Tice v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-05200
District Judge John Gleeson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 11:37 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Katie Tice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANDREW B. BULLION +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 abullion@hausfeldllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW B. BULLION +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 abullion@hausfeldllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com
Space Paul Thomas Gallagher +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 pgallagher@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald L. Perelman +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 dperelman@finekaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freedman Boyd Daniels Hollander & Goldberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. Garcia +1 505 842 9960 +1 505 842 0761

Toggle Switch Represented by Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Goldberg +1 505 842 9960 +1 505 842 0761 jg@fbdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary B. Friedman +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 gfriedman@flgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Gustafson +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dgustafson@gustafsongluek.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C. Hedlund +1 612 333 8844 +1 612 339 6622 dhedlund@gustafsongluek.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hulett Harper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie L. Dieringer +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 sldieringer@hulettharper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Stewart +1 619 338 1133 +1 619 338 1139 dstewart@hulettharper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The David Danis Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Flannery +1 314 725 7700

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Noah Shube

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Shube +1 212 274 8638 +1 212 966 8652 nshube@nsfirm.com
v.
No Logo AC Cargo LP, Defendant
No Logo Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Air Canada, Defendant
No Logo Air France ADS, Defendant
No Logo Air France Cargo ADS, Defendant
No Logo Air France-KLM Cargo ADS, Defendant
No Logo Air France-KLM Group ADS, Defendant
No Logo Asiana Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc, Defendant
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant
No Logo Cargolux Airlines International S.A., Defendant
No Logo Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Ag, Defendant
No Logo International Air Transport Association, Defendant
No Logo Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo John Does I-X, Defendant
No Logo Korean Airlines Company, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Lan Airlines S.a., Defendant
No Logo Lan Cargo S.A., Defendant
No Logo Lufthansa Cargo Ag, Defendant
No Logo Nippon Cargo Airlines Co. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Polar Air Cargo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAS AB, Defendant
No Logo SAS Cargo Group A/S, Defendant
No Logo Singapore Airlines Cargo Pte Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Singapore Airlines Cargo PTE Limited"
No Logo Singapore Airlines Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Singapore Airlines Limited"
No Logo Swiss International Air Lines Ltd., Defendant
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant
No Logo United Airlines Cargo Inc., Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Virgin Atlantic Airways Limited"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Plaintiffs represented by (please see attached list). Defendants represented by (please see attached list). Fairness Hearing regarding proposed settlements held on 1/16/2015 re (2082 in 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP) Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion for an Interim Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by All Plaintiffs, (2080 in 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP) Notice of MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Korean Air Lines Co., Ltd., Singapore Airlines Limited and Singapore Airlines Cargo Pte, Ltd., Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd., and China Airlines filed by All Plaintiffs. The Court's decision is reserved and will be filed via ECF separately. Transcript requests should be emailed to: Sherry_Bryant@nyed.uscourts.gov (Court Reporter Sherry Bryant.) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Lee, Ilene) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER in case 1:06-cv-00706-JG-VVP; granting (2043) Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP. The Court has largely adopted the proposed order and exhibits. Counsel is respectfully directed to modify the exhibits to bring the dates in line with the order. A final fairness hearing will be held Friday, January 16, 2015, at 10:00am in Courtroom 6C South. Papers in support of the settlements here at issue shall be filed by December 1, 2014. Any objection to the settlement shall be filed by December 26, 2014 pursuant to the procedure outlined in the order. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice, # 2 Exhibit Publication Notice, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Claim Form) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 23, 2014, before Judge Pohorelsky. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald E. Tolkin, Official Court Reporter, Telephone number 718-613-2647. Email address: ronald_tolkin@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Tolkin, Ronald) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Matthew McCahill Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (McCahill, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Letter to Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky enclosing courtsey copies of Motion to Amend Practice and Procedure Order Nos. 2 and 6 by All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Practice and Procedure Order Nos. 2 and 6 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1717 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1719 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; granting 1720 Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1719 motion for final approval of Plaintiffs' settlement agreements with (1) Lan Airlines, S.A., Lan Cargo, S.A., and Aerolinhas Brasileiras, S.A. (collectively, "Lan"); (2) British Airways plc ("British Airways"); (3) South African Airways Ltd. ("South African"); (4) Malaysia Airlines ("Malaysia"); (5) Saudia Arabian Airlines, Ltd. ("Saudia"); (6) Emirates Airline d/b/a Emirates ("Emirates"); (7) El Al Israel Airlines Ltd. ("El Al"); (8) Air Canada and AC Cargo LP (collectively, "Air Canada"); and (9) Salvatore Sanfilippo. Final judgments of dismissal as to the settling defendants will be entered separately. The Court also grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1720 motion for final approval of the plan of allocation. The Court grants counsel's 1717 request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses to the extent set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/2/2012. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Talbott, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of Withdrawal as counsel / change of firm. by Andreas Stargard NOTICE of Withdrawal as counsel / change of firm Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Stargard, Andreas) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-5237775. by China Airlines, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Blair, Kevin) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter dated 10/10/2011 from Alexander Italianer, Director General of the European Commission to Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                        Letter requesting clarification of this Court's May 23, 2011 Order granting Plaintiff's "motion to compel production of documents" by Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG -VVP et al. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None
                          Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Korean Air Company, Ltd.. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG -VVP et al. (Hewitt, Aaron) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Korean Air Company, Ltd.. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG -VVP et al. (Hewitt, Aaron) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                              Email sent to District of Columbia from EDNY advising them that they can close their case in the District of Columbia. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 06 CV 0809(HHK). Original file with documents numbered 1-2, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., COMPLAINT originally filed on 05/02/2006 in District bof Columbia against all defendants, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Marziliano, August) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                  Enclosed MDL Panel's Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) (from District of Columbia, case #06-809). (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?