The City of Rutland, Vermont v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Vermont District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00035

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2021 at 6:24 PM EDT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo City of Rutland, Vermont, The, Plaintiff

Represented by Kenlan, Schwiebert, Facey & Goss, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Cooper +1 802 773 3300
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Z Cooper +1 802 773 3300 +1 802 775 1581 hcooper@kenlanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Curt Spaulding, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Nikolas.Kerest@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gina McCarthy, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Nikolas.Kerest@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Nikolas.Kerest@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 Nikolas.Kerest@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael J. Messier, Amicus
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Substitution
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Status report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Document(s)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Document(s)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Intervene
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion to Stay. This matter is now scheduled for a telephonic status conference on Monday, February 22, 2016 at 1:00 p.m.Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/23/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  THIRD STIPULATED MOTION to Stay filed by City of Rutland, Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1.(Carlisle, Benjamin) Filer added on 10/21/2015 (jlh).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay; granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/18/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      SECOND STIPULATED MOTION to Stay or, SECOND STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1.(Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Michael J. Messier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (pac)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: 4/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA on behalf of Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kerest, Nikolas)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 5 Stipulated Motion to Stay and Stipulated Motionfor Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/21/2015. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                              STIPULATED MOTION to Stay and STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1.(Carlisle, Benjamin). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 4/20/2015 (law).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Carlisle on behalf of Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1.(Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 2 Affidavit of Service filed by The City of Rutland, Vermont. The document image for the Affidavit contained that of the return receipts. The images have been broken apart and placed on the docket. The corrected images are now attached to 2 and this entry. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipts) (law)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants on 3/4/2015 filed by The City of Rutland, Vermont. (Cooper, Heather) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/30/2015) (law). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2015: # 1 Return Receipts) (law). Date of service clarified on 3/30/2015 (law).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Gina McCarthy, Curt Spaulding, United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States Environmental Protection Agency Region 1 filed by The City of Rutland, Vermont. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?