USA v. Depergola et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-30002-MAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd E. Newhouse +1 413 785 0109 +1 413 785 0394 Todd.Newhouse@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Springfield
Filed 1/4/2005
County Hampden
Terminated 6/23/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 894.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 894.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered granting [89] Motion To destroy evdidence as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2) (French, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 7/3/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION Government's Request to Destroy Evidence as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA. (Newhouse, Todd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta: Jury Trial set for 3/27/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (Entered to clarify docket) (French, Elizabeth)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
        Notice of correction to docket #51 made by Court staff. Correction: Removed word "Electronic" as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (French, Elizabeth)
          LREF
          Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
          Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL ON ALL COUNTS (French, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
            Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered prohibiting post verdict contact with jurors as to Armando Botta (French, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Jury Verdict
              JURY VERDICT as to Armando Botta (2) Not Guilty on Count 1,2. (French, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Jury Trial
                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : 9:00 a.m.Jury Deliberations as to Armando Botta held on 6/23/2006 11:10 a.m. Jury verdict - Not guilty to both counts - (Court Reporter Jim Gibbons.) (French, Elizabeth)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Jury Trial
                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Jury Trial as to Armando Botta held on 6/22/2006 8:30 a.m. counsel only - charging conference; Jury enters 9:20 a.m.; Gov't rests; Defendant moves for judgment of acquittal, Def. rests; Motion denied; Closing arguments by counsel; Charge to Jury; Jury deliberations begin at 1:10 p.m.; 5:00 p.m. recess for day; deliberations to continue at 9:00 a.m. on 6/23/06 (Court Reporter Jim Gibbons.) (French, Elizabeth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Proposed Jury Instructions
                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Newhouse, Todd)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Jury Trial
                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : 9:00 a.m.Jury Trial as to Armando Botta held on 6/21/2006; Governments case continues w/testimony of L. Daniele; Agent Warren testifies; recess for day 1:00 p.m.; trial to resume on 6/22/06 at 8:30 a.m. w/counsel only; jury to report at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Jim Gibbons.) (French, Elizabeth)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Jury Trial
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Jury Trial as to Armando Botta held on 6/20/2006 9:00 a.m. Juror in Seat 13 excused by Court, Juror in Seat 14 into Seat 13; Opening Statements by counsel; Government's case begins w/ testimony of Leo Daniele; tape recordings and videos in the course of witness's testimony; Recess for day 1:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Jim Gibbons.) (French, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Exhibit
                          EXHIBIT by USA as to Armando Botta (French, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order
                            Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered re: (Motion) for additional voir dire (dkt no. 69) "Denied as moot" as to Armando Botta (French, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order
                              Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered re: Denying request contained in proposed voir dire (dkt no. 64) requesting limited attorney conducted voir dire ("Denied, the Court will conduct voir dire") as to Armando Botta (French, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Voir Dire Begun
                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : 9:00 a.m. Counsel only; 9:40 jury selection begins; Voir Dire begun on 6/19/2006 Armando Botta (2) on Count 1,2 Jury Selection held; Jury sworn at 12:45; Preliminary instructions to jury; Opening statements and evidence to begin on 6/20/06 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Jim Gibbons.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order on Motion in Limine
                                  Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered finding as moot [68] Motion in Limine as to Armando Botta "Denied as moot. To the extent counsel have not resolved the issue, opposing transcripts may be offered" (2) (French, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order on Motion in Limine
                                    Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [60] Motion in Limine as to Armando Botta (2) "Allowed in part, The witness Danielle may testify as to defendant's reputation and the witness Verducci may testify. The government will not offer defendant's prior conviction, the Court has barred expert testimony."; granting by agreement[66] Motion in Limine as to Armando Botta (2) (French, Elizabeth)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Motion Hearing
                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Motion Hearing as to Armando Botta held on 6/16/2006 re [66] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Drug Transactions filed by Armando Botta,, [60] MOTION in Limine filed by USA,, [68] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Use of Transcripts filed by Armando Botta, (Court Reporter Sarah Mubarek.) (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Proposed Voir Dire
                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Armando Botta (Levinson, Lori)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion in Limine
