USA v. Gianelli et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-10003-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 14, 2021 at 1:27 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Tabak +1 617 748 3203 +1 617 748 3963 michael.tabak@usdoj.gov
Space John A. Wortmann, Jr. +1 617 748 3207 +1 617 748 3963 john.wortmann@usdoj.gov
Space Fred M. Wyshak, Jr. +1 617 748 3201 +1 617 748 3954 Fred.Wyshak@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Dennis Albertelli, Defendant

Represented by Rankin & Sultan

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 1/5/2005
County Suffolk
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy to Commit arson, and travel in interstate commerce to promote, manage, establish, carry on and facilitate unlawful activity
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844I.F
Offense Level 4
18844(i) and 2 Arson
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951.F
Offense Level 4
181951 Conspiracy to commit Extortion
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951.F
Offense Level 4
181951 and 2 Attempted extortion
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7400.F
Offense Level 4
181952(a)(3) and 2 Interstate travel in aid of racketeering enterprises
Count 10s-86s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) Money Laundering Conspiracy
Count 187s-234s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-7400.F
Offense Level 4
181962(d) Racketeeting conspiracy
Count 236s-238s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a((1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182 Money laundering
Count 239s-272s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182 Money laundering
Count 273s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 Conspiracy to commit arson and travel in interstate commerce to promote manage establish carry on and facilitate the promotion management establishment and carrying on of unlawful activity
Count 274s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844I.F
Offense Level 4
18844(i),182 Arson
Count 275s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951
Offense Level 4
181951 Conspiracy to commit extortion
Count 276s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951
Offense Level 4
181951 Attempted extortion
Count 277s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7400.F
Offense Level 4
181952(a)(3),182 Interstate travel in aid of racketeering enterprises
Count 278s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182 Money Laundering
Count 283s-305s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182 Money laundering
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181962(c),182 Racketeering
Count 329s-332s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182 Money laundering
Count 3s-4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
181955,182 Illegal gambling business - sports betting
Count 5s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
181955,182 Illegal gambling business - football cards
Count 6s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1084.F
Offense Level 4
181084,182 Use of wire communication facility - telephone
Count 7s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1084.F
Offense Level 4
181084,182 Use of wire communication facility - Internet
Count 88s-185s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i),181956(a)(1)(B)(i),182
Count 8s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) Money Laundering Conspiracy
Count 10ss-86ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 187ss-234ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 1ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181962 (d)-RACKETEERING CONSPIRACY
Count 236ss-272ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 273ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371-CONSPIRACY
Count 274ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844I.F
Offense Level 4
18844 (i)- ARSON
Count 275ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 844I.F
Offense Level 4
18844 (h)(1)- USE OF FIRE TO COMMIT A FEDERAL FELONY
Count 276ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951.F
Offense Level 4
181951-CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT EXTORTION
Count 277ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1951.F
Offense Level 4
181951-ATTEMPTED EXTORTION
Count 278ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7400.F
Offense Level 4
181952 (a)(3)-INTERSTATE TRAVEL IN AID OF RACKETEERING
Count 279ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 284ss-306ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 2ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962-7480.F
Offense Level 4
181962 (c)-RACKETEERING
Count 3ss-5ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1955.F
Offense Level 4
181955 ILLEGAL GAMBLING BUSINESS
Count 423ss-426ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 6ss-7ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1084.F
Offense Level 4
181084-USE OF WIRE COMMUNICAATION FACILITY
Count 88ss-185ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (a)(1)(A)(i) & 1956 (a)(1)(B)(i)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 8ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956 (h)MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Def Custody Status Released
Flag VICTIM
  Entries (348) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 2/21/2021, Entered: None Compassionate Release - 18:3582
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Blank 838
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Blank 795
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 570
