Manor Care-Belden Village of Canton OH, LLC v. Nick H. Johnson, P.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-00310

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:44 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Manor Care-Belden Village of Canton OH, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ANSPACH MEEKS ELLENBERGER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph S. Center +1 419 246 5757 +1 419 321 6979

Toggle Switch Represented by Anspach Meeks Ellenberger - Toledo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Anspach +1 419 246 5757 +1 419 321 6979 ranspach@anspachlaw.com
Space J. Randall Engwert +1 419 246 5757 +1 419 321 6979 rengwert@anspachlaw.com
v.
No Logo Nick H. Johnson, P.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mannion & Gray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle L. Gorman +1 304 224 2006 +1 304 224 2263 mgorman@manniongray.com
Space Thomas P. Mannion +1 304 513 4242 +1 304 513 4243 tmannion@manniongray.com
Space Judd R. Uhl +1 513 665 3500 +1 513 665 3503 juhl@manniongray.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order and Decision granting Plaintiff's motion to remand to state (Doc. # 3 ) court. Judge John R. Adams on 3/10/15. (K,C)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None order on motion for temporary restraining order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
          Temporary Restraining Order Stark County, Ohio, February 6, 2015 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) 1 , 4 .(Engwert, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 22 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?