Pepicelli v. A.T. Sportswear, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12632-REK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 1:35 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ronald Alman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Warren Pepicelli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo A.T. Sportswear, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 12/16/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 1/3/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Robert E. Keeton : DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff.(Folan, Karen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Warren Pepicelli. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Judge Robert E. Keeton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [6] Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff is to submit a proposed default judgment to the court. (Folan, Karen)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
        AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment Against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. filed by Warren Pepicelli. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
          AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Kleinman in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment Against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. filed by Warren Pepicelli. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
            AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Kleinman in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment Against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. filed by Warren Pepicelli. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION for Default Judgment Against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. filed by Warren Pepicelli. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005, Terminated: 12/14/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                MOTION for Default Judgment Against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. by Warren Pepicelli.(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                  Judge Robert E. Keeton : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment. (Folan, Karen)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Request for notice of default
                      Request for notice of default. (Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed A.T. Sportswear, Inc. served on 1/12/2005, answer due 2/1/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against A.T. Sportswear, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 60868, filed by Ronald Alman, Warren Pepicelli. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Folan, Karen)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Folan, Karen)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Summons Issued
                              Summons Issued as to A.T. Sportswear, Inc.. (Folan, Karen)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?