North American Health Care, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case California Central Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:15-bk-10610
District Judge Mark S Wallace, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2017 at 12:33 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo North American Health Care, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Krikor J Meshefejian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Krikor J Meshefejian +1 310 229 1234 +1 310 229 1244

Toggle Switch Represented by Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Lawrence Neale +1 310 229 1234 +1 310 229 1244 dln@lnbyb.com
32836 Pacific Coast Highway
Suite 203
Dana Point, CA 92629
ORANGE-CA
Tax ID / EIN: 88-0250963 David Lawrence Neale +1 310 229 1234 +1 310 229 1244 dln@lnbyb.com
No Logo United States Trustee (SA), U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Elizabeth A Lossing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A Lossing +1 714 338 3409 +1 714 338 3421

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nancy S Goldenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593
(714) 338-3400 Nancy S Goldenberg +1 714 338 3416 +1 714 338 3421

Toggle Switch Represented by Maclean, Neil A., Company, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593
(714) 338-3400 Frank Cadigan +1 714 338 3405 +1 714 338 3421
  Entries (175) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)137 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM - RE: Case Name: Raymond K. Perce v. Carmichael Care, Inc.; Docket No. 2:15-cv-00398-GEM-KJN; Pending In: U.S. District Court, Eastern District Of California, Sacramento Division - filed by Creditor Raymond K. Pierce, By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Robert C. Shaw) - HEARING CONTINUED TO: 11/23/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 PER ORDER ENTERED 8/27/15 - [DOCKET NO. 355]. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Hearing Continued (RE: related document 264 Debtor's Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc) - HEARING CONTINUED TO: 11/23/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 PER ORDER ENTERED 8/26/15 - [DOCKET NO. 354]. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Professional Fee Statement #6 for the month of August Filed by Other Professional Constance R. Doyle . (Gonsales, Otoniel) Modified on 10/5/2015 (Gonsales, Otoniel). (Entered: 09/02/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 6. For the Month Ending July 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)332 Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Stipulations Extending Deadline For Debtors To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - MOTION GRANTED. (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order Approving Stipulations Extending Deadline For Debtors To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases From September 4, 2015 Through And Including January 15, 2016 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 332 ) Signed on 8/31/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)356 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/29/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/29/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)355 Motion for relief from automatic stay ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/29/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/29/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)354 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/28/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)326 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM - RE: Case Name: Essie Chandler, et al. v. Carmichael Care, Inc., et al.; Docket Number: 43-2013-00144410; Pending In: Superior Court Of California, Sacramento County - filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman) - HEARING CONTINUED TO: 11/23/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Order Granting Stipulation Between North American Health Care, Inc., Carmichael Care, Inc. And Chandler Plaintiffs To Continue Hearing On Motion For Relief From Stay To November 23, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 350 ) Signed on 8/27/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Sua Sponte Order Continuing Hearing On Raymond K. Pierce's Motion For Relief From Stay From August 31, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. To November 23, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 137 ) Signed on 8/27/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtors And Ad Hoc Group Of Personal Injury Tort Claimants Regarding Briefing And Evidentiary Hearing Schedule On Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal. IT IS ORDERED: The Court's Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing And Continuing Status Conference ( Doc 328) (the "Order") is modified as set forth herein. The evidentiary hearing regarding the Debtors' tort claim resolution proposal shall be and hereby is continued to November 23, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (the "Continued Hearing"). The deadline for any party to submit additional pleadings regarding the Debtors' tort claim resolution proposal shall be and hereby is seven (7) days prior to the Continued Hearing. All other terms of the Order shall remain unchanged and effective. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 352 ) Signed on 8/26/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)351 Motion for relief from automatic stay ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/22/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Stipulation By North American Health Care, Inc. and Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants Regarding Briefing and Evidentiary Hearing Schedule on Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order Continuing Hearing On Motion For Relief From Stay to August 31, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 137 ) Signed on 8/20/2015 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Stipulation By North American Health Care, Inc. and Carmichael Care, Inc. And Chandler Plaintiffs To Postpone Hearing On Motion For Relief From Stay Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Response to (related document(s): 326 Notice of motion and motion for relief from automatic stay with supporting declarations ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM RE: Relief from Stay to Prosecute Personal Injury Tort, Wrongful Death and Related State Law Causes of Action in the Sacramento C filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman) Chandler Plaintiffs Responses to Debtors' Evidentiary Objections to: Declaration of Lesley Ann Clement (Docket No. 326-1) Filed by Creditors Essie Chandler, Kenneth Chandler, Brenda Luker Gilman (Gorton, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Objection (related document(s): 346 Declaration filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) Evidentiary Objections of Chandler Plaintiffs to Declaration of Thomas E. Beach in Support of Debtors' Opposition to Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditors Essie Chandler, Kenneth Chandler, Brenda Luker Gilman (Gorton, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Reply to (related document(s): 345 Objection filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) Reply of Chandler Plaintiffs to Debtors' Opposition to Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditors Essie Chandler, Kenneth Chandler, Brenda Luker Gilman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to REPLY of Chandler Plaintiffs to Debtors opposition to MFRS # 2 Exhibit 7 to REPLY of Chandler Plaintiffs to Debtors opposition to MFRS # 3 Exhibit 8 to REPLY of Chandler Plaintiffs to Debtors opposition to MFRS # 4 Proof of Service re REPLY of Chandler Plaintiffs to Debtors opposition to MFRS) (Gorton, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Declaration re: - Declaration Of Thomas E. Beach In Support Of Debtors' Opposition To Raymond K. Pierce's Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 362 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)344 Opposition). