United States v. Silver
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00093
District Judge Valerie E. Caproni, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 27, 2021 at 3:38 PM DT (5.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Carrie Heather Cohen +1 212 637 2264
, , , , Andrew Daniel Goldstein +1 212 637 1559 +1 212 637 2527 andrew.goldstein@usdoj.gov
, Tatiana Roesler Martins +1 212 637 2215 tatiana.martins@usdoj.gov
, , , , Howard Seth Master +1 212 637 2248 +1 212 637 2937 howard.master@ag.ny.gov
Space Thomas McKay +1 212 637 2268 thomas.mckay@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Charles Richenthal +1 212 637 2109 +1 212 637 2615 daniel.richenthal@usdoj.gov
Space A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , James M. McDonald +1 212 637 2405 +1 202 434 5029 James.McDonald2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dr. Robert Taub, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lankler Siffert & Wohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lisa R. Zornberg +1 212 930 1276 +1 212 764 3701 lzornberg@lswlaw.com
No Logo NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by NBCUniversal Media, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M. Kummer +1 212 664 4017 +1 212 664 6572 daniel.kummer@nbcuni.com
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by The New York Times Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Edward McCraw +1 212 556 4031 +1 212 556 4634 mccraw@nytimes.com
No Logo Sheldon Silver, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Overy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Andrew Rhys Davies +1 212 756 1151 +1 212 610 6399 andrew.rhys.davies@newyork.allenovery.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Michael Svetkey Feldberg +1 212 610 6360 +1 212 610 6399 michael.feldberg@newyork.allenovery.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Michael Franklin Westfal +1 212 610 6418 +1 212 610 6399 michael.westfal@allenovery.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Overy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Rebecca Ann Naeder +1 212 610 6316 rebecca.naeder@allenovery.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Justin Michael Ellis +1 212 607 8160 +1 212 607 8161 jellis@mololamken.com
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Robert Kelsey Kry +1 202 556 2000 +1 202 556 2001 rkry@mololamken.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Graubard Miller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 C. Daniel Chill +1 212 818 8800 +1 212 818 8881 dchill@graubard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joel B. Rudin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Joel Barry Rudin +1 212 752 7600 +1 212 980 2968 jbrudin@rudinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MoloLamken, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Justin V Shur +1 202 556 2005 jshur@mololamken.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Joel Cohen +1 212 806 5400 +1 212 806 6006 jcohen@stroock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Carrie Heather Cohen +1 212 637 2264
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Andrew Daniel Goldstein +1 212 637 1559 +1 212 637 2527 andrew.goldstein@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Howard Seth Master +1 212 637 2248 +1 212 637 2937 howard.master@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 James M. McDonald +1 212 637 2405 +1 202 434 5029 James.McDonald2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2017 Tuongvy Le +1 212 336 5509 letu@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington, D.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Steven Francis Molo +1 212 607 8160 +1 212 607 8161 smolo@mololamken.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Justin V Shur +1 202 556 2005 jshur@mololamken.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (529) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Service by Publication
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/11/2020, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Probation Form
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None judgment
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 439 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Instructions as to Sheldon Silver. (lnl) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR IMMUNITY as to Sheldon Silver. It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 6002 and 6003, Jay Arthur Goldberg give testimony and provide other information as to all matters about which he may be questioned in United States v. Sheldon Silver; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 6002 and 6003, no testimony or other information compelled under this Order, or any information directly or indirectly derived from such testimony or other information, may be used against Jay Arthur Goldberg in any criminal case, except a prosecution for perjury, giving a false statement, or otherwise failing to comply with this Order. This order shall become effective only if after the date of this Order Jay Arthur Goldberg refuses to testify or provide other information on the basis of his privilege against self-incrimination. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/8/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew Rhys Davies dated May 8, 2018 re: in Connection with Charging Conference, and in Response to Government's Letter of May 6, 2018 (Attachments: # 1 Redline of Proposed Jury Charge)(Davies, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/6/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Damian Williams dated May 6, 2018 re: Draft Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 05/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated Apirl 29, 2018 re: Limiting Instructions and Moreland Evidence Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 04/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael S. Feldberg dated April 27, 2018 re: Proposing Limiting Instructions to the Jury (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Sheldon Silver: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference on April 25, 2018 is ADJOURNED to 10:30 A.M. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/25/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/25/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS a juror in this case has requested excusal from jury service due to an unforeseen family commitment; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a conference on April 25, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. to discuss this request. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/24/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/10/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 4/10/18 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/13/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 4/13/18 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached jury questionnaires of the empaneled jurors and alternate jurors shall be filed publicly, with certain content redacted to protect the jurors' personal privacy. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached jury questionnaires of the empaneled jurors and alternate jurors shall be filed publicly, with certain content redacted to protect the jurors' personal privacy. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached jury questionnaires of the empaneled jurors and alternate jurors shall be filed publicly, with certain content redacted to protect the jurors' personal privacy. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached jury questionnaires of the empaneled jurors and alternate jurors shall be filed publicly, with certain content redacted to protect the jurors' personal privacy. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Sheldon Silver (1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Courtroom Connect, a Southern District of New York contracted vendor, may provide defense counsel in the United States v. Sheldon Silver, S1 15-CR-093(VEC), with Internet connectivity for the duration of the trial proceedings, set to begin on Monday, April 30, 2018. Courtroom Connect should proceed to make proper arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/11/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael S. Feldberg dated April 11, 2018 re: Courtroom Connect . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sheldon Silver: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons discussed at the conference as to the witness's health and availability to testify, trial is hereby ADJOURNED to April 30, 2018. Jury selection will still proceed on April 16, 2018 as previously ordered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government must provide the Court with an update as to the status of this witness on April 20, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C § 3161(7)(A), the period of delay between April 23, 2018 and April 30, 2018 is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Given the unavailability of a Government witness, the ends of justice served by adjourning the commencement of trial outweigh the public's and Defendant's interests in a speedy trial. SO ORDERED. (Time excluded from 4/23/2018 until 4/30/2018) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/10/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will administer the attached Juror Questionnaire at Defendant's trial, and that the parties shall proceed according to the jury selection schedule set forth in the Court's previous orders and reiterated at the conference on April 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/10/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Sheldon Silver (1)granting 378 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael S. Feldberg dated April 9, 2018 re: Requesting Permission to Utilize Certain General Purpose Computing Devices in the Courtroom. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/9/2018) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael S. Feldberg dated April 9, 2018 re: Requesting Permission to Utilize Certain General Purpose Computing Devices in the Courtroom . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated April 7, 2018 re: Def's Proposed VD and Prelim Instructions . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's 4.6.18 Letter)(Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 04/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Courtroom Connect, a Southern District of New York contracted vendor, may provide the Government in the United States v. Sheldon Silver, S1 15-CR-093 (VEC), with an Internet connectivity feed for the duration of the trial proceedings, set to begin on Monday, April 16, 2018. Courtroom Connect should make proper arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court and the official court reporter. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/6/18)(jw) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated April 6, 2018 re: Courtroom Connect . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sheldon Silver ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference set for April 4, 2018 and the parties April 6, 2018 deadline to resubmit the questionnaire are CANCELLED. The parties will discuss any objections to the revised draft questionnaire at the FPTC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the FPTC shall be rescheduled from April 10, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. to April 10, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. The Court will post the finalized questionnaire to ECF after the conference, after which the Government will deliver copies of the questionnaire as previously ordered. The remainder of the schedule shall stay the same. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/2/18)(jw) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of of Filing Proposed Voir Dire Questions and Requests to Charge as to Sheldon Silver (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Proposed Voir Dire Questions, # 2 Exhibit B--Redline of Voir Dire Questions From First Trial, # 3 Exhibit C--Proposed Requests to Charge, # 4 Exhibit D--Redline of Jury Charge From First Trial)(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government and Defendant must produce to the Court, by April 9, 2018, their exhibit lists and copies of exhibits that they intend to use in their cases-in-chief. The exhibits must be submitted electronically (by CD) and in tabbed, hard-copy binders containing indexes, except that if any exhibit is particularly voluminous, it need not be produced in hard copy. The exhibit lists must be submitted in both PDF and Microsoft Word format. Each exhibit list must be a chart with four columns labeled: Exhibit Number, Document Description, Identified, and Admitted (with the last two columns left blank). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government must produce to the Court, by April 9,2018, the § 3500 and Giglio materials for the witnesses it intends to call in its case-in-chief. The Government must do so electronically (by CD) and in tabbed, hard-copy binders with an index. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/28/18)(jw) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 360 MOTION in Limine .. (Richenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Sheldon Silver re 359 MOTION in Limine .. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on 366 LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated March 23, 2018 re: RTC/VD. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline for filing the voir dire and request to charge is extended to April 2, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/23/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael F. Westfal in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 360 MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated March 23, 2018 re: RTC/VD Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER & OPINION as to Sheldon Silver. After appeal and upon remand from the Second Circuit, Defendant Sheldon Silver moves to dismiss the charges against him. Specifically, Silver contends that the Superseding Indictment should be limited to mailings, wires, payments, and transactions made during the limitations period; that it fails to allege a quid pro quo as to the asbestos and real estate schemes; that it fails to allege anyone was deprived of property as to the Hobbs Act counts; and that the forfeiture allegations should be dismissed to the extent they exceed the amounts alleged in the Superseding Indictment. Silver's arguments run counter to the law of this Circuit, as well as the law of this very case, as determined by this Court and on appeal. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion is DENIED....[See this Order & Opinion]... III. CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, the Defendant's Motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motion at Docket Number 351. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/20/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if there are any questions proposed on the questionnaire as to which the parties are in dispute, the parties must appear for a conference regarding the draft questionnaire on April 4, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. If necessary, the parties will be ordered to resubmit the questionnaire in Microsoft Word format to the Court with any changes arising from the conference, as well as any outstanding names and places to be inserted into the questionnaire, by April 6, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. The Court will file the finalized questionnaire on ECF by April 9, 2018. The Government is ordered to deliver 100 copies of the finalized questionnaire to the Jury Clerk by 3:00 P.M. on April 10, 2018. The questionnaire will be administered by the Jury Clerk on April 11, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government must collect the completed questionnaires on April 11, 2018, and duplicate them for the parties' and Court's review. The parties are ordered to submit to the Court a joint list of their for-cause challenges, including those upon which they agree, and those upon which they disagree, by April 13, 2018 at 8:00 A.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear on April 13, 2018 at 11:30 A.M. for a conference to discuss the parties' for-cause challenges. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/20/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 362 LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated March 17, 2018 re: Jury Questionnaire/MIL Schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Replies to motions in limine are due March 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 3/26/2018) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/20/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated March 17, 2018 re: Jury Questionnaire/MIL Schedule Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 03/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must confer and inform the Court, by no later than March 19, 2018, whether they wish to use a written questionnaire for jury selection. The parties are advised that if the Court decides to use a written questionnaire, the parties will be required to review questionnaire responses and submit challenges for cause during the week of April 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/16/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael F. Westfal in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 357 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 351 MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment. . (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 351 MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment.. (Richenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/1/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 2/1/18 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Sheldon Silver re 351 MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment.. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael F. Westfal in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 351 MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Towaki Komatsu dated February 2, 2018 re: First & Fourteenth Amendment Abuse. ENDORSEMENT: The request to seal the letters is denied. The request to bring signs into the courthouse is denied. Persons desiring to exercise their First Amendment rights to protest using signs are free to do so outside the courthouse. The request to bring electronic devices is denied. Local rules generally prohibit members of the public other than attorneys from bringing electronic devices into the courthouse [see Standing Order M10-468]. Attorneys who are given permission to bring such devices into the courthouse are doing so in furtherance of their representation of their clients. Members of the regular in-house press, who undergo a clearance procedure, are under limited circumstances allowed to have electronic devices with them. All others are prohibited from bringing electronic devices into the courthouse, but are welcome to exercise their First Amendment rights and write about anything they observe by using electronic devices outside the courthouse. The requests regarding access to the defendant in the US v. Silver matter are denied without prejudice, and may be revisited closer in time to trial.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/6/2018)(bw) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the parties appeared for a conference in this matter on February 1, 2018; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's request to substitute counsel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1. Defendant's pretrial motions are due February 16, 2018, with the Government's responses due March 2, 2018, and with replies due March 9, 2018. 2. Motions in limine are due March 9, 2018, with responses due March 23, 2018. 3. Proposed voir dire questions and requests to charge are due March 30, 2018. If the parties wish to use a jury questionnaire, the draft questionnaire is due on March 30, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must appear for a Final Pretrial Conference on April 10, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C § 3161(7)(A), the period of delay between the date of this order and April 16, 2018, is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Given the complexity of the trial and newly-retained counsel, the ends of justice served by allowing Defendant sufficient time to review discovery and to prepare for trial outweigh the public's and Defendant's interests in a speedy trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/2/2018)(bw) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rebecca Ann Naeder appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Naeder, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Franklin Westfal appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Westfal, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew Rhys Davies appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Davies, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Svetkey Feldberg appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated January 31, 2018 re: Motions Schedule Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 1/31/2018 re: Motion Schedule and Bill of Particulars . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the Court ordered the parties on January 16, 2018 to confer and propose, by January 26, 2018, a motion schedule for this matter [Dkt. 340]; and WHEREAS on January 26, 2018, Defendants counsel called to inform the Court that Defendant seeks substitution of counsel; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties deadline to file the proposed motion schedule is extended to January 31, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government, Defendant, Defendant's current counsel of record, and Defendant's replacement counsel appear for a conference in this matter on February 1, 2018 at 5:00 P.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The Court will address both the substitution and the proposed motion schedule at the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/26/2018)(bw) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 305 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-1615. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Court's opinion. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 01/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(nd) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on 338 LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal /Williams dated January 16, 2018 re: Cert denial; schedule. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are ordered to confer and propose, by letter dated no later than January 26, 2018, a motion schedule with deadlines in the form of a set number of days from the day the mandate is ultimately issued, rather than particular calendar dates. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/16/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE A. Damian Williams appearing for USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins/Richenthal/Williams dated January 16, 2018 re: Cert denial; schedule Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 335 MOTION for Tuong Vy Le to Withdraw as Attorney for Sheldon Silver. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2017) (bw) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel Charles Richenthal appearing for USA. (Richenthal, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for TuongVy Le to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of TuongVy Le)(Ellis, Justin) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 333 LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Steven F. Molo dated 8/11/2017 re: Trial Scheduling. We write with respect to the Court's Order dated August 4, 2017 (Dkt. 331), directing the parties to inform the Court whether the parties have any firm dates for trials between March 15, 2018 and August 1, 2018. ENDORSEMENT: Subject to a decision from the Supreme Court that would interfere, jury trial in this case will likely commence on April 16, 2018. The parties are directed to inform any other court seeking to set a trial date that they are likely to be engaged from April 16 through the end of May 2018. The parties are further directed to inform this Court promptly of any conflicts that may arise in the future. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/15/2017)(bw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 8/11/2017 re: Trial Scheduling (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Thomas McKay dated August 9, 2017 re: Trial Schedules Document filed by USA. (McKay, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 330 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to inform the Court, by August 11, 2017, whether they currently have any firm dates for trials between March 15, 2018 and August 1, 2018, and, if so, the name and docket number of the case, the date the trial is scheduled to begin and the anticipated length of the trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/4/2017)(ft) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins, McKay dated August 4, 2017 re: Scheduling Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSAs Martins, McKay dated July 24, 2017 re: US v. Silver Document filed by USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Tatiana Roesler Martins appearing for USA. (Martins, Tatiana) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas McKay appearing for USA. (McKay, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION of USCA (certified copy) re: 305 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-1615-cr. In 2015, the United States Government indicted Sheldon Silver, the former Speaker of the New York State Assembly, on charges of honest services fraud, Hobbs Act extortion, and money laundering. The Government alleged that Silver abused his public position by engaging in two quid pro quo schemes in which he performed official acts in exchange for bribes and kickbacks, and that he laundered the proceeds of his schemes into private investment vehicles. After a jury trial of nearly one month in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (Valarie E. Caproni, Judge), a jury found him guilty on all counts. He was sentenced to twelve years of imprisonment, to be followed by three years of supervised release. After Silver had been convicted and sentenced, the Supreme Court issued its decision in McDonnell v. United States, 136 S. Ct. 2355 (2016), which clarified the definition of an "official act" in honest services fraud and extortion charges. The Supreme Court, vacating the conviction of former Governor Robert McDonnell of Virginia, held that "an 'official act' is a decision or action on a 'question, matter, cause, suit, proceeding or controversy'" involving "a formal exercise of governmental power.". Silver now appeals from his judgment of conviction and argues, primarily, that the District Courts jury instructions defining an official act as "any action taken or to be taken under color of official authority" was erroneous under McDonnell. He additionally challenges the sufficiency of the evidence on all counts of conviction, arguing, among other things, that his money laundering conviction under 18 U.S.C. § 1957 required the Government to trace "dirty" funds comingled with "clean" funds. Though we reject Silver's sufficiency challenges, we hold that the District Court's instructions on honest services fraud and extortion do not comport with McDonnell and are therefore in error. We further hold that this error was not harmless because it is not clear beyond a reasonable doubt that a rational jury would have reached the same conclusion if properly instructed, as is required by law for the verdict to stand. Accordingly, we VACATE the District Court's judgment of conviction on all counts and REMAND the cause to the District Court for such further proceedings as may be appropriate in the circumstances and consistent with this opinion. