Amesbury Group, Inc. et al v. The Caldwell Manufacturing Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10020-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amesbury Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terese Dillingham +1 617 570 1691 +1 617 227 8591 tdillingham@goodwinprocter.com
Space Douglas J. Kline +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 dkline@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Safraz W Ishmael +1 617 570 1729 +1 617 523 1231 sishmael@proskauer.com
No Logo Amesbury Springs Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Whetstone +1 617 248 7312 +1 617 790 0292

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terese Dillingham +1 617 570 1691 +1 617 227 8591 tdillingham@goodwinprocter.com
Space Safraz W Ishmael +1 617 570 1729 +1 617 523 1231 sishmael@proskauer.com
Space Douglas J. Kline +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 dkline@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lurie & Krupp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Lent +1 617 367 1970 +1 617 367 1971 tlent@luriekrupp.com
v.
No Logo The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, Defendant

Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris, Beach Law Firm - Pittsford Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Edwards +1 585 419 8800 +1 585 419 8801 dedwards@harrisbeach.com
Space Laura W. Smalley +1 585 419 8800 +1 585 419 8801 lsmalley@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lurie & Krupp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Lent +1 617 367 1970 +1 617 367 1971 tlent@luriekrupp.com
Space David E. Lurie +1 617 367 1970 +1 617 367 1971 dlurie@luriekrupp.com
No Logo Amesbury Group, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Amesbury Springs Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/5/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 2/7/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PATENT
  Entries (165) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 126 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Endorsed ORDER entered. (Nici, Richard)
    LREF
    Legal Document 125 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. Document received: Consent Judgment and Agreed Order of Dismissal. (Kline, Douglas)
      LREF
      Legal Document 124 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Terminated Case
        Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE Cancelling Motion hearing previously set for 1/31/07. (Rynne, Michelle)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
            ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing on [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Declaration
              DECLARATION re [119] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Safraz W. Ishmael in Support of Amesbury's Opposition to Caldwell's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-3# (2) Exhibit 4 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 4 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibits 5-6# (5) Exhibit 7 (Part 1)# (6) Exhibit 7 (Part 2)# (7) Exhibit 7 (Part 3)# (8) Exhibits 8-9# (9) Exhibit 10 (Part 1)# (10) Exhibit 10 (Part 2)# (11) Exhibit 11)(Kline, Douglas)
                LREF
                Legal Document 122 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Declaration
                DECLARATION of Sammy Shina, Ph.D. by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-B)(Kline, Douglas)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Response
                  Response by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd., Amesbury's Response To Caldwell's Local Rule 56.1 Statement Of Material Facts Of Record As To Which There Is No Genuine Issue To Be Tried. (Kline, Douglas)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Statement of Facts
                    STATEMENT of facts Amesbury's Local Rule 56.1 Statement Of Material Facts Of Record As To Which There Is At Least A Genuine Issue To Be Tried. (Kline, Douglas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Thomas Lent. (Nici, Richard)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Affidavit
                          Corrected AFFIDAVIT of Fletcher Smith re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, [115] Affidavit in Support of Motion Corrected by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas) Modified on 1/4/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 116 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company re [115] Affidavit in Support of Motion - Exhibits to Smith Affidavit to be filed manually (Lurie, David) Received on 12/29/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 115 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                              AFFIDAVIT of Fletcher Smith in Support re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lurie, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                AFFIDAVIT of Neil L. Slifkin in Support re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,820,368)(Lurie, David)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 113 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lurie, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 112 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [111] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lurie, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 111 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lurie, David)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Pretrial filings due 2/21/07. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Notice of hearing(other)
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment :Hearing set for 2/14/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Status Conference
                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Status Conference held on 12/5/2006. Motion for summary judgment due 12/29/06, response by 1/12/07, hearing set for 2/14/07 at 3:30 p.m. Additional discovery completed by 1/31/07. Jury trial set for 3/12/07 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Status Report
