Safe Streets Alliance v. Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00349
District Judge Robert E. Blackburn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2019 at 11:20 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael P. Reilly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Barnes +1 202 220 9600 bbarnes@cooperkirk.com
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Barnes +1 202 220 9600 bbarnes@cooperkirk.com
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Safe Streets Alliance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Barnes +1 202 220 9600 bbarnes@cooperkirk.com
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo 6480 Pickney, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
d/b/a Rocky Mountain Organic Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo Barbara J. Brohl, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Scott Robert Bauer +1 720 508 6364 +1 720 508 6038 scott.bauer@state.co.us
in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Douglas J. Cox +1 720 508 6574 +1 720 508 6032 douglas.cox@coag.gov
in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Claudia B. Goldin +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 claudia.goldin@state.co.us
in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Sueanna Park Johnson +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Sueanna.Johnson@state.co.us
in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Frederick Richard Yarger +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 fred.yarger@coag.gov
No Logo Blackhawk Development Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pearson & Paris, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Sean P Paris +1 303 996 8610 sparis@rockymountain-law.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 James V. Pearson +1 303 996 8610 +1 303 996 8611 jpearson@rockymountain-law.com
No Logo Camp Feel Good, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo David L. Patch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015 Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
No Logo Jason M. Licata, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 303-866-5037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Governor of Colorado
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Douglas J. Cox +1 720 508 6574 +1 720 508 6032 douglas.cox@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Governor of Colorado
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Scott Robert Bauer +1 720 508 6364 +1 720 508 6038 scott.bauer@state.co.us
in his official capacity as Governor of Colorado
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Frederick Richard Yarger +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 fred.yarger@coag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Governor of Colorado
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Claudia B. Goldin +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 claudia.goldin@state.co.us
in his official capacity as Governor of Colorado
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Sueanna Park Johnson +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Sueanna.Johnson@state.co.us
No Logo Joseph R. Licata, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo Parker Walton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by robcorry.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew William Buck +1 303 999 0512 buck@robcorry.com
No Logo Patch Construction LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/01/2015 Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
No Logo Pueblo County Commission, Defendant
No Logo Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, Defendant
No Logo Roger Guzman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pearson & Paris, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Sean P Paris +1 303 996 8610 sparis@rockymountain-law.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 James V. Pearson +1 303 996 8610 +1 303 996 8611 jpearson@rockymountain-law.com
No Logo The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berg Hill Greenleaf & Ruscitti, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josh Adam Marks +1 303 402 1600 +1 303 402 1601 jam@bhgrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by pueblo.co.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Joseph Styduhar +1 719 583 6630 +1 719 583 6057 styduharg@co.pueblo.co.us
No Logo W. Lewis Koski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Marijuana Enforcement Division
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Scott Robert Bauer +1 720 508 6364 +1 720 508 6038 scott.bauer@state.co.us
in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Marijuana Enforcement Division
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Douglas J. Cox +1 720 508 6574 +1 720 508 6032 douglas.cox@coag.gov
in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Marijuana Enforcement Division
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Claudia B. Goldin +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 claudia.goldin@state.co.us
in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Marijuana Enforcement Division
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Sueanna Park Johnson +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 Sueanna.Johnson@state.co.us
in his official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Marijuana Enforcement Division
TERMINATED: 01/19/2016 Frederick Richard Yarger +1 720 508 6000 +1 720 508 6032 fred.yarger@coag.gov
No Logo Washington International Insurance Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 James Nicholas Boeving +1 303 244 1938 +1 303 244 1879 boeving@wtotrial.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Michael Lawrence O'Donnell 1 +1 +1 +1 +2941 294 294 1879 odonnell@wtotrial.com
TERMINATED: 07/07/2017 Kathryn A. Reilly +1 303 244 1800 +1 303 244 1879 reilly@wtotrial.com
No Logo Justin Smith, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul V. Kelly +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 paul.kelly@jacksonlewis.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (249) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER Plaintiffs' Glossary by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Davis Cooper on behalf of Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope ReillyAttorney Davis Cooper added to party Michael P. Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney Davis Cooper added to party Phillis Windy Hope Reilly(pty:pla) (Cooper, Davis) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 243 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Davis Cooper. Attorney has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. This document does not have a s/ signature and must be re-filed. (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Davis Cooper on behalf of Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope ReillyAttorney Davis Cooper added to party Michael P. Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney Davis Cooper added to party Phillis Windy Hope Reilly(pty:pla) (Cooper, Davis) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Witness List by Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/4/2018. (lrobe) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                COURTROOM MINUTES for Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/4/2018. ORDERED: Parties' proposed voir dire examination questions due on or before October 22, 2018. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (lrobe) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE to 237 Objections by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEF by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      OBJECTIONS to 234 Designation of Deposition Testimony by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Memorandum in Support of Their Contested Jury Instruction and Verdict Form re 235 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) Modified on 10/1/2018 to correct event text (athom, ). (Entered: 09/29/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Stip-01, # 2 Proposed Document Stip-02, # 3 Proposed Document Stip-03, # 4 Proposed Document Stip-04, # 5 Proposed Document Stip-05, # 6 Proposed Document Stip-06, # 7 Proposed Document Stip-07, # 8 Proposed Document Stip-08, # 9 Proposed Document Stip-09, # 10 Proposed Document Stip-10, # 11 Proposed Document Stip-11, # 12 Proposed Document Comp-P-1, # 13 Proposed Document Comp-D-1, # 14 Proposed Document Verdict-P-1, # 15 Proposed Document Verdict-D-1)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/29/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/29/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to disqualifyCourt Filing
