Motorola Electronica de P.R., Inc. et al v. Municipality Vega Baja
Federal Civil Lawsuit Puerto Rico District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01153

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 23, 2021 at 4:59 PM DT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Substitute Party
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Judgment - consent
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Informative Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Informative Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Approve Consent Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None In Compliance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Informative Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None In Compliance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None In Compliance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None In Compliance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None In Compliance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion Submitting
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Submitting
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None In Compliance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Requesting Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Informative Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Submitting
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order - Case Management Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Withdraw Attorney
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 288 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?