                                              STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report For The December 5, 2006 Scheduling Conference) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [76] Motion for Summary Judgment, specifically, DENYING Amesbury's summary judgment motion with respect to:(1)infringement and the validity of the '638 Patent,(2) validity of the '264 Patent, and (3) infringement of Claims 2, 3, 6, and 7 of the '368 Patent by Caldwell's Series 97i and 97ih balances; and GRANTING Amesbury's summary judgment motion with respect to:(1) infringement of Claims 1, 2, 4, and 5 of the '264 Patent by Caldwell's Series 86xt balance,(2) infringement of Claims 2, 3, 6, and 7 of the '368 Patent by Caldwell's Series 97ez balances, and (3)validity of the '368 Patent. (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status report due 11/28/06. Issues to be considered: contributory infringement discovery with respect to the '638 patent and trial date.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                    Motions terminated: [80] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion, Motion t filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, [103] MOTION to Strike [98] Declaration, [99] Declaration, [96] Reply to Response to Motion,, [100] Declaration, [95] Reply to Response to Motion, [94] Reply to Response to Motion, [97] Declaration, Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Papers On Its Mo filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ISSUED 11/2/06. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Summary Judgment Hearing held on August 31, 2006 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [101] Motion for Leave to File reply. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Neal L. Slifkin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Nici, Richard)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 8/31/2006 re [80] MOTION to Strike, [103] MOTION to Strike, and [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid - MOTIONS TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing on [80] MOTION to Strike [103] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid: Motion Hearing reset for 8/31/2006 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                Opposition re [103] MOTION to Strike [98] Declaration,, [99] Declaration, [96] Reply to Response to Motion,, [100] Declaration,, [95] Reply to Response to Motion,, [94] Reply to Response to Motion,, [97] Declaration, Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Papers On Its Mo filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-2# (2) Exhibit 3 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 3 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibit 4 (Part 1)# (5) Exhibit 4 (Part 2)# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6 (Part 1)# (8) Exhibit 6 (Part 2)# (9) Exhibit 6 (Part 3)# (10) Exhibits 7-10# (11) Exhibits 11-14)(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [103] MOTION to Strike [98] Declaration,, [99] Declaration, [96] Reply to Response to Motion,, [100] Declaration,, [95] Reply to Response to Motion,, [94] Reply to Response to Motion,, [97] Declaration, Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Papers On Its Mo filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                    MOTION to Strike [98] Declaration,, [99] Declaration, [96] Reply to Response to Motion,, [100] Declaration,, [95] Reply to Response to Motion,, [94] Reply to Response to Motion,, [97] Declaration, Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Papers On Its Motion for Summary Judgment by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Cancelling Hearing. Further scheduling/Status Conference previously set for 07/13/2006 is cancelled in light of the Motion hearing set for 8/30/06.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [80] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Motion t filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 10/3/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Declaration
                                                                            DECLARATION re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Second Declaration Of Sammy Shina, Ph.D.) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A - E)(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Declaration
                                                                              DECLARATION re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Declaration Of Terese Dillingham) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Declaration
                                                                                DECLARATION re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Declaration Of Christopher Rogers) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1 - 2)(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Declaration
                                                                                  DECLARATION re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Supplemental Declaration Of Safraz W. Ishmael) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 39 - 46)(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 96 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Reply In Support Of Amesbury's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid) filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 95 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Amesbury's Response To Caldwell's Response To Amesbury's Local Rule 56.1 Statement Of Material Facts Of Record As To Which There Is No Genuine Issue To Be Tried) filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid (Amesbury's Reply To Caldwell's Local Rule 56.1 Statement Of Additional Facts) filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 93 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Opposition re [80] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Motion t filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Part 1)# (2) Exhibit 1 (Part 2)# (3) Exhibit 1 (Part 3)# (4) Exhibit 1 (Part 4)# (5) Exhibit 1 (Part 5)# (6) Exhibits 2-8# (7) Exhibit 9 (Part 1)# (8) Exhibit 9 (Part 2))(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                            EXHIBIT (#36 & 37 )re [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 6/20/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd., Of Manual Filing With Clerk's Office (Dillingham, Terese)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [75] Motion to Seal Document, granting [83] Motion for Leave to File excess pages, granting [87] Motion to Seal (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing on Motion [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid: Motion Hearing reset for 8/30/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [84] Opposition to Motion Declaration of Charles E. Still by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Part I)# (2) Exhibit A (Part II)# (3) Exhibit B (Part I)# (4) Exhibit B (Part II)# (5) Exhibit C (Part I)# (6) Exhibit C (Part II)# (7) Exhibit C (Part