                                ORDER Denying Defendant's [sic] 217 Amended Motion to Disqualify the Plaintiff's [sic] Expert Pursuant to FRE 702, and FRE 703 Motion for the Court To Appoint an Expert(s) Pursuant to 104 To Address the Soundness of the Plaintiff's [sic] Expert's Methodology. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/14/2018. (athom, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Reassigning Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                  REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Crews at the end of the civil action number (such as 15-cv-00001-PAB-SKC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Crews in Courtroom C-204. His chambers are located in Room C-253 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2117. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                    ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts I and V [# 219 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted insofar as it seeks summary judgment on the issue whether defendants' violated RICO, 18 U.S.C. ?? 1962(c), as alleged in Counts I and V of the Second Amended Complaint. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56 [# 220 ] is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Errata Sheet [# 225 ] is granted, and Defendants' Experts [sic] Errata Sheet [# 222 ] is stricken. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/01/2018. (athom, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 letter
                                      LETTER re: 228 Conventionally Submitted Material by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (athom, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Conventionally Submitted Material
                                        Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Thumb Drive Containing Video Exhibit to 225 MOTION to Strike 222 Errata by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. Text Only Entry (athom, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                          REPLY to Response to 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Buck, Matthew)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                            REPLY to Response to 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Thompson, David)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Motion to strike
                                              MOTION to Strike 222 Errata by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ivor Hill Deposition Transcript Excerpts)(Thompson, David)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Response to motion
                                                RESPONSE to 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Parker Walton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Errata Sheet)(Buck, Matthew)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Response to motion
                                                  RESPONSE to 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix)(Thompson, David)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Errata
                                                    STRICKEN - ERRATA by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 8/1/2018 to strike pursuant to 230 Order (athom, ).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Response to motion
                                                      RESPONSE to 217 Amended MOTION to Disqualify filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Thompson, David) Modified on 6/22/2018 to correct linkage (athom, ).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Defendants Appendix)(Buck, Matthew)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Thompson, David)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Order on motion to disqualifyCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/01/2018. Defendant's 217 Amended Motion to Disqualify is denied to the extent it seeks an extension of the dispositive motion deadline. In all other respects, the motion is taken under advisement, pending full briefing by the parties. Defendant's 216 Motion to Disqualify is moot. (athom, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Motion to Disqualify
                                                              AMENDED MOTION to Disqualify by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 6/1/2018 to correct event text (athom, ).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Motion to Disqualify
                                                                MOTION to Disqualify by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief in support of motions, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs expert report, # 3 Exhibit Defendants expert report, # 4 Exhibit Defendants expert report, # 5 Exhibit Defendants experts CV)(Buck, Matthew)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER re: 214 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party. Plaintiffs' Stipulation To Dismiss Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC, Joseph R. Licata and Jason Mr. Licata [# 214 ] is approved. Plaintiffs' claims against Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, and Jason M. Licata are dismissed with prejudice, all parties to bear their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/13/2018. (athom, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal of Party
                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Jason M. Licata by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Granting Defendant's 210 Renewed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set the Trial and Extend the Deadlines Set Forth in the Scheduling Order. The expert disclosure deadline is extended to 4/12/2018. The combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/10/2018, and the trial set to begin 7/23/2018, are vacated. Combined Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference is re- scheduled for 10/4/2018, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 5-day Jury Trial is re-scheduled to commence on 10/29/2018, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/21/2018. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition to 210 Second MOTION to Vacate filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER re: 210 Second MOTION to Vacate filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. Plaintiffs shall respond on or before 2/16/18. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/9/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Motion to vacate
