USA v. Arillota et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-30001-MAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd E. Newhouse +1 413 785 0109 +1 413 785 0394 Todd.Newhouse@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Springfield
Filed 1/4/2005
County Hampden
Terminated 5/3/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7530.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Anthony Arillota (1), Count(s) 1, 1s, 2, 29 months on all counts to be ered concurrently w/one another and sentence to be served concurrently w/sentence currently serving w/the State of Massachusetts ; This Federal sentence is to begin today; Def. remanded to custody of Marshals; 3 yrs supervised release on all counts to be served concurrently w/one another; $300 assessment fee due immediately; Fine of $10,000 due immediately or acording to a court ordered payment schedule; (French, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Sentencing
    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Sentencing held on 4/27/2006 for Anthony Arillota (1), Count(s) 1, 1s, 2, 29 months on all counts to be ered concurrently w/one another and sentence to be served concurrently w/sentence currently serving w/the State of Massachusetts ; This Federal sentence is to begin today; Def. remanded to custody of Marshals; 3 yrs supervised release on all counts to be served concurrently w/one another; $300 assessment fee due immediately; Fine of $10,000 due immediately or acording to a court ordered payment schedule;. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
      Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Anthony Arillota for 4/27/06AT 2:00 P.M. (To Marshals this date)(French, Elizabeth)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
        Case as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd E. Newhouse appearing for USA filed. (Finn, Mary)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
            Attorney update in case as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari. Attorney Ariane D. Vuono terminated. (Finn, Mary)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
              Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered granting [43] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Anthony Arillota (1)Sentencing rescheduled to 4/27/06 at 2:00 p.m. (French, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                First MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 additional days to File presentence report as to Anthony Arillota. (Bongiorni, Vincent)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                  Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Anthony Arillota Sentencing set for 3/21/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Information - Felony
                    INFORMATION (Felony) as to Anthony Arillota (1) count(s) 1s. (Attachments: # (1) JS 45) (Stuckenbruck, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Plea Agreement
                      PLEA AGREEMENT as to Anthony Arillota (French, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 Change of Plea Hearing
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Change of Plea Hearing as to Anthony Arillota held on 12/21/2005, Plea entered by Anthony Arillota (1) Guilty Count 1,1s,2. (Court Reporter Sara Mubarek.) (French, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                          Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Anthony Arillota for 12/21/05MCI Concord, Concord, MA To Marshals this date (French, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Remark
                            NOTE TO COUNSEL as to Anthony Arillota:, Set/Reset Hearings as to Anthony Arillota: Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/21/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor per request of all counsel (French, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anthony Arillota ENTERED (on 11/7/05), cc:cl. [Conditions: abide by all conditions of his release as ordered in relation to his current state court case; notify Pretrial Services immediately once state court conditions are terminated] (Healy, Bethaney)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Bail Review Hearing
                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono and Bongiorni) and Defendant appear for Violation Hearing as to Anthony Arillota held on 11/8/2005. Colloquy re: violation and detainer. Court orders that Deft may be released subject to the conditions previously established in the pending superior court matter pending superior court sentencing set for 12/1/05. Deft signs new set of conditions of release. (Digital Recording #FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Status Conference
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 8/31/2005 (Atty Vuono/Atty Kelly appear for conference - Written status report by government by 9/12/05; Change of Plea set for David Cecchetelli for 10/7/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                    JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from July 26, 2005 until August 31, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. FINAL STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ENTERED, cc:cl. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Healy, Bethaney) Modified on 7/26/2005 (Healy, Bethaney).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: [32] Final Status Report corrected because: corrected to reflect the Initial Pretrial Conference shall go forward before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor (original entry erroneously stated the Initial Pretrial Conference shall go forward before Mag. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Status Conference
                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono and Mastroianni) appear for Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 7/26/2005. Colloquy re: status of discovery. Conference converted to a Final Status Conference. Final status report to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from April 27, 2005 until July 26, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. INTERIM STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ISSUED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ITNERIM SCHEDULING ORDER as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Interim Status Conference set for 7/26/2005 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo by 7/25/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Joint submission - Status Report for Final Status
                                                    Parties JOINT REPORT pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(A) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Status Conference
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Mastroianni, Kelly) appear for Interim Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 6/23/2005. Colloquy re: status of matter. Status Report and Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ISSUED, cc:cl. Status Conference moved to 6/23/2005 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from March 8, 2005 until April 27, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Interim Status Conference set for 6/23/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo due by 6/21/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Joint submission - Status Report for Final Status
                                                                Parties JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(A) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Status Conference
                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Kelly) appear for Initial Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 4/27/2005. Colloquy re: status of discovery. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Pretrial Services/Probation Memo
                                                                    Memorandum from Pretrial Services as to Anthony Arillota requesting that a detainer be lodged. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                      Letter (non-motion) regarding Local Rules 116.3 as to Anthony Arillota (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Waiver of Right to Separate Counsel
                                                                        WAIVER of Right to Separate Counsel by Anthony Arillota (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Hearing (Other)
                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Mastroianni) appear for Separate Representation Hearing as to Anthony Arillota, Louis Naioleari held on 4/7/2005. Colloquy re: status of appearances. Deft Arillotta sworn. Colloquy with court. Deft Arillotta executes waiver of right to separate representation. Deft Naioleari sworn. Colloqy with Court. Deft Naioleari executes waiver of right to separate representation. Court finds each Defendant understands proceedings and is each making a knowing waiver. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                            NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Anthony Arillota (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Arraignment
                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys O'Regan and Bongiorni) and Defendant Naioleari appear for Arraignment re: Count 1,2 held on 3/22/2005. Colloquy re: status of counsel and potential conflicts. Counsel and Defts Arilotta and Naioleari shall appear for a conference re: separate representation set for 4/7/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Deft pleads not guilty to charges. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/8/05. as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli seting Status Conference for 4/27/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo due by 4/25/05, ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anthony Arilotta ENTERED, cc:cl. [Conditions: execute $10,000 unsec. bond; report to PTS as directed; maintain/actively seek empl.; travel restricted to MA; maintain residence at 21 Chalmers St., Spfd, MA; abide by all conds. of his release, as ordered in relation to his current state court case; notify PTS immediately, once state court conds. are terminated] (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vincent A. Bongiorni appearing for Anthony Arillota (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Remark
                                                                                        Redacted Version of Indictment as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, filed. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Mastroianni, Garvey) appear for Initial Appearance, Detention Hearing, and Arraignment as to Anthony Arillota (1) Count 1, 2 and David Cecchetelli (2) Count 1, 2 held on 3/8/2005. Defts advised of rights. Atty Mastroianni is appearing on behalf of Anthony Arilotta, and covering in court for Atty Vincent Bongiorni. Atty Garvey is appearing on behalf of David Cecchetelli, and covering in court for Atty Jack St. Clair. Govt is not seeking detention. Defts plead not guilty to charges. Schedule established with order to issue. Defts released on conditions. Initial Status Conference set for 4/27/05 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom Three. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Case Unsealed
                                                                                            Case unsealed as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [4] Motion to Unseal Case as to Anthony Arillota (1), David Cecchetelli (2), Louis Naioleari (3), ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?