USA v. Spence, et al
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:94-mj-02385-UA

Tags
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 4:14 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lev Louis Dassin +1 212 225 2790 +1 212 225 3999 ldassin@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Goodman +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 mpgoodman@debevoise.com
v.
No Logo Peter, Tohmes, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/29/1994
County NewYork
Terminated 3/14/1995
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level
18 U.S.C. 1956 MONEY LAUNDERING.
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,MERGED
18 U.S.C. 1956, 1001 AND 1343 MONEY LAUNDERING, FALSE STATEMENTS TO THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT, AND WIRE FRAUD.
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (143) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Oral Order
ORAL ORDER as to Chaim Herman , to Continue in Interests of Justice adj. to 5/26/95 ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Leonard A. Bernikow ) (md)
    LREF
    Blank  Oral Order
    ORAL ORDER as to Chaim Herman , to Continue in Interests of Justice; continuance granted until 5/19/95 for deft to waive ind. ( Entered by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV ) (emil)
      LREF
      Blank  Oral Order
      ORAL ORDER as to Richard Spence, Chaim Herman, Michael T. Kalanz , to Continue in Interests of Justice; continuance granted as follows: Spence to 5/5/95; Herman to 5/12/95; Kalanz to 5/31/95 ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck ) (emil)
        LREF
        Legal Document 93 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER as to Charles Bruno, Robert Janz, Sylvia Ezell, dismissing ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis ); Copies mailed. (vb)
          LREF
          Blank  Oral Order
          ORAL ORDER as to Richard Spence, Chaim Herman, Michael T. Kalanz , to Continue in Interests of Justice; continuance granted until 5/1/95 ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis ) (emil)
            LREF
            Blank 94 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER as to Patricia Dilluvio, dismissing ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. Lee ); Copies mailed. (vb)
              LREF
              Blank  Oral Order
              ORAL ORDER as to Richard Spence, Chaim Herman, Michael T. Kalanz, Charles Bruno, Jose E. Tanon, Robert Janz, Sylvia Ezell, Patricia Dilluvio , to Continue in Interests of Justice; continuance granted until 3/31/95 ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Naomi R. Buchwald (emil)
                LREF
                Legal Document 92 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995 Transcript
                TRANSCRIPT of record of proceedings as to Alexander Schwartz for dates of 12/9/94. (md)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Oral Order
                  ORAL ORDER as to Patricia Dilluvio , Extended to 3/1/95; to Continue in Interests of Justice ( Entered by Magistrate Judge Naomi R. Buchwald ) (emil)
                    LREF
                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER as to Patricia Dilluvio, to Continue in Interests of Justice, adj. to 1/30/95 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard A. Bernikow ); Copies mailed. (md)
                      LREF
                      Blank 88 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, to Continue in Interests of Justice, adj. to 1/30/95 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Leonard A. Bernikow ); Copies mailed. (md)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 12/16/1994, Entered: 2/7/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                        Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter dated 12/14/94 from Ronald G. Russo as to Charles Bruno, waiving the requirement that Mr. Bruno post add'l bail (deft was supposed to post his home) ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen A. Roberts ); Copies mailed. (emil) Modified on 02/07/1995
                          LREF
                          Blank  Bond Hearing
                          Bail modification hearing as to Jose E. Tanon held. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Bail modified to $100,000 PRB cosigned by 3 FRP. (Mag. Judge Roberts). (gq)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 12/13/1994, Entered: 2/2/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                            Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter dated 12/12/94 from Christine E. Yaris as to Jose E. Tanon, extending time to 12/15/94 for Mr. Tanon to have his suretors sign his bail bond ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen A. Roberts ); Copies mailed. (emil)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 87 Filed: 12/13/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                              NOTICE of Appearance for Sylvia Ezell by Attorney Ira London. (gq)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 12/13/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                CJA 20 as to Sylvia Ezell : Appointment of Attorney Ira D. London ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen A. Roberts ) (gq)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Remark
                                  SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL HEARING as to Sylvia Ezell held. Case reassigned to CJA Ira London due to conflict. Prepare CJA order. (Mag. Judge Roberts). (gq)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                    Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Daniel Carroll. (gq)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 BondCourt Filing
                                      PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Daniel Carroll in the Amount of $250,000. Cosigned by 5 FRP's. Surrender travel documents. Firearms surrendered. Posting of family home. Bail modification on 12/9/94 before Mag. Judge Gershon. Reduce FRP cosigners from 5 to 3. (gq)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Bond Hearing
