Secure Web Conference Corporat v. Microsoft Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-187

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 11:20 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/10/2015, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1456829] [15-187] [Entered: 03/10/2015 12:48 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1456813] [15-187] [Entered: 03/10/2015 12:39 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
      APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 03/10/2015, DISMISSED.[1456812] [15-187] [Entered: 03/10/2015 12:39 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
        ORDER, dated 03/10/2015, on January 22, 2015, the notice of appeal in this matter was transmitted to this Court in error. The notice of appeal was properly routed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on February 9, 2015. It is hereby Ordered, that this appeal is administratively closed, FILED.[1456804] [15-187] [Entered: 03/10/2015 12:35 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1421792] [15-187] [Entered: 01/22/2015 04:30 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
            DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/23/2014, RECEIVED.[1421782] [15-187] [Entered: 01/22/2015 04:26 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
              DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/02/2014, RECEIVED.[1421779] [15-187] [Entered: 01/22/2015 04:25 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Secure Web Conference Corporation, FILED. [1421741] [15-187] [Entered: 01/22/2015 04:12 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 48 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?