Tudor Insurance Company v. Hoyt Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10026-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tudor Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Farrey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Farrey, III +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 farrey@burnsandfarrey.com
Space Brooke P. Seliger +1 508 756 6288 +1 508 831 9769 seliger@burnsandfarrey.com
v.
No Logo Hoyt Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary K. Ryan +1 617 439 2212 +1 617 310 9212 mryan@nutter.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/5/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 4/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tudor Insurance Company (Seliger, Brooke)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
      Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint, Hoyt Corporation answer due 8/12/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005, Terminated: 7/27/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
        JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2005 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, by Tudor Insurance Company, Hoyt Corporation.(Hassett, Kathy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Summons Returned Executed
          SUMMONS Returned Executed Hoyt Corporation served on 4/5/2005, answer due 4/25/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
            Letter/request (non-motion) from Brooke P. Seliger to clerk re: issuance of another summons. (Filo, Jennifer)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against Hoyt Corporation Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61249, filed by Tudor Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit A Part 1# (3) Exhibit A Part 2# (4) Exhibit B Part 1# (5) Exhibit B Part 2# (6) Exhibit C)(Filo, Jennifer)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to Hoyt Corporation. (Filo, Jennifer)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Filo, Jennifer)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 30 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?