Walsh et al v. Hilee, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10010-EFH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Christopher J. Walsh, Plaintiff

Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo I.B.T.U. Local 379, Plaintiff

Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Hilee, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 1/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Suffolk
Terminated 11/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff. (Holahan, Sandra)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
    Judge Edward F. Harrington : ElectronicORDER entered granting [20] Motion for Entry of Default. MOTION ALLOWED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Geiman, Gregory)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Affidavit
        AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Walsh as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
          AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Walsh in Support re [20] MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Hilee, Inc. filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            MEMORANDUM in Support re [20] MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Hilee, Inc. filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005, Terminated: 11/1/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
              MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Hilee, Inc. by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time to File. MOTION ALLOWED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 9/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to October 31, 2005 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hilee, Inc. (Holahan, Sandra)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                      Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [17] Motion for Entry of Default. REQUEST ALLOWED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/16/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                        MOTION for Entry of Default by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                          Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [11] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Christopher J. Walsh,, I.B.T.U. Local 379,, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund. NOTICE OF DISMISSAL IS APPROVED (McCourt Construction Company, Inc.) (Holahan, Sandra)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                            Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [13] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Christopher J. Walsh,, I.B.T.U. Local 379,, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund. NOTICE OF DISMISSAL IS APPROVED (Gioioso Bros, Inc.) (Holahan, Sandra)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed The McCourt Construction Company, Inc. served on 7/1/2005, answer due 7/21/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Gioioso Bros, Inc. served on 6/30/2005, answer due 7/20/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Hilee, Inc. served on 6/30/2005, answer due 7/20/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379 (Geiman, Gregory)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Reach-and-Apply Defendant, the McCourt Construction Company, Inc. (ONLY) by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379 (Geiman, Gregory) Modified on 7/7/2005 (Holahan, Sandra).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Answer
                                        ANSWER of Trustee by Fleet Bank. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                                          SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Fleet Bank served on 6/16/2005, answer due 7/6/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Summons to Trustee Issued
                                            Summons to Trustee Issued as to Fleet Bank. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Order on Motion for Trustee Process
                                              Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion for Trustee Process. MOTION ALLOWED. SO ORDERED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time. MOTION ALLOWED. SO ORDERED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Affidavit
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. sills re [5] MOTION for Trustee Process by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Ex Parte) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Walsh in Support re [5] MOTION for Trustee Process filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Ex Parte) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [5] MOTION for Trustee Process filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Ex Parte) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Motion for Trustee Process
                                                        EX PARTE MOTION for Trustee Process by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                          EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/30/2005 to serve complaint by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against McCourt Construction Co., Inc., Hilee, Inc., Gioioso Bros, Inc., filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Extension of Time. MOTION ALLOWED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/31/2005 to serve complaint by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379.(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against McCourt Construction Co., Inc., Hilee, Inc., Gioioso Bros, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61149, filed by Christopher J. Walsh, Construction Teamsters Health And Welfare Fund, I.B.T.U. Local 379. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Catagory Cover Sheet)(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                    Summons Issued as to McCourt Construction Co., Inc., Hilee, Inc., Gioioso Bros, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge ALEXANDER. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?