                                        Bail modifcation hearing as to Daniel Carroll held. Deft appears with CJA atty Marc Bogatin. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Reduce FRP cosigners from 5 to 3. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                                          Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with atty Richard Finkel. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $1 million PRB secured by sister's home in Muncie & sister's home in Bklyn & $200,000 in either cash or property. Bond cosigned by all owners of those homes. Deft to reside at sister's home in Brooklyn & is not to leave the Borough of Brooklyn except for court appearances. Strict Pretrial Supervision, reporting in Brooklyn. Deft is not to use any name other than Alexander Schwartz. Deft is not to travel anywhere except between sister's home at 142 Haywood St. & Yeshiva 15 E. 51 ST. Affidavit regarding source of assets to be provided. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 2/2/1995 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                            Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter dated 12/7/94 from Christine E. Yaris as to Jose E. Tanon, extending time to 12/12/94 for deft Tanon to have his suretors sign his bail bond ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ); Copies mailed. (emil)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 83 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rachel Weinmann ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ) (gq)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 82 Filed: 12/7/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Leon Shulum Weinmann ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ) (gq)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                  Detention hearing as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Michael Bachner. AUSA Lev Dassin present. Detained. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                    Detention hearing as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Michael Bachner. AUSA Lev Dassin present. Detained. (Mag. Judge Gershon. (gq)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Alexander Schwartz, that religious articles needed by the deft for daily religious observances, including tallis, tephelim, prayer books, be provided to the deft Alexander Schwartz. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ); Copies mailed. (gq)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance for Alexander Schwartz by Attorney Richard A. Finkel (gq)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 12/6/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER OF DETENTION as to Richard Spence ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nina Gershon ) (gq)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                            Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with atty Richard A. Finkel. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to Friday, 12/9/94, 10:00 A.M. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                              Detention hearing as to Richard Spence held. Deft appears with atty Freeman. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Detained. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                Detention hearing as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moscovitz by Michael Bachner. Interpreter present. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 11:00 A.M., Tuesday, 12/6/94. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                  Detention hearing as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz by Michael Bachner. Interpreter present. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 11:00 A.M., Tuesday, 12/6/94. (Mag. Judge Gershon). (gq)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                    Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Chaim Herman. (gq)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 12/2/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                      PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Chaim Herman in the Amount of $1,000,000. Posting of 4 buildings worth approximately $970,000, 4 FRP. Surrender passports of deft, his wife & his children by 12/5/94, 5:00 P.M. Strict PSA. Posting of building by 5 P.M., 12/5/94. (gq)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                        Detention hearing as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with CJA atty James Roth by Michael Hurwitz. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Adjourned to 12/6/94 at noon. (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                          Detention hearing as to Chaim Herman held. Deft appears with atty Kenneth Kaplan. AUSA Mark Goodman present. One million PRB, posting of 4 buildings worth approximately $970,000, 4 FRP. Passports of deft, his wife & his children by 12/5/94, 5:00 P.M., 12/5/94. (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                            Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Patricia Dilluvio. (gq)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                              PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Patricia Dilluvio in the Amount of $250,000. Cosigned by 3 FRP's. PSA. Surrender travel documents. (gq)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Harvey Weinig. (gq)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                  PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Harvey Weinig in the Amount of 1,000,000. Secured by Apartment on Riverside Drive within 2 weeks. Cosigned by 3 FRP. 2 today and 3rd within one week. PSA. Surrender travel documents. (gq)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                    Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Jose E. Tanon. (gq)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                      PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Jose E. Tanon in the Amount of $250,000. Cosigned by 3 FRP's within 1 week. PSA with drug testing and treatment as directed by PSA. Surrender travel documents. Must live with mother. Bail modified to $100,000 PRB cosigned by 3 FRP's on 11/14/94 by consent of AUSA Mark Goodman & approved by Mag. Judge Roberts. (gq)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                        Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Robert Janz (gq)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                          PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Robert Janz in the Amount of $250,000. Secured by $100,000 cash/property within 2 weeks, 3 FRP, 1 today, others withing 1 week. Surrender travel documents. PSA. (gq)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                            Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Michael T. Kalanz. (gq)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                              PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Michael T. Kalanz in the Amount of $250,000. Posting of home within 14 days. 3 FRP's. PSA. Surrender travel documents. Surrender of firearms. Psychological counseling. (gq)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Sylvia Ezell. (gq)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                                  PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Sylvia Ezell in the Amount of $250,000. Co-signed by 3 FRP, 1 today, others within 1 week. Surrender travel documents. PSA. (gq)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                    Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Menashe Leifer. (gq)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                                      PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Menashe Leifer in the Amount of $450,000. Cosigned by 4 FRP's (3 today, the other within 1 week). Posting of commercial building within 2 weeks. Surrender of travel documents. PSA. (gq)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                                                                                        Order of advice of penalties and sanctions as to Charles Bruno. (gq)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Bond