III))(Lent, Thomas) Received Copies and exhibits A-E in paper form (disk containing exhibits A-E will be sent) (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 89 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [84] Opposition to Motion Declaration of Neal L. SLifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Part 1)# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Part II)# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 7 (Part I)# (6) Exhibit 7 (Part II)# (7) Exhibit 7 (Part III)# (8) Exhibit 8 (Part I)# (9) Exhibit 8 (Part II)# (10) Exhibit 8 (Part III)# (11) Exhibit 8 (Part IV)# (12) Exhibit 9# (13) Exhibit 10 (Part I)# (14) Exhibit 10 (Part II)# (15) Exhibit 11# (16) Exhibit 12# (17) Exhibit 13# (18) Exhibit 14# (19) Exhibit 15# (20) Exhibit 16)(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 6/12/2006 (Nici, Richard). Received exhibits 4-6, 11 & 16, (FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 6/12/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [84] Opposition to Motion Declaration of Douglas Zinter by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit B (Part II)# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 87 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Exhibits 11 and 16 to the Slifkin Declaration by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Response
                                                                                                            Statement of Additional Facts in Response by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company to [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Response
                                                                                                              Response by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company to [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Opposition re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Brief In Excess of Twenty Pages by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [81] Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, [80] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Motion t o Exclude Expert Testimony and Strike Expert Reports and Hearsay Statements from Amesbury's Motion for Summary Judgment by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Sammy G. Shina)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 81 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [80] MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Motion t o Exclude Expert Testimony and Strike Expert Reports and Hearsay Statements from Amesbury's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid, [77] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, [78] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [79] Affidavit in Support of Motion,, Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Strike Expert Reports and Hearsay Statements from Amesbury's Motion for Summary Judgment by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: the docket text of docket entry #75 corrected because: a typographical error was made during entry. The docket text now reflects the document accurately. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Safraz W. Ishmael in Support re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-3# (2) Exhibit 4 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 4 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibit 5# (5) Exhibit 6 (Part 1)# (6) Exhibit 6 (Part 2)# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9 (Part 1)# (10) Exhibit 9 (Part 2)# (11) Exhibit 9 (Part 3)# (12) Exhibit 10# (13) Exhibit 11# (14) Exhibits 12-13# (15) Exhibits 14-16# (16) Exhibits 17-20# (17) Exhibits 21-23# (18) Exhibits 24-26# (19) Exhibits 27-30# (20) Exhibits 31-37# (21) Exhibit 38)(Ishmael, Safraz) Modified on 6/20/2006 (Nici, Richard). RECEIVED EXHIBITS 36 & 37. FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [76] MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not Invalid by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Exhibits 36 and 37 To The Declaration of Safraz W. Ishmael In Support Of Amesbury's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Infringement And That The Asserted Claims Are Not invalid) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Dillingham, Terese) Modified on 5/22/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [73] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Terese Dillingham on behalf of Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd., (Dillingham, Terese)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006, Terminated: 5/18/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jordan M. Singer (Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Notice of hearing(other)
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of correction of hearing date:Hearing on motion for summary judgment set for 7/12/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying [69] Motion to enforce compliance with Court's December 22, 2005 Order, the defendant being obligated by that order only to provide data for the product lines identified and pursued as infringing before the close of discovery. (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 71 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition including unscanned exhibits 1-10 re [69] MOTION To Enforce Compliance With The Court's December 22, 2005 Order filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [69] MOTION To Enforce Compliance With The Court's December 22, 2005 Order filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006, Terminated: 4/19/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION To Enforce Compliance With The Court's December 22, 2005 Order by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert discovery completed by 5/5/06. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/19/2006, oppositions due by 6/9/06, reply due by 6/23/06. Motion hearing set for 7/13/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [67] Motion for Order setting schedule. Order to issue. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/24/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Order to Set Schedule by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 22, 2005 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on December 22, 2005 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 2/7/2006 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Attachments: # (1) Page 53# (2) Page 54 to 74)(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: entry #63 corrected because: document was not signed by the filer. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company Supplemental Response - Markman Hearing. (Laroche, Sara) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2006 (Nici, Richard). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on September 28, 2005 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Markman Hearing held on 12/22/2005. Parties to make supplemental filings by 1/6/06. Court expects to issue order by 1/13/06, after which parties shall file proposed schedule for further proceedings. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2005 re [34] MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions ALLOWED to extent that plaintiff agrees to supplement by 1/12/06, [42] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint DENIED, [45] MOTION to Compel Discovery ALLOWED to extent that defendant may supplement by 1/12/06, Revised privilege log by 1/12/06, Court declines to compel production of tax returns, [47] MOTION to Compel Documents ALLOWED to extent that representations were made that plaintiff have or will produce all documents by 1/12/06, [55] MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B and C to Declaration of Neal J. Slifkin in Support of Caldwell's Reply Memorandum, [56] MOTION to Strike [53] Reply to Response to Motion, [54] Declaration in Support of Reply - DENIED, [57] MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Amesbury's Motion to Compel Discovery, treated as belated motion to compel - DENIED (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [59] Opposition to Motion Declaration of Neal Slifkin in Support of Opposition to Amesbury's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Its Motion to Compel by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [57] MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Amesbury's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [56] MOTION to Strike [53] Reply to Response to Motion, [54] Declaration in Support of Reply filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Amesbury's Motion to Compel Discovery by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Amesbury's Motion to Compel Discovery (with Exhibits 1-4))(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike [53] Reply to Response to Motion, [54] Declaration in Support of Reply by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B and C to Declaration of Neal J. Slifkin in Support of Caldwell's Reply Memorandum by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard). Received unedited version. Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [53] Reply to Response to Motion of Neal J. Slifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).Received unedited version. Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [42] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).Received uneditied version. Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 12/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Motion hearing re: [42] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint, [45] MOTION to Compel Discovery, [47] MOTION to Compel Documents, [34] MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions: Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, followed by Markman hearing set for 1:00 p.m. Each side will be allotted 20 minutes to present general background information to the Court. The Court will then ask questions of counsel. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Douglas Kline. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [42] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [47] MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F)(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [45] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [38] Motion to Seal, terminating [39] duplicate Motion to Compel (see [34] motion to compel) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 1/22/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Motion to Seal and granting [44] Motion to Seal. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [47] MOTION to Compel Documents of Neal J. Slifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Documents by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [45] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Discovery by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Exhibits C and D to Declaration of Neal J. Slifkin in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Complaint by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/1/2005 (Nici, Richard). Received original copy 12/1/05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [42] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint of Neal J. Slifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Part I)# (2) Exhibit A (Part II)# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E)(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/1/2005 (Nici, Richard). Received original copy 12/1/05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to the Complaint by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 12/1/2005 (Nici, Richard). Received original copy 12/1/05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [34] MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Part 1# (2) Exhibit A Part 2# (3) Exhibit A Part 3# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E# (8) Exhibit F# (9) Exhibit G)(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on October 27, 2005 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DUPLICATE OF #'S 34,35,36 MOTION to Compel with declarations in support by Neal F. Slifkin and David Edwards with exhibits by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Nici, Richard) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DUPLICATE OF #37 MOTION to Seal by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Nici, Richard) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Portions of Motion to Compel and Declaration of Neal J. Sifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard). RECEIVED UNREDACTED VERSION 11/14/05
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [34] MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions of David J. Edwards by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard).RECEIVED UNREDACTED VERSION 11/14/05
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [34] MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions of Neal J. Slifkin by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P)(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard).RECEIVED UNREDACTED VERSION 11/14/05
