Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00244

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:50 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sycamore Ip Holdings LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Hitachi America, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawnna Marie Yashar +1 202 861 1518 +1 202 861 1783 syashar@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
No Logo Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawnna Marie Yashar +1 202 861 1518 +1 202 861 1783 syashar@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
Hitachi, Ltd. Hitachi, Ltd., Defendant
Officer/Director, Opnext, Inc.
Officer/Director, Western Digital Corp
Officer/Director, Bookham Technology Plc

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawnna Marie Yashar +1 202 861 1518 +1 202 861 1783 syashar@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Ellsworth Davis, III +1 903 230 9090 +1 903 230 9661 bdavis@bdavisfirm.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Space Space

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?