USA v. Arillota et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-30001-MAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd E. Newhouse +1 413 785 0109 +1 413 785 0394 Todd.Newhouse@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Springfield
Filed 1/4/2005
County Hampden
Terminated 5/9/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Louis Naioleari (3), Count(s) 1, 2, 13 months imprisonment to consist of terms of 13 months on both counts, to be served concurrenlty w/one another and concurrent w/the sentence the defendant is currently serving with the State of Massachusetts, this sentence is to begin today. Defendant remanded to U.S. Marshals. 3 yrs supervised release to consist of terms of 3 yrs on ea. ct. to be served concurrently w/one another. Prohibited from possessing a firearm; pay balance of fine according to a court ordered payment schedule; Prohibited from incurring new credit charges or opening additional lines of credit w/o approval of Probation; Provide Probation w/any requested financial information, which may be shared with the Financial Litigation Unit of the U.S. Attorney's office; Submit to collection of DNA as directed; Prohibited from engaging in any gambling activity, legal or otherwise; $200 assessment fee due immediately; Fine of $2,000 to be paid immediately or according to a court ordered payment schedule; (French, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2006 (French, Elizabeth).
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Sentencing
    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Sentencing held on 5/9/2006 for Louis Naioleari (3), Count(s) 1, 2, 13 months imprisonment to consist of terms of 13 months on both counts, to be served concurrenlty w/one another and concurrent w/the sentence the defendant is currently serving with the State of Massachusetts, this sentence is to begin today. Defendant remanded to U.S. Marshals. 3 yrs supervised release to consist of terms of 3 yrs on ea. ct. to be served concurrently w/one another. Prohibited from possessing a firearm; pay balance of fine according to a court ordered payment schedule; Prohibited from incurring new credit charges or opening additional lines of credit w/o approval of Probation; Provide Probation w/any requested financial information, which may be shared with the Financial Litigation Unit of the U.S. Attorney's office; Submit to collection of DNA as directed; Prohibited from engaging in any gambling activity, legal or otherwise; $200 assessment fee due immediately; Fine of $2,000 to be paid immediately or according to a court ordered payment schedule;. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
      Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Louis Naioleari for 5/8/06 (MCI Gardner)(French, Elizabeth)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
        Case as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Louis Naioleari: Sentencing RESET for 5/8/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd E. Newhouse appearing for USA filed. (Finn, Mary)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
              Attorney update in case as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari. Attorney Ariane D. Vuono terminated. (Finn, Mary)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                Set/Reset Hearings as to Louis Naioleari: Sentencing rese to 5/8/2006 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 2/16/2006 to change AM to PM. (Finn, Mary).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE OF CORRECTION RE: SENTENCING DATE AS TO LOUIS NAIOLEARI - SENTENCING RESCHEDULED TO 5/8/06 AT 2:30 P.M. (French, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: SENTENCING HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 4/3/06 AT 2:00 P.M.AS TO LOUIS NAIOLEARI PER REQUEST OF AUSA AND U.S. PROBATION (STATUS REPORT) (French, Elizabeth)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA as to Louis Naioleari (Goodwin, Karen)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Status Conference
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Louis Naioleari held on 1/27/2006 - Counsel to contact Probation and Report (by government) by 2/6/06 re: possible condensed PSR and/or motion to continue sentencing (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. as to Louis Naioleari - Counsel are ordered to appear before this court on 1/27/06 at 11:30 a.m. to report on status of case. See Order for further details.Probation memo attached (French, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Louis Naioleari Status Conference set for 1/27/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. RE:Memo from Probation(French, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Change of Plea Hearing
                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Change of Plea Hearing as to David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 10/21/2005, Plea entered by David Cecchetelli (2) Guilty Count 1,2 and Louis Naioleari (3) Guilty Count 1,2. Sentencing set for 3/3/06 @ 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Remark
                                NOTICE BY AUSA as to Louis Naioleari:, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Louis Naioleari: Defendant wishes to change plea Change of Plea Hearing set for 10/21/2005 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Status Conference
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 8/31/2005 (Atty Vuono/Atty Kelly appear for conference - Written status report by government by 9/12/05; Change of Plea set for David Cecchetelli for 10/7/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                    JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from July 26, 2005 until August 31, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. FINAL STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ENTERED, cc:cl. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. (Healy, Bethaney) Modified on 7/26/2005 (Healy, Bethaney).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: [32] Final Status Report corrected because: corrected to reflect the Initial Pretrial Conference shall go forward before District Judge Michael A. Ponsor (original entry erroneously stated the Initial Pretrial Conference shall go forward before Mag. Judge Kenneth P. Neiman) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Status Conference
