McNally et al v. Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10011-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Merloni, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Paul J McNally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
No Logo Madison Excavating Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
No Logo Eastern Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Barnstable
Terminated 11/2/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh (Geiman, Gregory)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Patch, Christine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc., Madison Excavating Corp..(Carpenter, M.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons Returned Executed
          SUMMONS Returned Executed Madison Excavating Corp. served on 1/10/2005, answer due 1/31/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons Returned Executed
            SUMMONS Returned Executed Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc. served on 1/10/2005, answer due 1/31/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc., Madison Excavating Corp. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61150, filed by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to Littleton Environmental Serives, Inc., Madison Excavating Corp.. (Patch, Christine)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Patch, Christine)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 117 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?