USA v. Londono
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:98-cr-10109-RCL

Tags
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 1:09 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gavin A. Corn +1 202 305 1834
v.
No Logo Londoño, Gustavo A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Gustavo Londoño"
No Logo Maria Lucia Florez, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 4/8/1998
County Middlesex
Terminated 11/15/1999
Reopened
Magistrate Case
198-mj-01009
Citation
Offense Level
21846 conspire and knowingly intend to distribute cocaine [ 198-m -1009 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 - CONSPIRACY TO DISTRIBUTE AND TO POSSESS WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE, COCAINE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 2 - POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE AND DISTRIBUTION OF COCAINE; AIDING AND ABETTING
Count 3
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 2 - POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE AND DISTRIBUTION OF COCAINE; AIDING AND ABETTING
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 105 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
Transcript of proceedings of Sentencing held on July 27, 1999 hearing date: before Judge: Honorable Reginald C. Lindsay, as to Maria L. Florez , Court Reporter: Teri Gibson., filed. (sat)
    LREF
    Blank 104 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001, Terminated: 1/4/2001 Motion for Clarification
    MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono for clarification of [0-0] endorsed order , and to seal/impound , filed; c/s. SEALED DOCUMENT. (sat)
      LREF
      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [104-1] motion for clarification of [0-0] endorsed order as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [104-2] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1). Copy sent to counsel on 1/5/01. (sat)
        LREF
        Blank 103 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
        RESPONSE by USA as to Gustavo Londono in opposition to [101-1] motion to compel, filed; c/s. SEALED DOCUMENT. (sat)
          LREF
          Blank 102 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Motion to Seal
          MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono to seal/impound , to extend time to 12/22/00 to respond to sealed motion. , filed; c/s. (sat)
            LREF
            Blank 101 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/15/2000, Terminated: 12/21/2000 Motion to Compel
            MOTION by Gustavo Londono to compel , to seal/impound this motion , filed; c/s. (sat)
              LREF
              Blank  Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSEMENT as to Maria L. Florez, re: [100-1] remark.....Approved for CJA payment. Copy sent to counsel on 8/29/00. (sat)
                LREF
                Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/8/2000 Letter (non-motion)
                Letter (non-motion) filed by Maria L. Florez , dated: July 7, 2000, re: requesting copy of transcript. (sat)
                  LREF
                  Blank 99 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000, Terminated: 5/16/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Ex Parte MOTION by Gustavo Londono SEALED MOTION , filed. (sat)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 Letter (non-motion)
                    Letter (non-motion) filed by Maria L. Florez dated: March 27, 2000, re: letter for Immingration. (sat)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 97 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Letter (non-motion)
                      Letter (non-motion) by Lisa M. Hourihan to Maria L. Florez filed as to Maria L. Florez , dated: March 20, 2000, re: responding to her letter of 2/12/00. (sat)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 Letter (non-motion)
                        Letter (non-motion) filed by Maria L. Florez, dated: February 12, 2000, re: ongoing threats to her life. (sat) Modified on 02/17/2000
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: 12/28/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by Gustavo Londono for return of property , filed; c/s. (sat)
                            LREF
                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez: Denying Motion for transcripts #89.....Because this request does not appear to be for a transcript for purposes of appeal or other review of sentencing, it is denied. Copy sent to counsel on 12/28/99. (sat)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. JUDGMENT entered Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1, 2 , 3. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 70 month(s). The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervisied release for a term of 5 year(s). The defendant shall report to the probation office in the district to which the defendant is released within 72 hours of release from the custody of the Bureau of Prisons. The defendant shall not committ another federal, state, or local crime. The defendant shall not illegally possess a controlled substance. The defendant shall not possess a firearm. The Standard Conditions of Supervision are entered. Special Conditions of Supervision: If ordered deported, the defendant is to leave the United States and is not to return without prior permission of the United States Attorney General. The defendant shall pay a Special Assessment in the amount of $300.00. (sat)
                                LREF
                                Blank 93 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono re: sentencing held. The court finds the Total Offense Level to be 25 and the Criminal History Category to be II. The court orders the defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 70 months. Upon release, the defendant is placed on Supervised Release for a term of 5 years with Special Conditions. The court further imposes a Special Assessment of $300.00. Court Reporter: Teri Gibson. (sat)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maria L. Florez , re service of [90-1] affidavit, [89-1] motion for copy of transcript(s) at government expense, [91-1] motion to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis), filed. (sat)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                    MOTION by Maria L. Florez to proceed without prepayment of fees (in forma pauperis) , filed. (sat)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Maria Lucia Florez, re: [89-1] motion for copy of transcript(s) at government expense, filed. (sat)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 89 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/15/1999, Terminated: 11/17/1999 Motion for Transcripts at Government Expense
                                        MOTION by Maria L. Florez for copy of transcript(s) at government expense , filed. (sat)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 Letter (non-motion)