                                                                            Second MOTION to Vacate by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District CourtCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Overruling Objections to Order of United States Magistrate Judge.The objection contained in Defendant's Appeal of the Magistrate's Non-Action on the Prior Filed Motion To Vacate and Re-Set the Trial and Extend the Deadlines [# 205 ]is denied. The motion to continue the trial contained in the [# 205 ] Appeal is denied without prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/08/2018. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Response to Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                RESPONSE to 205 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 202 Motion to Vacate pursuant to 206 Order granting motion to withdraw. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw documentCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 204 Motion to Withdraw Document 202 MOTION to Vacate 201 Order 182 Order. The motion is now withdrawn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                      OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 201 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,, Status Conference,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Motion to withdraw document
                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Document re 202 MOTION to Vacate 201 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,, Status Conference,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 182 Order, by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/18 regarding 202 MOTION to Vacate 201 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,, Status Conference,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 182 Order, filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Motion to vacate
                                                                                            WITHDRAWN - MOTION to Vacate 201 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,, Status Conference,,, Terminate Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 182 Order, by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) Modified on 1/25/2018 pursuant to 206 Order (rebsec). (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                              COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2018 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman. Defendants Motions for an Extension of Expert Witness Report Disclosure Deadline 194, 195 are GRANTED. The current expert disclosure deadline, the rebuttal expert deadline, and Rule 702 motion deadline outlined in the Civil Scheduling Order 181, are STAYED. The expert disclosure deadline is now set for 2/21/2018. The rebuttal expert disclosure deadline is 3/20/2018. Any motions regarding experts are due 4/2/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-702. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                BRIEF in Support of 195 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 195 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to, 194 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports filed by Defendant Joseph R. Licata. (Graf, Gregory) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re: 195 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. The affirmative expert deadline of 1/15/2018 is stayed pending the conference, but the court directs movants' attention to Judge Blackburn's practice standards for counsel to review and be prepared to address at the conference. Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing, Joseph Licata and Jason Licata shall file a response, if any, by 1/17/2018. No reply will be permitted, pending the conference. Counsel shall initiate a conference call among themselves before calling the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman on 1/12/2018. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      BRIEF in Opposition to 194 MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/12/18 regarding 195 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton, 194 MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Carman. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information CORRECTED by Matthew William Buck (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Matthew William Buck (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Reassigning Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: During Magistrate Judge Shaffer's unavailability, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman of the District of Wyoming, who is substituted as the referral judge. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Carman at the end of the civil action number (such as 17-cv-0001-MSK-MLC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all scheduled matters will be maintained. Parties shall continue to communicate with Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers regarding this case. (Text only entry - no document attached) (athom, ) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules
                                                                                                                    ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 189 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by attorney Matthew William Buck. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint, by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton.(Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 185 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Although the motion fails to show good cause for the requested extension, it is unopposed. It appears from the docket to be Defendants' first stipulated extension of not more than 21 days to respond to the second amended complaint. The court will therefore construe the motion as a self-executing stipulation under D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a). Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC; Camp Feel Good, LLC and Parker Walton shall have up to and including 9/29/2017 in which to answer the second amended complaint. If not already done, counsel shall serve a copy of the motion and this order to his clients. See Local Rule 6.1(c). By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/26/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Notice of Noncompliance with Court Procedures/Rules
                                                                                                                          ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 185 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by attorney Matthew William Buck. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/25/17 regarding 185 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS ALTERNATIVE HOLISTIC HEALING, LLC, JOSEPH R. LICATA AND JASON M. LICATA ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint, by Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata.(Graf, Gregory) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANTS ALTERNATIVE HOLISTIC HEALING, LLC, JOSEPH R. LICATA AND JASON M. LICATA ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to 66 Amended Complaint by Alternative Holistic Healing LLC,Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata.(Graf, Gregory) Modified on 9/21/2017 to correct filers (athom, ). (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. Combined Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 5-day Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/23/2017. (athom, ) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/22/17. (amont, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2017. Defendants shall file answers to the operative pleading by 9/22/2017. Parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 8/29/2017. Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Matthew W. Buck's 170 Motion to Withdraw from representing Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, and Joseph R. Licata. New counsel has entered an appearance on behalf of those Defendants. Mr. Buck remains counsel of record for Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC; Camp Feel Good, LLC; and Parker Walton. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/16/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Charles Graf on behalf of Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata. (Graf, Gregory) Modified on 8/16/2017 to correct event text (athom, ). (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re 173 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 7/26/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel, including new counsel, shall have a 26(f) conference before the hearing. To the extent an amended proposed scheduling order is prepared, it shall be sent to the court no later than 8/15/2017. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None order on motion to vacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 171 motion to vacate and reset scheduling conference. The scheduling conference is converted to a status conference, 7/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Non-Denver based attorneys may attend in person or by telephone. If more than one call will come in, counsel shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves before calling the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/20/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 168 Motion by State Defendants (John W. Hickenlooper, Barbara J. Brohl, and James Burack as successor to Lewis Koski, each in their official capacities) to not participate in preparation of scheduling order and scheduling conference. Since these defendants have been dismissed, they are not required to participate in any further proceedings in this case. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/20/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/19/17 regarding 171 MOTION to Vacate filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton, 170 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Joseph R. Licata, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Vacate by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw by Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/18/17 regarding 168 MOTION for Order to filed by John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Barbara J. Brohl, W. Lewis Koski. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION/NOTICE of Dismissal of Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Request Not to Participate in Preparation of Scheduling Order and July 26, 2017 Scheduling Conference by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski (Yarger, Frederick) Modified on 7/18/2017 to correct event (athom, ). (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Dismissing Parties. Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal [# 166 ] is approved. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants Roger Guzman, Blackhawk Development Corporation, and Washington International Insurance Co., are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/07/2017. (athom, ) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Roger Guzman, Blackhawk Development Corporation, and Washington International Insurance Co. by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Non-Denver based attorneys may attend in person or by telephone. If more than one call will come in, counsel shall initiate a conference call amongst themselves before calling the court at (303) 844-2117 at the scheduled time. No later than seven calendar days before the scheduling conference, the parties shall file a new proposed scheduling order and submit a word version thereof to Shaffer_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/30/2017. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA as to 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, 160 USCA Opinion, 161 USCA Judgment, 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, 162 USCA Opinion, 163 USCA Judgment : (USCA Case No. 16-1048, 16-1266) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Judgment as to 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance : Affirmed in Part and Reversed in Part and Remanded (USCA Case No. 16-1266 consolidated with 16-1095: USDC Case No. 15-cv-00462-WYD-NYW) (This document is not the Mandate) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Opinion as to 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance : Affirmed in Part and Reversed in Part and Remanded (USCA Case No. 16-1266 consolidated with 16-1095: USDC Case No. 15-cv-00462-WYD-NYW) (This document is not the Mandate) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Judgment as to 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance : Affirmed (USCA Case No. 16-1048) (This document is not the Mandate) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Opinion as to 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance : Affirmed (USCA Case No. 16-1048) (This document is not the Mandate) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA granting, as contained in the order, motion to consolidate appeals 16-1048 and 16-1095. as to 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (USCA Case No. 16-1048; 16-1095: USDC Case No. 15-cv-00462-WYD-NYW) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 16-1266). Text Only Entry. (cmira) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript is not necessary re 153 Notice of Appeal. (cmira) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 153 Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 16-1266 for 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (cmira) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid). (Attachments: # 1 Preliminary Record, # 2 Docket Sheet). (cmira) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 140 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations, 152 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, 141 Clerk's Judgment, by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-5041454) (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS RULE 59 147 MOTION TO VACATETHE JUDGMENT DISMISSING THEIR RACKETEERING CLAIMS.Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/9/2016.(cmira) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 147 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 147 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re 147 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/21/16. By May 19, 2016, Defendant Washington International may file its response to 147 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment. Text Only Entry(rebsec) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 147 MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment, by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Alter Judgment re 141 Clerk's Judgment, by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Robbins Appellant's Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Jan. 29, 2016 Status Conference, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Art Klock, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from The Appraisal of Real Estate)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 145 Motion to Withdraw Document 143 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/13/16. Text Only Entry(rebsec) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re 143 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreement dated April 11, 2016)(Paris, Sean) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: 143 MOTION for Attorney Fees :Sean Patrick Paris has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training, or action by the court. Fax Number Missing. (Text Only Entry). (cmira) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHDRAWN MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 22, 2015 E-mail Regarding Conferral, # 2 Exhibit May 28, 2015 E-mail Regarding Dismissal, # 3 Exhibit June 10, 2015 Letter Regarding Dismissal, # 4 Exhibit June 17, 2015 E-mail Response Re June 10, 2015 Letter, # 5 Exhibit January 11, 2016 Conferral Regarding Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit CBA 2012 Economic Survey Snapshot)(Paris, Sean). Modified on 4/14/2016 withdrawn pursuant to 146 Minute Order. (cmira). (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on January 29, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-25. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, ) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Blackhawk Development Corporation, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Washington International Insurance Co, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton, Roger Guzman against Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly re: 140 Order Overruling Objections to and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. By Clerk on 3/21/16. (kfinn) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO AND ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: adopting Report and Recommendations re 128 Report and Recommendations; granting 77 Motion to Dismiss; granting 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 86 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/16.(kfinn) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Objection to 128 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66] filed by Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman, 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Washington Inter filed by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Objection to 128 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66] filed by Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman, 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Washington Inter filed by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Paris, Sean) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Denying 133 defendants Motion To Strike Untimely Objection, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/1/2016.(evana, ) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 16-1048) Text Only Entry (evana, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 129 Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 133 MOTION to Strike 132 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 132 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to 128 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Concerning Private RICO Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number 16-1048 for 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (evana, ) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the 129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet, # 2 Preliminary Record)(evana, ) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 122 Clerk's Judgment, 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-4828633) (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 77 Motion to Dismiss filed by Blackhawk Development Corporation and Roger Guzman, 81 Motion to Dismiss filed by Washington International Insurance Co., and 86 Motion to Dismiss filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, and Parker Walton be granted, Defendant John Doe I be dismissed, and the Second Amended Complaint be dismissed. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 02/08/2016. (cbslc1) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66], 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 86 MOTION to Dismiss Supplemental Response filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 126 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Blackhawk Development Corporation, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Roger Guzman, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton, Washington International Insurance Co, filed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 1/29/2016. Plaintiff shall file Second Amended Complaint by 12:00 on 2/1/2016. Finding as moot 117 Motion for Leave. Supplemental briefing on current motions to dismiss shall be filed no later than 2/5/2016. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, ) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that Plaintiffs Unopposed Request That Judgment on Preemption Claims Be Set Out in a Separate Document as Required by Rule 58(a) 121 , filed January 25, 2016, is denied as moot, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/2016.(evana, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference for Friday, January 29, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Mountain Time in Courtroom A-402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer to discuss the pending motions to dismiss and the motion for leave to file a Supplemental Complaint. Participants in the Telephone Status Conference shall first create a conference call among themselves and then call the court at 303.844.2117 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/26/2016. Text Only Entry (cbslc1) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Pueblo County Commission, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo, Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski against Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly re: 118 Order on Motions to Dismiss. By Clerk on 1/26/16. (kfinn) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Judgment re 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Request that Judgment on Preemption Claims Be Set Out in a Separate Document as Required by Rule 58(a) by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 117 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(d) filed by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Paris, Sean) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 117 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(d) filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/19/16. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: That the State Defendants Motion To Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 83 , filed April 30, 2015, is granted; That the Pueblo Defendants Motion To Dismiss 85 , filed April 30, 2015, is granted, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/19/2016.(evana, ) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Complaint Pursuant to Rule 15(d) by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - First Supplemental Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - First Supplemental Complaint -- Redline)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Notice of Case Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Paul V. Kelly on behalf of Justin Smith (Kelly, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 9 Motion to Consolidate Cases. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/27/2015.(mlace, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Order on Motion to SeverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 51 State Defendants' Motion To Sever Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint Into a Separate Civil Action or, Alternatively, To Bifurcate That Claim. Pueblo Defendants' Motion To Sever the Preemption Claims From Plaintiffs' Complaint or, Alternatively, To Bifurcate Those Claims 62 . That pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, Counts VII and VIII of the First Amended Complaint 66, filed April 13, 2015, are severed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/14/2015.