                                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude Use of Transcripts as to Armando Botta. (Levinson, Lori)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Armando Botta [60] MOTION in Limine, [66] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Drug Transactions: Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                              Opposition by Armando Botta re [60] MOTION in Limine (Levinson, Lori)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Drug Transactions as to Armando Botta. (Levinson, Lori)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Armando Botta (Levinson, Lori)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Armando Botta (Levinson, Lori)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Trial Brief
                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Newhouse, Todd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Attachments: # (1) pages 21 - 29) filed. (Document deleted and redocketed to divide the pages to 1-20 and 21-29)(Finn, Mary) Modified on 6/5/2006 to correct the document number to [62]. (Finn, Mary).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Newhouse, Todd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                            MOTION in Limine to Admit Evidence Pursuant to FRE 404(b) as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA. (Newhouse, Todd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Letter (non-motion)
                                                              Letter regarding discovery as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta filed by USA (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Motion for Warrant
                                                                MOTION for Material witness Warrant to prevent deportation as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Order on Motion for Warrant
                                                                  Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered granting [55] Motion for issuance of a material witness warrant as to Armando Botta (2) Warrant issued and delivered to Marshals this date (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Status Conference
                                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 3/22/2006 re: new trial date; Trial shall go forward on 6/19/06 at 9:00 a.m.; Motions in limine, voir dire questions and jury instructions to be filed by 6/5/06; Opposition by 6/12/06; Once motions filed a determination shall be made as to whether a hearing shall be scheduled prior to trial date (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                      Govt's Letter (non-motion) regarding continuing discovery obligations as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta: Government to provide remaining documents by 3/3/06; By 3/3/06, counsel may file, if he wishes, a motion to continue trial w/supporting material; Motions in limine by 3/10/06; opposition by 3/17/06; Jury Trial reset for 3/27/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. Pretrial Conference and hearing on motions in limine set for 3/22/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/22/2006 (French, Elizabeth).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd E. Newhouse appearing for USA filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Status Conference
                                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 2/28/2006. Discovery to be furnished to defense counsel by 3/3/2006 as well as motion to continue trial, if any, by deft. Depergola. Pre-trial Motions due by 3/10/2006. Govt. response by 3/17/06. Motion hearing on 3/22/06 @ 2:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta. Attorney Ariane D. Vuono terminated. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/8/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                MOTION to Continue as to Armando Botta. (Levinson, Lori)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                  Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Motion to Continue as to Armando Botta (2) Status Conference reset for all defendants for 2/28/2006 01:45 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta Status Conference set for 2/22/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006, Terminated: 6/23/2006 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                      First MOTION for Bill of Particulars as to Armando Botta. (Levinson, Lori)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered denying [26] Motion to Dismiss as to Armando Botta (2) (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Motion to Compel as to Armando Botta (2) "The government will provide the requested information by 1/9/06" (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Oral Order
                                                                                            Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered. ORAL ORDER as to Armando Botta - Allowing travel outside of Hampden County on 1/1/06 from 8:00 a.m. to midnight (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                              ORAL MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Armando Botta to allow travel outside of Hampden County on New Years Day to Foxboro. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Motion Hearing as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 12/22/2005 re [25] MOTION to Compel filed by Armando Botta,, [26] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Armando Botta, Defendants shall file any further discovery motions by 1/6/06; Oral motion by Armando Botta re: permission to travel out of Hampden County on 1/1/06 - Allowed - defendant may leave Hampden County from 8:00 a.m. to 12 midnight to travel to Foxboro - Pretrial services notified (Court Reporter Sara Mubarek.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta Hearing set for 12/22/05 at 11:30 a.m. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta Jury Trial RESET for 3/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ElectronicORDER entered granting [36] Motion to Continue as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2) "The clerk will reschedule this trial for February or March 2006; The government will file a motion to exclude time based on the need for continuity of counsel" (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta re [26] MOTION to Dismiss, [22] MOTION to Dismiss (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                          Dft's AFFIDAVIT of Michael L. Foy in Support of their [36] MOTION to Continue Trial Date, by Frank Depergola, Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                            Dft's AFFIDAVIT of Lori H. Levinson; in Support of their [36] MOTION to Continue trial date by Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 11/7/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                              Dft's MOTION to Continue Trial as to Frank Depergola, and Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                Judge Michael A Ponsor : ElectronicORDER entered granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Armando Botta (2) (Response due 11/4/05) (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005, Terminated: 10/31/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                  Govt's MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/04/2005 to File Response to the Deft's [26] MOTION to Dismiss, [22] MOTION to Dismiss as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                    Case as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta Time excluded from June 8, 2005 until October 21, 2005; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta [22] MOTION to Dismiss, [26] MOTION to Dismiss. Govt's Responses due by 10/21/2005. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : ELECTRONIC ENDORSEDORDER entered granting [33] Motion for an Order of Excludable Delay for the time from 6/08/2005 to 10/21/2005 as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2); granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time to 10/21/2005 to resp. to the Defts' motion to dismiss as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2); cc/cl. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                            Govt's MOTION for an Order of Excludable Delay for the time period from June 8, 2005 to October 21, 2005 and MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/21/2005 to File a resp. to the Deft's motion to dismiss as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA filed. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta, ENTERED, cc:cl. Time excluded from March 2, 2005 until June 8, 2005. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/1/05 as to Armando Botta, returned to the clerk's office for filing on 9/27/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Lori H. Levinson; in Support of Dft's [26] MOTION to Dismiss by Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss as to Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Disclosure as to Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/23/05 to File Memorandum of law as to Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor :Status Conference as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 8/11/2005; Motion to Dismiss, if any, to be filed by 9/9/05; If no motion will be filed, counsel to notify the court in writing; Opposition by 9/30/05; Trial set for 12/12/05 Government to file appropriate motion re: excludable delay (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. FINAL STATUS REPORT as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta ENTERED, cc:cl. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel appear for Final Status Conference as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 6/9/2005. Final Status Report to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT Pursuant to local rule 116.5(A) by Frank Depergola, USA, Armando Botta as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta ISSUED, cc:cl. Status Conference continued from 6/2/05 to 6/9/2005 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [16] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (allowing travel to Stamford, CT on 6/18/05) as to Armando Botta (2), ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005, Terminated: 5/23/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Temporary Modification of a Condition of Release as to Armando Botta. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta ENTERED, cc:cl. Status Conference set for 6/2/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint memo due by 5/31/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lori H. Levinson appearing for Armando Botta (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono, Foy and Levinson) appear for Initial Status Conference as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta held on 4/25/2005. Joint memo filed. Colloquy re: discovery. Further Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Armando Botta. Attorney Lori H. Levinson for Armando Botta added. Attorney Roy H. Anderson terminated. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED Copy of Indictment as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta, filed. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : SCHEDULING ORDER as to Armando Botta entered. Status Conference set for 4/25/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Parties joint memorandum due by close of business 4/21/2005; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Armando Botta, ENTERED, cc:cl. [Conditions: execute an unsecured $30,000 appearance bond; report to PTS as directed (at least once per week in person); maintain/actively seek empl. and submit ongoing verification to PTS; obtain no passport; travel restricted to Hampden County, MA; surrender any firearms to law enforcement and provide proof to PTS] (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Roy H. Anderson appearing for Armando Botta (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005, Terminated: 3/2/2005 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case and submit redacted indictment, as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Vuono and Anderson) and Defendant appear for Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Armando Botta (2) Count 1,2 held on 3/2/2005. Deft advised of rights. Deft retains his own counsel for purposes of arraignment. Counsel will inform court by 3/7/05 whether he will remain in the case, or whether Deft will be seeking appointment of counsel. Deft pleads not guilty to charges. Deft released on conditions. Status conference set for 4/25/05 at 2:30 p.m. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Case Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                Case unsealed as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [3] Motion to Unseal Case as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2), ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Case as to Frank Depergola, Armando Bottaby USA. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Case Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                      Case sealed as to Frank Depergola, Armando Botta (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Order on Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Electronic ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal Case as to Frank Depergola (1), Armando Botta (2) ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 470 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?