                                          Letter (non-motion) filed by Marta Delossantos, Legal Assistant for Lenore Glaser attorney for Gustavo Londono , dated: October 15, 1999, re: requesting a copy of docket sheet. (copy sent on 10/21/99). (sat)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Procedural order re sentencing hearing as to Gustavo Londono entered. set Sentencing for 2:30 11/15/99 for Gustavo Londono . Copy sent to counsel on 8/19/99. (sat)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 86 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, re: change of plea hearing held. Interpreter sworn. Defendant retracts previous plea of not guilty and enters plea of guilty to Counts 1 - 3 of the Indictment. Court finds factual basis, the plea is accepted and entered. set Sentencing for 2:30 11/15/99 for Gustavo Londono ; Court Reporter: Teri Gibson. (sat)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999, Terminated: 8/4/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION by USA, as to Maria L. Florez to dismiss Count One of the Indictment , filed. (sat)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [85-1] motion to dismiss Count One of the Indictment as to Maria L. Florez (2). Copy sent to counsel on 8/4/99. (sat)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. JUDGMENT entered Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 3. The defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 30 month(s). The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the nearest institution to her 11 year old daughter who lives in Connecticut. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, the defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 3 year(s). The defendant shall report to the probation office in the district to which the defendant is released within 72 hours of release from the custody of the Bureau of Prisons. The defendant shall not commit another federal, state, or local crime. The defendant shall not illegally possess a controlled substance. The defendant shall not possess a firearm. The Standard Conditions of Supervision are entered. Special Conditions of Supervision: If ordered deported, the defendant is to leave the United States and is not to return without prior permission of the United States Attorney General. The defendant shall pay a Special Assessment in the amount of $100.00. (sat)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  JS-3 Closing Information
                                                      **JS3 Closing Card for Maria L. Florez Terminated Defendant Maria L. Florez (sat)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. CLERK'S NOTES as to Maria L. Florez, re: sentencing held. The court finds the Total Offense Level to be 19 and the Criminal History Category to be I. The court orders the defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 30 months. Upon release, the defendant is placed on Supervised Release for a term of 3 years. The court furhter imposes a Special Assessment in the amount of $100.00. Government moves orally to Dismiss Count 1; allowed. Court Reporter: Teri Gibson. (sat)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Maria L. Florez, filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion
                                                            DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Maria L. Florez . Counts Dismissed: Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 1 (sat)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Sentencing
                                                              Sentencing held Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 3. (sat)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Set Deadlines
                                                                NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Gustavo Londono, set Change of Plea Hearing for 11:00 8/19/99 for Gustavo Londono . Notice sent to counsel on 7/7/99. (sat)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Gustavo Londono, by Attorney Lenore Glaser; c/s. (sat)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                    Letter (non-motion) filed by Lenore Glaser, dated: 6/28/99, re: Mr. Londono has requested that the motion to withdraw as appointed counsel be withdrawn and that Ms. Glaser continue with his representation. (lmh)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [78-1] motion to continue change of plea hearing as to Maria L. Florez (2), RESET Sentencing for 3:00 7/27/99 for Maria L. Florez . Copy sent to counsel on 6/15/99. (sat)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999, Terminated: 6/15/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                        Assented-to MOTION by Maria L. Florez to continue change of plea hearing , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999, Terminated: 6/28/1999 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          MOTION by Gustavo Londono for Lenore Glaser to withdraw as attorney , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono . Time ordered excluded from 5/24/99 to 7/28/99. SEALED DOCUMENT. Copy sent to counsel on 6/8/99. (sat)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono . Time ordered excluded from 6/3/99 to 6/3/99. Copy sent to counsel on 6/4/99. (sat)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 Motion to Seal
                                                                                Assented-to MOTION by Gustavo Londono to seal/impound , and for order of excludable delay for the period of time from May 24, 1999 to July 28, 1999 pursuant to: 18 U.S.C.Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) , filed; c/s. SEALED DOCUMENT. (sat)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999, Terminated: 6/3/1999 Motion to Seal
                                                                                  Assented-to MOTION by Gustavo Londono to seal/impound , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [104-1] motion for clarification of [0-0] endorsed order as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [104-2] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1). Copy sent to counsel on 1/5/01. (sat)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [101-1] motion to compel as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [101-2] motion to seal/impound this motion as to Gustavo Londono (1). Copy sent to counsel on 12/22/00. (sat)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                        Letter (non-motion) filed by Lenore Glaser , dated: May 4, 1999, re: confirming that the change of plea hearing will be at 2:00 P.M. (sat)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 3/24/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. Procedural order re sentencing hearing as to Maria L. Florez entered. set Sentencing for 2:30 6/14/99 for Maria L. Florez . Notice sent to counsel on 3/24/99. (sat)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [102-1] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [102-2] motion to extend time to 12/22/00 to respond to sealed motion. as to Gustavo Londono (1), Response to motion reset to 12/22/00 for Gustavo Londono for [101-1] motion to compel . Copy sent to counsel on 11/28/00. (sat)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 Plea Agreement
