Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00240

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:34 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sycamore Ip Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Adva Optical Networking North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blair M Jacobs +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 blairjacobs@paulhastings.com
Space Hong Lin +1 650 820 1890 +1 650 820 1900 honglin@paulhastings.com
Space Christina A Ondrick +1 202 551 1953 +1 202 551 0453 christinaondrick@paulhastings.com
Space Stephen M Yu +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 stephenyu@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
Space Michael Dru Montgomery +1 409 866 3318 dru@heartfieldlawfirm.com
No Logo Adva Optical Networking Se, Defendant
Officer/Director, ADVA NA Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Mrv Communications, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blair M Jacobs +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 blairjacobs@paulhastings.com
Space Hong Lin +1 650 820 1890 +1 650 820 1900 honglin@paulhastings.com
Space Christina A Ondrick +1 202 551 1953 +1 202 551 0453 christinaondrick@paulhastings.com
Space Stephen M Yu +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 stephenyu@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Dru Montgomery +1 409 866 3318 dru@heartfieldlawfirm.com
No Logo ADVA Optical Networking, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blair M Jacobs +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 blairjacobs@paulhastings.com
Space Christina A Ondrick +1 202 551 1953 +1 202 551 0453 christinaondrick@paulhastings.com
Space Stephen M Yu +1 202 551 1700 +1 202 551 1705 stephenyu@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Dru Montgomery +1 409 866 3318 dru@heartfieldlawfirm.com
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?