Green v. Boston Edison Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12721-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Randolph E. Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Boston Edison Company, Counter-Claimant
No Logo NSTAR Electric, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Boston Edison Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Palmer +1 978 957 6383 +1 617 241 2815 palmerlaw1@aol.com
No Logo NSTAR Electric, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Palmer +1 978 957 6383 +1 617 241 2815 palmerlaw1@aol.com
No Logo Thomas J. May, Defendant
No Logo Randolph E. Green, Counter-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $35000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 2/25/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '05-1482'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/19/2005 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [12] Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph E. Green. We affirm the judgment substantially for the reasons recited by the district court in its February 25, 2005 decision. AFFIRMED. See Mandate for further details. (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Appeal Record Returned
    Appeal Record Returned: [12] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 12/19/2005 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number 05-1482 for [12] Notice of Appeal, filed by Randolph E. Green,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005, Terminated: 12/19/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [12] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [10] Memorandum & ORDER by Randolph E. Green. $ 255, receipt number 62956 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/12/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Johnson, Mary)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
              Judge Richard G. Stearns : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.(Giannotti, Diane)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Terminated Case
                Civil Case Terminated. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Randolph E. Green. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Randolph E. Green by NSTAR Electric, Boston Edison Company.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Affidavit in Support
                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [5] MOTION to Dismiss. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION to Dismiss filed by NSTAR Electric, Boston Edison Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss by NSTAR Electric, Boston Edison Company.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed NSTAR Electric served on 1/3/2005, answer due 1/24/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Edison Company served on 1/3/2005, answer due 1/24/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas J. May served on 1/3/2005, answer due 1/24/2005. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Nici, Richard)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against Boston Edison Company, Thomas J. May Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61084, filed by Randolph E. Green. (Attachments: # (1) cover sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Issued
                                      Summons Issued as to NSTAR Electric, Thomas J. May. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/5/2005 Summons Issued
                                        Summons Issued as to Boston Edison Company. (Nici, Richard)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 228 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?