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Objection (related document(s): 326 Notice of motion and motion for relief from automatic stay with supporting declarations ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM RE: Relief from Stay to Prosecute Personal Injury Tort, Wrongful Death and Related State Law Causes of Action in the Sacramento C filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman) / Evidentiary Objections To: Declaration Of Lesley Ann Clement (Docket No. 326-1) Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Opposition to (related document(s): 326 Notice of motion and motion for relief from automatic stay with supporting declarations ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM RE: Relief from Stay to Prosecute Personal Injury Tort, Wrongful Death and Related State Law Causes of Action in the Sacramento C filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman, 327 Errata filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman) / Debtors' Opposition To Raymond K. Pierce's Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 362 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Request for Removal from Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Jorgensen, Jeanne. (Jorgensen, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/08/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)339 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/07/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of motion/application - Notice of Application of Carmichael Care, Inc. to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as Special Counsel Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)340 Application to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as Special Counsel Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date; Declaration of Rachel P. Zuraw, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Application to Employ Hanson Bridgett LLP as Special Counsel Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date; Declaration of Rachel P. Zuraw, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Order Granting First Interim Applications Of Professionals For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses For: (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 297) for Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, Fees Awarded: $291,337.50, Expenses Awarded: $32,134.39, Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 298) for Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright, a Professional Corporation, Fees Awarded: $4,497.50, Expenses Awarded: $505.60, Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 299) for Beach Cowdry Owen LLP, fees Awarded: $255,114.00, Expenses Awarded: $10,652.39 Signed on 8/5/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)299 Application for Compensation filed by Special Counsel Beach Cowdry Owen LLP) - GRANTED. BEACH COWDRY OWEN LLP, LITIGATION COUNSEL TO DEBTORS AND DEBTORS-IN-POSSESION, FEES ALLOWED: $255,114.00, EXPENSES: $10,652.39. (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)298 First Interim Application for Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from February 6, 2015 through June 30, 2015 filed by Special Counsel Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation) - GRANTED. ALBRIGHT, STODDARD, WARNICK & ALBRIGHT, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, SPECIAL COUNSEL FOR DEBTORS AND DEBTORS-IN-POSSESSION: FEES ALLOWED: $4,497.50, EXPENSES: $505.60. (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)297 First Interim Application Of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P.. Attorney for Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession, For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses For The Period From February 6, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 filed by Attorney Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP) - GRANT. (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)137 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM - RE: Case Name: Raymond K. Perce v. Carmichael Care, Inc.; Docket No. 2:15-cv-00398-GEM-KJN; Pending In: U.S. District Court, Eastern District Of California, Sacramento Division - filed by Creditor Raymond K. Pierce, By And Through His Guardian Ad Litem, Robert C. Shaw) - HEARING CONTINUED TO: 8/31/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)332 Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Stipulations Extending Deadline For Debtors To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 8/24/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice of lodgment Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)297 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. For Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. for Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, Debtor's, 298 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of William H. Stoddard, Esq. for Albright Stoddard, 299 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of Thomas E. Beach, Esq. for Beach Cowdry Owen LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 3/1/2015 to 6/30). (Neale, David) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Motion / Debtors' Notice Of Motion And Motion For Entry Of Order Approving Stipulations Extending Deadline For Debtors To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Leases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 07/22/15 RE: Cont'd status conference hearing re status of chapter 11 case. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/2/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/10/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/2/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/2/2015. (Bauer, Tara) (Entered: 08/02/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)328 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/01/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/01/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)326 Motion for Relief from Stay - ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM - RE: Case Name: Essie Chandler, et al. v. Carmichael Care, Inc., et al.; Docket Number: 43-2013-00144410; Pending In: Superior Court Of California, Sacramento County - filed by Creditor Essie Chandler, Creditor Kenneth Chandler, Creditor Brenda Luker Gilman) The Hearing date is set for 8/24/2015 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing And Continuing Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Evidentiary Hearing shall be held on August 31, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. Each party may call such witnesses as it deems appropriate. Only live testimony by witnesses subject to cross examination will be received. The rule for exclusion of witnesses may be invoked. Declarations will not be received or accepted. Written discovery is all due August 12, 2015. Any party may file additional pleadings on or before August 24, 2015. The Court will set the next Status Conference for October 21, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 1 ) Signed on 7/30/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Errata Notice of Errata to Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Chandler Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Stay; Reservation of Rights; Demand for Jury Trial; Supplemental Declaration of Lesley Ann Clement; and Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Creditors Essie Chandler, Kenneth Chandler, Brenda Luker Gilman (RE: related document(s)326 Notice of motion and motion for relief from automatic stay with supporting declarations ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM RE: Relief from Stay to Prosecute Personal Injury Tort, Wrongful Death and Related State Law Causes of Action in the Sacramento C). (Gorton, Mark) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Notice of motion and motion for relief from automatic stay with supporting declarations ACTION IN NON-BANKRUPTCY FORUM RE: Relief from Stay to Prosecute Personal Injury Tort, Wrongful Death and Related State Law Causes of Action in the Sacramento County Superior Court. Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditors Essie Chandler, Kenneth Chandler, Brenda Luker Gilman (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities iso Chandler Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Stay; Reservation of Rights; Demand for Jury Trial; Supplemental Declaration of Lesley Ann Clement; and Request for Judicial Notice # 2 Exhibit 1-6 to Memorandum of Points and Authorities iso Chandler Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Stay; Reservation of Rights; Demand for Jury Trial; Supplemental Declaration of Lesley Ann Clement; and Request for Judicial Notice (with Proof of Service)) (Gorton, Mark) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)321 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/29/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)320 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/29/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)1 CONT'D STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing RE: (1) Status Of Chapter 11 Case; And (2) Requiring Report On Status Of Chapter 11 Case filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) NEXT STATUS CONFERENCE 10/21/2015 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. EVIDENTIARY HEARING: 8-31-15 AT 2:00 PM - HEARING ON DEBTOR'S MOTION RE TORT CLAIM RESOLUTION PROPOSAL. ADDITIONAL PLEADINGS IF ANY DUE 8-24-15. WRITTEN DISCOVERY DUE 8-12-15. (Le, James) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Hearing Set (RE: related document 264 Debtor's Tort Claim Resolution Proposal) - The Hearing date is set for 8/31/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Order Granting Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth P.C. As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327 And 330 Effective As Of June 1, 2015 - (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 282) Signed on 7/27/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Order Granting Application Of Carmichael Care, Inc. To Employ Kennaday Leavitt & Daponde PC As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327 And 330 Effective As Of May 1, 2015 - (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 262) Signed on 7/27/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-14. RE Hearing Date: 07/22/15, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Telephone number 858-453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)318 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 07/22/15 Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Declaration re: non opposition / Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian Re Neither Opposition To Nor Request For Hearing On Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)282 Application to Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Jason De Bretteville, Esq. in Support Thereof). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Declaration re: non opposition / Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian Re Neither Opposition To Nor Request For Hearing On Application Of Carmichael Care, Inc. To Employ Kennaday, Leavitt & Daponde PC As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)262 Application to Employ Kennaday, Leavitt & Daponde PC as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Kelli M. Kennaday, Esq. in Support Thereof). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 5. For the Month Ending June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 5. For the Month Ending June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Statement // Response of the Ad Hoc Group to the Debtors' July 15, 2015 Status Report (with proof of service) (RE: related document 301 Debtors' Status Report Dated July 15, 2015) Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Pfister, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)299 First Interim Application Of Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP, Litigation Counsel For Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession, For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses For The Period From March 1, 2015 Through June 30, 2015for Compensation - Fees: $255,114.00; Expenses: $10,652.39 - filed by Special Counsel Beach Cowdry Owen LLP) The Hearing date is set for 8/3/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)298 First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation, Special Counsel To Debtors and Debtors-In-Possesion, For The Period From February 6, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 - Fees: $4,497.50; Expenses: $505.60 - filed by Special Counsel Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation) The Hearing date is set for 8/3/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)297 First Interim Application Of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P.. Attorney for Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession, For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expesnes For The Period From February 6, 2015 Through June 30, 2015 - Fees: $291,337.50 and $32,134.39 - filed by Attorney Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP) The Hearing date is set for 8/3/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Request to be Removed from Service List and Release; Filed by Creditor Patricia Tweedy (unable to locate party with this address) (Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Declaration re: / Declaration of John L. Sorensen in Support of First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)298 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of William H. Stoddard, Esq. for Albright Stoddard). