Smartflash LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00145

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2020 at 11:19 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smartflash LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldwell Cassady Curry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Wayne Caldwell +1 214 593 7129 bcaldwell@caldwellcc.com
Space Jason Dodd Cassady +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 jcassady@cassadycurry.com
Space J Austin Curry +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 acurry@caldwellcc.com
Space Hamad M Hamad +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 hhamad@caldwellcc.com
Space Warren Joseph McCarty, III +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 wmccarty@caldwellcc.com
Space Jason Scott McManis +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 jmcmanis@caldwellcc.com
Space Justin Thomas Nemunaitis +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 jnemunaitis@caldwellcc.com
Space Daniel R Pearson +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 dpearson@caldwellcc.com
Space Christopher S Stewart +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 cstewart@caldwellcc.com
Space John Franklin Summers +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 jsummers@caldwellcc.com
No Logo Smartflash Technologies Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Smartflash Technologies Limited"
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?