Pogorzelski, et al v. Brothers Gourmet, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:95-cv-08584
District Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 5:35 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alice Baren, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Baren, Plaintiff
No Logo David Pogorzelski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jameson Pucillo +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0302 mpucillo@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo Gary Exner, Plaintiff
No Logo Joe Garuckas, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Galella, Plaintiff
No Logo Neil Pepper, Plaintiff
No Logo Shayna Investments, Plaintiff
No Logo Sheldon Muchnick, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Balasiano, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Brothers' Gourmet Coffees, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Kelly Coates, Jr. +1 561 472 2121 +1 561 472 2122 hcoates@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Brodsky +1 212 969 3002
No Logo Dennis Boyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Edward Ferguson +1 312 494 4400 +1 312 494 4440 mark.ferguson@bartlit-beck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Don Breen, Defendant
No Logo Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank S Moseley +1 212 450 4000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Warganz, Jr. +1 212 450 4000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Wurtz +1 212 450 4548 + 212 450 5575

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Caldwell Smith +1 305 358 5171 +3587 358 358 7470 rcsmith@shb.com
No Logo Elias Aburdene, Defendant
No Logo J.h. Whitney & Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marty Leonard Steinberg +1 305 810 2500 +1 305 810 2460 msteinberg@bilzin.com
No Logo J. P. Bolduc, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Holland, Defendant
No Logo KEVIN LEARY, Defendant
No Logo Michael Carlin, Defendant
No Logo Peter M. Castleman, Defendant
No Logo Ray Newton, Defendant
No Logo Thomas V. Bonoma, Defendant
No Logo Whitney l990 Equity Fund, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Subordinated Debt Fund, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Eric Bauer, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Oliver Burt, III +1 561 835 9400 +8350 835 835 0322 cburt@bermanesq.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Hope Zoberman +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0302 wzoberman@bermandevalerio.com
No Logo Essie Frankel, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Tammy Neuman, Consol Plaintiff
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [128-1] motion for disbursement of funds, permit late filed claims, authorize final payment of fees and expenses to claims administrator and resolve disputed claim (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/29/97) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/1997)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: None
    MOTION by All Plaintiffs for disbursement of funds, permit late filed claims, authorize final payment of fees and expenses to claims administrator and resolve disputed claim (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: None
      NOTICE of filing affidavit of Michael Pucillo by All Plaintiffs (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting stipulation filed on 10/15/97 ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/16/97) CCAP (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/20/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/15/1997, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of settlement between Rashed Abdul Rahman and Al Rashed & Sons Company and Class Counsel (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: None
            STIPULATION In Re: the Time for Rashed Abdul Rahman, Al Rashed & Sons Company to file an appeal of the denial of its claim in this action is extended to 9/30/97 to permit the Company and class counsel an opportunity to resolve this disputed claim without incurring the ocsts associated with motion practice (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting in part [119-1] motion for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses.The plan of allocation submitted as part of the stipulation is hereby approved and shall govern the distribution of settlement proceeds in this action. Plaintiff's counsel are awarded a fee of 25% of the cash and stock portions in this cause as attorneys' fees. Lead counsel shall dispense the fees in accordance with each counsel's respective contribution to the prosecution of the case; Having review the declarations of counsel, the declaration of plaintiffs' counsel's expert and the record in the cause, the Court awards the sum of $240,147.84 as reimbursement of expenses in this cause. ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/24/97) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Filing the Declaration of Kathleen Strozza in support of Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by All Plaintiffs (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER dismissing this action (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 04/07/97) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minutes of Motion Hearing held before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 04/04/97 at 10:30 a.m.; Court Reporter Name: Rick Greenspan; Motion to approve settlement; Motion granted (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/11/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: None
                      Application, by All Plaintiffs for award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of filing affidavits of mailing and publication, by All Plaintiffs (Attached) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER denying as moot [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint,[85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/3/97) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of change of attorney's name by All Plaintiffs (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [32-1] motion to certify class action; Approving settlement (see order for further details) ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/27/97) CCAP (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION of settlement by All Plaintiffs, All Defendants (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: None
                                  SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS AND DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT by Shayna Investments, Michael Galella, Neil Pepper, Joe Garuckas, Sheldon Muchnick, Steven Balasiano, Alice Baren, Carl Baren, Gary Exner, David Pogorzelski, (Answer due 1/27/97 for Brothers Gourmet, for Dennis Boyer, for Michael Carlin, for Kevin Leary, for Thomas V. Bonoma, for J. P. Bolduc, for Peter M. Castleman, for Ray Newton, for Elias Aburdene, for Jerry Holland, for Don Breen, for J. H. Whitney & Co., for Whitney l990 Equity, for Whitney Debt Fund, for Donaldson, Lufkin ) amending [31-1] amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Hearing: set settlement conference to consider approving the class settlement for 8:30AM on 1/15/97 before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/1996)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of settlement, by All Plaintiffs, All Defendants (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/25/1996)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [109-1] joint motion to adjourn and continue oral argument Motion hearing before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp reset for 8:30AM 11/1/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, for [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), for [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended set, for [32-1] motion to certify class action (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/2/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/1996)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: None