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Declaration re: / Declaration of John L. Sorenson in Support of First Interim Application of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. For Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)297 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. For Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. for Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, Debtor's). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/11/15 RE: Hearing re motion to extend the debtors' exclusivity periods for the debtors to file a plan of reorganization. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/14/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/23/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/17/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/14/2015. (Bauer, Tara) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/04/15 RE: Final hearing re debtor's emergency motion for an interim order authorizing the debtors to use cash collateral on an interim basis pending a final hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/14/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/23/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/17/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/14/2015. (Bauer, Tara) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/13/15 RE: Cont'd motion for relief from stay. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/14/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/23/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/17/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/14/2015. (Bauer, Tara) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/06/15 RE: Motion for an order establishing bar date for filing proofs of claim. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/14/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/23/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/17/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/14/2015. (Bauer, Tara) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Professional Fee Statement Number: 4, Month of June Filed by Other Professional Constance R. Doyle . (Le, James) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Status report / Debtors' Status Report Dated July 15, 2015; Declaration of Wylie Strout in Support Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing on First Interim Applications of Professionals for Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)297 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. For Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. for Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/6/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $291,337.50, Expenses: $32,134.39. Filed by Attorney Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, 298 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of William H. Stoddard, Esq. for Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation, Special Counsel, Period: 2/6/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $4,497.50, Expenses: $505.60. Filed by Special Counsel Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation, 299 Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of Thomas E. Beach, Esq. for Beach Cowdry Owen LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 3/1/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $255,114.00, Expenses: $10,652.39. Filed by Special Counsel Beach Cowdry Owen LLP). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of Thomas E. Beach, Esq. for Beach Cowdry Owen LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 3/1/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $255,114.00, Expenses: $10,652.39. Filed by Special Counsel Beach Cowdry Owen LLP (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation / First Interim Application Of Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright, A Professional Corporation For Approval Of Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses; Declaration Of William H. Stoddard, Esq. for Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation, Special Counsel, Period: 2/6/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $4,497.50, Expenses: $505.60. Filed by Special Counsel Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright a Professional Corporation (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation / First Interim Application of Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. For Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. for Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/6/2015 to 6/30/2015, Fee: $291,337.50, Expenses: $32,134.39. Filed by Attorney Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo, Brill LLP (Neale, David) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-13. RE Hearing Date: 5/11/15, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, INC., Telephone number Ph: (858) 453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)291 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-12. RE Hearing Date: 5/4/15 2:00 PM MATTERS, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, INC., Telephone number Ph: (858) 453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)289 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-11. RE Hearing Date: 5/4/15 9:00 AM MATTERS, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, INC., Telephone number Ph: (858) 453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)290 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-10. RE Hearing Date: 4/13/15, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, INC., Telephone number Ph: (858) 453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)288 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 15-MW-09. RE Hearing Date: 4/6/15, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: ECHO REPORTING, INC., Telephone number Ph: (858) 453-7590.] (RE: related document(s)287 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) (Le, James) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 5/11/15 Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 05/04/15 9:00 AM MATTERS Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) Modified on 7/10/2015 (Le, James). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 05/04/15 2:00 PM MATTERS Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) Modified on 7/10/2015 (Le, James). (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 04/13/15 Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Transcript Order Form, regarding Hearing Date 04/06/2015 Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Zwicker, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Mandate on appeals re: Order Of Dismissal - Re: Appeal BAP Number: CC-15-1097, Ruling: DISMISSAL, (filed at United States Bankruptcy Appellate Panel 5/22/15) (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion / Debtors' Motion For An Order Approving Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to (related document(s): 278 Statement filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants) / Debtors' Response to Statement of the Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants Regarding the Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of motion/application - Notice of Application of North American Health Care, Inc. to Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)282 Application to Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Jason De Bretteville, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C. as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Jason De Bretteville, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Professional Fee Statement #4 for the month of June Filed by Other Professional Constance R. Doyle . (Gonsales, Otoniel) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)279 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/01/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. And Carmichasel Care, Inc. To Employ Beach Cowdry Owen LLP As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327 And 330 Effective As Of March 1, 2015 - (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 230) Signed on 6/29/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of the Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants Regarding the Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal and Reservation of Rights with Respect to Same; Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Support Thereof Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Pfister, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement / Verified Statement of the Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Creditor Ad Hoc Group of Personal Injury Tort Claimants. (Pfister, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for special notice and Inclusion in Mailing List, and Reservation of Rights; Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Creditors Brenda Luker Gilman, Kenneth Chandler, Essie Chandler. (Mouzes, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)272 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/24/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re: non opposition / Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian Re Neither Opposition To Nor Request For Hearing On Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. And Carmichael Care, Inc. To Employ Beach Cowdry Owen LLP As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)230 Application to Employ Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Thomas E. Beach, Esq. in Support Thereof). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental / Supplement In Support Of Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. And Carmichael Care, Inc. To Employ Beach Cowdrey Owen, LLP As Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle, LLP As Special Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(e) And 330 Effective As Of February 6, 2015 - (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 247) Signed on 6/22/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing / Notice to Professionals of Hearing on Interim Applications for Approval of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration re: non opposition / Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian Re Neither Opposition To Nor Request For Hearing On Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle, LLP As Special Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)247 Application to Employ Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle, LLP as Special Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) and 330; Declaration of Lawrence S. Giardina, Esq. in Support Thereof). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 4. For the Month Ending May 31, 2015 for Carmichael Care Inc. Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 4. For the Month Ending May 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental / Supplement To Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Schuering Zimmerman & Doyle, LLP As Special Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(e) And 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re: - Declaration of John L. Sorenson in Support of Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)264 Statement). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration re: - Declaration of Wylie Strout in Support of Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)264 Statement). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 264 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement / Debtors' Tort Claim Resolution Proposal Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of motion/application - Notice of Application of Carmichael Care, Inc. To Employ Kennaday, Leavitt & Daponde PC as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)262 Application to Employ Kennaday, Leavitt & Daponde PC as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Kelli M. Kennaday, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ Kennaday, Leavitt & Daponde PC as Litigation Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of Kelli M. Kennaday, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Interim Report of Patient Care Ombudsman for the period of 04/01/15 through 05/31/15 Filed by Other Professional Constance R. Doyle . (Le, James) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Professional Fee Statement #3 Month of May Filed by Other Professional Constance R. Doyle . (Le, James) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)257 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/03/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof of service (Supplemental) Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)182 Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11) (LBR 3001-1)). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application Of North American Health Care, Inc. To Employ Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp LLP As Special Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(e) And 328 Effective As Of February 6, 2015, The Date Of The Debtors' Chapter 11 Filings (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 183) Signed on 6/1/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Pino, Estela. (Pino, Estela) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)250 Order on Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)249 Order on Motion to Extend Time (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 3. For the Month Ending April 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 3. For the Month Ending April 30, 2015 for Carmichael Care Inc. Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)244 Order on Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Approving Stipulation Between North American Health Care, Inc. And Talbrook Executive Suites, Inc. And Extending Deadline For North American Health Care, Inc. To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease From June 6, 2015, Through And Including September 4, 2015, Without Prejudice To The NAHC's Right To Seek Further Extensions Of Such Period, And Without Any Determination That The Lease Constitutes A Nonresidential Real Property Lease Under 11 U.S.C. Section 365(d)(4). (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 241 ) Signed on 5/14/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order For Status Conference . Hearing Set For: April 22, 2015 at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 6C, 411 W. Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 2/20/2015 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) ENTERED IN ERROR. BELONGS IN ADV. CASE NO. 8:15-01095. Modified on 2/20/2015 (Steinberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Order Approving the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (Cadigan, Frank)ENTERED IN ERROR PER UST. Modified on 2/20/2015 (Steinberg, Elizabeth). (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Cadigan, Frank) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Approving Stipulation Directing The Appointment Of A Patient Care Ombudsman In Carmichael Care, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the U.S. Trustee shall appoint a Patient Care Ombudsman in the above captioned case - (Related Doc # 40 ) Signed on 2/19/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits - (Related Doc # 12 ) Signed on 2/19/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing The Debtor To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing. IT IS ORDERED: A final hearing on the use of cash collateral shall be held on May 4, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 - SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING - (Related Doc # 11 ) Signed on 2/19/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary case 8:15-ap-01095. Notice of Removal by ANTONIO RAMIREZ, by and through his Successor in Interest, Abel Ramirez, JESUSTIA DIAZ RAMIREZ, ABEL RAMIREZ, ROSA RIVERA, RAMIRO RAMIREZ, ALFREDO RAMIREZ, BERTIA LOPEZ, RAFAEL RAMIREZ, ANTONIO RAMIREZ, RICARDO RAMIREZ. (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet # 2 Notice of Status Conference re Removal of Action) Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code (Related Doc # 13 ) Signed on 2/19/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System, (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Administrative Holds And/Or Freezes On The Debtors' Pre-Petition Accounts (Related Doc # 14 ) Signed on 2/19/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Set On Order: (1) Setting Hearing On Status Of Chapter 11 Case; And (2) Requiring Report On Status Of Chapter 11 Case. (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) Status Conference hearing to be held on 4/8/2015 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order: (1) Setting Hearing On Status Of Chapter 11 Case; And (2) Requiring Report On Status Of Chapter 11 Case. The Status Conference hearing is set for April 8, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6C, located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (Related Doc # 1 ) Signed on 2/18/2015 (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)28 Debtors' Ex parte Motion For An Order Extending Time For Debtors To File Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities, Statements Of Financial Affairs, And All Other Required Documents - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - GRANT; DEADLINE FOR FILING SCHEDULES, STATEMENTS AND ALL OTHER REQUIRED DOCUMENTS IS EXTENDED FROM 2/13/2015 TO 3/9/2015 - (cr:dani) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)14 Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System, (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Administrative Holds And/Or Freezes On The Debtors' Pre-Petition Accounts - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - GRANT WITH 30 DAY RULE - (cr:dani) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)13 Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - GRANT WITH 30 DAY RULE - (cr:dani) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)12 Debtor's Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - GRANT - (cr:dani) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)11 Debtor's Emergency motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) - FINAL HEARING SET FOR 5/4/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 - The case judge is Mark S Wallace (cr:dani) (Law, Tamika) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Forsythe, Marc. (Forsythe, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Broker, Jeffrey. (Broker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation By United States Trustee (SA) and Debtor Providing for Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 333 for Carmichael Care, Inc. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (Lossing, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Rogan, Richard. (Rogan, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Park, Ernie. (Park, Ernie) (Entered: 02/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)33 ORDER approving application for extension of time to file schedules and/or plan (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/15/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)25 Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of motion/application - Notice of Application of Debtors and Debtors in Possession to Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. as Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)34 Application to Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. as Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.). (Neale, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Employ Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P. as Bankruptcy Counsel Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327 and 330; Declaration of David L. Neale, Esq. in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Neale, David) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Debtors' Ex Parte Motion For An Order Extending Time For Debtors To File Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities, Statements Of Financial Affairs, And All Other Required Documents Up To And Including March 9, 2015 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/13/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)28 Debtors' Ex parte Motion For An Order Extending Time For Debtors To File Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities, Statements Of Financial Affairs, And All Other Required Documents - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 2/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)6 ORDER for joint administration (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/12/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12) No. of Notices: 76. Notice Date 02/12/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental / Supplement To Debtors' Emergency Cash Management Motion Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex parte application / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion For An Order Extending Time For Debtors To File Schedules Of Assets And Liabilities, Statements Of Financial Affairs, And All Other Required Documents; Declaration Of Krikor J. Meshefejian In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re: - Declaration Of Stephanie Reichert Regarding Telephonic Notice To Creditors For Hearings On Emergency First Day Motions Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)21 Notice of Hearing). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Hennesay, Kenneth. (Hennesay, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) (RE: related document(s)9 Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors - Local Form (LBR 1007-1(d)) filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) (Nguyen, Vi) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof of service -[Declaration Of Service Of Emergency Motions, Declarations In Support Of Emergency Motions, And Notice Of Hearing On Emergency Motions (POS Attached)]- Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)11 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; Memorandum of Points And Authorities, 12 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities13 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 14 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System; (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Admini, 15 Declaration, 16 Declaration, 21 Notice of Hearing). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)14 Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System, (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Administrative Holds And/Or Freezes On The Debtors' Pre-Petition Accounts - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 2/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)13 Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 2/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing -[Notice Of Hearing On Debtors Emergency Motions For Orders: (1) Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; (2) Authorizing Debtors To Pay Pre-Petition Wages And Related Relief; (3) Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance Of Future Payment To Utility Companies; And (4) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors Cash Management System And Related Relief (POS Attached)]- Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)11 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; Memorandum of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc., 12 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc., 13 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc., 14 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System; (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Administrative Holds And/Or Freezes On The Debtors' Pre-Petition Accounts; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)12 Debtor's Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 2/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)11 Debtor's Emergency motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing - filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) The Hearing date is set for 2/13/2015 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)5 Notice of Case Deficiency (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/11/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)4 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/11/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration re: Declaration of Krikor J. Meshefejian In Support Of Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)11 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; Memorandum of Points And Authorities). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration re: Omnibus Declaration Of Spencer Olsen In Support Of Debtors' Emergency Motions Filed On February 11, 2015 Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)11 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; Memorandum of Points And Authorities, 12 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities13 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 14 Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System; (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Admini). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Order: (A) Authorizing The Continued Use Of Debtors' Cash Management System; (B) Authorizing The Maintenance Of Debtors' Existing Bank Accounts; And (C) Ordering Banks To Release Administrative Holds And/Or Freezes On The Debtors' Pre-Petition Accounts; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Payment To Utility Companies Pursuant To Section 366(c) Of The Bankruptcy Code; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For Order Authorizing Debtors To: (1) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Related Payroll Taxes And Reimburseable Expenses; And (2) Honor Accrued Vacation And Leave Benefits; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency motion Debtors' Emergency Motion For An Interim Order Authorizing The Debtors To Use Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing; Memorandum of Points And Authorities Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Eisenberg, Joseph. (Eisenberg, Joseph) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors - Local Form (LBR 1007-1(d)) - Amended Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.. (Meshefejian, Krikor)WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #25. (FEE DUE $30; New creditors not added) Modified on 2/12/2015 (Nguyen, Vi). (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements For Filing Documents Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (RE: related document(s)6 ORDER Granting Motion To Approve Joint Administration Of Cases. Lead Case: North American Health Care, Inc. (Case No. 8:15-bk-10610-MW) With Member Case, Carmichael Care, Inc. (Case No. 8:15-bk-10612-MW (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/10/2015.). (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/12/2015 at 01:30 PM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Beezer, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Motion To Approve Joint Administration Of Cases. Lead Case: North American Health Care, Inc. (Case No. 8:15-bk-10610-MW) With Member Case, Carmichael Care, Inc. (Case No. 8:15-bk-10612-MW (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/10/2015. (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) (Shimizu, Tina) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) (Shimizu, Tina) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. OTHER - Creditors have not been uploaded. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc.) (Shimizu, Tina) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex parte application / Debtor's Ex Parte Motion For Entry Of An Order For Joint Administration Of Cases; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of John L. Sorensen In Support Thereof Filed by Debtor North American Health Care, Inc. (Meshefejian, Krikor) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by North American Health Care, Inc. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/9/2015 (Neale, David). WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #3. Case Deficient For: Summary of Schedules (Form B6 Pg 1) due 2/20/2015. Schedule A (Form B6A) due 2/20/2015. Schedule B (Form B6B) due 2/20/2015. Schedule D (Form B6D) due 2/20/2015. Schedule E (Form B6E) due 2/20/2015. Schedule F (Form B6F) due 2/20/2015. Schedule G (Form B6G) due 2/20/2015. Schedule H (Form B6H) due 2/20/2015. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules (Form B6) due 2/20/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form B7) due 2/20/2015. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form B203) due 2/20/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 2/20/2015. Creditors have been uploaded. Modified on 2/9/2015 (Shimizu, Tina). (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,411 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?