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 07/13/2017. (nd) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Sheldon Silver re: 312 AMENDED MOTION to Stay Revised Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal filed by Sheldon Silver, 299 MOTION to Stay Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal filed by Sheldon Silver. For the foregoing reasons, Silvers motion to continue bail pending appeal and to stay the fine and forfeiture orders pending appeal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motions at docket entries 299 and 312. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/25/16)(jw) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants deadline to pay the fine and forfeiture pursuant to the Amended Judgment and to surrender for service of his sentence is adjourned to 14 days after any denial by this Court of the defendants motion for bail pending appeal. If Defendant seeks review of any denial of his motion for bail pending appeal within that 14-day period, Defendants deadline to pay the fine and forfeiture pursuant to the Amended Judgment and to surrender for service of his sentence is adjourned to 14 days after any decision from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit affirming this Courts denial of Defendants motion for bail pending appeal, or to October 27, 2016, whichever date is later. Defendant shall withdraw as moot and without prejudice the Emergency Motion. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/25/2016)(jw) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James McDonald dated August 24, 2016 re: surrender and payment deadline Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, James) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated August 22, 2016 re: Stevenson decision; extension of surrender date and payment deadline (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James McDonald dated August 17, 2016 re: US v. Stevenson Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McDonald, James) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 10/16/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Hearing held on 10/16/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James McDonald dated August 5, 2016 re: US v. Sheldon Silver Document filed by USA. (McDonald, James) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert Kry dated August 4, 2016 re: Supplemental Authority -- Bail Ruling in Skelos Case (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 315 LETTER MOTION Adjournment of Deadline as to Sheldon Silver (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/2/2016) (ft) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 8/2/16 re: Extension of Deadline to Pay Fine and Forfeiture . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 312 AMENDED MOTION to Stay Revised Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal. . (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 313 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 312 AMENDED MOTION to Stay Revised Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal.. (McDonald, James) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED MOTION to Stay Revised Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 214 Notice of Appeal by The New York Times Company, 210 Notice of Appeal by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. USCA Case Number 16-654 (XAP),16-656 (XAP). The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/27/2016. (nd) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER concerning defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Mr. Solomon, NY, not dated re: Silver case. (bw) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER concerning defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Martin I. Spindel dated May 18, 2016 re: Sentencing. (bw) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER concerning defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from an Anonymous sender, not dated re: Sentencing. (bw) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Aretakis dated May 16, 2016 re: I am in receipt of the Court's April 29, 2016 order that denied me the ability to make a victim's impact statement in the above case. What I am primarily write for, is to find out why I a am not given any notice of or the opportunity to attend or participate in the April 25, 2016 hearing and/or Court order that addressed my request. ENDORSEMENT: All court appearances and filings in this case are on the public record. Mr. Aretakis may access those filings and court appearances in the same manner as any other member of the public. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this endorsement to Mr. Aretakis and to note mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/20/2016) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has mailed a copy of this Endorsed Letter to Mr. John Aretakis on May 20, 2016. ***] (bw) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM B Filed by Sheldon Silver. No transcript ordered. (nd) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sheldon Silver from 296 Judgment, 297 Amended Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401152896. (nd) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's deadline to pay the fine and forfeiture pursuant to the Amended Judgment is adjourned to August 15, 2016. 2. Defendant's deadline to surrender for service of his sentence is adjourned to noon on August 31, 2016. 3. The briefing schedule for Defendant's motion for bail pending appeal previously set by the Court is adjourned. No later than two weeks after the Supreme Court issues its decision in McDonnell v. United States, Defendant must file a revised motion for bail pending appeal in light of the Supreme Court's decision. No later than two weeks after Defendant files his revised motion, the Government must file its response, and Defendants deadline to reply is one week after the Government's response. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/18/2016)(ft) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/21/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 10/21/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Sentence held on 5/3/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Motion to Continue Bail and to Stay Financial Penalties Pending Appeal. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert K. Kry dated May 12, 2016 re: Proposed Defense Instruction No. 8 (Kry, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case. Date of Imposition of Judgment: 5/3/2016. Date of Original Judgment: 5/5/2016. Reason for Amendment: Correct of Sentence for Clerical Mistake. Defendant Sheldon Silver (1) was found guilty on Count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, and 7s, after a plea of not guilty. Count(s) in the underlying indictment are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: Twelve (12) years on counts ls-6s, and ten (10) years on count 7s, all counts to run concurrently with each other. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant be designated to the FCI Otisville Camp. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: at noon on 7/1/2016. If the defendant has not been designated to a facility by 7/1/16, he must surrender himself to the MCC-NY facility. SUPERVISED RELEASE: Two (2) years on each count (1s-7s) to run concurrently with each other. The above drug testing condition (see page 4 of judgment) is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. Special Conditions of Supervision (see page 5 of judgment). ASSESSMENT: $700.00. FINE: $1,750,000.00. Having assessed the defendant's ability to pay, payment of the total criminal monetary penalties shall be due as follows: Lump sum payment of $700.00 due immediately, balance due not later than 6/14/2016, and in accordance F below. [F] Special instructions regarding the pay1nent of criminal monetary penalties: Not later than 6/14/2016, defendant must pay $1,500,000. The balance of the fine ($250,000) shall be paid in monthly installments of not less than $5,846 starting 7/14/16. If the defendant is engaged in a BOP non-UNICOR program, the defendant shall pay an additional $25 per quarter toward the criminal financial penalties. However, if the defendant participates in the BOP's UNICOR program as a grade 1 through 4, the defendant shall pay an additional 50% of his monthly UNICOR earnings toward the criminal financial penalties, consistent with BOP regulations at 28 C.F.R. 545/11. The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: * In the amount of $5,393,976.63 as so ordered on the Preliminary Order of Forfeiture on 5/3/16 (doc. #295). (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/10/2016)(bw) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT as to Sheldon Silver (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 3, Dismissed; Count(s) 1s - 7s Imprisonment: Twelve (12) years on counts 1s-6s, and ten (10) years on count 7s, all counts to run concurrently with each other. Supervised Release: Two (2) years on each count (1s-7s) to run concurrently with each other. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant be designated to FCI Otisville Camp. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: at noon on 7/1/2016. If the defendant has not been designated to a facility by 7/1/16 he must surrender himself to the MCC-NY facility. The defendant shall provide the probation officer with access to any requested financial information. The defendant shall not incur new credit charges or open additional lines of credit without approval of the probation officer unless defendant is in compliance with the installment payment schedule. The defendant must report to the nearest Probation Office within 72 hours of his release from custody. The defendant will be supervised in the district of his residence. The defendant shall pay the special assessment fee of $700 not later than 6/14/2016. Not later than 6/14/2016, defendant must pay $1,500,000. The balance of the fine ($250,000) shall be paid in monthly installments of $5,846 starting 7/14/2016. If the defendant is engaged in a BOP nonUNICOR program, the defendant shall pay an additional $25 per quarter toward the criminal financial penalties. However, if the defendant participates in the BOP's UNICOR program as a grade 1 through 4, the defendant shall pay an additional 50% of his monthly UNICOR earnings toward the criminal financial penalties, consistent with BOP regulations at 28 C.F.R. 545/11. The defendant shall pay the following court cost(s): $5,393,976.63. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/5/2016)(ft) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Sheldon Silver. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One through Seven of the Indictment,to which the defendant was found guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $5,393,976.63 in United States currency (the Money Judgment) shall be entered against the defendant. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One through Seven of the Indictment, to which the defendant was found guilty, all of the defendants right, title and interest in the Forfeited Property is hereby forfeited to the United States. Any and all net proceeds realized from the liquidation of the Forfeited Property shall be applied towards the defendants Money Judgment. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, SHELDON SILVER, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith. Upon adjudication of all third-party interests, this Court will enter a Final Order of Forfeiture with respect to the Forfeited Property pursuant to Title 21, United States Code, Section 853(n) and Rule 32.2(c)(2) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, in which all third-party interests will be addressed. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/3/2016)(jw) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. After a twelve-day jury trial, twenty-five witnesses, and three days of jury deliberations, on November 30, 2015, Sheldon Silver, former Speaker of the New York State Assembly, was convicted on two counts of honest services mail fraud, 18 U.S.C. §§ 1341, 1346, two counts of honest services wire fraud, 18 U.S.C. §§ 1343, 1346, two counts of extortion under color of official right, 18 U.S.C. § 1951, and one count of money laundering, 18 U.S.C. § 1957. Silver renews his motion pursuant to Rule 29 for a judgment of acquittal and moves pursuant to Rule 33 for a new trial. For the following reasons, Silver's motions are denied....[See this Memorandum Opinion & Order]... CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Silver's Motions are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motions at docket entries 179 and 180. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/3/2016)(bw) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Elliot B. Pasik dated May 3, 2016 re: Upon reviewing my own letter dated April 28, 2016, and after conversation with colleagues, I believe that I need to clarify an ambiguity of my own doing when I briefly commented upon the actual sentencing of Sheldon Silver at page 7 of my letter, penultimate paragraph. To be clear, Sheldon Silver deserves incarceration. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Arthur Z. Schwartz dated April 28, 2016 re: I urge you to give Sheldon Silver the maximum sentence on each charge for which he has been convicted. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sentencing Letter by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Victor J. Papa dated 04/27/2016 re: Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER (E-Mail) as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven Hoffman dated 05/02/2016 01:45 PM re: For the good of the people of New York, where I was born and raised, I hope you sentence Sheldon Silver to jail time. (bw) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated May 2, 2016 re: Government's proposed forfeiture order (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Aretakis is not permitted to make a victim impact statement at Defendants sentencing. Mr. Aretakis does not satisfy the definition of crime victim under the Crime Victims Rights Act. 18 U.S.C. § 3771(e)(2)(A); see also United States v. Sharp, 463 F. Supp. 2d 556, 566 (E.D. Va. 2006) (denying non-party petitioners request to testify at sentencing hearing based on unsubstantiated allegations of harm not related to the federal crime committed by the Defendant). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/29/2016)(ft) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 286 LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Steven F. Molo dated April 28, 2016 re: Court's order dated April 25, 2016. We write in response to the Court's April 25, 2016 order (Dkt. 275) requesting that Mr. Silver confirm certain information in his Presentence Investigation Report ("PSR"), and adviseof his "views regarding whether the Court should approve Mr. John Aretakis' request to make a victim impact statement at sentencing." ENDORSEMENT: If the Defendant wishes to respond to the Government's proposed forfeiture order, he must do so in no more than five pages to be submitted no later than May 2, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/29/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated April 28, 2016 re: Court's order dated April 25, 2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Andrew D. Goldstein dated April 28, 2016 re: Court's Order Dated April 25, 2016 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Suarna Mehulie, M.D. dated 4/26/2016 re: E-Mails. (ft) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Anna B. Murphy dated 4/25/2016 re: Sentencing. (ft) Modified on 4/28/2016 (ft). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Nathan Lewin dated 4/25/2016 re: Sheldon Silver. (ft) Modified on 4/28/2016 (ft). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Elliot B. Pasik dated April 28, 2016 re: At the same time that I acknowledge the terrible faults of the New York Legislature, I hope this court can exercise leniency and mercy in sentencing. (bw) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Arthur H. Miller dated April 25, 2016 re: I am writing on behalf of my oldest friend Sheldon Silver as he awaits your judgment as to his fate. (bw) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from "anonymous sender" dated April 25, 2016 re: As I sit here this morning at my computer, I want you to know the world is watching to see if you are going to let crook Sheldon Silver off the hook on May 3, 2016. (bw) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Oral Argument proceeding held on 4/14/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Oral Argument held on 4/14/16 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER (E-Mail) as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Robert J. Notari dated 04/25/2016 06:43 PM re: Please consider the prosecutor's requested penalties for Sheldon Silver and do ALL the law allows to hold him accountable. (bw) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the Defendant's sentencing is scheduled for May 3, 2016; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than April 28, 2016: 1. The Government must provide the present value of Defendant's New York State pension. 2. The Government must confirm that none of the assets listed on pages 22-23 of the Presentence Investigation Report is subject to forfeiture or identify any that is subject to forfeiture. 3. The Defendant must confirm that all the assets listed on pages 22-23 of the Presentence Investigation Report are net of any interest of Mrs. Silver. 4. The parties must inform the Court of their views regarding whether the Court should approve Mr. John Aretakis' request to make a victim impact statement at sentencing; Mr. Aretakis has made this request by letter, which is posted on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/25/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Aretakis dated April 22, 2016 re: My letters and Affidavit requesting giving a statement to the Court, or a victim's impact statement has been ignored (bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph J. Santora, Esq. dated April 21, 2016 re: The Sentencing of Sheldon Silver. (bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Florence Maloney, Chair, Joint Parish Respect Life Committee, dated April 22, 2016 re: Sheldon Silver Sentence. (bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Howard R. Slonim, former President of the Lower East Side Business Improvement District re: With your indulgence, I am submitting this letter in advance of your sentencing of Mr. Silver. (bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Douglas Kremer dated 4/21/2016 re: Sheldon Silver apologizes as prosecutors seek a sentence of more than 14 years. (ft) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER (E-Mail) as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Dewey J. Benedetti dated 04/25/2016 03:29 PM re: Sheldon Silver sentencing May 3, 2016. (bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS Defendant's sentencing was previously scheduled to take place in courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants sentencing scheduled for May 3, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. will take place in courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/25/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER (E-Mail) as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Harold J. Harrison dated 04/22/2016 09:35 AM re: Sentencing for Sheldon Silver. (bw) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 194 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-550. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Silver's motion for a stay is DENIED and the government's motion to dismiss his interlocutory appeal is GRANTED. Sealed Party A's motion for a stay pending appeal is GRANTED subject, however, to a district court determination that the transcripts and documents at issue are relevant to sentencing, whereupon the stay is automatically dissolved without need for further action by this court. The United States' motion to dismiss Sealed Party A's appeal is REFERRED to the merits panel. Its motions for summary affirmance and expedited briefing are DENIED. Leave to file these motions and associated documents under seal is GRANTED to the limited extent of allowing the parties to file sealed original documents with the court with copies on the public record redacting only discussions of the materials for which a stay of unsealing is hereby granted.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/21/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 199 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-557. The parties have filed a stipulation to withdraw the appeal in docket number 16-557 with prejudice and without costs or without attorneys' fees. The stipulation is SO ORDERED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 04/20/2016. (nd) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 9, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 14, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 15, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 16, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER concerning Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Peter T. Lau, Pharmacist/Owner of Confucius Pharmacy Inc., dated April 11, 2016 re: I am writing on behalf of our legislative representative from Chinatown, Mr. Sheldon Silver. (bw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Sheldon Silver re: 241 MOTION in Limine filed by Sheldon Silver. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's and Jane Does #1 and 2's requests to continue sealing in their entirety the Government's Motion in Limine, the related oral argument transcripts, and the related briefing is DENIED. The documents will be disclosed with the limited Court- approved redactions on March 2, 2016, unless an interested party seeks an extended stay from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit on or before March 1, 2016. If an interested party seeks a stay from the Second Circuit, this Order and the documents at issue in this Order will remain under seal until the Second Circuit rules on the request for a stay. United States v. Martoma, 2014 WL 164181, at *8 (staying order unsealing documents to allow Defendant time to stay order in the Second Circuit. SO ORDERED. (***Originally filed on 2/23/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/23/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Hearing held on 2/11/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (***Originally filed on 2/11/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Manuel Ortega dated 2/17/2016 re: We represent an individual who is the subject of a motion under seal by your Honor. We understand that Court has asked the parties to submit proposed redactions to the additional documents listed under seal: proposed redactions to the February 11 sealed oral argument and to any other documents on said list; and any additional proposed redactions to the Government" Motions in Limine, Defendant's Opposition and the October 16, 2015 sealed oral argument transcript. (***Originally filed on 2/17/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Email on 2/17/2016 To: Cecilia Vogel from: Abbe D. Lowell re: Sheldon Silver. I proposed redactions to the relevant documents on your Honor's February 11, 2016 list pursuant to the Court's order. (***Originally filed on 2/17/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen and Howard S. Master and Andrew D. Goldstein dated 2/17/2016 re: Pursuant to the Court's instructions at the February 11, 2016 hearing in this matter the Government writes to provide the Court for its consideration with proposed redactions to certain filings and transcripts in the above-captioned case. The Government further requests that its proposed redaction to the documents and others that previously were the subject of Government submissions to the Court be incorporated in any filing that includes the proposed redacted documents as attachments. (***Originally filed on 2/17/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo and Justin V. Shur dated 2/17/2016 re: We write in response to the Court's directives during the February 11, 2016 hearing to advise whether we contest the Government's good faith basis for the allegations in its October 12, 2015 motion; and propose redactions to the documents currently under seal, as supplemented by the additional documents identified in Ms Vogel's email of February 12, 2016. (***Originally filed on 2/17/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo and Justin V. Shur dated 1/22/2016 re: We write pursuant to the Court's order directing the parties to submit letter briefs as to whether the Government's October 12, 2015 motion in limine, the defense's response, and the transcript of the arguments regarding the motion - all currently under seal - should be publicly disclose now that the trial has concluded. For the reasons discussed herein, we submit that these material should remain sealed. (***Originally filed 1/22/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen and Howard S. Master and Andrew D. Goldstein dated 1/22/2016 re: The Government writes pursuant to the Court's Order dated December 1, 2015 directing the parties to address "disclosure of the sealed transcript from the October 16, 2015 oral argument and the related sealed filings". As set forth, the Court should consider both the privacy interests of Third Parties and the First Amendment and common law rights of public access to court proceedings. (***Originally filed on 1/22/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Manuel Ortega dated 1/22/2016 re: To request that the motion in limine and any related materials, including briefs and transcripts, remain under permanent seal. (***Originally filed on 1/22/16 and unsealed on 4/14/16***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Abbe David Lowell dated 1/21/2016 re: I write on behalf of my client to request that the government's motion in limine concerning certain character evidence, the defense's opposition, and portions of the October 16, 2015 hearing transcript regarding same remain under seal. If the Court determines that the documents at issue should be disclosed to the public, then we request that they be disclosed in redacted form so as to protect the privacy of my client. (***Originally filed on 1/21/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. It is hereby ORDERED that: The Government must promptly provide Mr. Ortega with the relevant sealed documents. Mr. Ortega may file a letter brief under seal no later than January 22, 2016 regarding why redactions cannot be made to the sealed documents that will both preserve his client's privacy interests and make these pretrial proceedings adequately available to the public consistent with Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. Onondaga. Mr. Ortega may file proposed redactions that satisfy both interests. If Mr. Ortega intends to file a letter brief, he must first confer with the parties regarding disclosure. (***Originally filed on 1/20/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***). (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/20/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver from Abbe David Lowell dated 1/20/2016 re: Filing a letter brief asking that the materials in question remain under seal and offerings some additional