Lopilato et al v. Officer Michael Lank et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10012-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfredo Lopilato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hrones, Garrity & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Diane Hedges +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 hedges@masscriminallawyer.com
Space Stephen Baylis Hrones +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 sbhlaw@comcast.net
Space Michael L. Tumposky +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 tumposky@masscriminallawyer.com
No Logo Marc Lopilato, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hrones, Garrity & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Diane Hedges +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 hedges@masscriminallawyer.com
Space Stephen Baylis Hrones +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 sbhlaw@comcast.net
Space Michael L. Tumposky +1 617 227 4019 +1 617 227 3908 tumposky@masscriminallawyer.com
v.
No Logo Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com
Space Stephen C. Pfaff +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 spfaff@lccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by merricklc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie A. McCormack +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 vmccormack@lccplaw.com
No Logo Officer Errol Lane, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com
Space Stephen C. Pfaff +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 spfaff@lccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by merricklc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie A. McCormack +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 vmccormack@lccplaw.com
No Logo Officer Glenn Nix, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com
Space Stephen C. Pfaff +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 spfaff@lccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by merricklc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie A. McCormack +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 vmccormack@lccplaw.com
No Logo Officer Michael Lank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com
Space Stephen C. Pfaff +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 spfaff@lccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by merricklc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie A. McCormack +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 vmccormack@lccplaw.com
No Logo The Town of Canton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com
Space Stephen C. Pfaff +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 spfaff@lccplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by merricklc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie A. McCormack +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 vmccormack@lccplaw.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/4/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Norfolk
Terminated 11/21/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Paine, Matthew)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Paine, Matthew)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion in Limine
      Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [49] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Citations. (Paine, Matthew)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion to Sequester
        Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [48] MOTION to Sequester Plaintiffs' Witnesses. (Paine, Matthew)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion in Limine
          Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered denied as moot [46] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Alleged Misconduct. (Paine, Matthew)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Motion in Limine
            Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered denied as moot [45] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Medical Records. (Paine, Matthew)
              LREF
              Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Certificate of Consultation
              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [48] MOTION to Sequester Plaintiffs' Witnesses, [49] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Citations, [46] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Alleged Misconduct, [45] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Medical Records, [47] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Photographs of Plaintiff's Injuries Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1. (McCormack, Valerie)
                LREF
                Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion in Limine
                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Citations by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(McCormack, Valerie)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion to Sequester
                  MOTION to Sequester Plaintiffs' Witnesses by Officer Errol Lane, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(McCormack, Valerie)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/21/2007 Motion in Limine
                    MOTION in Limine To Exclude Photographs of Plaintiff's Injuries by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(McCormack, Valerie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion in Limine
                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Alleged Misconduct by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(McCormack, Valerie)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Motion in Limine
                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Medical Records by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(McCormack, Valerie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Witness List
                          Plaintiff's Supplemental Witness List by Marc Lopilato. (Hedges, Jessica)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Pretrial Conference - Final
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young : Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2007.The Court informs counsel the case will commence Nov 26 with jury empanelment. The case is expected to finish by Dec 4. If the case settles, a phone call to the clerk is all that is necessary. (Smith, Bonnie)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Order on Motion for Order
                              Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion for Order FOR ACCESS TO CORI RE: PLAINTIFF (Smith, Bonnie)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                Case Reassigned to Judge William G. Young. Judge Nancy Gertner no longer assigned to the case. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing :Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.,Jury Trial set for MONDAY 11/26/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Remark
                                    Remark: Counsel reported to the court, that all settlement negoiations have failed. Counsel will be on call for trial, clerk will notify parties in advance of a trial date. (Note: jury trial scheduled for 10/29/07 was cancelled-all parties were notified) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Settlement Conference
                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner: Atty Hrones, Atty Hedges, Atty Louison and clients on both sides present.Settlement Conference held on 10/25/2007....settlement negoiations on-going, counsel will notify clerk on 10/26/07 if settlement fails. (Court Reporter none.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Proposed Voir Dire
                                        Proposed Voir Dire by all plaintiffs. (Tumposky, Michael)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by all plaintiffs. (Tumposky, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 11/14/2007 Motion for Order
                                            MOTION for Order Granting Access to Criminal Offender Record Information Concerning the Plaintiff, Alfredo Lopilato by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# (2) Affidavit Affidavit of Valerie McCormack# (3) Certificate Pursuant to LR 7.1(a)(2))(McCormack, Valerie)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                              Opposition re [35] MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato. (Tumposky, Michael)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (McCormack, Valerie)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Exhibit
