Smith v. Mark Equipment Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10008-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rodney G Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dwyer and Duddy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E. Dwyer +1 617 723 9777 +1 617 227 8692 med@dwyerd.com
v.
No Logo Mark Equipment Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Eastern Bank, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine Burke +1 617 599 2100
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1131 ERISA - Collection of Delinquent Trust Fun
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 3/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Rodney Smith against defendant Mark Equipment Corp.(Johnson, Mary)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
    Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Default Judgment. (Johnson, Mary)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Affidavit in Support
      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [10] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mark Equipment. (Flaherty, Elaine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005, Terminated: 3/22/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
        MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mark Equipment by Rodney G Smith.(Flaherty, Elaine)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
          NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Equipment Corporation (Flaherty, Elaine)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. allowed.ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [8] Request for notice of default(Flaherty, Elaine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Request for notice of default
              Request for notice of default. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Answer
                ANSWER of Trustee by Eastern Bank.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mark Equipment (Flaherty, Elaine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Mark Equipment Corporation served on 1/21/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons to Trustee Issued
                      Summons to Trustee Issued as to Eastern Bank. (Flaherty, Elaine) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2005 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : ElectronicORDER entered granting [2] Motion ex parte hearing (Flaherty, Elaine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Affidavit in Support
                          Ex parte AFFIDAVIT in Support re [2] MOTION ex parte relief. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION for ex parte relief by Rodney G Smith.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against Mark Equipment Corporation, Eastern Bank Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61147, filed by Rodney G Smith. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to Mark Equipment Corporation. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?