                                          JOINT MOTION by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner, Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen to adjourn and continue oral argument (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/1996)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities and Response to Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/1996)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of supplemental authority, by All Defendants (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/1996)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/26/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [105-1] motion to adjourn and reschedule oral argument, Motion hearing before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp set for 8:30AM 10/4/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, for [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), for [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint(signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/26/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/27/1996)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner to adjourn and reschedule oral argument (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/1996)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [101-1] motion for reconsideration of [78-1] order stayding discovery in this action (Motion to lift the discovery stay) (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/14/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/17/1996)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Max Gitter, to appear pro hac vice (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/13/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/1996)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE by All Defendants in opposition to [101-1] motion for reconsideration of [78-1] order stayding discovery in this action (Motion to lift the discovery stay) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/1996)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by All Plaintiffs for reconsideration of [78-1] order stayding discovery in this action (Motion to lift the discovery stay) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/03/1996)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [99-1] motion to adjourn and reschedule oral argument on defendants' motion to dismiss presently scheduled for 5/16/96 , Motion hearing before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp set for 9:30 6/28/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, set for 9:30 6/28/96 for [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), set for 9:30 6/28/96 for [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 5/10/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/1996)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/8/1996, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by Brothers Gourmet to adjourn and reschedule oral argument on defendants' motion to dismiss presently scheduled for 5/16/96 (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/13/1996 (Entered: 05/09/1996)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Don Breen to response to [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/14/1996)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY by Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund to response to [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/1996)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY Memorandum of law in support,by Donaldson, Lufkin to response, to [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/07/1996)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [91-1] motion to increase amount of time for oral argument The hearing presently set for 5/16/96, will be scheduled for 2 hours, from 8:30 to 10:30 AM (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/30/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/1996)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [89-1] joint motion to reschedule oral argument, Motion hearing before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp set for 8:30 AM 5/16/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint, for [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b), for [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/29/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [87-1] motion to extend time to file reply memoranda in support of motion to dismiss, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/6/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/29/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [90-1] motion for enlargement of time to reply to plaintiff's opposition, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 5/3/96 for [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b) (Dismiss the consolidated amended complaint) ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/29/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION by All Defendants to increase amount of time for oral argument (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/1996)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION with memorandum in support by Donaldson, Lufkin for enlargement of time to reply to plaintiff's opposition (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by All Plaintiffs, All Defendants to reschedule oral argument (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/29/1996)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/25/1996 (Entered: 04/25/1996)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen, J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund to extend time to file reply memoranda in support of motion to dismiss (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/23/1996)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [85-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/1996)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Donaldson, Lufkin to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims pursuant to Feder. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 9(b) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/19/1996)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [80-1] motion for leave to file memorandum of law in excess of 20 pages ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/10/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/1996)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [79-1] motion to extend time for service of plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to defendant Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette's motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint and supporting memorandum of law, Response to motion reset to 4/16/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/16/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/24/1996)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [88-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/1996)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/9/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION by All Plaintiffs for leave to file memorandum of law in excess of 20 pages (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/18/1996)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner to extend time for service of plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to defendant Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette's motion to dismiss the cosolidated amended complaint and supporting memorandum of law (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/1996)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [49-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/29/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Clerk's receipt #704579 in the amount of $150.00 for Frank S. Mosely, William E. Wurtz & Joseph Warganz, Jr. by Donaldson, Lufkin (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [70-1] motion for Edward Brodsky to appear pro hac vice (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/29/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Clerk's receipt #704574 in the amount of $50.00 for Edward Brodsky by Brothers Gourmet, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [71-1] motion for Mark E. Ferguson to appear pro hac vice (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/29/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Clerk's receipt #704573 in the amount of $50.00 for Mark E. Ferguson by Dennis Boyer (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER setting motion hearing on [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint by defendants for 8:30 5/8/96 (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/28/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Dennis Boyer for Mark E. Ferguson to appear pro hac vice (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen for Edward Brodsky to appear pro hac vice (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of firm name (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [66-1] motion to extend time to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss, Response to motion reset to 4/12/96 for [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/25/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY by All Defendants [except Holland] to response to [49-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint, [47-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by All Plaintiffs to extend time to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [58-1] motion for oral argument on motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint setting motion hearing on [56-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint by defendants for 8:30 4/22/96 (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/19/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of joinder in request for oral argument on motion to dismiss by Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, J. H. Whitney Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/19/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [57-1] motion to extend time to file reply memorandum in support of motion to stay discovery (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/19/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/27/1996)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [57-1] motion to extend time to file reply memorandum in support of motion to stay discovery, Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/22/96 for [49-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint & [47-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/18/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [60-1] motion to exceed page length rule, granting [59-1] motion for special or limited appearance of Frank S. Moseley, William E. Wurtz & Joseph F. Warganz, Jr. The Attorneys are admitted upon payment of an admission fee of $50 each. (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/15/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Donaldson, Lufkin to exceed page length rule (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Donaldson, Lufkin for special or limited appearance of Frank S. Moseley, William E. Wurtz & Joseph F. Warganz, Jr. (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REQUEST by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen for oral argument on motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by All Defendants to extend time to file reply memorandum in support of motion to stay discovery (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen to dismiss consolidated amended complaint (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER referring case to mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/13/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE: set Jury trial for 9/15/97 before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp , set calendar call for 1:15 9/10/97 before Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp , set pretrial stipulation due for 9/3/97 (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadline for filing of all Pretrial Motions by 4/30/97, Pretrial Stipulation due on or before 9/15/97, Discovery cutoff 2/28/97 (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/13/96) CCAP (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/1996)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [48-1] motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of 20 pages ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/6/96) CCAP (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner to [47-1] motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing corrected motion for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Jerry Holland, Don Breen (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen for leave to file memorandum in excess of 20 pages (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, Elias Aburdene, Don Breen, J. H. Whitney & Co. for protective order staying discovery pending ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's consolidated amended complaint (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Scheduling Report of Scheduling Meeting by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner, Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen, J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund, Donaldson, Lufkin (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [41-1] motion to extend time to file scheduling report and proposed scheduling order ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/7/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/09/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [39-1] motion to extend time to respond to consolidated amended class action complaint ( signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/7/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/09/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of joinder in the unopposed motion for enlargment of time to respond to consoldated amended class action complaint filed 2/2/96, by J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of joinder, by Donaldson, Lufkin (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Elias Aburdene, Don Breen, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary to extend time to file scheduling report and proposed scheduling order (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Kevin Leary on 12/26/95 Answer due on 1/15/96 for Kevin Leary (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland, Don Breen, J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund, Donaldson, Lufkin to extend time to respond to consolidated amended class action complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of joinder in the motion for enlargment of time to respond to motion for class certication and for postponement of determination regarding class certification filed with this Court on 1/22/96, by J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [36-1] motion to extend time to respond to motion for class certification and for postponement of determination regarding class certification Defendants shall file any opposition to class certification within 30 days after the conclusion of discovery directed towards class certification(signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/30/96) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Brothers Gourmet, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Don Breen to extend time to respond to motion for class certification and for postponement of determination regarding class certification (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of attorney appearance for Brothers Gourmet, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, Thomas V. Bonoma, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Don Breen by Howard Kelly Coates Jr (kw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to the Court and all parties regarding service list, by J. H. Whitney & Co. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [32-1] motion to certify class action (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by All Plaintiffs to certify class action (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner, Eric Bauer, Tammy Neuman, Essie Frankel, (Answer due 1/13/96 for Donaldson, Lufkin, for Whitney Debt Fund, for Whitney l990 Equity, for J. H. Whitney & Co., for Don Breen, for Jerry Holland, for Elias Aburdene, for Ray Newton, for Peter M. Castleman, for J. P. Bolduc, for Thomas V. Bonoma, for Kevin Leary, for Michael Carlin, for Dennis Boyer, for Brothers Gourmet) amending [1-1] complaint adding Carl Baren, Baren, Steven Balasiano, Sheldon Muchnick, Joe Garuckas, Neil Pepper, Michael Galella, Shayna Investments (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/28/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [29-1] motion to extend time to file a consolidated amended complaint Plaintiffs shall have until, through and including 1/3/96, to file and serve the consolidated amended complaint in this cause (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/28/95) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/29/1995 (Entered: 12/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner to extend time to file a consolidated amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/29/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Elias Aburdene on 12/5/95 Answer due on 12/26/95 for Elias Aburdene (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Kevin Leary (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Kevin Leary on 12/1/95 Answer due on 12/21/95 for Kevin Leary (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed for J. P. Bolduc on 12/1/95 Answer due on 12/21/95 for J. P. Bolduc (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Brothers Gourmet on 12/6/95 Answer due on 12/26/95 for Michael Carlin (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Dennis Boyer on 12/7/95 Answer due on 12/27/95 for Dennis Boyer (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner Mailed on: 10/27/95 30 days to file waiver. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/07/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that 95-8608-CV-Ryskamp & 95-8617-CV-Ryskamp are consolidated & transferred into case #95-8584-CV-Ryskamp for all purposes, including pretrial proceedings, discovery and trial. The caption of these consolidated actions shall be "In Re: Brothers Gourmet Coffees, Inc. Securities Litigation". Any other actions now pending or hereafter filed in this Court or transferred to this Court which arise out of the facts as alleged in the above-identified cases, will be consolidated with this Consolidated Action for pretrial purposes if, as and when they are drawn to the Court's attention. This Court's order of pre-trial procedures entered on l0/4/95 in case #95-8584-CV-Ryskamp, requiring a scheduling meeting within 20 days of the filing of the complaint shall apply to the consolidated action & any subsequently filed action. Co-Lead Counsel are responsible for the filing of a joint proposed scheduling order as set forth in this Courts pre-trial proposed scheduling order of 10/4/95. A master file & a master docket sheet are hereby established under case #95-8584-CV-Ryskamp. No further pleadings will be accepted or filed in case #95-8608-CV-Ryskamp & 95-86l7-CV-Ryskamp. The Clerk is hereby ordered to administratively close these cases & to reject any further pleadings in these actions. Plaintiffs in this consolidated action shall file & serve a single consolidated amended complaint within 30 days of entry of this order. The defendants shall have 30 days from the service of the consolidated amended complaint to file a response. (Signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/28/95) CCAP/M/12/7/95 (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/26/1996 (Entered: 12/06/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for Dennis Boyer, Michael Carlin, Kevin Leary, J. P. Bolduc, Elias Aburdene, Jerry Holland (sg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [9-1] motion to extend time within which they may respond to plaintiff's complaint Plaintiffs motion to consolidate, filed ll/17/95, has been granted and addresses response scheduled under II Order of pretrial procedures (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/28/95) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/01/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Martin Leonard Steinberg to appear pro hac vice (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/28/95) CCAP (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/01/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Waiver of service executed by Donaldson, Lufkin (Attorney Michael J. Pucillo), 10/27/95 Answer due by 12/26/95 for Donaldson, Lufkin (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/01/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund for Martin Leonard Steinberg to appear pro hac vice (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund for Max Gitter, to appear pro hac vice (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Ray Newton on 10/27/95 Answer due on 11/16/95 for Ray Newton (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Peter M. Castleman on 10/27/95 Answer due on 11/16/95 for Peter M. Castleman (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Whitney Debt Fund on 10/27/95 Answer due on 11/16/95 for Whitney Debt Fund (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Whitney l990 Equity on 10/27/95 Answer due on 11/16/95 for Whitney l990 Equity (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed for J. H. Whitney & Co. on 10/27/95 Answer due on 11/16/95 for J. H. Whitney & Co. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Brothers Gourmet to extend time within which they may respond to plaintiff's complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action. by David Pogorzelski, Gary Exner (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Thomas V. Bonoma on 10/20/95 Answer due on 11/9/95 for Thomas V. Bonoma (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of service unexecuted as to Donaldson, Lufkin (sg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Brothers Gourmet on 10/17/95 Answer due on 11/6/95 for Brothers Gourmet (sg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Don Breen on 10/17/95 Answer due on 11/6/95 for Don Breen (sg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/27/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Brothers Gourmet, Thomas V. Bonoma, Peter M. Castleman, Ray Newton, Don Breen, J. H. Whitney & Co., Whitney l990 Equity, Whitney Debt Fund, Donaldson, Lufkin (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER filed (signed by Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 10/4/95) CCAP (sg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Class Action COMPLAINT for violation of the Federal Securites Laws filed; FILING FEE $120.00 RECEIPT #703838; FJL, A-7 (Former Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/02/1995 (Entered: 10/02/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?