                                                  Defendants' Amended Exhibit List by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.. (McCormack, Valerie)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (McCormack, Valerie)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner : Atty Hedges, Atty Louison, Atty McCormack present.Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/10/2007.Jury Trial reset to 10/29/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.,Settlement Conference set for 10/25/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Court Reporter none.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007, Terminated: 11/21/2007 Motion to Bifurcate
                                                        MOTION to Bifurcate by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(McCormack, Valerie) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2007 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Order Granting Access to Criminal Offender Record Information Concerning the Plaintiff, Marc Lopilato. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered: PROCEDURAL ORDER re: pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2007 02:30PM; Jury Trial set for 10/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner.(Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion for Order
                                                              MOTION for Order Granting Access to Criminal Offender Record Information Concerning the Plaintiff, Marc Lopilato by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order# (2) Affidavit Affidavit of Valerie McCormack# (3) Certificate Pursuant to LR 7.1(a)(2))(McCormack, Valerie)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Claim by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(Louison, Douglas)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie A. McCormack on behalf of Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix (McCormack, Valerie)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Pfaff on behalf of Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix (Pfaff, Stephen) Modified on 8/13/2007 - Duplicate entry of docket number [28] (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by James W. Simpson, Jr (Simpson, James) Modified on 8/13/2007-Duplicate of docket entry [27] (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Pfaff on behalf of Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix (McCormack, Valerie) Modified on 8/13/2007 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by James W. Simpson, Jr. (McCormack, Valerie) Modified on 8/13/2007 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas I. Louison on behalf of Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix (Louison, Douglas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato.(Hedges, Jessica)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered granting [23] Motion to Amend [1] Complaint, by Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (Hedges, Jessica)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 7/31/2007 Motion to Amend
                                                                                    MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint, by Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Amended Complaint)(Hedges, Jessica)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner: Pretrial Conference (lobby) held on 6/7/2007; Jessica Hedges for the pltf. and James Simpson for the defts.; The parties report the status of the case; Ajury trial is set for 10/22/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner., and the pretrial conference is set for 10/10/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESETTING "TIME ONLY for Pretrial Conference:Pretrial Conference reset from 2:30pm to 3:00pm on 6/7/2007 in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution ProviderCourt Filing
                                                                                          REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. U.S. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin reports that case did not settled. (Report attached). (Franklin, Yvonne) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2007 (Filo, Jennifer).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Notice of ADR Conference
                                                                                            NOTICE of ADR Conference; The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been set for 5/24/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memoranda should be submitted no later than five (5) days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing". In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and the court as soon as possible. If this date poses a conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and file an assented to motion to continue the mediation date as soon as possible.(Simeone, Maria)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of assignment to ADR Provider. U.S. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. If available, parties request that Mag Judge Sorokin be appointed.(Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Remark
                                                                                                  Remark: Counsel have agreed to participate in the Mediation Program, counsel request that matter be referred to Mag Judge Sorokin, order to follow. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                    Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered Granting [18] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for the defendants. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner : Atty Tumposky & Atty Simpson present.Status Conference held on 9/19/2006. Discovery deadlines extended to 11/30/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2007; Responses due by 2/23/07; Jury Trial set for 6/11/2007 09:00AM; Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. No Further Continuances will be entertained.(Court Reporter none.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference is reset from 7/19/2006 at 2:30 PM to 9/19/2006 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by William P Breen, Jr (Breen, William)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Simpson, Jr on behalf of all defendants (Simpson, James)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(Andrews, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Tumposky on behalf of all plaintiffs (Tumposky, Michael)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nancy Gertner : Scheduling Conference held on 12/1/2005. Joint Statement Adopted. Status Conference set for 7/19/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Court Reporter none.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Joint submission
                                                                                                                    JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix.(Hedges, Jessica)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Nancy Gertner. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Town of Canton.(Breen, William)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Stephen B. Hrones on behalf of Alfredo Lopilato. (Hrones, Stephen)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Stephen B. Hrones on behalf of Marc Lopilato. (Hrones, Stephen)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Canton Police Chief Peter Bright waiver sent on 1/10/2005, answer due 3/11/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Officer Errol Lane waiver sent on 1/10/2005, answer due 3/11/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Officer Michael Lank waiver sent on 1/10/2005, answer due 3/11/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed The Town of Canton waiver sent on 1/10/2005, answer due 3/11/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Officer Glenn Nix.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Canton Police Chief Peter Bright.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Officer Errol Lane.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Officer Michael Lank.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by The Town of Canton.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Andrews, William P Breen, Jr on behalf of Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61189, filed by Marc Lopilato, Alfredo Lopilato. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Officer Errol Lane, Canton Police Chief Peter Bright, The Town of Canton, Officer Michael Lank, Officer Glenn Nix. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 870 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?