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 E-mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-Mail Notice originally issued on 8/19/08 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: David Kerrigan. The ECF Help Desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorneys email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 525 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Hearing on Motions as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on July 17, 2008, before Judge Gorton. Court Reporter Cheryl Dahlstrom at 617/951-4555. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 9/2/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2008. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney update in case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants. Attorney Roger Witkin terminated. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 521 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by USA as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants re [520] MOTION to Vacate Order For Interlocutory Sale and Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel (Barclay, Kristina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING Arthur Gianelli, et al., Status Conference set for 9/10/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 518 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Roger Witkin. as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Yousef Bina. (Witkin, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 516 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Mary Ann Gianelli. (Parker, E.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 515 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Edward A. Gottlieb as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Gottlieb, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants. Attorney Edward A. Gottlieb terminated for Yousef Bina. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 511 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter (non-motion) regarding financial hardship as to Yousef Bina (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 510 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter (non-motion) regarding withdrawal of counsel as to Yousef Bina (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motions terminated as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: [503] MOTION to Seal filed by USA. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Electronic ORDER entered denying [496] Motion for Reconsideration as to Philip Puopolo (14) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Dennis Albertelli [497] SEALED MOTION, [432] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles W. Rankin. : Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motions terminated as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: Motion was ruled on 5/23/08[492] MOTION to Continue filed by Dennis Albertelli, Joseph Yerardi, Jr., Arthur Gianelli, Frank Iacaboni, Rafia Feghi, Mary Ann Gianelli, Gisele Albertelli, Stephen Russo. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Dennis Albertelli [497] SEALED MOTION, [432] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles W. Rankin. : Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig) Modified on 6/11/2008 (Nicewicz, Craig).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 492 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Hearing as to Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi. (Egbert, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to remaining defendants Jury Trial set for 2/17/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants [458] Joint MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Wiretap Warrants, Leave to File Granted on 3/21/08 : Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Pretrial Conference as remaining defendants held on 5/7/2008. This trial will commence mid to end of February 2009. Hearing on joint motion 5/27/08 at 3:00 p.m. (Court Reporter Dahlstrom.)(Attorneys present: Egbert, Rankin, Thompson, DelVecchio, Kelley, Prince, Weymouth, Parker) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Electronic ORDER entered granting [484] Motion to Seal as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Philip Puopolo (14); granting [487] Motion to Seal as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 487 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/2/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Exhibits 7-10 to [486] Government's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Suppress Fruits of Wiretap Warrants as to Philip Puopolo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 486 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Philip Puopolo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi re [458] Joint MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Wiretap Warrants, Leave to File Granted on 3/21/08 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of District Attorney Blodgett, # (2) Exhibit 4 - Com. v. Aldana, # (3) Exhibit 5 - Com. v. Simone, # (4) Exhibit 6 - Com. v. Sanders)(Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to all remaining defendants. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2008 12:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 471 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Exhibits re [470] of Manuel Filing by Philip Puopolo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi re [458] MOTION to Suppress (Egbert, Richard) Modified on 4/4/2008 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 458 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Wiretap Warrants, Leave to File Granted on 3/21/08 as to Philip Puopolo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby Arthur Gianelli. (Egbert, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 457 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Arthur Gianelli as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants re [456] MOTION to Suppress filed by Arthur Gianelli, USA (Egbert, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions terminated as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: [456] MOTION to Suppress filed by Arthur Gianelli, USA. Withdrawal of motion on 3/21/08. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions terminated as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: [454] MOTION for Leave to File filed by Arthur Gianelli. Ruled on 3/21/08 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Electronic ORDER entered granting [454] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Mary Ann Gianelli (17); granting [455] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 456 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008, Terminated: 3/21/2008 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress Fruits of Wiretap Warrants as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Arthur Gianelli, USA. (Egbert, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 454 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008, Terminated: 3/21/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Twenty Pages as to Philip Puopolo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby Arthur Gianelli. (Egbert, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Conference as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on January 24, 2007 before Judge Hillman. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 451 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered granting [390] Motion for INTERLOCUTORY SALE as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 436 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Dennis Albertelli re [432] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles W. Rankin. (Rankin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 433 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Dennis Albertelli re [432] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles W. Rankin. (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 432 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles W. Rankin. as to Dennis Albertelli. (Rankin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 5/1/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions terminated as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: [427] MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Arthur Gianelli. Ruled on 12/5/07. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 402 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered "The third party motion of Yousef Bina to dissolve lis pendens and for relief from restraining order affecting real property known as 405B Dedham Street, Newton, MA (Docket No. 338) and the motion for leave to file a reply (Docket No. 342) are DENIED. So ordered."denying [338] Motion for Order as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17); denying [342] Motion for Leave to File; as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 396 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants Time excluded from 8/8/07 until 1/17/08. (Collins, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 395 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER entered. FINAL STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Collins, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Collins, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Status Conference as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 8/8/2007. Case called, Counsel (Tabak, Dejunas, Rankin, Thompson, Barron, O'Hara, Kelly, Prince, Goldstein, Straus)-mostly by telephone-appear, Motion and response dates set, Oral Motion to exclude time through January 17, 2008, Case as to all Defendants (except Joseph Yerardi) to be sent back to the District Judge, Final Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. Case as to Defendant Yerardi continued for Status, Status Report to issue. (Digital Recording 10:21 a.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 380 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by USA as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants for proceedings held on June 14, 2007 before Judge Hillman. (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 379 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Mary Ann Gianelli (17). Time excluded from May 23, 2007 through August 8, 2007, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 378 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman : STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference set for 8/8/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi. Motion for Discovery [# 321] is still pending, and has not been ruled on. (Roland, Lisa) Modified on 6/19/2007 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay from May 23, 2007 to August 8, 2007 as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa) Motions referred to Timothy S. Hillman.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Motion Hearing as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 6/14/2007 re [361] MOTION for Discovery (Motion to Expedite Local Rule Discovery and For Other Appropriate Relief) filed by Philip Puopolo, [321] MOTION for Discovery filed by Philip Puopolo, [360] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials filed by Philip Puopolo. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Goldstein, Rankin, Butters, Prince, Straus, Parker) appear, Counsel argue motion, Status Conference as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 6/14/2007, Counsel request additional time, Oral Motion to Exclude Time, Case continued, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 10:15 a.)(Roland2, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Order on Motion forJoinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [369] Motion for Joinder as to Dennis Albertelli (2), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Discovery Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 6/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 IN WORCESTER, before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 369 Filed: 6/9/2007, Entered: 6/9/2007, Terminated: 6/14/2007 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder of Motion for Discovery as to Dennis Albertelli. (Rankin, Charles) Motions referred to Timothy S. Hillman.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ElectronicORDER entered granting [345] Motion to Continue as to Philip Puopolo (14). Motion Hearing and Final Status Conference set for 6/11/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 342 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007, Terminated: 8/10/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in the Event No Oral Argument is Granted on Yousef Bina's Motion to Dissolve Lis Pendens and Restraining Order as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Yousef Bina. (Gottlieb, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 340 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IN BEHALF OF YOUSEF BINA, BY ROGER WITKIN by Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Witkin, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants. Attorney Roger Witkin for Yousef Bina added. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by USA as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants re [338] MOTION for Order Dissolving Lis Pendens and for Relief from Restraining Order (Barclay, Kristina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 338 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 8/10/2007 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Party MOTION for Order Dissolving Lis Pendens and Restraining Order Affecting Real Property by Yousef Bina. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Affidavit John McDermott)(Gottlieb, Edward) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 337 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Third Party Yousef Bina (Gottlieb, Edward) Modified on 4/18/2007 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: documents #337 and 338 corrected because: counsel had to choose a defendant in order to file 3rd party, Court deleted the named defendants. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi [321] MOTION for Discovery: Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2007 10:00 AM IN BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [331] Motion to Join Co-Defendant's Motion for Discovery as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference re-set for 5/22/2007 10:00 AM IN BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 333 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Mary Ann Gianelli (17). Time Excluded from March 15, 2007 through May 23, 2007, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 332 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Timothy S. Hillman : STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi. Status Conference set for 5/23/2007 10:00 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 331 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Join Co-Defendant's Motion for Discovery as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Dennis Albertelli. (Rankin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay from March 15, 2007 to May 23, 2007 as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Status Conference as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 3/14/2007. Case called, Counsel (Tabak, Goldstein, Kelley, Weymouth, Dejunas, Thompson, Cosso, Rankin, Scott-Reed, O'Hara) appear, Counsel request continuance of motion hearing and additional time, Oral Motion to exclude time, Case continued, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 9:15.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 319 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Response Unrelated to a Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi: [303] Letter (non-motion), [308] Letter (non-motion). (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 311 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman CORRECTED INTERIM STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi Status Conference set for 3/15/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Previous document had an incorrect date) (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 310 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Mary Ann Gianelli (17). Time Excluded from January 24, 2007 throguh March 15, 2007, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi. Status Conference set for 3/15/2007 10:00 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 306 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered granting [300] Motion to Vacate as to Dennis Albertelli (2) (Attachments: # (1) Release of Lis Pendens) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2007 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2007 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay from January 24, 2007 to March 15, 2007 as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Status Conference as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 1/24/2007. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, DeJunas, Butters, Balliro, DiMento, O'Hara, Scott-Reed, Bourbeau, Kenyon) appear, Discovery Letters due 1/29/2007, Governments response due 2/16/2007, Motions to be filed by 3/5/2007, Motion Hearing date set for March 15, 2007 @ 10:00 am IN BOSTON, Oral Motion for Excludable Time, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 2:12 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 300 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007, Terminated: 1/24/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Vacate Order for Interlocutory Sale and to Partially Vacate Restraining Order and for Release of Lis Pendens as to Dennis Albertelliby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2))(Barclay, Kristina) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2007 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 285 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Mary Ann Gianelli (17). Time Excluded from August 24, 2006 through January 24, 2007, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 284 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman : STATUS REPORT as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference set for 1/24/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa) Modified on 11/1/2006 (Roland, Lisa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006, Terminated: 11/1/2006 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay from August 24, 2006 to January 24, 2007 as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Status Conference as to Dennis Albertelli, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli held on 10/31/2006. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, Kelley) & Defendants appear, Counsel request additional time, Case continued, No Objection by Defense Counsel to Exclude the time, Status Report & Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 2:09 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Arraignment as to Dennis Albertelli (2) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss-5ss,6ss-7ss,8ss,10ss-86ss,88ss-185ss,187ss-234ss,236ss-ss, 273ss, 274ss, 275ss, 276ss, 277ss, 278ss, 279ss, 284ss-306ss, 423ss-426ss and Randy Albertelli (7) Count 1s,2s,3s,5s,6s-7s and Gisele Albertelli (8) Count 1s,2s,5s,186s,187s-234s held on 10/31/2006, Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, Kelley), PTS Cuascut & Defendants appear, Defendants notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Not Guilty Plea entered by Dennis Albertelli on all counts, Not Guilty Plea by Randy Albertelli on all counts, Not Guilty Plea entered by Gisele Albertelli on all counts, Attorney Kelley requests a amendment to Conditions of Release, Government does