redactions to the proposal we received from the government....ENDORSEMENT: Request to file under seal GRANTED. (***Originally filed on 1/20/16 and unsealed on 4/14/16***) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/20/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Email on 1/19/2016 as to Sheldon Silver. Re: Letter to Court. (***Originally filed on 1/19/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Manuel Ortega dated 1/19/2016 re: Letter from Manuel Ortega requesting that the Court direct that we be provided with the parties sealed papers relating to this matter, allow us to submit a letter on the motion, and that the Court receive this letter, and any letter we submit to the Court....ENDORSEMENT: No later than close of business on January 20, 2016, the Defendant and the Government must notify the Court whether they object to sharing the sealed documents in this case with Mr. Ortega. If neither party objects, the Government should provide Mr. Ortega with a copy of the relevant sealed documents. (***Originally filed on 1/19/16 and unsealed on 4/14/16***) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/19/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Manuel Ortega dated 1/19/2016 re: Letter by Manuel Ortega requesting that the Court direct that we be provided with the parties papers relating to this matter. (***Originally filed on 1/19/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Abbe David Lowell dated 1/14/2016 re: To request that, on behalf of the person actually involved in the motion, we can be part of the Court's consideration of this issue. The issue, among others, is whether it is fair for one side or another in a trial or proceeding to propose the use of something that might not be at all relevant or otherwise admissible, for that item not be used, but that the person involved still be injured by something that need not have been raised in the first place....ENDORSEMENT: Given that the parties do not object, the Government must provide Mr. Lowell with a copy of the relevant sealed documents. Mr. Lowell may also file a letter brief under seal no later than January 22, 2016, regarding why redactions cannot be made to the sealed documents that will both preserve his client's privacy interests and make these pretrial proceedings adequately available to the public consistent with Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. Onondaga, 453 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006). Mr. Lowell may file proposed redactions that satisfy both interests. If Mr. Lowell intends to file a letter brief, he must first confer with the parties regarding disclosure.(***Originally filed on 1/15/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/15/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER re: Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Abbe David Lowell dated 1/14/2016 re: Letter by Abbe David Lowell (***Originally filed on 1/14/2016 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Hearing held on 10/16/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (***Originally filed 10/16/15 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTION IN LIMINE CONCERNING CERTAIN CHARACTER EVIDENCE by Joel Cohen, Steven F. Molo, Robert K. Kry, Justin V. Shur re 241 Sheldon Silver (***originally filed on 10/15/2015 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***)(jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GOVERNMENT'S MOTION IN LIMINE CONCERNING CERTAIN CHARACTER EVIDENCE. Document filed by Carrie H. Cohen, Howard S. Master, Andrew D. Goldstein and James M. McDonald. (***Originally filed on 10/12/15 and unsealed on 4/14/2016***) (jw) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 240 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order as to Sheldon Silver. It is hereby ORDERED that the sealed material is relevant to sentencing. The Court's February 23, 2015 sealed Opinion and Order and related documents attached thereto (sealed envelope 192) be unsealed with the limited Court-approved redactions at 9:00am on April 15, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/14/2016)(jw) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sentencing Letter by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Dean Loren dated 4/7/2016. (jw) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS Sealed Party A has notified the Court of a scheduling conflict with the April 13, 2016 oral argument regarding the use of sealed material at sentencing; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the oral argument addressing the use of the sealed material at sentencing that was previously scheduled for April 13, 2016 is adjourned to April 14, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 443. Sealed Party A and the media intervenors are invited to participate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/11/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the parties have proposed May 3, 2016, as an alternative date for sentencing; and WHEREAS the parties, Sealed Party A, and the media intervenors have filed letters regarding the use of the sealed material at sentencing in light of the Second Circuit's March 29, 2016 Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's sentencing is rescheduled to May 3, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York 10007. 2. The parties must appear for oral argument on April 13, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 443 to address the use of the sealed material at sentencing. Sealed Party A and the media intervenors are invited to participate. 3. The deadline for the parties' sentencing submissions is adjourned to April 18, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/7/2016)(bw) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 236 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Judy Rapfogel dated 3/23/2016 re: Sentencing. (ft) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT 230 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Sheldon Silver...ENDORSEMENT...Defendant's sentencing is adjourned to May 12, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse.The deadline for the parties' sentencing submissions is adjourned to April 13, 2016. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/4/2016) (jw) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 4/4/2016 re: Sentencing/Sealed Records Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated Apr. 4, 2016 re: sealed materials at sentencing (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by NBC Universal Media, LLC as to Sheldon Silver Intervenors' Memorandum Concerning Potenbtial Unsealing in the Context of Sentencing. (Kummer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated April 1, 2016 re: Adjournment of sentencing and briefing . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Government include in its sentencing submission a summary chart containing the sentences imposed on elected state and federal officials who were convicted in federal court of corruption-related offenses in the last five years to the extent that information is not unduly burdensome to obtain. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/31/2016)(ft) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 194 Notice of Appeal, 210 Notice of Appeal, 214 Notice of Appeal, 199 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-550 (L), 16-557 (Con); 16-654 (XAP); 16-656 (XAP). Sheldon Silver, a defendant awaiting sentencing following a guilty plea, and Sealed Party A, a person referenced in materials that were the subject of a now-moot pre-trial motion in limine, move in 16-550 and 16-557, respectively, for stays pending appeal of the district court's February 23, 2016 order unsealing the transcript of court proceedings on October 16, 2015, and related documents, and for leave to file these motions and associated documents under seal. The United States moves to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for summary affirmance or expedited briefing. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Silver's motion for a stay is DENIED and the government's motion to dismiss his interlocutory appeal is GRANTED. Sealed Party A's motion for a stay pending appeal is GRANTED subject, however, to a district court determination that the transcripts and documents at issue are relevant to sentencing, whereupon the stay is automatically dissolved without need for further action by this court. The United States' motion to dismiss Sealed Party A's appeal is REFERRED to the merits panel. Its motions for summary affirmance and expedited briefing are DENIED. Leave to file these motions and associated documents under seal is GRANTED to the limited extent of allowing the parties to file sealed original documents with the court with copies on the public record redacting only discussions of the materials for which a stay of unsealing is hereby granted.Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Certified: 03/29/2016. (nd) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 225 LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Abbe David Lowell representing Sealed Party A, dated March 23, 2016 re: request for clarification. As your Honor knows, we represent Sealed Party A, a party the Court acknowledged has an interest in the motion in limine and related filings that were the subject of the Court's February 23, 2016 unsealing order. (ECF Nos. 188, 189.) Because Sealed Party A has a substantial privacy interest in the information contained in the motion in limine and related filings, we were notified of the request to unseal those documents and the Court permitted us to participate in the proceedings regarding the unsealing. The Court's decision was consistent with the general rule that a party whose interests will be affected by the Court's judgment in a criminal case may be permitted to participate in those proceedings for the limited purpose of protecting their interests. ENDORSEMENT: This Court permitted Sealed Party A to participate in certain district court proceedings because Sealed Party A had a privacy interest that was implicated and because Sealed Party A could provide valuable insight into appropriate redactions. Whether Sealed Party A has standing to appeal is for the Second Circuit to decide. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/23/2016)(bw) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Abbe David Lowell representing Sealed Party A, dated March 23, 2016 re: request for clarification (Lowell, Abbe) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 180 MOTION for New Trial ., 179 MOTION for Acquittal . . (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Desmonde Printz dated 3/4/2016 re: Clemency. (ft) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel M. Kummer appearing for USA. Intervenor NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Kummer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Edward McCraw appearing for USA. Intervenor The New York Times Company (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying without prejudice to renewal 216 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated March 7, 2016 re: 189 Order, re: Extension of Stay of Unsealing Order. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED without prejudice to renewal following the Second Circuit's decision on the Intervenor's motion for a stay from the Second Circuit. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/8/2016) (bw) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Abbe David Lowell dated 3/1/2016 re: Request for documents to remain sealed. ENDORSEMENT: Per the Court's March 1, 2016 order (Dkt. 209), the Court's February 23, 2016 sealed order and related documents will remain sealed until the Second Circuit rules on the motion for a stay pending before it. No later than March 3, 2016, Counsel must notify the Court whether he objects to this letter and endorsement being filed on the public docket and, if so, the reason for his objection. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/2/2016)(ft) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by NBC Universal Media, LLC, The New York Times Company as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from David E. McCraw dated 03/07/2016 re: Opposition to Defendant's Request for Stay Document filed by NBC Universal Media, LLC, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the interested partys March 1, 2016 letter with the Court's March 2, 2016 endorsement is to be filed on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/7/2016)(ft) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated March 7, 2016 re: 189 Order,,,, re: Extension of Stay of Unsealing Order . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 180 MOTION for New Trial ., 179 MOTION for Acquittal .. CORRECTED COPY (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL by The New York Times Company from 189 Order. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401147310. (nd) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 180 MOTION for New Trial ., 179 MOTION for Acquittal .. (Master, Howard) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 199 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-0557. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Sealed Party A's motions are REFERRED to a three-judge motions panel. It is further ORDERED that the proceedings in this matter shall be CONSOLIDATED with the proceedings on appeal in Silver v. United States, 16-550. It is further ORDERED that the motions shall be heard on an EXPEDITED basis by the next available motions panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Certified: 03/03/2016. (nd) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Sheldon Silver re: 194 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-550. For the reasons stated in this order, it is clear that this Court lacks appellate jurisdiction to consider Silver's appeal. However, as an applications judge I lack the power to dismiss the appeal. Accordingly, and upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Silver's motion to stay the District Court's order is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that proceedings in this matter are hereby CONSOLIDATED with the proceedings on appeal in Sealed Party A v. United States, Docket No. 16-557, and that Silver's motion for leave to appeal is hereby REFERRED to the motions panel that will hear motions in Sealed Party A. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit, Clerk USCA. Certified: 03/03/2016. (nd) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by NBC Universal Media, LLC as to Sheldon Silver from 189 Order. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401147260. (tp) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 208 LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Steven F. Molo dated March 1, 2016 re: stay pending appeal. On February 23, 2016, the Court entered a sealed order directing that certain materials be unsealed with redactions. The Court's order states that the documents at issue will be disclosed with redactions on March 2, 2016, unless an interested party seeks an extended stay from the Second Circuit by March 1, 2016; and that if a party does seek such a stay, the order and documents will remain under seal until the Second Circuit rules on the request. We write to inform the Court that earlier today, March 1, 2016, Mr. Silver filed with the Second Circuit a motion to stay pending his appeal of the Court's February 23, 2016 order. See United States v. Silver, No. 16-550, ECF No. 20 (2d Cir. Mar. 1, 2016) (filed under seal). We therefore request that, in accordance with the Court's order, the documents at issue remain under seal until the Second Circuit rules on Mr. Silver's motion for a stay. ENDORSEMENT: In accordance with the Court's sealed order filed on February 23, 2016, and the Court's public order filed on the same date (Dkt. 189), the Court's February 23, 2016 sealed order and the related documents will remain under seal until the Second Circuit rules on the motion for a stay pending before it. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/1/2016)(bw) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated March 1, 2016 re: stay pending appeal (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Intervenor NBCUniversal Media, LLC as to Sheldon Silver (Kummer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of of Appearance for Intervenor The New York Times Company as to Sheldon Silver (McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from David E. McCraw dated 2/26/2016 re: To request that the Court formally grant the Proposed Intervenors limited intervenor status in the above-captioned matter...ENDORSEMENT: The Court grants The New York Times Company and NBC Universal Media intervenor status with respect to the Court's February 23, 2016 sealed order regarding disclosure of certain sealed documents in this case. With respect to the request to issue a public version of the February 23, 2016 sealed order, the Court does not have jurisdiction to do so given that an appeal of that order is pending before the Second Circuit. See United States v. Rodgers, 101 F.3d. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/29/16)(jw) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from David E. Mccraw dated 2/26/2016 re: Request to approve intervenor status. (ft) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 202 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/29/2016)(ft) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 02/26/2016 re: Post-Trial Breifing Schedule Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying 198 LETTER MOTION filed by Sheldon Silver (1), addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Steven F. Molo dated February 25, 2016 re: 189 Order re: stay pending appeal. To resolve any doubts over Mr. Silver's compliance with Rule 8, Mr. Silver respectfully requests that the Court enter a stay pending the entire duration of his appeal from the unsealing order, or else clarify (as we suspect was the intent) that the temporary stay the Court entered was an implicit denial of any longer stay pending appeal. ENDORSEMENT: The Court denies Defendant's request for a stay of the Court's February 23, 2016 sealed order until Defendant's appeal of that order is resolved. The Court's February 23, 2016 sealed order, by its terms, only stays disclosure until the Second Circuit rules on a party's request for an extended stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/25/2016) (bw) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Abbe David Lowell for Sealed Party A. as to Sheldon Silver (Lowell, Abbe) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sealed Interested Party from 189 Order. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401146675. (nd) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated February 25, 2016 re: 189 Order,,,, re: stay pending appeal . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 02/11/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 02/11/2016 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016. (Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM B Filed by Sheldon Silver. No transcript ordered. (nd) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sheldon Silver from 189 Order. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401146443. (nd) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in accordance with a separate opinion filed under seal on February 23, 2016, the documents will be disclosed with the limited Court-approved redactions on March 2, 2016, unless an interested party seeks an extended stay from the U.S. Court of Appealsfor the Second Circuit on or before close of business March 1, 2016. If an interested party seeks a stay from the Second Circuit, the February 23, 2016 sealed opinion and the documents at issue in that opinion will remain under seal until the Second Circuit rules on the request for a stay. United States v. Martoma, No. S1 12 CR 973 (PGG), 2014 WL 164181, at *8 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 9, 2014) (staying order unsealing documents to allow Defendant time to seek an extended stay from the Second Circuit (citing United States v. Huntley, 943 F. Supp. 2d 383, 388 (E.D.N.Y. 2013); United States v. Amodeo, No. 92 Civ. 7744(RPP), 1994 WL 389172, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. 1994) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/23/16)(jw) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 188 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER concerning Defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Judy Schreck dated 2/18/16 re: I'm writing today to ask for your compassion in sentencing N.Y. State Assemblyman Sheldon Silver. (bw) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 2/9/2016 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court excuse Mr. Silvers presence at the hearing scheduled for February 11, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/9/2016)(ft) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Oral argument regarding disclosure of these documents shall be held on February 11, 2016, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse. 2. Counsel for the affected third parties and the media should attend the oral argument if they wish to be heard on the issue of disclosure. 3. The Court intends to conduct as much of the oral argument as possible in open court. To the extent it is necessary to close the courtroom to consider particular arguments, such as proposed redactions, the Court will do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/2/2016)(ft) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from David E. McCraw dated 1/22/2016 re: The NY Times Company to seek the unsealing of the transcript of oral argument held before this Court on October 16, 2015 (jw) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Daniels M. Kummer dated 1/22/2016 re: Request to Unseal the Transcript and Related Filings (jw) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Aretakis dated 1/20/2016 re: A letter from John Aretakis regarding Sheldon Silver (jw) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Acquittal . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 178 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER concerning defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael F. Ziolkowski dated December 26, 2015 re: In the aftermath of the conviction of New York State Assemblymember Sheldon Silver many facts have been uncovered and made part of the public record that would logically lead one to believe that the Attorneys associated with Mr. Silver's crimes, and the environment in which they took place, should be examined under the standards of the New York Rules of Professional Conduct. In Summary: A common denominator among the case of characters surrounding Mr. Silver's case is that they were almost all Licensed Attorneys. Many of them appear to have used the privileges afforded to Attorneys to further their illegal schemes. I am respectfully requesting that you refer the individuals named in this letter to the appropriate Judicial Disciplinary Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(bw) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants sentencing is scheduled for April 13, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. 2. No later than April 6, 2016, the parties must submit their sentencing submissions. SO ORDERED. (Brief due by 4/6/2016, Sentencing set for 4/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/6/2016)(ft) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence N. Gray, Esq. dated 12/16/2015 re: Albany's Transcendental Truth. (ft) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 172 LETTER MOTION Extension of deadlines as to Sheldon Silver (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. No additional extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/29/2015) (ft) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 12/26/15 re: Extension of time to file post-trial motions . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 12/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER concerning Defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Etan Leibovitz, Pro Se Litigant dated December 15th, 2015 re: Leibovitz v. City of New York et al., 14-CV-3297(RA)(JCF). I am the Plaintiff in the above-referenced lawsuit proceeding pro se. I submit this sentencing letter in hopes to provide you my sentiment towards Sheldon Silver and how he has impacted my current situation in my above-referenced suit. (bw) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER concerning Defendant Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Aretakis dated December 15, 2015 re: People v. Sheldon Silver. I write regarding the impending sentencing of Sheldon Silver. In the coming months, it is likely you will receive letters in support of a light sentence from Rabbis, Priests, Bishops and institutions that have benefited from Mr. Silver's largesse over the decades. However, what you should be aware, is not so much the 7 felonies with which he was convicted of, but the other uncharged crimes, and quid pro quo's he has engaged in for decades involving the selection and appointment of Judges and other state positions, and grants of State funds. (bw) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/30/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/30/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/25/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/25/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/24/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/24/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/23/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/23/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/19/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/19/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/18/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/18/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/17/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/17/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/16/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/16/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/13/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/13/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/12/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/12/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/10/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/10/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/9/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/9/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/5/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/5/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/4/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/3/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Trial held on 11/3/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. No later than January 11, 2016, Defendant must file his motion for a judgment of acquittal under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29. The Government must file its response to the Rule 29 motion no later than February 19, 2016, and the Defendant must file his reply no later than March 4, 2016. The parties must confer regarding disclosure of the sealed transcript from the October 16, 2015 oral argument and the related sealed filings. No later than January 22, 2015, the parties must each file a letter brief under seal regarding whether to disclose the sealed transcript and filings, and if in favor of disclosure, the parties must file proposed redactions. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/11/2016, Replies due by 3/4/2016, Responses due by 2/19/2016) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/1/2015)(ft) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    VERDICT SHEET as to Sheldon Silver. (ft) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Riley dated 11/25/2015 re: Underacted copies of all juror notes. (ft) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Instructions as to Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (jw) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/22/2015 re: Closing Statements Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/22/2015 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 11/22/15 re: Government's summation (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 11/22/2015 re: Jury Instructions (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/22/2015 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 11/22/15 re: Revised proposed jury instructions (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/20/2015 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated Nov. 20, 2015 re: Jury Instructions (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/30/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 10/30/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Sheldon Silver to Court's Proposed Jury Instructions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline Showing Changes to Proposed Charge)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/19/2015 re: Propsed Jury Charges Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Jury Instructions by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline Showing Changes to Proposed Charge)(Molo, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2015 (ka). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Acquittal . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated November 17, 2015 re: Exclude Evidence Relating to Investments . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 11/16/15 re: Evidence of disclosure forms and press statements (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/10/2015 re: curative instruction Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 11/9/2015 re: Jury Instruction Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN THE MATTER OF AN APPLICATION TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL: as to Sheldon Silver. The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned United States v. Sheldon Silver, No. 15-cr-093. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) [duration of trial]. Attorney: Steven F. Molo, Device(s): 1 mobile phone; 1 tablet. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse. Bringing any authorized Device(s) into the Courthouse or its Environs constitutes a certification by the attorney that he or she will comply in all respects with the restrictions and obligations set forth in Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/6/2015)(bw) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IN THE MATTER OF AN APPLICATION TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL: as to Sheldon Silver. The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned United States v. Sheldon Silver, No. 15-cr-093. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) Nov. 4, 2015 - [end of trial]. ...(See this Order). ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/4/2015)(bw) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 112 MOTION to Compel. (Cohen, Carrie) Modified on 11/4/2015 (ka). (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Courtroom Connect, a Southern District of New York contracted vendor, may provide the Government in the above referenced matter with Internet connectivity and Remote Real Time Transcript feeds for the duration of the trial of this matter scheduled to begin on Monday, November 2, 2015. Courtroom Connect should make proper arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court and the official court reporter. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/29/2015)(jw) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen, Howard S. Master & Andrew D. Goldstein dated 10/29/2015 re: The Government respectfully requests that Your Honor permit the Government to arrange for a Remote Real Time transcript feed that can be viewed by United States Attorney personnel outside of the courthouse during the trial in the matter scheduled to begin on November 2, 2015. (ft) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned US v Sheldon Silver. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) 10/29/15 - [end of trial]. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/28/15)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE: as to USA v. Sheldon Silver, S1 15 Cr. 093 (VEC). (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 106 Letter filed by Robert Taub. ENDORSEMENT: Given that the parties have resolved the issues concerning the subpoena served on Dr. Robert Taub, his motion to quash (Dkt. 103) is dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/27/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Robert Taub as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lisa Zornberg dated 10/27/2015 re: Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum Document filed by Robert Taub. (Zornberg, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bob Hardt dated 10/22/2015 re: Cell Phone during trial. ENDORSEMENT: This request must be directed to Mr. Edward Friedland in the District Court Executive's Office. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/26/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Counsel for the Defendant and for Dr. Richard Taub must meet and confer on or before October 26, 2015 to attempt to resolve the dispute regarding Defendants subpoena. 2. If the Defendant and Dr. Richard Taub cannot resolve this dispute, the Defendantmust file a response to the Motion to Quash by October 27, 2015 at 6:00 p.m., any reply must be filed by October 28, 2015 at noon, and the parties must appear for oral argument on Wednesday, October 28, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/23/15)(ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Document filed by Robert Taub as to Sheldon Silver. (ft) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2015: # 1 Subpoena) (ft).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lisa Zornberg dated 10/23/2015 re: We respectfully request that the Court file the motion electronically.ENDORSEMENT: As an interested party in this case, Dr. Robert Taub has the Court's permission to file electronically for the remainder of this case. The Court Clerk is respectfully requested to grant counsel for Dr. Robert Taub access to electronic filing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/23/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 10/23/2015 re: Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum (Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joanna Chung, Bureau Chief, Law, The Wall Street Journal, dated 10/22/2015 re: I'm writing to request permission for Wall Street Journal reporter Erica Orden to bring electronics into your courtroom for the duration of Sheldon Silver's trial. ENDORSEMENT: This request must be directed to Mr. Edward Friedland in the District Court Executive's Office. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/23/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the Court submitted a proposed juror questionnaire to the parties on October 16, 2015; WHEREAS the parties appeared before the Court for a Final Pretrial Conference on October 21, 2015, and resolved all objections to the proposed juror questionnaire; and WHEREAS during the Conference, the Court ordered the parties to file a list of agreed-upon challenges for cause based on the completed questionnaires by noon on October 30, 2015; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. In addition to the agreed-upon challenges for cause, by noon on October 30, 2015, the parties must also file a list of any challenges for cause on which the parties do not agree. 2. If there are any challenges for cause on which the parties do not agree, the parties must appear for a conference to discuss those challenges on Friday, October 30, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/23/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver on re: 96 LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Attorney Steven F. Molo dated 10/22/2015 re: Request for Courtroom Connect. We represent Defendant Sheldon Silver in this matter. We write to respectfully request that the Court allow us to arrange for the provision of secure high-speed wired Internet access in the courtroom during Mr. Silver's trial. Accordingly, we respectfully request that the Court allow Courtroom Connect to provide us with secure high-speed wired Internet access in the courtroom (and adjoining break-out room), and to permit Courtroom Connect to proceed to make proper arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court and the official court reporter. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 10/22/2015 re: Request for Courtroom Connect (Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 10/21/2015 re: Proposed preliminary instructions (Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS the Court submitted proposed voir dire questions to the parties on October 16, 2015; WHEREAS the parties appeared before the Court for a Final Pretrial Conference on October 21, 2015, and addressed changes to the proposed voir dire questions; and WHEREAS the Court now proposes an additional revision to the voir dire questions not discussed during the Final Pretrial Conference; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Court intends to delete the following two questions from the voir dire: question 16 (Taped conversations may be introduced into evidence in this trial. I instruct you that these recorded conversations were properly obtained and that it is proper for this evidence to be introduced at trial for your consideration. Do you have any opinions about the use of evidence obtained by law enforcement through the use of recorded conversations that might affect your ability to be a fair and impartial juror in this case?); and question 17(2) (pled guiltyto their criminal conduct pursuant to what is called a cooperation agreement with the government). 2. The parties must file any objections to the revisions proposed above no later than close of business on October 22, 2015. 3. Counsel for Defendant must file on the ECF case docket the letter emailed to theCourt and to the Government on October 21, 2015 regarding the Courts proposed preliminary jury instructions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/21/15)(ajc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tuongvy Le appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Le, Tuongvy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin Michael Ellis appearing for Sheldon Silver. Appearance Type: Retained. (Ellis, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS one of the parties to this action filed a motion in limine under seal on October 13, 2015; WHEREAS the other party filed a response under seal on October 15, 2015; WHEREAS the motion was considered at a closed hearing on October 16, 2015, and denied; and WHEREAS WNBC sent a letter to the Court on October 20, 2015, requesting that all documents in this case be unsealed in light of the public interest in the case; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Pursuant to the factors set forth in Waller v. Georgia, 467 U.S. 39, 48 (1984), it is necessary that these filings and the corresponding sealed portion of the record remain under seal for the duration of the trial. Fully stating the basis for sealing the documents and the oral argument record would reveal the information sought to be protected. In the event this decision is appealed, the sealed record contains the full basis for sealing the filings and the record. 2. Having considered alternatives and fully taking into consideration the public interest in court proceedings generally and this criminal trial in particular, Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d Cir. 2006), the Court determined that there is no alternative to sealing the filings and the oral argument record. The Court specifically considered whether the motions could be redacted and unsealed and determined that, at this time, redaction could not be accomplished in a way that would yield a meaningful document without compromising the privacy interests of third parties and the fair trial interests of the Government and the Defendant. 3. After the completion of the trial, the Court will reconsider whether the filings and the oral argument record can be redacted and unsealed or should remain under seal pursuant to the Waller v. Georgia factors. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/21/2015)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jonathan Dierist dated 10/20/2015 re: Unsealing of Documents. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated October 20, 2015 re: Rule 803(3) Evidence (Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM ORDER: denying 53 Motion in Limine as to Sheldon Silver (1). The Court assumes familiarity with the facts and posture of this case. Defendant Sheldon Silver moved in limine to preclude the Government from offering any evidence of campaign contributions from the real estate developer Glenwood Management ("Glenwood") to Silver, to others in New York State government or to political action committees. Dkt. 53. For the following reasons, the Defendant's motion is DENIED....[See this Memorandum Order]... CONCLUSION: For the above-stated reasons, the Defendant's motion in limine to exclude evidence of Glenwood's campaign contributions is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2015) (bw) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN THE MATTER OF AN APPLICATION TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC DEVICE(S) OR GENERAL PURPOSE COMPUTING DEVICE(S) INTO THE COURTHOUSES OF THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK FOR USE IN A PROCEEDING OR TRIAL: as to Sheldon Silver. The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned United States v. Sheldon Silver, No. 15-CR-093. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) November 2, 2015 - [end of trial]. 1. Attorney Steven Molo, Device(s): One Blackberry smartphone; 2. Attorney Justin Shur, Device(s): One iPhone; 3. Attorney Tuongvy Le, Device(s): One laptop computer, one iPhone; 4. Attorney Justin Ellis, Device(s): One laptop computer, one iPhone; 5. Attorney Britt Hamilton, Device(s): One laptop computer, one iPhone; 6. Attorney Joel Cohen, Device(s): Two mobile phones; 7. Attorney Dale Degenshein, Device(s): One laptop computer, one iPhone; 8. Attorney Amanda Maslar, Device(s): One iPhone; 9. Thomas Lee (Courtroom technician), Device(s): Two laptop computers; hard drives; computer peripherals. The attorney(s) identified in this Order must present a copy of this Order when entering the Courthouse. Bringing any authorized Device(s) into the Courthouse or its Environs constitutes a certification by the attorney that he or she will comply in all respects with the restrictions and obligations set forth in Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/20/2015)(bw) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Howard S. Master dated 10/19/15 re: Rule 803(3) Evidence Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Master, Howard) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Andrew D. Goldstein dated October 16, 2015 re: U.S. v. Silver, S1 15 Cr. 093 Document filed by USA. (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 10/15/2015 re: 10/15/2015 Letter from J. Riley (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Riley dated 10/15/2015 re: I am a reporter with Newsday, covering the case of U.S. v. Silver, 15CR00093. I am writing for the second time with regard to the defense's use of the word "confidential" in its proposed juror questionnaire (jw) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/7/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 10/7/15 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Produce -- DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR A WITNESS LIST AND OTHER RELIEF. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. The other party must file a response under seal no later than close of business October 15, 2015. At oral argument on October 16, 2015 at 2:30 p.m., scheduled by the Courts October 7, 2015 Order (Dkt. 75), the parties must be ready to discuss whether, consistent with Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119-20 (2d. Cir. 2006), the motion and response should be redacted and unsealed before or after trial or whether they should remain sealed. The defendant, Mr. Sheldon Silver, must appear at oral argument on October 16, 2015 and at the final pretrial conference on October 21, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 10/16/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni, Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/14/2015)(ft) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 77 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver ( Oral Argument set for 10/16/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for use of a written juror questionnaire is GRANTED. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the contents of the proposed juror questionnaire. By Wednesday, October 14, 2015, the parties shall submit a jointly proposed questionnaire to the Court, and shall e-mail a Word version of the proposed document to the Court. To the extent the parties are unable to agree on particular questions, each party should indicate its respective position below each proposed question in dispute. The Government is directed to provide the Court with a copy of its exhibit list and itsJencks Act materials by October 13, 2015. In addition to an electronic version (if that is the manner of production to the Defense), the Jencks Act materials should be provided to the Court in tabbed binders with an index. The parties shall appear before the Court for oral arguments on their Motions in Limine on October 16, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/7/2015)(jw) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John Riley dated 10/7/2015 re: I write with regard to a juror questionnaire the defense has proposed (jw) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 54 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Compliance with Disclosure Laws., 53 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Glenwood Management Corp.'s Campaign Contributions., 52 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Obtain a Property Tax Reduction., 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Public Corruption Cases. . (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Sheldon Silver re: 56 MOTION in Limine . . (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Sheldon Silver. The parties shall appear before the Court on Wednesday, October 7, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the issues raisedin Defendant's motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/2/15)(ajc) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen dated October 2, 2015 re: Defendant's October 1, 2015 Motion Document filed by USA. (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request To Charge by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Master, Howard) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Goldstein, Andrew) Modified on 10/2/2015 (ka). (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated October 1, 2015 re: 63 FIRST MOTION for Discovery . re: Conference . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. Return Date set for 10/5/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST MOTION for Discovery . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. Return Date set for 10/7/2015 at 06:00 PM. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re: 54 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Compliance with Disclosure Laws., 53 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Glenwood Management Corp.'s Campaign Contributions., 52 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Obtain a Property Tax Reduction., 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Public Corruption Cases.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Sheldon Silver re 56 MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Molo, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 54 MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Compliance with Disclosure Laws., 53 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Glenwood Management Corp.'s Campaign Contributions., 52 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Obtain a Property Tax Reduction., 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Public Corruption Cases.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Andrew) Modified on 10/1/2015 (ka). (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA as to Sheldon Silver . (Master, Howard) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 57 LETTER MOTION Extention as to Sheldon Silver (1), re: short extension to the deadlines for the remaining briefing of motions in limine, such that the deadline for response briefs would be extended from todays date. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/25/15) (ajc) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Andrew D. Goldstein dated September 25, 2015 re: Extension of Time for Briefing Motions in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Motion pages 19-39, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Cohen, Carrie) Modified on 9/14/2015 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence of Compliance with Disclosure Laws. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Glenwood Management Corp.'s Campaign Contributions. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Obtain a Property Tax Reduction. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Public Corruption Cases. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 49 LETTER MOTION Extension of Motion Deadline as to Sheldon Silver (1). ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/1/2015) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven F. Molo dated 8/31/2015 re: Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine . Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Bill of particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA as to Sheldon Silver . (Master, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen, Howard S. Master, Andrew D. Goldstein and James M. McDonald re: The Government respectfully requests that time in the above-captioned action be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), from today's date, July 23, 2015, through the first day of trial, November 2, 2015..ENDORSEMENT: Time in the above-captioned action shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(A) from July 24, 2015 through November 2, 2015. For the reasons articulated above, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by the granting the requested continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. SO ORDERED. Time excluded from 7/24/15 until 11/2/15. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/24/2015)(jw) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER terminating 39 Motion to Dismiss as to Sheldon Silver. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants Motion is DENIED. No later than August 14, 2015, the Government is ORDERED to provide the Defendant with a limited Bill of Particulars or to show cause why it should not be ordered to provide Defendant with a Bill of Particulars detailing the specific mailings and wire transmissions on which it will rely to prove the mail and wire fraud charges. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motion at docket number 39. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/24/15) (jw) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Carrie H. Cohen dated 7/23/15 re: Speedy Trial Exclusion Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Carrie H. Cohen dated June 30, 2015 re: U.S. v. Silver Document filed by USA. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Sheldon Silver addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven Molo and Joel Cohen dated June 29, 2015 re: Supplemental Authority for Motion to Dismiss (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Sheldon Silver re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment. . (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 39 MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment.. (Master, Howard) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INTERNET CITATION NOTE as to Sheldon Silver: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 31 Memorandum & Opinion. (vf) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Superseding Indictment. Document filed by Sheldon Silver. (Molo, Steven) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sheldon Silver. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sheldon Silver re: Conference held on 4/28/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's deadline to file any Motion to Dismiss the Superseding Indictment shall be May 28, 2015. The Government's Opposition deadline shall be June 12, 2015. Defendant's Reply deadline shall be June 19, 2015. 2. The following pretrial and trial deadlines and dates shall apply: Motions in Limine shall be due September 4, 2015. Responses to Motions in Limine shall be due September 18, 2015. Proposed Voir Dire questions and Requests to Charge shall be due October 1, 2015. The final pretrial conference will be held on October 21, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Trial shall commence on November 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/4/2015, Replies due by 6/19/2015, Responses due by 9/18/2015, Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/13/2015)(ft) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. WHEREAS by Order dated April 24, 2015 (Dkt. 34), the parties were directed to appear before the Court for Defendant's arraignment on the Superseding Indictment at 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 29, 2015; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the arraignment previously set for April 29, 2015 shall be cancelled and rescheduled for Tuesday, April 28, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/27/2015) (bw) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss as to Sheldon Silver (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Indictment is DENIED as moot. 2. The parties are directed to appear before the Court in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, for an arraignment on the Superseding Indictment at 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 29, 2015. The parties should also be prepared to discuss their proposals for briefing any motion to dismiss the Superseding Indictment. 3. The status conference previously scheduled for May 7, 2015 shall be terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/24/2015) (ft) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Sheldon Silver re 29 MOTION to Dismiss .. (Cohen, Carrie) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Sheldon Silver (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s. (jbo) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Sheldon Silver. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendant's Motion is DENIED. Nevertheless, the parties are cautioned that this case is to be tried in the courtroom and not in the press. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the open motions at docket numbers 12 and 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/10/2015)(ft) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,837 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?