Presumey v. Education
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00278

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 10, 2019 at 1:39 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elisabeth Presumey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Gabriel Williams, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/30/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Gabriel Lateef Williams +1 917 525 2683 gabriel.williams@gabrielwilliamslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Merly +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jmerly@johnrwilliams.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Board of Education, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein & Peck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Kupinse, Jr. +1 203 334 9421 kupinsew@goldsteinandpeck.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. McPherson +1 203 334 9421 mcphersona@goldsteinandpeck.com
No Logo LIUNA Local 136, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Mark Garelick +1 860 418 6321 +1 860 418 6491 adam.garelick@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Chieverie & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Cheverie +1 860 290 9610 +1 860 290 9611 rcheverie@cheverielaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Objection
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Application for Writ of Garnishment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Findings of Fact and Conclusions of LawCourt Filing
                            Memorandum of Law re: damages. See attached. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 6/5/2018.(Constantine, A.)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 100 defendant's motion to amend. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 4/16/2018. (Constantine, A.)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying 74 defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law or in the alternative, for a new trial pursuant to Rule 59. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/7/18. (Constantine, A.)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial. Held on 5/17/17 before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Court Reporter: Kirsten Telhiard. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (Telhiard, K)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/4/2017, Entered: 11/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Elisabeth Presumey (Longo-McLean, Rose)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      First RESPONSE re 78 MOTION Schedule a Damages Trial filed by Board of Education. (Kupinse, William) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION Schedule a Damages Trial by Elisabeth Presumey.Responses due by 9/19/2017 (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Jury Trial - Vol. 1. Held on May 16, 2017 before Judge D. Martinez. Court Reporter: I. Sanchez-Farnham. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2017. (Sanchez, I.)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: 6/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 74 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              First Memorandum in Support re 74 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and For a New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by Board of Education. (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Board of Education.Responses due by 6/23/2017 (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER : By 6/2/2017, the defendant shall produce to the plaintiff information regarding the plaintiff's wages and benefits. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/23/2017.(Constantine, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: The motion 63 is granted. The parties agreed on the record in open court on May 16, 2017 to waive a jury claim as to damages and instead have the court determine any and all monetary damages, including back pay, front pay and compensatory damages. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/23/17. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        JURY VERDICT with foreperson's signature redacted for Plaintiff against Defendant. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Jury Instructions/Charge
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Jury Instructions. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Marked Court Exhibit List. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Marked Witness & Exhibit List by Board of Education. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Marked Exhibit & Witness List by Elisabeth Presumey. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Jury commences deliberations at 12:52 p.m. Jury Trial completed on 5/17/2017. Jury Verdict Form filed. Plaintiff's Verdict. Total Time: 2 hours and 4 minutes(Court Reporter K. Telhiard.) (Wood, R.) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Jury Trial held on 5/16/2017. Jury Trial Continued Until 5/17/17 at 10:00 a.m.. Total Time: 3 hours and 40 minutes(Court Reporter I. Sanchez-Farnham.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION OF FACT AND LAW by Board of Education. (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Issue an Order prior to Trial Order by Board of Education. (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: 4/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Jury Selection held on 4/12/2017. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in East Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Total Time: 1 hour and 45 minutes(Court Reporter J. McCauley.) (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Merly on behalf of Elisabeth Presumey (Merly, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Proposed Exhibit List by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Proposed Exhibit List by Board of Education. (McPherson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2017, Entered: 3/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Proposed Exhibit List by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER : See attached Pretrial Order. Jury Selection set for 4/12/2017 at 10:00 a.m. with the final pretrial conference to follow. Trial will begin 5/16/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 1/10/17.(Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2017. Jury selection and final pretrial conference scheduled for 4/12/17; evidence to start 5/16. During the conference, plaintiff's counsel stated that the plaintiff will be pressing only claims alleging failure to accommodate disability and will not be pursuing any Title VII claims. 10 minutes (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Elisabeth Presumey Concerning Claims to be Pursued at Trial (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: 12/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Exhibit List by Board of Education, LIUNA Local 136. (McPherson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Verdict Form by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER : By 12/12/16, the parties shall filed an updated exhibit list indicating whether they agree that the exhibits may be admitted as evidence. If there is an objection to an exhibit, the proponent of the exhibit must set forth the basis for admissibility of the exhibit and the opponent must set forth the basis of the objection. Also by 12/12/16, the parties shall submit a proposed verdict form suitable for submission to the jury. A conference call is scheduled for 1/6/2017 at 10:45 AM regarding the scheduling of the final pretrial conference, jury selection and trial. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860 240 3605. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 12/1/16.(Constantine, A.) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL MEMO by Board of Education Estimated trial time 3-4 days. (McPherson, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 7/1/16. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 8, 2016, to File Joint Trial Memorandum by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Order: Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed by 7/1/2016. See attached order. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/26/16.(Constantine, A.) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 43 defendant LIUNA's Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/26/16. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by LIUNA Local 136.Responses due by 5/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Affidavit William McCormick, # 4 Exhibit 1 - CHRO Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Professional Assistant Statement of Duties, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Memo re Professional Assistant Duties 8.4.08, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Acknowledgement by Elisabeth Presumey re Receipt of CBA, # 8 Exhibit 5 - CBA 7.1.10 through 6.30.13, # 9 Exhibit 6 - Termination Letter dated 11.2.12, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Email forwarding Termination Letter to Lynn Mason, # 11 Exhibit 8 - Memo Scheduling Meeting on 11.19.12, # 12 Exhibit 9 - Emails Prior to Meeting, # 13 Exhibit 10 - Letter to HR Dated 11.13.12, # 14 Exhibit 11 - Follow Up Correspondence to Meeting dated 11.29.12, # 15 Exhibit 12 - Emails from March 2010, # 16 Exhibit 13 - Letter from HR re Misconduct 11.7.11, # 17 Exhibit 14 - Letter Stating Union Cannot Pursue Grievance)(Garelick, Adam) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 4/26/2016. Case did not settle. Total Time: 2 hours (Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The parties' Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 5/27/2016. See attached order regarding requirements and instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 3/3/16.(Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER : A settlement conference is scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Please see the attached order for important instructions and deadlines.(Constantine, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Status Conference held on 2/25/2016. 5 minutes. Chambers will provide counsel with available dates for a settlement conference. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER : A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 2/25/2016 at 1:00 PM before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call and shall have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860 240 3605.(Constantine, A.) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 2/17/16.(Wood, R.) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Board of Education, LIUNA Local 136, Elisabeth Presumey. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/12/16.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION re 33 Status Report Consent to Referral to United States Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The telephonic status conference set for February 18, 2016 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/12/2016. (Hillier, D.) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by plaintiff and defendant LIUNA Local 136 by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The 31 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel is GRANTED. The 23 SCHEDULING ORDER is VACATED. Discovery shall be completed by March 31, 2016. Dispositive Motions are due April 29, 2016. If a dispositive motion is filed, the joint trial memorandum is due forty-five (45) days from the date of the Court's decision on the motion. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum is due by May 27, 2016. The case will be considered trial ready immediately upon the filing of the joint trial memorandum. A Telephonic Status Conference will be held on February 18, 2016 at 2:00 p.m., with Chambers providing dial-in instructions. The parties will file a joint status report by February 11, 2016. Finally, the parties are responsible for following the undersigned instructions available on the Court's website regarding (1) joint status reports, (2) discovery disputes, and (3) the joint trial memorandum, all of which the Court hereby incorporates as part of this Order.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/30/2015. (Hillier, D.) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: 11/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Gabriel Williams to Withdraw as Attorney by Elisabeth Presumey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/25/2015.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/25/15.(Blue, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: 11/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Elisabeth Presumey (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by LIUNA Local 136 re 10 Order (Garelick, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Board of Education re 10 Order (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting the parties' 24 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall respond to the Initial Discovery Protocols by 9/21/2015. All deadlines contained in the parties' 23 Scheduling Order remain in effect and unchanged. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/31/2015. (Nadler, S.) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/21/2015 Respond to Initial Discovery Protocols 10 Order by Elisabeth Presumey. (Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report 22 is approved and the Court sets the following case management deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2016; Dispositive Motions are due by 4/29/2016; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 5/27/2016 and trial to the Court will take place in the month of July 2016 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 12/23/2016 and trial to the Court will take place in the month of January 2017 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of the Bench Trial. All Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/10/2015.(Nadler, S.) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by Board of Education.(McPherson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by LIUNA Local 136.(Cheverie, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting, in part, Defendant Greenwich's 18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Greenwich shall respond to the 17 Amended Complaint by 7/30/2015. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/2015. (Nadler, S.) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2015 Responsive to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Confer with clients and fully investigate by Board of Education. (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elisabeth Presumey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Cheverie on behalf of LIUNA Local 136 (Cheverie, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elisabeth Presumey. Board of Education served on 6/8/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. (Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Mark Garelick on behalf of LIUNA Local 136 (Garelick, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elisabeth Presumey. LIUNA Local 136 served on 6/8/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. (Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. McPherson on behalf of Board of Education (McPherson, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Kupinse, Jr on behalf of Board of Education (Kupinse, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: 3/20/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/20/2015.(MacGillivary, S)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *LIUNA Local 136* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gabriel L. Williams* *Law Office of Gabriel Williams, LLC* *1221 Avenue of the Americas Suite 4200* *New York, NY 10020*. (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gabriel L. Williams* *Law Office of Gabriel Williams, LLC* *1221 Avenue of the Americas Suite 4200* *New York, NY 10020*. (Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 2/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 6 Notice, 4 Order Re: Chambers Practices, 1 Complaint filed by Elisabeth Presumey, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 02/26/2015.(Grady, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Parties Re Initial Discovery Protocols: Signed by Clerk on 02/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Initial Discovery Protocol)(Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/25/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Order Re: Chambers Practices
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/25/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER: Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 02/25/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 05/26/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2015; Discovery due by 8/27/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2015. Signed by Clerk on 02/25/2015.(Grady, B.) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3521830.), filed by Elisabeth Presumey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Gabriel) Modified on 2/26/2015 to correct filed against (Lynch, K.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Selection set for 4/12/2017 at 10:00AM before Judge Donna F. Martinez (Courtroom TBD). Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 thru 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in East Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2017 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Trial Brief due by 7/8/2016. (Wood, R.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 3/31/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2016; Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2016; Joint Trial Brief due by 5/27/2016; Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/18/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer deadline updated for Board of Education to 7/30/2015. (Blue, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Board of Education. (Williams, Gabriel) Modified on 2/26/2015 to correct party name(Lynch, K.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to issue summons as to LIUNA Local 136. (Williams, Gabriel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Malone, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?