(mlace, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/15/2015 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Rules/Procedures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Frederick R. Yarger has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and one or more of the following Electronic Case Filing Procedures(Civil Cases): 1.1, 1.3(f), 4.1(a), and/or 4.3, which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents filed in civil cases must be filed electronically, shall be converted directly to portable document format (PDF) from software applications in which they were created (i.e., No scanned documents), shall include a signature block with the filer's typed name, typed signature and must match the filers login and password (i.e. a filer may not use non-signatory's login and password to file a document). See ECF Procedure 4.3. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to 86 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo. (Marks, Josh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Support of 83 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Bauer, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 103 Motion for Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate electronic service to Timothy P. Schimberg in this matter. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/15. (cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 102 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Washington International Insurance Company may file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss not to exceed 13 pages. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/15.(cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, and W. Lewis Koski may file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss not to exceed 15 pages.Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/15. (cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 100 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Pueblo County Commission and the Pueblo County Liquor and Marijuana Licensing Board may file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss not to exceed twenty-two pages.Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/15.(cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 101 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Barbara J. Brohl, W. Lewis Koski, 102 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Motions to Dismiss filed by Washington International Insurance Co, 103 MOTION for Order to Terminate Court ECF Notifications filed by David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC, 100 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, Pueblo County Commission. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/11/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Terminate Court ECF Notifications by Defendants David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Motion to Terminate ECF Notifications)(Schimberg, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Yarger, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Pueblo County Commission, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Marks, Josh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 6/4/2015. Discovery is STAYED pending rulings on pending motions to dismiss. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66] filed by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Paris, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66], 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 83 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint, 86 MOTION to Dismiss, 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets AllianceAttorney Peter A. Patterson added to party Michael P. Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Patterson added to party Phillis Windy Hope Reilly(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A. Patterson added to party Safe Streets Alliance(pty:pla) (Patterson, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: 5/21/2015 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 90 Motion to Continue, in part. The Scheduling Conference is converted into a Status Conference on 6/4/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties need not confer under Rule 26(f) or submit a proposed scheduling order. Non-Denver based counsel may appear by telephone and shall first initiate a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/21/15. (cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/15. Text Only Entry(rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: 5/20/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 92 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Motions to Dismiss of up to 50 Pages in Length on May 26, 2015 filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/20/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Motions to Dismiss of up to 50 Pages in Length on May 26, 2015 by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 90 Joint MOTION to Continue June 4 Scheduling Conference filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/13/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Continue June 4 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Jason M. Licata, 6480 Pickney LLC, Parker Walton, Camp Feel Good LLC, Roger Guzman, Blackhawk Development Corp, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, Barbara J. Brohl, W. Lewis Koski, Washington International Insurance Co. (Thompson, David) Modified filers on 5/14/2015 (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Robert Bauer on behalf of Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. Attorney Scott Robert Bauer added to party Barbara J. Brohl(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Robert Bauer added to party John W. Hickenlooper, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Robert Bauer added to party W. Lewis Koski(pty:dft) (Bauer, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING PARTIES: Plaintiffs' 82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice is approved. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants, David L. Patch and Patch Construction LLC only, are dismissed without prejudice, with the affected parties to bear their attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/2015. (alowe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 86 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata, Parker Walton, 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/1/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo. (Marks, Josh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Washington International Insurance Co, 83 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Barbara J. Brohl, W. Lewis Koski. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/30/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Yarger, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party David L. Patch and Patch Construction, LLC by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Notice of Noncompliance with Court Rules/Procedures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re 75 : Sean Patrick Paris; James V. Pearson have failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and one or more of the following Electronic Case Filing Procedures(Civil Cases): 1.1, 1.3(f), 4.1(a), and/or 4.3, which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents filed in civil cases shall include a signature block with the filer's typed name, typed signature and must match the filers login and password (i.e. a filer may not use non-signatory's login and password to file a document). See ECF Procedure 4.3. Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 77 MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66] filed by Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/28/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/28/15. Text Only Entry(rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss [Doc. #66] by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Paris, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Patrick Paris on behalf of Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger GuzmanAttorney Sean Patrick Paris added to party Blackhawk Development Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Paris added to party Roger Guzman(pty:dft) (Paris, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Sean Patrick Paris (Paris, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 62 MOTION to Sever the Preemption Claims from Plaintiffs' Complaint or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate Those Claims Attorney Josh Adam Marks added to party The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo (pty:dft) filed by Defendants Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of the County of Pueblo. (Marks, Josh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 51 First MOTION to Sever Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint into a Separate Civil Action or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate that Claim filed by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Yarger, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Yarger, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/23/15. Text Only Entry(rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to File a Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 15 Pages by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn) Modified title on 4/23/2015 (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory Joseph Styduhar on behalf of The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board. Attorney Gregory Joseph Styduhar added to party Pueblo County Commission, The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Pueblo. (Styduhar, Gregory) Modified text on 4/17/2015 (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/14/2015 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re 66 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Redline)(Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 62 MOTION to Sever the Preemption Claims from Plaintiffs' Complaint or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate Those Claims, 51 First MOTION to Sever Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint into a Separate Civil Action or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate that Claim filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly.(Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. Parker Walton waiver sent on 3/3/2015, answer due 5/4/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time [for all Defendants] to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. The deadline is extended to on or before April 21, 2015. FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is reset to June 4, 2015 at 11:00 AM (MT) in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED that parties shall adhere to the deadlines and instructions as set forth in Preparation for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, located on the court's website under "Judicial Officers." Parties are advised that this case has been assigned to District Judge Blackburn who has a standard practice of setting a trial date approximately 15 months from the date the Complaint was filed. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/2/15.(cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Sever the Preemption Claims from Plaintiffs' Complaint or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate Those Claims by Defendants Pueblo County Commission, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Marks, Josh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 60 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to ComplaintJoint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Defendants Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Jason M. Licata, 6480 Pickney LLC, Parker Walton, Camp Feel Good LLC, Roger Guzman, Blackhawk Development Corporation, David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC, Pueblo County Commission, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski, Washington International Insurance Co. (Thompson, David) Modified filers on 4/1/2015 (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael L. O'Donnell on behalf of Washington International Insurance CoAttorney Michael L. O'Donnell added to party Washington International Insurance Co(pty:dft) (O'Donnell, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Nicholas Boeving on behalf of Washington International Insurance CoAttorney James Nicholas Boeving added to party Washington International Insurance Co(pty:dft) (Boeving, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd for Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate. Responses due by 3/24/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/2015. (alowe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party Parker Walton(pty:dft) filed by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, Parker Walton. (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Johnson, Sueanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Sever Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint into a Separate Civil Action or, Alternatively, to Bifurcate that Claim by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Johnson, Sueanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 47 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 21, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/18/2015. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 46 Stipulation of Extension of Time. Defendants Patch and Patch Construction LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 8, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/18/2015. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: 3/18/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint filed by Washington International Insurance Co, 46 MOTION/STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint filed by David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC, Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint by Defendant Washington International Insurance Co. (Reilly, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION/STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiffs Safe Streets Alliance, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Michael P. Reilly, Defendants David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schimberg, Timothy) Modified filers on 3/18/2015 (alowe). Modified event text on 3/18/2015 per chambers (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: 3/17/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Peter Schimberg on behalf of David L. Patch, Patch Construction LLC. (Schimberg, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Roger Guzman and Blackhawk Development Corporation's 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. The deadline is extended to on or before 4/8/2015.Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/16/15. (cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM regarding 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint filed by Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/16/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint by Defendants Blackhawk Development Corporation, Roger Guzman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pearson, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise RespondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting defendants John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Barbara J. Brohl and W. Lewis Koski's 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint and defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC; Jason M. Licata; Camp Feel Good, LLC; Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC; and Joseph R. Licata's 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to 1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. The deadline is extended to on or before 4/21/2015. ORDERED that 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is MOOT. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/13/15.(cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 39 Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata. (Buck, Matthew) Modified text and linkage on 3/13/2015 (alowe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint filed by 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Joseph R. Licata, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Jason M. Licata. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/13/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint by Defendants 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata. (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint filed by John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., Barbara J. Brohl, W. Lewis Koski. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/12/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint by Defendants Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Johnson, Sueanna) Modified title on 3/13/2015 (alowe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board waiver sent on 3/6/2015, answer due 5/5/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. Pueblo County Commission waiver sent on 3/6/2015, answer due 5/5/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. Jason M. Licata served on 2/26/2015, answer due 3/19/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. Alternative Holistic Healing LLC served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew William Buck on behalf of 6480 Pickney, LLC, Camp Feel Good, LLC, Jason M. LicataAttorney Matthew William Buck added to party 6480 Pickney, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party Camp Feel Good, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party Jason M. Licata(pty:dft) (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. W. Lewis Koski served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Barbara J. Brohl served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. John W. Hickenlooper, Jr served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Patch Construction LLC served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. David L. Patch served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Washington International Insurance Co served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Blackhawk Development Corporation served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Roger Guzman served on 2/25/2015, answer due 3/18/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Camp Feel Good, LLC served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. 6480 Pickney, LLC served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Joseph R. Licata served on 2/21/2015, answer due 3/16/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sueanna Park Johnson on behalf of Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis KoskiAttorney Sueanna Park Johnson added to party Barbara J. Brohl(pty:dft), Attorney Sueanna Park Johnson added to party John W. Hickenlooper, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Sueanna Park Johnson added to party W. Lewis Koski(pty:dft) (Johnson, Sueanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Alternative Holistic Healing LLC served on 2/24/2015, answer due 3/17/2015. (Thompson, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Claudia B. Goldin on behalf of Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis KoskiAttorney Claudia B. Goldin added to party Barbara J. Brohl(pty:dft), Attorney Claudia B. Goldin added to party John W. Hickenlooper, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Claudia B. Goldin added to party W. Lewis Koski(pty:dft) (Goldin, Claudia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Entry of Appearance FIRST by Matthew William Buck on behalf of Alternative Holistic Healing LLC, Joseph R. LicataAttorney Matthew William Buck added to party Alternative Holistic Healing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew William Buck added to party Joseph R. Licata(pty:dft) (Buck, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 4/23/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. ORDERED that parties shall adhere to the deadlines and instructions as set forth in Preparation for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, located on the court's website under "Judicial Officers." Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/3/15. (cbssec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Brian Wesley Barnes on behalf of Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Barnes, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles J. Cooper on behalf of Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas J. Cox on behalf of Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Cox, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frederick Richard Yarger on behalf of Barbara J. Brohl, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski. (Yarger, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/20/15. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 6 Memorandum Returning Case: This case is reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 15-cv-00349-REB. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, ) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock. (dkals, ) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiffs Michael P. Reilly, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safe Streets Alliance, Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Michael P. Reilly. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against 6480 Pickney, LLC, Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC, Blackhawk Development Corporation, Barbara J. Brohl, Camp Feel Good, LLC, John Doe 1, Roger Guzman, John W. Hickenlooper, Jr, W. Lewis Koski, Jason M. Licata, Joseph R. Licata, David L. Patch, Patch Construction, LLC, Pueblo County Commission, Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, Parker Walton, Washington International Insurance Co. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4276839) filed by Phillis Windy Hope Reilly, Safe Streets Alliance, Michael P. Reilly. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Alternative Holistic Healing, LLC, # 2 Summons Joseph R. Licata, # 3 Summons Jason M. Licata, # 4 Summons 6480 Pickney, LLC, # 5 Summons Parker Walton, # 6 Summons Camp Feel Good, LLC, # 7 Summons Roger Guzman, # 8 Summons Blackhawk Development Corporation, # 9 Summons Washington International Insurance Co., # 10 Summons David L. Patch, # 11 Summons Patch Construction, LLC, # 12 Summons John W. Hickenlooper, Jr., # 13 Summons Barbara J. Brohl, # 14 Summons W. Lewis Koski, # 15 Summons Pueblo County Commission, # 16 Summons Pueblo County Liquor & Marijuana Licensing Board, # 17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Motions No Longer Referred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion(s) No Longer Referred: 83 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs Complaint, 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/27/15. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 411 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?