                                                                                              Plea Agreement as to Maria L. Florez, filed. (sat)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/24/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. CLERK'S NOTES as to Maria L. Florez, re: change of plea hearing held. Plea agreement filed. Defendant retracts previous plea of not guilty and enters plea of guilty to Count 3 of the Indictment. Court finds factual basis, the plea is accepted and entered. set Sentencing for 2:30 6/14/99 for Maria L. Florez ; Court Reporter: Teri Gibson (sat)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [99-1] motion SEALED MOTION as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [99-1] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1). (sat)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                    PLEA entered by Maria L. Florez. Court accepts plea. Guilty: Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 3 (sat)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000, Terminated: 5/16/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION by Gustavo Londono SEALED MOTION , filed. (sat)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Rule 11 Hearing
                                                                                                        Change of Plea Hearing as to Maria L. Florez held. (sat)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                          MOTION by Gustavo Londono to continue plea (assented to) , filed. (lau)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                                            Judgment Returned Executed as to Gustavo Londono ; on 12/10/99. (sat)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. PRETRIAL ORDER entered as to Maria L. Florez :, set Jury trial for 9:00 3/22/99 for Maria L. Florez . Copy sent to counsel on 2/11/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono: granting [95-1] motion for return of property as to Gustavo Londono (1).....The motion by defendant for the return of his property is granted. Copy sent to counsel on 1/14/00. (sat)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. CLERK'S NOTES as to Maria L. Florez, re: status conference held; trial estimate one week. set Jury trial for 9:00 3/22/99 for Maria L. Florez Pretrial Order issued. Court Reporter: Teri Gibson (sat)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                    Status conference as to Maria L. Florez held. (sat)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 2/2/99 to 2/3/99. Notice sent to counsel on 2/8/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  JS-3 Closing Information
                                                                                                                        **JS3 Closing Card for Gustavo Londono Terminated Defendant Gustavo Londono (sat)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 1/26/99 to 2/8/99. Notice sent to counsel on 2/4/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Terminate Criminal Case
                                                                                                                            Case closed as to all defendants, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez (sat)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                              Letter (non-motion) filed by Alex Ramirez dated: January 27, 1999, re: the defendant, Maria Florez. (sat)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                Assented-to MOTION by USA, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez to continue status conference , and for order of excludable delay for the of time from January 26, 1999 to February 8, 1999 pursuant to: 18 U.S.C.Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Sentencing
                                                                                                                                  Sentencing held Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (sat)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. Final STATUS REPORT filed by Magistrate as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez. Notice sent to counsel on 1/21/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 12/22/98 to 12/28/98. Notice sent to counsel on 1/12/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 1/6/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 12/18/98 to 1/26/99. Notice sent to counsel on 1/6/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                          PLEA entered by Gustavo Londono. Court accepts plea. Guilty: Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 (sat)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 12/29/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 12/9/98 to 12/14/98. Notice sent to counsel on 12/29/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Rule 11 Hearing
                                                                                                                                              Change of Plea Hearing as to Gustavo Londono held. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                Assented-to MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for order of excludable delay for the period of time from December 18, 1998 to January 26, 1999 pursuant to: 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                  Letter (non-motion) filed by Gustavo Londono by Lenore Glaser, dated: December 16, 1998, re: requesting that the Marshals transport her client to the court on 12/21/98 so that she could speak to him before the hearing. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [77-1] motion for Lenore Glaser to withdraw as attorney (Terminated attorney Lenore Glaser for Gustavo Londono as to Gustavo Londono (1). The clerk shall seek new counsel from the CJA list cc/cl (lmh)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998, Terminated: 12/14/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez to set trial date , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: 10/23/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono . Time ordered excluded from 10/19/98 to 10/19/98. Notice sent to counsel on 10/23/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998, Terminated: 10/19/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Gustavo Londono to extend time to December 2, 1998 to file discovery motions , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [75-1] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1), granting [75-2] motion for order of excludable delay for the period of time from May 24, 1999 to July 28, 1999 pursuant to: 18 U.S.C.Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) as to Gustavo Londono (1). Copy sent to counsel on 6/7/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 9/30/98 to 10/8/98. Notice sent to counsel on 10/14/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 10/7/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono. Time ordered excluded from 10/5/98 to 10/5/98. Notice sent to counsel on 10/7/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [73-1] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1). Copy sent to counsel on 6/3/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated as to Gustavo Londono ;, RESET Change of Plea Hearing for 2:00 5/25/99 for Gustavo Londono . (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      Assented-to MOTION by Gustavo Londono to extend time to October 15, 1998 to file discovery motion late , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez :, reset Change of Plea Hearing for 11:00 3/22/99 for Gustavo Londono, for Maria L. Florez . Entered cc/cl (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez :, reset Change of Plea Hearing for 11:00 3/22/99 for Gustavo Londono, for Maria L. Florez . Entered cc/cl (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for protective order , and to seal/impound , filed. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [48-1] motion for Bernard Grossberg to withdraw as attorney (Terminated attorney Bernard Grossberg for Maria L. Florez as to Maria L. Florez (2). Entered (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 1/26/99 to 2/8/99. Notice sent to counsel on 2/4/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Maria L. Florez for Bernard Grossberg to withdraw as attorney , filed. (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Maria L. Florez , by Attorney David A. Cooper. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez to extend time to 8/18/98 to file discovery motions , filed. (seh)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Reginald C. Lindsay . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 7/1/98 to 7/14/98. (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : denying [43-1] motion to revoke detention order as to Maria L. Florez (2).....Because the court is in substantial agreement with the points made by the government in opposition to this motion, the motion is denied. Notice sent to counsel on 7/14/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: 7/9/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono. Time ordered excluded from 6/16/98 to 7/2/98. Notice sent to counsel on 7/8/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Maria L. Florez in support of [43-1] motion to revoke detention order, filed c/s (sad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 7/1/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Maria L. Florez to revoke detention order , filed. c/s (sad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [57-1] motion for order of excludable delay for the period of time from December 18, 1998 to January 26, 1999 pursuant to: 18 U.S.C. Sec. 3161(h)(8)(A) as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). Notice sent to counsel on 1/5/99. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Gustavo Londono and USA to extend time to 7/31/98 to file discovey motions , filed. (seh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Gustavo Londono for joinder [39-1] motion to extend time to June 26, 1998 for filing discovery motions , filed. (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [55-1] motion to set trial date as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2), set status conference for 2:30 12/21/98 for Gustavo Londono, for Maria L. Florez . Notice sent to counsel on 12/14/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [39-1] motion to extend time to June 26, 1998 for filing discovery motions as to Maria L. Florez (2). Entered (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/16/1998, Terminated: 6/19/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Maria L. Florez to extend time to June 26, 1998 for filing discovery motions , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Maria L. Florez . Time ordered excluded from 5/20/98 to 5/21/98. (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Gustavo Londono . Time ordered excluded from 5/20/98 to 5/21/98. (lau)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [53-1] motion to extend time to December 2, 1998 to file discovery motions as to Gustavo Londono (1), RESET motion filing deadline for 12/2/98 for Gustavo Londono . Notice sent to counsel on 10/19/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [49-1] motion for protective order as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2), granting [49-2] motion to seal/impound as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [35-1] motion to extend time to June 10, 1998 to file discovery motions as to Maria L. Florez (2), RESET motion filing deadline for 6/10/98 for Maria L. Florez . Notice sent to counsel on 5/22/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998, Terminated: 5/21/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented-to MOTION by Gustavo Londono to extend time to June 10, 1998 to file discovery motions , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998, Terminated: 5/21/1998 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Maria L. Florez to extend time to June 10, 1998 to file discovery motions , filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Reginald C. Lindsay Referral to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez [49-1] motion for protective order to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2), [49-2] motion to seal/impound Purpose: for ruling (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Reginald C. Lindsay Referral to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez [49-1] motion for protective order to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2), [49-2] motion to seal/impound Purpose: for ruling (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by USA to Uniform Order on Automatic Discovery as to Gustavo Londono, filed. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by USA to Uniform Order on Automatic Discovery as to Maria L. Florez, filed. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [50-1] motion to extend time to October 15, 1998 to file discovery motion late as to Gustavo Londono (1). Notice sent to counsel on 10/5/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Maria L. Florez , by Attorney Bernard Grossberg, filed. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez, re: arraignment; Spanish Interpreter, G. Hadad. Arraignment held; defendants plead not guilty to all counts. The court sets schedule and issues standing orders re: Criminal motions and Speedy Trial Act. set motion filing deadline for 5/20/98 for Gustavo Londono, for Maria L. Florez , set Response to motion filing deadline 6/3/98 ; Government Response to U.O.A.D. due 4/29/98. Court Reporter: Tape 98 (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono: granting [41-1] joint motion to extend time to 7/31/98 to file discovey motions as to Gustavo Londono (1), RESET motion filing deadline for 7/31/98 for Gustavo Londono . Notice sent to counsel on 7/2/98. (lmh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/17/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for USA , by Attorney Gavin A. Corn, filed; c/s. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [40-1] motion for joinder [39-1] motion to extend time to June 26, 1998 for filing discovery motions as to Gustavo Londono (1). (efs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [40-1] motion for joinder [39-1] motion to extend time to June 26, 1998 for filing discovery motions as to Gustavo Londono (1). (efs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : denying [28-1] motion for reconsideration of [19-1] detention order as to Maria L. Florez (2). "no new information has been presented that warrants reconsideration" [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/16/1998 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT returned Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 1, 3 . (tmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Maria L. Florez for reconsideration of [19-1] detention order , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono : granting [36-1] motion to extend time to June 10, 1998 to file discovery motions as to Gustavo Londono (1), RESET motion filing deadline for 6/10/98 for Gustavo Londono . Notice sent to counsel on 5/21/98. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Maria L. Florez : granting [21-1] motion for Charles McGinty to withdraw as attorney (Terminated as to Maria L. Florez (2). [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Maria L. Florez for Charles McGinty to withdraw as attorney , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA entered by Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Court accepts plea. Not Guilty: , Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 1, 3 (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: detention hearing; Court hears agruement. Court finds probable cause. The defendant consents to detentions at this time ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arraignment as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez held Gustavo Londono (1) count(s) 1,2, 3 Maria L. Florez (2) count(s) 1, 3. (sat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered for detention as to Maria L. Florez Bond set to NO BAIL for Maria L. Florez. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Reginald C. Lindsay Referral to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Purpose: PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGD (tmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Reginald C. Lindsay Referral to Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . Purpose: PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGD (tmc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CJA appointment for Gustavo Londono , Attorney Lenore Glaser appointed. Voucher # 0986404. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [25-1] motion to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ENDORSED ORDER as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [25-1] motion to unseal [24-1] order, [23-1] affidavit, [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2). [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: scheduled detention hearing; Peter Krupp informs court of conflict and askes to be excused. Court excuses Peter Krupp. Court informs defendant of right of hearing and right of counsel. Defendant detained pending detention hearing on 3/23/98 ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Appearance Through Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First appearance through counsel as to Gustavo Londono . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CJA appointment for Gustavo Londono , Attorney Peter B. Krupp appointed. Voucher # 0986403. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: defendant moves for continuance; Court orders defendant detained pending detention hearing ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono : for temporary detention . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduled detention hearing hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduled detention hearing hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono , re: scheduled detention hearing; Atty Donohue has a conflict and detention hearing is reset ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Suggested conditions of release by Maria L. Florez [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Maria L. Florez , re: detention hearing; Arguement heard. Court finds probable cause. The court takes the matter of detention under advisement ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduled detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduled detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Detention hearing as to Maria L. Florez held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : for temporary detention . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Appearance Through Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First appearance through counsel as to Gustavo Londono . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: scheduled detention hearing; Dfts move for continuance. Court explains to dft Londono that counsel has been appointed and will represent him tomorrow. Dft Londono assents to continuance. Court orders dfts detained pending hearing ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Detention hearing as to Gustavo Londono held . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : for temporary detention . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Order Appointing Federal Defender Program.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered Appointing Federal Public Defender for Maria L. Florez . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Maria L. Florez , as to Maria L. Florez , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gustavo Londono , as to Gustavo Londono , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: initial appearance; dfts file a financial affidavits. Dfts request counsel. Court orders counsel. Gov't moves for detention and for continuance. Court orders defendants detained pending hearing on 3/17/98 at 2:30 ; Court Reporter: Tape [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial appearance as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez held (Defendant informed of rights.) . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST of Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Search Warrant as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for search warrant filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/25/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , filed. Pretrial Services [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr) Modified on 03/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arrest Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest warrant issued as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr) Modified on 03/25/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER entered as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez : granting [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device as to Gustavo Londono (1), Maria L. Florez (2) . [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Agent Dermot Quinn, as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez , re: [22-1] motion for authorization of trape and trace device , filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/26/1998 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA , as to Gustavo Londono, Maria L. Florez for authorization of trape and trace device filed. [ 1:98-m -1009 ] (fmr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?