                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono and Mastroianni) appear for Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 7/26/2005. Colloquy re: status of discovery. Conference converted to a Final Status Conference. Final status report to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from April 27, 2005 until July 26, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. INTERIM STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, ISSUED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ITNERIM SCHEDULING ORDER as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Interim Status Conference set for 7/26/2005 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo by 7/25/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Joint submission - Status Report for Final Status
                                                    Parties JOINT REPORT pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(A) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Status Conference
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Mastroianni, Kelly) appear for Interim Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 6/23/2005. Colloquy re: status of matter. Status Report and Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ISSUED, cc:cl. Status Conference moved to 6/23/2005 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from March 8, 2005 until April 27, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. STATUS REPORT as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Interim Status Conference set for 6/23/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo due by 6/21/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Joint submission - Status Report for Final Status
                                                                Parties JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 116.5(A) as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Status Conference
                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Kelly) appear for Initial Status Conference as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari held on 4/27/2005. Colloquy re: status of discovery. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Waiver of Right to Separate Counsel
                                                                    WAIVER of Right to Separate Counsel by Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Hearing (Other)
                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Bongiorni, Mastroianni) appear for Separate Representation Hearing as to Anthony Arillota, Louis Naioleari held on 4/7/2005. Colloquy re: status of appearances. Deft Arillotta sworn. Colloquy with court. Deft Arillotta executes waiver of right to separate representation. Deft Naioleari sworn. Colloqy with Court. Deft Naioleari executes waiver of right to separate representation. Court finds each Defendant understands proceedings and is each making a knowing waiver. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Louis Naioleari ENTERED, cc:cl. Initial Status Conference set for 4/27/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo by 4/25/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vincent A. Bongiorni appearing for Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/9/05 as to Louis Naioleari. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Arraignment
                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys O'Regan and Bongiorni) and Defendant Naioleari appear for Arraignment re: Count 1,2 held on 3/22/2005. Colloquy re: status of counsel and potential conflicts. Counsel and Defts Arilotta and Naioleari shall appear for a conference re: separate representation set for 4/7/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Deft pleads not guilty to charges. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Louis Naioleari, ENTERED, cc:cl. [Conditions: apr on 3/22/05 at 2:30 p.m. for arraignment with counsel; execute a $10,000 unsec. apr bond; report to PTS as directed; maintain/actively seek empl; obtain no passport; travel restricted to MA, except travel allowed to NY, NJ, PA, and New England states for employment purposes only; attend all ct proceedings at the Hampden County Superior Ct; provide proof of resolution of state case to PTS; abide by all conds. of release set by the Superior Ct] (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark G. Mastroianni appearing for Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Detention Hearing
                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Mastroianni and O'Regan) appear for Initial Appearance and Detention Hearing as to Louis Naioleari held on 3/9/2005. Deft advised of rights. Colloquy re: potential atty conflict. Arraignment continued to 3/22/05 at 2:30 p.m. Deft released on conditions. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Remark
                                                                                      Redacted Version of Indictment as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari, filed. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Case Unsealed
                                                                                        Case unsealed as to Anthony Arillota, David Cecchetelli, Louis Naioleari (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [4] Motion to Unseal Case as to Anthony Arillota (1), David Cecchetelli (2), Louis Naioleari (3), ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 262 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?