                                                                                                          PRB APPEARANCE BOND filed by Charles Bruno in the Amount of $250,000. Cosigned by 4 FRP's - 3 today and the other within one week. Posting of defts home within 2 weeks. Surrender travel documents. (gq)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Chaim Herman by Attorney Kenneth J. Kaplan (gq)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance for Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann by Attorney Avraham C. Moskowitz (gq)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance for Michael T. Kalanz by Attorney Stuart London (gq)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance for Harvey Weinig by Attorney James R. DeVita (gq)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Richard Spence by Attorney Charles E. Clayman (gq)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance for Charles Bruno by Attorney Ronald Fischetti (gq)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CJA 20 as to Jose E. Tanon : Appointment of Attorney Christine E. Yaris ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          CJA 20 as to Menashe Leifer : Appointment of Attorney Harvey Fishbein ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Michael T. Kalanz : Appointment of Attorney Marc Bogatin ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              CJA 20 as to Robert Janz : Appointment of Attorney Lisa Scolari ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                CJA 20 as to Alexander Schwartz : Appointment of Attorney James Roth ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Patricia Dilluvio : Appointment of Attorney Thomas D. White ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Order Appointing Public Defender
                                                                                                                                    ORDER Appointing Federal Public Defender for Sylvia Ezell (gq)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance for Sylvia Ezell by Attorney Andrew Schapiro (gq)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Jose E. Tanon : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Patricia Dilluvio : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Alexander Schwartz : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Robert Janz : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Daniel Carroll : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Sylvia Ezell : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Menashe Leifer : ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Patricia Dilluvio on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Sylvia Ezell on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Menashe Leifer on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Robert Janz on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Jose E. Tanon on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Daniel Carroll on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Alexander Schwartz on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Charles Bruno on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Gary Salerno on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Michael T. Kalanz on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Rachel Weinmann on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Leon Shulum Weinmann on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Chaim Herman on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Harvey Weinig on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Richard Spence on 11/30/94 (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    First Appearance as to Leon Shulum Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Leon Shulum Weinmann ; Detention Hearing set for 10:00 12/5/94 for Leon Shulum Weinmann ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq) Modified on 12/15/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      First Appearance as to Alexander Schwartz held. Deft appears with CJA atty James Roth. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing 12/2/94 at 11 a.m. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Alexander Schwartz ; Detention Hearing set for 11:00 12/2/94 for Alexander Schwartz ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        First Appearance as to Gary Salerno held. Deft appears with atty Nicholas C. DiPiazza. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $2.5 million PRB co-signed by 5 FRP. Secured by $750,00 cash or property. Electronic bracelet. Gov't moves on danger & flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Gary Salerno ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          First Appearance as to Patricia Dilluvio held. Deft appears with CJA atty Thomas White. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $250,000 PRB co-signed by 3 FRP. PSA. Surrender travel documents. Preliminary Examination set for 12/20/94 for Patricia Dilluvio ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            First Appearance as to Richard Spence held. Deft appears with atty Charles Clayman. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing 12/6/94 at 10:00 a.m. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Richard Spence ; Detention Hearing set for 10:00 12/6/94 for Richard Spence ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              First Appearance as to Chaim Herman held. Deft appears with atty Kenneth Kaplan. AUSA Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing 12/2/94, 11:00 a.m. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Chaim Herman ; Detention Hearing set for 11:00 12/2/94 for Chaim Herman ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                First Appearance as to Harvey Weinig held. Deft appears with atty James DeVita. AUSA Mark Goodman present. One million PRB secured by apt. on Riverside Drive within 2 weeks, co-signed by 3 FRP - 2 today - 3rd within 1 week. PSA. Surrender travel documents. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Harvey Weinig ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Appearance as to Charles Bruno held. Deft appears with atty Richard Fischetti. AUSA Mark Goodman present. $250,000 PRB co-signed by 4 FRP - (3 today. Other within 1 week). Posting of deft's home within 2 weeks. Surrender travel documents. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Charles Bruno ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Appearance as to Jose E. Tanon held. Deft appears with CJA atty Christine Yaris by Talia Bender. $250,000 PRB co-signed by 3 FRP within one week. PSA with drug testing & treatment & as directed by PSA. Surrender travel documents. Must live with mother. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Jose E. Tanon ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Appearance as to Menashe Leifer held. Deft appears with CJA atty Harvey Fishbein. AUSA Lev Dassin present. $450,000 PRB, 4 FRP-3 today-the other within 1 week. Posting of commercial building within 2 weeks. Surrender travel documents. PSA. (Mag. Judge Grubin). Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Menashe Leifer ; (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Appearance as to Daniel Carroll held. Deft appears with CJA atty Marc Bogatin. AUSA Lev Dassin present. $250,000 PRB. 5 FRP. Strict PSA. Surrender travel documents. Firearms surrender. Posting of family home. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Daniel Carroll ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Appearance as to Michael T. Kalanz held. Deft appears with atty Stuart London. AUSA Lev Dassin present. $250,000 PRB. Posting of home within 14 days. 3 FRP. PSA. Surrender travel documents. Surrender of firearms. Psychological counseling. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Michael T. Kalanz ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Appearance as to Sylvia Ezell held. Deft appears with L.A. atty Andrew Schapiro. AUSA Mark Goodman & Lev Dassin present. $250,000 PRB. 3 FRP - 1 today - other 2 within 1 week. Travel documents. PSA. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Sylvia Ezell ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Appearance as to Robert Janz held. Deft appears with CJA atty Lisa Scolari by Thalia Bender. $250,000 PRB, $100,000 cash/property within 2 weeks. 3 FRP - 1 today, other 2 within 1 week. Surrender travel documents. PSA. Preliminary Examination set for 12/30/94 for Robert Janz ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Appearance as to Rachel Weinmann held. Deft appears with atty Avraham Moskowitz. AUSA Lev Dassin & Mark Goodman present. Remanded pending detention hearing. Gov't moves on flight. Preliminary Examination set for 12/14/94 for Rachel Weinmann ; Detention Hearing set for 10:00 12/5/94 for Rachel Weinmann ; (Mag. Judge Grubin). (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST of Jose E. Tanon (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST of Menashe Leifer (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST of Daniel Carroll (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST of Michael T. Kalanz (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST of Sylvia Ezell (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST of Robert Janz (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST of Rachel Weinmann (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST of Leon Shulum Weinmann (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST of Alexander Schwartz (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST of Gary Salerno (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST of Patricia Dilluvio (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST of Richard Spence (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST of Chaim Herman (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST of Harvey Weinig (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST of Charles Bruno (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Patricia Dilluvio (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued as to Sylvia Ezell (gq) Modified on 12/14/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Menashe Leifer (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Robert Janz. (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT issued as to Latchezar Christov (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to Donald J. Hayden (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to Jose E. Tanon (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to Daniel Carroll. (gq) Modified on 12/14/1994
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Alexander Schwartz (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued as to Charles Bruno (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Gary Salerno (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Michael T. Kalanz (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT issued as to Carlos Lopez (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to Juliana LNU (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to Amparo Hurtado Valencia (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued as to Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT issued as to Rachel Weinmann (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued as to Leon Shulum Weinmann (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST WARRANT issued as to Juan Guillermo Ocampo (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued as to Peter Tohmes (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST WARRANT issued as to Chaim Herman (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT issued as to Harvey Weinig (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to Richard Spence (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/29/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT as to Richard Spence, Harvey Weinig, Chaim Herman, Peter Tohmes, Juan Guillermo Ocampo, Leon Shulum Weinmann, Rachel Weinmann, Miguel Omar Garrabito Botero, Amparo Hurtado Valencia, Juliana LNU, Carlos Lopez, Michael T. Kalanz, Gary Salerno, Charles Bruno, Alexander Schwartz, Daniel L Carroll, Jose E. Tanon, Donald J. Hayden, Latchezar Christov, Robert Janz, Menashe Leifer, Sylvia Ezell, Patricia Dilluvio in violation of 18 U.S.C. 1956, 1001, 1343 and 1503. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon Grubin ) (gq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 294 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?