Halberstam v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00807

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 11:54 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arie Halberstam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 2310 Realty LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maxim Maximov +1 718 395 3459 +1 718 408 9570 m@maximovlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Igor B Litvak +1 646 796 4905 +1 718 228 8140 igorblitvak@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Brady Johnson +1 212 376 6433 +1 212 376 6490 mbjohnson@mdwcg.com
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 10/14/2015 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), a Telephone Conference is set for 12/8/2015 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Defendants' counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. The Parties remain unable to settle because they cannot come to an agreement as to the proper 1099(s) by which to handle the settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/14/2015. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?