not object, Motion to be filed, Defendants previously released on conditions and conditions remain in effect. (Digital Recording 2:09 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 276 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 275 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 274 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 273 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 272 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 260 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 259 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 258 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 257 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/27/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 256 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/26/2006 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 255 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Process Receipt and Return by USA as to Dennis Albertelli (Barclay, Kristina) Modified on 10/26/2006 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Weshtod Consultants; Arraignment set for 10/31/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants; Status Conference set for 10/31/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [232] Motion to Exclude as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [240] Motion for Extension of Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17). Status Conference set for October 4, 2006 is cancelled, Notice of rescheduling to issue, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 240 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 10/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Excludable Delay as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguezby USA. (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 238 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Nunzio Orlando in Support of Pretrial Detention of Philip Puopolo by USA as to Philip Puopolo.(Tabak, Michael) Modified on 9/28/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 235 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 232 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 10/11/2006 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay to October 25, 2006 as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Mary Ann Gianelli by USA. (Tabak, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2006 to remove additional defendants' names.(Hurley, Virginia).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 223 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006, Terminated: 9/19/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguezby USA. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Case Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case unsealed as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Costello2, Helen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Joyce London Alexander : Electronic ORDER entered granting [223] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 222 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Arthur Gianelli (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss-5ss, 6ss-7ss, 8ss, 10ss-86ss, 88ss-185ss, 187ss-234ss, 236ss-272ss, 273ss, 274ss, 275ss, 276ss, 277ss, 278ss, 280ss-283ss, 284ss-329ss, 512ss, 513ss, 516ss, 517ss, 518ss, 519ss. (Attachments: # (1) PAGE 26-50# (2) PAGE 51-75# (3) PAGES 76-100# (4) PAGE 101-125# (5) PAGE 126-155# (6) JS45) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 221 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Case as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguezby USA. (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman Reason for referral: PRETRIAL as to Philip Puopolo, Stephen Russo, Michael Pinialis, Mary Ann Gianelli, Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered granting [221] Motion to Seal Case as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Philip Puopolo (14), Stephen Russo (15), Michael Pinialis (16), Mary Ann Gianelli (17) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference set for 10/4/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [217] Motion for Extension of Time and Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9). "ALLOWED., Next Status Conference 10/4/2006 @ 2:00 pm, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 217 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006, Terminated: 8/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Tabak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 213 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9). Time Excluded from June 27, 2006 through Auguest 24, 2006, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 212 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference set for 8/24/2006 10:00 AM, IN BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 6/28/2006. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, DeJuneas, Rankin, Butters, DiMento, Belairo, O'Hara, Kelley, Prince) appear, Counsel request additional time, Oral Motion to Exclude Time, Case continued to 8/24/2006 @ 10:00 AM, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 2:30 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 208 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered granting [204] Motion for Interlocutory Sale as to Dennis Albertelli (2) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 204 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/25/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Interlocutory Sale of Real Property as to Dennis Albertelliby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order for Interlocutory Sale of Real Property)(Barclay, Kristina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 198 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE John A. Wortmann, Jr appearing for USA. (Wortmann, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER Regarding Wiretap Logs entered as to (granting [186] Motion for Order) Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 190 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Timothy S. Hillman : ORDER of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9); Time excluded from March 6, 2006 through June 27, 2006, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa) Modified on 3/10/2006 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 189 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Timothy S. Hillman : STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi; Status Conference set for 6/27/2006 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 188 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 187 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 4/3/2006 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Regarding Wiretap Logs as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby Dennis Albertelli. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rankin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [188] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [187] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Timothy S. Hillman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [185] Motion to Seal as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2006 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Timothy S. Hillman :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 3/6/2006. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, Kelly DiMento, Scott-Reed, DeJunas, Rankin, Butters, O'Hara) appear, Counsel request additional time, Oral Motion to exclude time, Case continued to 6/27/2006 @2:15, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 2:21 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Forfeiture of Bail Hearing as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on January 4, 2006 before Judge Swartwood. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: Status Conference set for 3/6/2006 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Entered to correct hearing assignment from MJ Swartwood to MJ Hillman)(Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 181 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Sealed ORDER entered. as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants re [173] (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [170] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13); granting [171] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 177 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi Reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Judge Charles B. Swartwood no longer assigned to the case. (Shattuck, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 173 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Proposed Order(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED Sealed Document submitted by USA as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 172 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants re [171] SEALED MOTION (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket No. 165 'Reply and Opposition to Governments Motion to Strike' was deleted from the docket because on 01/17/2006 Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting 161 Motion to Strike as to Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5). "ALLOWED. Since Mr. Yerardi is represented by counsel, his pro-se filings should not be docketed. Therefore, I am striking his pro-se pleadings." This filing will not be on the docket. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [164] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13); granting [163] Sealed Motion as to Randy Albertelli (7). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [163] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [162] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motions terminated as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants: [109] SEALED MOTION filed by USA,, [161] MOTION to Strike [151] Notice (Other) filed by USA,. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006, Terminated: 1/17/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [151] Notice (Other) as to Joseph Yerardi, Jr, by USA. (Wyshak, Fred) Modified on 1/17/2006 (Jones, Sherry). Modified on 5/1/2008 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 155 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER of Excludable Time entered as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9) Time to be exlcuded from January 4, 2006 through March 6, 2006. (cc/cl) (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants Status Conference set for 3/6/2006 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. (cc/cl) (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghiby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi held on 1/4/2006. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, Egbert, Balliro, (DeJeunas, Rankin, Thompson, Dimento, Prince-by telephone)) appear, Counsel request additional time, Oral Motion to Exclude Time, Case continued, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue, Government informs the Court of potential conflicts with Attorneys, Motion to be filed. (Digital Recording 2:28 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 1/19/2006 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 143 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICEof Government's Declination of Disclosure by USA as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 142 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address of Counsel by Dennis Albertelli (Rankin, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Order of Excludable Time as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10). Time excluded from September 21, 2005 through January 4, 2006, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Charles B. Swartwood : STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Weshtod Consultants; Status Conference set for 1/4/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral MOTION for Excludable Delay as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Danielsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Weshtod Consultants held on 9/21/2005. Case called, Counsel (Scott-Reed, McLary, O'Hara), Defendants Randy & Gisele Albertelli appear, All other Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, DeJuneas, Rankin, Thompson, Cox, Dimento, Weiner) appear by telephone, The Court address the two motions to appoint counsel for Randy & Gisele Albertelli, Motion as to Gisele ALLOWED and Page Kelley appointed, Motion as to Randy ALLOWED subject to having application reviewed at a later date by the District Judge, Attorney Weiner reports that Dft Westerman & Weshtod Consultants be sent back to District Judge, All other Counsel request additional time, Oral Motion to Exclude Time, Case continued, Status Report and Order on Excludable Time to issue. (Digital Recording 2:23 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions terminated as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni: [16] MOTION for Detention filed by USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions terminated as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi: [32] MOTION for Protective Order filed by USA. Supplemental motion as to all defendants filed and allowed. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants; Time excluded from June 21, 2005 until September 21, 2005, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Charles B. Swartwood : STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants; Status Conference set for 9/21/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Charles B. Swartwood : PROTECTIVE ORDER entered as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [102] Motion for Protective Order as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13). "ALLOWED." cc/cl (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman held on 6/21/2005. Case called, Counsel (Tabak, DeJuneas, DiMento, Rankin-by telephone, Balliro, Baily, McAlary, Butters) appear, Counsel request additional time, Case continued, Time to be excluded. (2:18 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Government's Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Detention Proceedings as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni held on Jauary 11, 2005 before Judge Charles B. Swartwood. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Hassett, Kathy) Modified on 4/28/2005 (Jones, Sherry).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER entered granting [45] Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13); granting [46] Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13) (Nicewicz, Craig)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Arraignment as to Salvatore Ramasci (6) Count 1,2,3-4,6,7,8,10-86,88-185,239-272 and Randy Albertelli (7) Count 1,2,3,5,6,7 and Gisele Albertelli (8) Count 1,2,5,186,187-234 and Rafia Feghi (9) Count 1,2,9-86,333,334-395 and Tony Daniels (10) Count 1,2,3,6,7,235,236-238 and Arthur Gianelli (1) Count 1s,2s,3s-4s,5s,6s,7s,8s,10s-86s,88s-185s,187s-234s,236s-238s,239s-272s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,279s,280s,281s,282s,283s-328s and Dennis Albertelli (2) Count 1s,2s,3s-4s,6s,7s,8s,10s-86s,88s-185s,187s-234s,236s-238s,239s-272s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,278s,283s-305s,329s-332s and Frank Iacaboni (3) Count 1s,2s,3s,5s,273s,274s,275s,276s and Deeb Homsi (4) Count 1s,2s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,278s held on 4/21/2005, Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Tabak, Egbert, Menkin, Balliro, Nixon, Denner, Bailey, McAlary, Thompson, Cox), PTS & All Defendants appear, All Defendants notified of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Not Guilty Plea entered by Salvatore Ramasci (6) on Counts 1,2,3-4,6,7,8,10-86,88-185,239-272, Not Guilty Plea entered by Randy Albertelli (7) on Counts 1,2,3,5,6,7, Not Guilty Plea entered by Gisele Albertelli (8) on Counts 1,2,5,186,187-234, Not Guilty Plea entered by Rafia Feghi (9) on Counts 1,2,9-86,333,334-395, Not Guilty Plea entered by Tony Daniels (10) on Counts 1,2,3,6,7,235,236-238, Not Guilty Plea entered by Arthur Gianelli (1) on Counts 1s,2s,3s-4s,5s,6s,7s,8s,10s-86s,88s-185s,187s-234s,236s-238s,239s-272s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,279s,280s,281s,282s,283s-328s, Not Guilty Plea entered by Dennis Albertelli (2) on Counts 1s,2s,3s-4s,6s,7s,8s,10s-86s,88s-185s,187s-234s,236s-238s,239s-272s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,278s,283s-305s,329s-332s, Not Guilty Plea entered by Frank Iacaboni (3) on Counts 1s,2s,3s,5s,273s,274s,275s,276s, Not Guilty Plea entered by Deeb Homsi (4) on Counts 1s,2s,273s,274s,275s,276s,277s,278s, All Defendants previously released and all conditions remain in effect. (4:30 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2005, Entered: 4/16/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels; Arraignment set for 4/21/2005 03:30 PM, IN BOSTON, Courtroom 16 on the 5th Floor, before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005, Terminated: 4/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005, Terminated: 4/27/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Unseal Indictment as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [49] Motion to Unseal Indictm as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Arthur Gianelli (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s-4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 8s, 10s-86s, 88s-185s, 187s-234s, 236s-238s, 239s-272s, 273s, 274s, 275s, 276s, 277s, 279s, 280s, 281s, 282s, 283s-328s, Dennis Albertelli (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s-4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 8s, 10s-86s, 88s-185s, 187s-234s, 236s-238s, 239s-272s, 273s, 274s, 275s, 276s, 277s, 278s, 283s-305s, 329s-332s, Frank Iacaboni (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 5s, 273s, 274s, 275s, 276s, Deeb Homsi (4) count(s) 1s, 2s, 273s, 274s, 275s, 276s, 277s, 278s, Joseph Yerardi, Jr (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 9-87, 88-185, 333, 334-395, Salvatore Ramasci (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 6, 7, 8, 10-86, 88-185, 239-272, Randy Albertelli (7) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 7, Gisele Albertelli (8) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 186, 187-234, Rafia Feghi (9) count(s) 1, 2, 9-86, 333, 334-395, Tony Daniels (10) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 235, 236-238, Todd Westerman (11) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 235, 236-238, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 235, 236-238, Weshtod Consultants (13) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 235, 236-238. (Attachments: # (1) part two# (2) part three# (3) part four# (4) part five# (5) cover sheets) (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultantsby USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : Electronic ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, Joseph Yerardi, Jr, Salvatore Ramasci, Randy Albertelli, Gisele Albertelli, Rafia Feghi, Tony Daniels, Todd Westerman, Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez, Weshtod Consultants (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic ORDER entered granting [47] Motion to Seal Indictment as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), Joseph Yerardi Jr. (5), Salvatore Ramasci (6), Randy Albertelli (7), Gisele Albertelli (8), Rafia Feghi (9), Tony Daniels (10), Todd Westerman (11), Eneyda Gonzalez Rodriguez (12), Weshtod Consultants (13), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Time excluded from March 21, 2005 until June 21, 2005, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Charles B. Swartwood : Electronic STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Status Conference set for 6/21/2005 02:00 PM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Status Conference as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi held on 3/21/2005. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Egbert, Cox) appear by telephone, Counsel request additional time, Case continued, Time to be excluded. (4:11 p.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Status Conference set for 3/21/2005 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Discharge of Mortgage
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Recorded MORTGAGE as to Dennis Albertelli (Attachments: # (1) Escrow Agreement# (2) Forfeiture Agreement)(Barrette, Mark) Modified on 4/14/2005 (Diskes, Sheila).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Time excluded from January 21, 2005 until March 21, 2005, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : STATUS REPORT as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Status Conference set for 3/21/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi and United States of America (Butters, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER entered as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Declination of Disclosure by USA as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi (Barrette, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsiby USA. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/6/2005. as to Dennis Albertelli. (Barrette, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Dennis Albertelli (Barrette, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood Reason for referral: pretrial proceedings as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi cc/cl (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi. Attorney Michael L. Tabak for USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Dennis Albertelli. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 motion for detention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Detention as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboniby USA, c/s. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles W. Rankin appearing for Dennis Albertelli (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/7/05. as to Dennis Albertelli. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Secured Bond Entered as to Dennis Albertelli in amount of $ 250,000. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Order on Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ElectronicORDER entered granting [17] Sealed Motion as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Arraignment as to Arthur Gianelli (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5 and Dennis Albertelli (2) Count 1,2,3,4,5 and Frank Iacaboni (3) Count 1,2,3,4,5 held on 1/11/2005, Detention Hearing as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni held on 1/11/2005, Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Rankin, Egbert, Brazilian), PTS O'Brien and Defendants appear, All defendants informed of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Not Guilty Plea entered by Arthur Gianelli on counts 1-5, Not Guilty Plea entered by Dennis Albertelli on counts 1-5, Not Guilty Plea entered by Frank Iacaboni on counts 1-5, Scheduling Order issued. Government calls Trooper Russolillo, Cross by Atty Egbert, Cross by Atty Rankin, Cross by Atty Brazilian, Re-Direct, Closing Arguments. Dfts' Gianelli & Albertelli released on conditions, Dft Iacaboni to be held for 10 days from arrest and then released if Probation does not seek a warrant re: revocation hearing. Dft Iacaboni remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. (1:51 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Charles B. Swartwood : SCHEDULING ORDER as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi Time excluded from January 7, 2005 until January 21, 2005, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi; Status Conference set for 2/18/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood, cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni; Detention Hearing set for 1/11/2005 01:30 PM, IN BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Charles B. Swartwood. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Case as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi by USA. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Initial Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Charles B. Swartwood :Initial Appearance as to Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni held on 1/7/2005. Case called, Counsel (Wyshak, Egbert, Rankin, Butters), PTS Brown & O'Brien and Defendants appear, Defendants informed of rights, charges & maximum penalties, Government moves for detention, Case continued for arraignment and detention on 1/11/05 @ 1:30 pm, All defendants remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. (2:23 P.) (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Arthur Gianelli, Dennis Albertelli, Frank Iacaboni, Deeb Homsi (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Charles B. Swartwood : ElectronicORDER entered granting [2] Motion to Unseal Case as to Arthur Gianelli (1), Dennis Albertelli (2), Frank Iacaboni (3), Deeb Homsi (4), cc/cl. (Roland, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Arthur Gianelli (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Dennis Albertelli (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Frank Iacaboni (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Deeb Homsi (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 119 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?