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Amesbury to Designate a 30(b)(6) Witness on Its Infringement Contentions by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company, The Caldwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas) Modified on 11/15/2005 (Nici, Richard). RECEIVED UNREDACTED VERSION 11/14/05
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER issuing letters of request. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing set for 12/22/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Further Scheduling/Status Conference held on 10/27/2005. Markman hearing scheduled for 12/22/05 at 9:00 am. Deposition discovery shall be completed by 11/30/05. Any discovery motions shall be filed by 11/30/05, oppositions by 12/7/05, replies by 12/14/05. All pending issues shall be address at the hearing on 12/22/05. [25] MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Letters of Request ALLOWED. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Lurie, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry 29 corrected because: the document was not electronically signed (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [30] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrected BRIEF by The Caldwell Manufacturing Company Regarding Claim Construction. (Lurie, David) Modified on 10/17/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 16, 2005 to take fact depositions by Amesbury Group, Inc..(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry #29 corrected because: a typographical error was made in the brief. The corrected brief was refiled (docket entry #31). Exhibits to the corrected brief not refiled in entry #31. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company Regarding Claim Construction. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Lurie, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Laura W. Smalley in Support of Claim Construction by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I# (11) Exhibit J# (12) Exhibit J# (13) Exhibit K# (14) Exhibit L# (15) Exhibit L# (16) Exhibit M)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re [25] MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Letters of Request. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [25] MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Letters of Request filed by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Exhibit A to Order)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/27/2005 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Letters of Request by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Letters of Request)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler : Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2005 re [16] MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Amesbury Group, Inc.,, Amesbury Springs Ltd. Motion denied without prejudice. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered denying [16] Motion to Compel, without prejudice to be renewed after the taking of the scheduled depositions discussed in open court. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Rescheudling Hearing:Further Scheduling/Status Conference re: Markman Hearing reset for 10/27/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Status report due 10/21/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jordan M. Singer in Support of Claim Construction by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Errata D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd., Regarding Claim Construction. (Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion; [16] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories: Motion hearing set for 9/28/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [16] MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd. to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Matthew Singer on behalf of all plaintiffs (Singer, Jordan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [16] MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories filed by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Affidavit Declaration of Neal Slifkin)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [16] MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories (Certification Pursuant to Local Rules 7.1(A)(2) and 37.1) by Safraz W. Ishmael on behalf of Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005, Terminated: 9/28/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Scheduling/Status Conference set for 10/21/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Discovery due by 10/17/2005. Plaintiff's Markman Brief due 9/15/05; Defendant's Markman Brief due 10/14/05; Status report due 10/13/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 4/28/2005. Schedule set: fact discovery by 10/17/05; exchange of construction charts(views on claim construction) by 7/30/05; Plaintiffs' Markman brief by 9/15/05; defendant's Markman brief by 10/14/05; further scheduling conference set for 10/21/05 at 2:30 pm. (Court Reporter Valerie O'Hara.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference pursuant to LR 16.1. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 4/4/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Yesawich; Neal L. Slifkin; David J. Edwards; Laura W. Smalley by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Paul J. Yesawich# (2) Affidavit of Neal L. Slifkin# (3) Affidavit of David J. Edwards# (4) Affidavit of Laura W. Smalley)(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 63175 regarding Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Safraz W. Ishmael on behalf of Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd., (Ishmael, Safraz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amesbury's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,.(Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas J. Kline (Kline, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Lurie on behalf of The Cadwell Manufacturing Company (Lurie, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Lent on behalf of The Cadwell Manufacturing Company, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company (Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by The Cadwell Manufacturing Company.(Lent, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,, The Cadwell Manufacturing Company. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amesbury Group, Inc.. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The Cadwell Manufacturing Company Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61248, filed by Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Amesbury Group, Inc., Amesbury Springs Ltd.,. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?