's assets shall be released or returned as follows: 1. Thomas J. Callan, Esq., shall be authorized to release and issue a draft drawn on his attorney Escrow account payable to the defendant, Donald J. Hayden, for the full balance of funds contained therein which is approximately $98,794.75; and 2. Defendant hereby forfeits all rights, title and interes he maintains in the aforementioned accounts held jointly with Latchezar Christov at Laidlaw Equitites, Inc. under account number 7M9-900015 and 7M9-9000395 to the United States Government pursuant to his plea agreement. 3. That in view of the forfeiture referred to in paragraph 2 above, all other assets of the defendant as contained in the financial statement annexed hereto previously subject to court order or stipulation, shall be released to the defendant free and unencumbered, immediately. It is further Stipulated and Agreed Upon, that this agreement is strictly limited to the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York and the Defendant, and does bind either party in any future arrangement or agreement. It is Further Stipulated and Agreed Upon, that there are no promises or understanding between the Government and the defendant other than as set forth herein. So Ordered:( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Alexander Schwartz.... Having reveiwed the petition, I direct the Gov't to file an answer within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and underlying petition and memorandum of law on the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed certified #P146571711. (ys) Modified on 08/15/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Payment of Fine in the amount of 100.00 by Latchezar Christov . Date received: 8/6/90 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Alexander Schwartz to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Payment of Fine in the amount of 150.00 by Donald J. Hayden . Date received: 7/15/96 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: 7/11/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXONERATING BAIL as to Latchezar Christov... Ordered that the bond securing defendant's bail is exonerated and all property furnished to secure defendant's bond to wit: cash, real property including title documents with respect thereto, and the defendant's passport shall be returned to their rightful owners. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docketed as a Judgment #96,1372 on 6/17/96 as to Donald J. Hayden (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case. The deft. pres. w/atty. Stephen Worth. The deft. Donald J. Hayden (12) pleaded guilty to count(s) 1s, 2s , 3s . The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. It is further Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States Attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines, restitution, costs, and special assessments imposed by this judgment are fully paid. The defendant is hereby placed on probation for a term of 3 years. The defendant shall not commit another federal, state, or local crime. The deft. shall not illegally possess a controlled substance. The deft. shall refrain from any unlawful use of controlled substance. The defendant shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of placement on probation and at least two periodic drug tests thereafter, as directed by the probation office. The defendant shall not possess a firearm as defined in 18 U.S.C. 921. Special conditions of supervision: Defendant is to submit to drug-testing every 30 days, as directed by the probation department. Defendant is not to return to the securities industry. Defendant is prohibited from driving while under the influence of alcohol. The deft. shall pay the following total criminal monetary penalties in accordance with the schedule of payments set forth on Sheet 5, Part B. Total $150.00. Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1. Original indictment dismissed on oral motion of the gov't. ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Donald J. Hayden Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sentencing held Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judgment Returned Executed as to Harvey Weinig on 4/19/96 (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Harvey Weinig for dates of 3/22/96 before Judge Duffy. (mr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docketed as a Judgment #96,0950 on 4/24/96 as to Latchezar Christov (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Payment of Fine in the amount of 50.00 by Harvey Weinig . Date received: 4/22/96 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/22/1996 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case. The deft. pres. w/atty. Gerald Lefcourt and Josh Dratel. The deft. Latchezar Christov (13) pleaded guilty to count(s) 1s, 38s . The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. It is further Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States Attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines, restitution, costs, and special assessments imposed by this judgment are fully paid. The defendant is hereby placed on probation for a term of 2 years. Probation is to take place in the district of residence. The deft. shall pay the following total criminal monetary penalties...Special assessment of $100.00. Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1, 3s -4s , 7s . Counts dismissed on the motion of the United States. ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ys) Modified on 04/22/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Latchezar Christov Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1, 3s-4s, 7s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sentencing held Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1s, 38s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Notice of Publication Process Receipt and Return as to Harvey Weinig... served at: U.S. States Marshal's Service (SDNY), 500 Pearl Street, 4th Floor, New York, N.Y. 10007. Date of service 3/7/96. (ys) Modified on 04/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docketed as a Judgment #96,0719 on 3/29/96 as to Harvey Weinig (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case. The deft. pres. w/atty. John Wing. The deft. Harvey Weinig (1) pleaded guilty to count(s) 1s, 38s . It is Ordered that the defendant shall pay a special assessment of $100.00, for counts 1 and 38. It is further Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines, restitution, costs and special assessment imposed by this judgment are fully paid. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of One Hundred and Thirty-Five (135) months. The defendant shall surrender for service at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2 p.m. on 4/5/96. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of Three (3) years. Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1, 5s , 11s -17s , 19s , 26s -31s , 32s -33s , 34s . All outstanding counts are dismissed on the motion of the United States. Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Harvey Weinig Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1, 5s, 11s-17s, 19s, 26s-31s, 32s-33s, 34s, 35s-37s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sentencing held Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1s, 38s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) as to Menashe Leifer Re: [155-1] appeal affirming judgment/order (kk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter by Stephen C. Worth, dtd 2/12/96 to Judge Duffy re: as to Donald J. Hayden, to travel to the states of Nevada and Colorado for several days on business duing the month of Feb., 1996. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation in Order as to Latchezar Christov,... that subject to the terms of the attached Stipulation and Order, dated December 1994, that on the day this Stipulation and Order is So Ordered and/or served upon Laidlaw Equities, Inc., Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall release to Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. the sum of $10,000 (ten thousand dollars) from account 7M9-900015, the contents of which account are under restraing by Order of the Court, which sum shall represent payment and pre-payment of fees, expenses, or other costs billed by Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. solely in connection with its representation of deft. Latchezar Christov , and that purs. to the Dec. 1994, Stipulation and Order, Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C., shall place the monies transferred from Laidlaw Equities, Inc., into an interest bearing escrow account. If there is a resolution of the above-captioned criminal case prior to the expenditure of the $10,000, Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. agrees to return the unused portion either to the Gov't or to the Deft., as the Court so directs. If there is not a resolutionof the above-captioned criminal case prior to the expenditure of the $10,000, the deft. reserves the right to seek appropriate reliev for additional funds. , and that from the interest bearing escrow in which Lefcourt & Dratel, P.D., has placed the $10,000 ...Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C., shall pay to Terrence P. Goggin, Esq., the amount of $6,600 (six thousand six hundred dollars), and to Dewey Ballantine, c/o John K. Van de Kamp, Esq., the amount of $10,094 (Ten thousand ninety-four dollars and thirty-six cents) , and that on the day this Stipulation and Order is So Ordered and/or served upon Laidlaw Equities, Inc. Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall transfer $5,000 (five thousand dollars) from account No. 7M9-900015 to Acount No. 7M9-900935. , and that this Stipulation and Order does nothing to supersede, displace, or nullify the Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter Nov. 29, 1994, as extended Dec. 12, 1994, or attached Stipulation and Order of Dec. 1994, other than as set forth herein. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation in Order as to Donald J. Hayden,... that certainof the defendant's assets shall be released or returned as followed: 1. upon receipt of this Order, Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall immediately release two (2) checks payable to the Internal Revenue Service in the amounts of $1,435.00 and $2,033, respectively, on behalf of the Defendant. Said checks should be forwarded to Defendant's attorneys, Hession, Bekoff and Worth, 29 Roslyn Road, Mineola , and Upon receipt of this Order Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall immediately release a check in the amount of $25,000.00 payable to Hession, Bekoff & Worth, which shall represent payment of fees, expenses and other costs billed by Hession, Bekoff & Worth, solely in connection with its representation of the defendant , and that the defendant shall not request a hearing purs. to U.S. V. Monsanto, 924 F. 2d, 1186 (2d Cir. 1991), with respect to attorneys' fees unless and until such time as they represent that they have expended the $25,000.00 , and that upon this Agreemnt is strictly limited to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the S.D.N.Y. and the deft., and does bind either party in any future arrangements and agreements. Further Stipulated, that there are not promises or understandings between the Gov't and the deft. other than as set forth herein, or as are contained in the aforesaid Agreement between the U.S. Attorney's Office for the S.D.N.Y. and the deft. dated 3/22/95. So Ordered: ( Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote, Part I ); Copies mailed. (ys) Modified on 01/05/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEA entered by Gary Salerno . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1s (ys) Modified on 02/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arraignment as to Gary Salerno held Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1s, 2s, 9s, 18s, 20s-22s, 38s. Deft. pres. w/atty. David Greenfield. Deft. plead guilty to count 1 of 94 CR 981. Deft. cont'd remanded.... before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995 USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) as to Alexander Schwartz Re: [146-1] appeal affirming judgment/order (kk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Menashe Leifer for dates of 10/18/95 before Judge Duffy. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Directing Forfeiture of Property as to Latchezar Christov Based on the plea agreement with the deft. the deft. agrees to forfeit the Laidlaw Equities Account to the United States. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/16/1995 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Directing Forfeiture of Property as to Harvey Weinig Based on the plea agreement with the deft. Harvey Wwinig, the deft. agrees to forfeit the above listed assets and/or properties to the United States for disposition in accordance with the law. Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            File notice that the record on appeal as to Menashe Leifer has been certified and transmitted to USCA on 11/13/95 [155-1] appeal (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Memo-Endorsement on Letter ated November 6, 1995 by: Gerald L. Shargel. Requesting extension for surrender date for six weeks, until Dec. 21, 1995. as to Menashe Leifer....An extension f srrrender date is granted untiol Nov. 27, 1995 ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Alexander Schwartz for dates of 9/6/95 before Judge Duffy. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Gary Salerno for dates of 9/21/95 before Judge Duffy. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Harvey Weinig for dates of 9/21/95 before Judge Duffy. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docketed as a Judgment #95,2075 on 10/25/95. (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/27/1995 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Menashe Leifer from the Judgment entered in this action on October 19, 1995. Copies sent to: Deft., AUSA, and Ct. Reporters. Filing Fee $ 105.00 Receipt # E248447 (em)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Payment of Fine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Payment of Fine in the amount of 50.00 by Alexander Schwartz . Date received: 10.24.95..date deposited..10.25.95..paid to date $50.00...amt $50.00 (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: 10/20/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT In a Criminal Case ( For Offenses Committed On or after November 1, 1987) The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 1 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform act of 1984. Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1. Count Dismissed on Government's Motion. , Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s. The defendant is hereby Committed to the custody to the of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of Twenty (20 months on count 1. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by Bureau of prisons before 2 p.m. on 11/9/95. Upon release from imprisonment, the deefendant shall be on Supervised release for a term of three (3) Years on count 1. It is Ordered that the defendant shall pay a special assessment of $50.00 for count 1 . Original Indictment Nolled as to Menashe Leifer only on motion of govt. It is Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines and special assessments are fully paid. ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Menashe Leifer Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing held Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT as to Latchezar Christov (da)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgent date d Sept. 7, 1995 Dockted as a Judgment $ 95,1746 on 9/12/95. as to Alexander Schwartz (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Harvey Weinig, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer, to Continue in Interests of Justice all time running from the date of thos order until October 16, 1995 shall be excluded from the time within which trial must commence ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLEA entered by Harvey Weinig . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1s, 38s (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sentencing set for 9:30 2/14/96 for Latchezar Christov , Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1s, 38s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Latchezar Christov (dd) Modified on 04/22/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLEA entered by Latchezar Christov . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1s, 38s (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea by Latchezar Christov Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1s, 38s Deft. pres ( Atty. Gerald Lefcourt and Josh Dratel pres) Deft. w/d's his previous plea of n/g and enters a plea of guilty to counts 1 and 38 of S4 94 cr 981. PSi Ordered. Sentence date is scheduled for Wednesday 2/14/96 at 9:30 am. Bail conditions cont'd--Duffy, J. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of Plea Hearing as to Latchezar Christov held (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sentencing set for 9:30 1/10/96 for Harvey Weinig , Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1s, 38s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Harvey Weinig (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Change of Not Guilty Plea
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea by Harvey Weinig , Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1s, 38s deft. pres. ( Atty. John Wing pres0. deft/ w/d's his previous plea of n/g and enters a plea of guilty to count 1 and 38. PSI ordered. Sentence darte is scheduled for Wednesday 1/10/96 at 9:30 am. Bail conditions cont'd--Duffy, J. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of Plea Hearing as to Harvey Weinig held (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/21/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation in Order as to Latchezar Christovthat on the day this stip and order is So Ordered and/or served upon Laidlaw Equities, Inc., Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall release to Lefcourt & Datel, the sum of $50,000 (Fifty Thousand Dollars) from accounts 7m9-900015 and 7m9-900395, the contents of which accounts are under restraint by Order of the court, which sum represent pay ment and pre-payment of fees pursuant to Dec. 1994, stip. and order Lefcourt & Dratel shall place the monies transferred into an interest bearing escrow account. Lefcourt & Dratel may withdraw monies from this account to satisfy work performed upon this stip. nothing to supersede, displace, o nullify the TRO of 11/29/94 ( Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT In a Crininal case ( For Offenses Committed On or After November 1, 1987) The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of prisons to be for a term imprisoned for Twenty-Four (240 months. on count 1. defendant is to remain on bail pending appeal Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on Supervised release for Three (3) Years. on count 1. deft. is to cooperate, if necessary, with INS. It is ordered that the defendant shall pay a special assessment of $50.00 for count 1 It is ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines and special assessments are fully paid. ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Alexander Schwartz Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [146-1] appeal by Alexander Schwartz ; Copy of notice of appeal sent to District Judge. (em)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Harvey Weinig, Gary Salerno, Latchezar Christov for dates of June 26, 1995. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 146 Filed: 9/6/1995, Entered: 9/7/1995 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Alexander Schwartz from the judgment entered in this action on September 6, 1995. Copies sent to: AUSA, Deft. and Ct. Reporters. Filing Fee $ 105.00 Receipt # E 245562. (em)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sentencing held Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation in Order as to Harvey Weinig ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum and ORDER as to Latchezar Christov denying [133-2] motion to sever of trial as to Latchezar Christov (13) The case remains set for trial on October 2, 1995. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 7/12/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation in Order by the parties that certain of the deft's assets shall be released or returned as set forth herein as to Donald J. Hayden ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann for dates of May 19, 1995. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Menashe Leifer as to Menashe Leifer (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT as to Harvey Weinig, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer (sp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation in Order as to Latchezar Christov,... that subjected to the terms of the attached Stipulation and Order, dtd Dec. 12 1994, that on the day this Stipulation and Order is So Ordered and/or served upon Laidlaw Equities, Inc., Laidlaw Equities, Inc. shall release to Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. the sum of $25,000 (Twenty-Five Thousand Dollars) from accounts 7M9-900015 and 7M9-900395, the contents of which accounts are under restraint by Order of the Court, which sum shall represent payment and pre-payment of fees, expenses, or other costs billed by Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. solely in connection with its representation of defendant Latchezar Christove.... , and Purs. to the Dec. 1994, Stipulation and Order, Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C., shall place the monies transferred from Laidlaw Equities, Inc., into an interest bearing escrow account. Lefcourt & Dratel may withdraw monies from this account to satisfy work performed in connection with its representation of the Defendant. If there is a resolution of the above-captioned criminal case prior to the expenditure of the $25,000, Lefcourt & Dratel, P.C. agrees to return the unused portion either to the Gov't or to the defendant, as the Court so directs. If there is not a resolution of the criminal case prior to the expenditure of the $25,000, the defendant reserves the right to seek appropriate relief for additiona funds , and Further Stipulated that this stipulation and Order does nothing to supersede, displace, or nullify the Temporary Restraining Order entered in this matter Nov. 29, 1994, as extended Dec. 12, 1994, or the attached Stipulation and Order of Dec. 1994, other than as set forth herein. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER as to Harvey Weinig, Gary Salerno, Latchezar Christov , set Jury trial for 10:00 10/2/95 for Harvey Weinig, for Gary Salerno, for Latchezar Christov ( Entered by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pre-trial conference as to Harvey Weinig, Gary Salerno, Latchezar Christov held. Deft. Harvey Weinig pres. w/atty. John Wing. A jury trial is scheduled for Monday 10/2/95 at 10:00 a.m. All time between now and 10/2/95 is excluded in the interest of justice. Travel is extended to N.J. and North of Albany. The rest of baill conditions remain the same. Deft. Gary Salerno pres. w/atty. David Greenfield. (same as above). Deft. cont'd remanded. Deft. Latchezar Christov pres. atty. Joshua Dratel pres. (same endorsement as above. Bail conditions cont'd). (Judge Duffy) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed Memo-Endorsement on Letter dated June 20, 1995 to Judge Duffy by Gerald B. Lefcourt atty. for the deft. Requesting that the Court, so Order this letter, granting Christov's application to travel to Edwards, Colorado, during the time period set forth herein. as to Latchezar Christov ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Latchezar Christov in support of [133-1] motion to suppress of any and all statements, [133-2] motion to sever of trial, [133-3] motion to suppress of the fruits of electronic surveillance., [133-4] motion to produce of discovery, [133-5] motion leave to join any motions, [133-6] motion leave ot make further motions, ( Received in night Depository Box 6/15/95 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Latchezar Christov to suppress of any and all statements , to sever of trial , to suppress of the fruits of electronic surveillance. , to produce of discovery , leave to join any motions , leave ot make further motions, affdvt. of Gerald B. LefCourt , Return date none given (Received in night depository box 6/15/95) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Donald J. Hayden for dates of March 23, 1995. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment Dated May 19, 1995 Dockted as a Judgment # 95,1149 on 6/5/95. as to Leon Shulum Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT In a Criminal Case ( For Offenses Committed On o After November 1, 1987). The Defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1s, 1 , 6s , 8s , 10s , 12s -14s , 23s -28s , 38s . Counts Dismissed on Government's Motion. , Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1ss. The Defendant is hereby placed on Unsupervised Probation One (1) Year on Count 1. The defendant shall pay a fine of $1,000.00 It is Ordered that the defendant shall pay a special assesssment of $50.00 for count 1. S4 and Original Ind. are Nolled as to Rachel Weinmann only on motion of Govt. It is Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States attorney for this district of within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address untril all fines and special assessments are fully paid ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 6/2/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT In a Criminal case ( For Offenses Committed On or After November 1, 1987) The defendant is sentenced as provided in pages 2 through 3 of this judgment. The sentence is imposed pursuant to the Sentencing Reform Act of 1984. Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1s, 1 , 6s , 8s 10s , 12s -14s , 23s -28s , 38s . Dismissed on Government's Motion. , Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1ss. The Defendant is hereby placed on Unsupervised Probation for a term of One (1) Year on count 1. The defendant shall pay a fine of $1,000.00 It is Ordered that the defendant shall pay a special assessment of $50.00 for count 1 . S. 4 and the Original Indictment are Nolled as to Leon Weinmann only on Motion o Govt. It is Ordered that the defendant shall notify the United States attorney for this district within 30 days of any change of name, residence, or mailing address until all fines and special assessments are fully paid. ; Judgment and Commitment issued to U.S. Marshal ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Rachel Weinmann Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1s, 1, 6s, 8s, 10s, 12s-14s, 23s-28s, 38s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sentencing held Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1ss (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Leon Shulum Weinmann Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1s, 1, 6s, 8s, 10s, 12s-14s, 23s-28s, 38s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing held Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1ss (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA entered by Leon Shulum Weinmann . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1ss (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Rachel Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA entered by Rachel Weinmann . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1ss (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arraignment as to Rachel Weinmann held Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1ss Deft. pres ( Atty Benjamin Brafman pres) deft. pleas guilty to count 1 of SS 94 cr. 951 Infomation. deft. waives PSI--Duffy, J. before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Waiver of Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Leon Shulum Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arraignment as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1ss Deft. pres. ( Atty Michael Bachner pres). Deft. pleas guilty to count 1 of SS 94 Cr. 981. information. deft. waives PSI. before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1ss, Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1ss (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Rachel Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Leon Shulum Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Rachel Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Leon Shulum Weinmann (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation in Order as to Harvey Weinig that Weil Gotshal & Manges shall place the monies transferred from the Financial institution into an interest bearing escrow account. Well, Gotshal & manges may withdraw monies from this account to satisfy work performed in connection with its John R. Wing shall submit an affdvt. to the Govt. indicating that the funds released as described herein were received and as further stipulated. representation of the deft ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Menashe Leifer for dates of 3/17/95. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Alexander Schwartz for dates of 3/17/95. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (S4) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1s, 5s, 11s-17s, 19s, 26s-31s, 32s-33s, 34s, 35s-37s, 38s, Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1s, 38s, Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3) count(s) 1s, 38s, Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1s, 6s, 8s, 10s, 12s-14s, 23s-28s, 38s, Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1s, 6s, 8s, 10s, 12s-14s, 23s-28s, 38s, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero (6) count(s) 1s, 38s, Amparo Hurtado Valencia (7) count(s) 1s, 38s, Juliana LNU (8) count(s) 1s, 38s, Carlos Lopez (9) count(s) 1s, 38s, Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1s, 2s, 9s, 18s, 20s-22s, 38s, Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1s, 3s-4s, 7s, 38s (dd); Added (S4) to docket text. Modified on 1/21/2005 (bw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation in Order that certain of the deft's assets shall be released or returned as follows: 1. Thomas J. Callan shall be authorized to release and issue a draft on his attorney Escrow Account payable to Mercedes-Benz credit Corp. 2. Thomas Callan, shall be authorized to release and issue a draft drawn on his attorney Escrow to release and issue a draft drawn on his attorney escrow Account made payable to Myron Samovitz, M.D as to Donald J. Hayden c/o Thomas Richards & Co.. 7037 Hayvenhurst Ave., Van Nuys california in the amt of $541.85. 3. Thomas J. Callan shall be authorized to release and issue a draft of his Atty. Account made payable to Stephen C. Worth, deft. shall provide proof to the govt of payment of the aforementioned debts, , this Agreement is strictly limited to the USA's office. for the SD of NY. , and that there are no promises or understanding between the Government and the deft. other than as set forth herein ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Harvey Weinig for dates of 2/17/95. (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (S3) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (dd) Modified on 05/02/1995; Added (S3) to docket text. Modified on 1/21/2005 (bw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Donald J. Hayden (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sentencing set for 9:30 6/26/95 for Donald J. Hayden , Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Donald J. Hayden (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA entered by Donald J. Hayden . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arraignment as to Donald J. Hayden held Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s Deft. pres. w/atty Stephen Worth deft. pleas guilty to counts 1,2,3. PSI Ordered. Sentence date is scheduled for Monday 6/26/95 at 9:30 a.m. Bail cont'd with one exception. Travel is extended to Northern District of California and Southern District of California. before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (S2) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s (dd); Added (S2) to docket text. Modified on 1/21/2005 (bw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Menashe Leifer (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (S1) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s (dd); Added (S1) to docket text. Modified on 1/21/2005 (bw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Alexander Schwartz (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sentencing set for 9:45 6/21/95 for Menashe Leifer , Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Menashe Leifer (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA entered by Menashe Leifer . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arraignment as to Menashe Leifer held Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1s defft. pres. w/atty Gerald Shargel Deft. w/d's his previous pea of n/g and enters a plea of guilty to count 1 of s1 94 CR 981. PSI Ordered. Sentence date is scheduled for Wednesday 6/21/95 at 9:45 a.m. ail cont'd before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing set for 9:30 6/21/95 for Alexander Schwartz , Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order for PSI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Court Orders pre-sentence investigation as to Alexander Schwartz (dd) Modified on 09/07/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEA entered by Alexander Schwartz . Court accepts plea. Guilty: Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s (Terminated motions - ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arraignment as to Alexander Schwartz held Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1s Deft. pres. w/atty Richard finkel deft. w/d's his revious plea of n/g and enters a plea of guilty to count 1 of S1 94 cr 981. PSI Ordered. Sentence date is scheduled for Wednesday 6/21/95 at 9:30. Bail cont'd before Judge Kevin T. Duffy (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 3/15/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Harvey Weinig, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer for dates of 1/27/95. (rag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 3/10/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Rule 40 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 40 Documents as to Donald J. Hayden received from Central District of California. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Bail hearing as to Harvey Weinig held Deft. pres. w/atty John Wing Bail Application to allow deft. to travel down to Brazil and back. present conditions cont'd--Duffy, J. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/16/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed Memo-Endorsement on Letter dated February 7, 1995 by: Gerald B. Lefcourt Requesting that the Court, by So Order this letter. grant Mr. Christov's application to extend his travel to include visits to his mother in San Diego. as to Latchezar Christov ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann for dates of 12/13/94. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann for dates of 12/7/94. (md)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation in Order as to Menashe Leifer 1. The partiaes agree that upon the entry of this order, the restraining order authorizing the restraint of the Account shall be lifted with prejudice, the funds in the Account shall be released from restraint and Bank Leumi shall be authorized to release the restrained funds in the Acocunt to Congregation Chasidei Nadverna 2. Bank Leumi, Mmenashe Leifer and Congregation Chasidei Nadverna are barred from asserting any claim against the United States 3. Bank Leumi and congregation Chasidei Nadverna further agree to hold harmless the United States.( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pre-trial conference as to Rachel Weinmann, prs. w/atty. Michael Bachner Bail condition cont. Miguel Omar Garrabito not pres. Fugitive Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, not pres. Fugitive Carlos Lopez, not pres. Fugitive Gary Salerno, pres w/atty David Greenfield pres deft. Remanded. Alexander Schwartz, pres w/atty Richard Finkel Bail cont'd. Donald J. Hayden, pres. w/atty Stephen Worth pres bail con't. Latchezar Christov, pres. w/atty. Gerald Lefcourt Bail cont'd. Menashe Leifer deft. pres w/atty Gerald Shargel pres Bail cont'd PTC is scheduled for Thursday 4/27/95 at 10:00 A.M. All time is to be excluded in the interest of Justice Bail cont held.--Duffy, J (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation in Order as to Donald J. Hayden that certain of the deft's assets shall be released or returned 1. on the first day of each month until the date of either a Judgment of Conviction or a judgment of Acquittal being entered against the deft. Laidlaw equties, Inc. shall release $6,000.000 to the deft. for payment of his living expenses 2. Laidlaw shall immediately release a $2,000.00 check. 3. Thomas Callan, shall be authorized to release and issue a check in the sum of $23,686.79 ( Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT PROPERTY BY Abraham Mermelstein and Perla Mermelstein as to Alexander Schwartz. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Alexander Schwartz. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Alexander Schwartz in the Amount of $1,000,000.00, secured by $200,000, Receipt # M19-1-09420. Co-signed by sister & brother in law (Mr. & Mrs. Mermelstein) plus 2 other FRP's. Strict PTS. Surrender passport; Mermelstein to post all of their Right, Title & Interest in their reseidence; Deft must reside with his sisters family (Mrs. Engel) in Bklyn. Deft must attend Academic and religious instruction at the Geryeshiva in Bklyn and may not leave Bklyn, except to appear in Court. Affidavit of Confession of Judgment posted as collateral. Property located at 2 Adar Court, Monsey, N.Y. Property posted by Abraham Mermelstein & Perla Mermelstein. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER as to Alexander Schwartz , deft. pres. w/atty. Richard Finkel. Bail application made. Bail conditions to remain the same with one modification: $1 million PRB, secured by sister's interest of home in Muncie. ( Entered by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Advice of Penalties and SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Donald J. Hayden ( signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRB BOND filed by Donald J. Hayden in Amount $ 100,000.00 Signed by Donald J. Haden 4 East 95th st. NY, NY. Aptc 1C (dd) Modified on 04/22/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRB BOND filed by Latchezar Christov in Amount $ 100,000.00 Signed by deft. Latchezar Christov 607 Skyline Trial Topanza Cagozgs. (dd) Modified on 04/22/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Advice of Penalties and SanctionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Latchezar Christov ( signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Harvey Weinig, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer, Excludable time to Continue in Interests of Justice from 12/22/94 to 1/27/95. ( Signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 12/28/1994, Entered: 4/5/1996 Rule 40 Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 40 Documents as to Latchezar Christov received from Central District of California. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 12/28/1994, Entered: 12/30/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance for Gary Salerno by Attorney Nicholas C. DiPiazza (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 12/28/1994, Entered: 12/29/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Harvey Weinig, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer and all attys, other persons and entitles action for or in concert with the named defts, businesses and/or entitles having actual knowledge of this order. theri attys, agents, employees and anyone acting on their behalf, and all persons or entities and anyone acting on their behald, shall not, directly or indirectly, transfer, sell assign, pledge hypothecate, encumbar, or dispose of in any manner; cause to be transferred, sold. The property and other nterests hereby restrained and as further ordere. ( Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 12/28/1994, Entered: 12/29/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX Parte Declaration of Assistant United States Attorney Kenneth M. Karasas to Harvey Weinig, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Gary Salerno, Alexander Schwartz, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Menashe Leifer Re: (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/11/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Donald J. Hayden by Attorney Stephen C. Worth (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/10/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance for Latchezar Christov by Attorney Gerald B. Lefcourt (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/10/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance for Rachel Weinmann by Attorney Michael F. Bachner (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/10/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance for Leon Shulum Weinmann by Attorney Benjamin Brafman (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/10/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Alexander Schwartz by Attorney Richard A. Finkel. (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 4/10/1995 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance for Gary Salerno by Attorney David Greenfield (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 2/8/1995 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest WARRANT issued as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 2/8/1995 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest WARRANT issued as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Carlos Lopez (lf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero (lf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT issued as to Amparo Hurtado Valencia (lf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/22/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to Juliana LNU (lf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA entered by Gary Salerno . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: , Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1 (ys)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Kevin T. Duffy (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEA entered by Menashe Leifer . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1 (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Appearance as to Menashe Leifer held (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arraignment as to Menashe Leifer held Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1..deft. presw/atty Gerald Shargel and Lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin, AUSA., Case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes, Deft Leifer is bail status., cont'd at $450,000.00 PRB Sec property., PSA sur travel documents. before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA entered by Latchezar Christov . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions - ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Appearance as to Latchezar Christov held (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arraignment as to Latchezar Christov held Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1..deft. Christov pres w/atty Gerald Lefcourt and Lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin...AUSA deft. Christov pleads not guilty and case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes. Deft bail status cont'd as set in L.A., as $100,000.00 PRB cos 2 FRP sec by property Central Dist. of California, State of N.Y., and Newark N.J., deft Christov must not travel to any airports, train stations or bus terminals w/o consent of the court.. before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Appearance as to Donald J. Hayden held (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLEA entered by Donald J. Hayden . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1 (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arraignment as to Donald J. Hayden held Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1..deft Hayden pres w/atty Stephen World and Lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin. Deft. Hayden pleads not guilty and case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes. Deft Haydes bail status cont'd as set in L.a. AS $100,000.00 PRB cos 2 FRP cos 2 frp sec by property., surr of travel documents. Travel limited to Central District of California, state of N.J. and Newark N.J. Deft. Hayden must not travel to any airports, train stations or bus terminals w/o consen of this court.. Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA entered by Alexander Schwartz . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: , Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions - ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arraignment as to Alexander Schwartz held Alexander Schwartz (11)..deft. pres w/atty Richard A.Finkel and lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin.Deft Schwartz pleads not guilty to the indictment. Case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes. Bail status fixed at $1 mill prb $200,000.00 c/o property and 2 homes strict PSA owners. cos live w/sister use no other name, etc.. count(s) cmp before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb) Modified on 12/30/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA entered by Alexander Schwartz . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1 (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arraignment as to Gary Salerno held Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1..deft. pres w/atty David S. Salerno pres w/aty David Greenfield, and Lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin. Case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes., Deft Salerno bail status cont'd fixed at $2.5 mill, PRB-$750,000., C or prop 5 FRP strict strict, PSA elect bracelet... before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER as to Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez , arrest warrant issued.. ( Entered by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA entered by Rachel Weinmann . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions - ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arraignment as to Rachel Weinmann held..deft. Rachel Weinnam pres, w/atty Michael Bachner and Lynne Neils for Mr. Dassin and Mr. Goodman, AUSA and Meir Turner Hebrew Interpreter. Deft. Rachel Weinman pleads not guilty and case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes. Deft. Rachel Weinmans bail status cont'd in same bail as before...Leon Shulum. Weinman as $2. Mill PRB sec by $1.5 mill prop and $1.25. mill C-10 FRP strict PSA--Elect. Bracelet.. Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PLEA entered by Leon Shulum Weinmann . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions - ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arraignment as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1..deft. pres w/atty Bret Gilbert for Benjamin Brafman and Lynne Neils for Lev Dassin., Mr. Goodman pres., Deft Leon Shulum Weinman pleads not guilty and case is now assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes. Defts. Bail status cont'd., at 2 Mill. PRB sec by $1.5 million property $1.25 mill., C-10 FRP strict. PSA., Electronic Bracelet before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER as to Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo , deft Peter not pres, atty not pres., Deft Ocampo not pres., atty not pres, Arrest Warrant issued.. ( Entered by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEA entered by Harvey Weinig . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1 (Terminated motions - ) (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arraignment as to Harvey Weinig held Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1..deft.pres w/atty Gerald Lefcourt for John Wing. Deft Weinig pleads not guilty to the indictment and case is assigned to Judge Duffy for all purposes, Weinig bail status cont'd at $1,000,000.00 PRB sec/propty. 3 FRP--PSA sur travel documents.. before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 153 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 10/11/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application and ORDER ( The USA makes this Application for an order, prusuant to the provisions of Title 18, USC, Sec. 2510-2521, authorising the disclosure, for the limited purposes of making discovery, and the Govt further requests that the original tape recordings remain under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge David N. Edelstein ); Copies mailed. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 2/2/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed Memo-Endorsement on as to Harvey Weinig, request for extension of bail limits to include travel to Colorado from 12/16/94 to 12/25/94 is granted ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen A. Roberts ); Copies mailed. (emil)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 12/13/1994, Entered: 12/16/1994 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT as to Harvey Weinig (1) count(s) 1, Peter Tohmes (2) count(s) 1, Juan Guillermo Ocampo (3) count(s) 1, Leon Shulum Weinmann (4) count(s) 1, Rachel Weinmann (5) count(s) 1, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero (6) count(s) 1, Amparo Hurtado Valencia (7) count(s) 1, Juliana LNU (8) count(s) 1, Carlos Lopez (9) count(s) 1, Gary Salerno (10) count(s) 1, Alexander Schwartz (11) count(s) 1, Donald J. Hayden (12) count(s) 1, Latchezar Christov (13) count(s) 1, Menashe Leifer (14) count(s) 1 (Preliminary Examination cancelled.) (lf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with atty Richard Finkel. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $1 million PRB secured by sister's home in Muncie & sister's home in Bklyn & $200,000 in either cash or property. Bond cosigned by all owners of those homes. Deft to reside at sister's home in Brooklyn & is not to leave the Borough of Brooklyn except for court appearances. Strict Pretrial Supervision, reporting in Brooklyn. Deft is not to use any name other than Alexander Schwartz. Deft is not to travel anywhere except between sister's home at 142 Haywood St. & Yeshiva 15 E. 51 ST. Affidavit regarding source of assets to be provided. (Mag. Judge Gershon). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rachel Weinmann ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION as to Leon Shulum Weinmann ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Detention hearing as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Michael Bachner. AUSA Lev Dassin present. Detained. (Mag. Judge Gershon). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Detention hearing as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Michael Bachner. AUSA Lev Dassin present. Detained. (Mag. Judge Gershon. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Alexander Schwartz, that religious articles needed by the deft for daily religious observances, including tallis, tephelim, prayer books, be provided to the deft Alexander Schwartz. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ); Copies mailed. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Alexander Schwartz by Attorney Richard A. Finkel [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with atty Richard A. Finkel. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to Friday, 12/9/94, 10:00 A.M. (Mag. Judge Gershon). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Detention hearing as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moscovitz by Michael Bachner. Interpreter present. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 11:00 A.M., Tuesday, 12/6/94. (Mag. Judge Gershon). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Detention hearing as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz by Michael Bachner. Interpreter present. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 11:00 A.M., Tuesday, 12/6/94. (Mag. Judge Gershon). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with CJA atty James Roth by Michael Hurwitz. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 12/6/94 at noon. (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Harvey Weinig. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Harvey Weinig in the Amount of 1,000,000. Secured by Apartment on Riverside Drive within 2 weeks. Cosigned by 3 FRP. 2 today and 3rd within one week. PSA. Surrender travel documents. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Menashe Leifer. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Menashe Leifer in the Amount of $450,000. Cosigned by 4 FRP's (3 today, the other within 1 week). Posting of commercial building within 2 weeks. Surrender of travel documents. PSA. [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance for Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann by Attorney Avraham C. Moskowitz [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance for Harvey Weinig by Attorney James R. DeVita [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Menashe Leifer : Appointment of Attorney Harvey Fishbein ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Alexander Schwartz : Appointment of Attorney James Roth ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Alexander Schwartz : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Menashe Leifer : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Menashe Leifer on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Alexander Schwartz on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Gary Salerno on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Rachel Weinmann on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Leon Shulum Weinmann on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Harvey Weinig on 11/30/94 [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Appearance as to Menashe Leifer held. Deft appears with CJA atty Harvey Fishbein. AUSA Lev Dassin present. $450,000 PRB, 4 FRP-3 today-the other within 1 week. Posting of commercial building within 2 weeks. Surrender travel documents. PSA. (Mag. Judge Grubin). Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Menashe Leifer ; [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Appearance as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Rachel Weinmann ; Detention Hearing set for 10:00 12/5/94 for Rachel Weinmann ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Appearance as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Leon Shulum Weinmann ; Detention Hearing set for 10:00 12/5/94 for Leon Shulum Weinmann ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq) Modified on 12/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Appearance as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with CJA atty James Roth. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing 12/2/94 at 11 a.m. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Alexander Schwartz ; Detention Hearing set for 11:00 12/2/94 for Alexander Schwartz ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Appearance as to Gary Salerno held. Deft appears with atty Nicholas C. DiPiazza. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $2.5 million PRB co-signed by 5 FRP. Secured by $750,00 cash or property. Electronic bracelet. Gov't moves on danger & flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Gary Salerno ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Appearance as to Harvey Weinig held. Deft appears with atty James DeVita. AUSA Mark Goodman present. One million PRB secured by apt. on Riverside Drive within 2 weeks, co-signed by 3 FRP - 2 today - 3rd within 1 week. PSA. Surrender travel documents. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Harvey Weinig ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST of Menashe Leifer [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST of Rachel Weinmann [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST of Leon Shulum Weinmann [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST of Alexander Schwartz [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST of Gary Salerno [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to Menashe Leifer [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to Latchezar Christov [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Donald J. Hayden [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued as to Alexander Schwartz [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Gary Salerno [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Carlos Lopez [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT issued as to Juliana LNU [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to Amparo Hurtado Valencia [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to Rachel Weinmann [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Leon Shulum Weinmann [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Peter Tohmes [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Harvey Weinig [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Richard Spence, Harvey Weinig, Chaim Herman, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Michael T. Kalanz, Gary Salerno, Charles Bruno, Alexander Schwartz, Daniel L Carroll, Jose E. Tanon, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Robert Janz, Menashe Leifer, Sylvia Ezell, Patricia Dilluvio in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1956, 1001, 1343 and 1503. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) [ 1:94-m -2385 ] (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 390 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?