Benyamin v. Beliveau
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:05-cv-40004-FDS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:29 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Benyamin, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alan Mason, Defendant
No Logo Ann Egnitz, Defendant
No Logo Cahill, Defendant
No Logo City Of Worcester, Defendant
No Logo David Holden, Defendant
No Logo Strasburger & Price LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "David Moore"
No Logo Donald Richard, Defendant
No Logo Eileen Finneran, Defendant
No Logo Frank Tabori, Defendant
No Logo Ian M. Bennie, Defendant
No Logo James Donohue, Defendant
No Logo Jamie Milot, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Barry, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Brennan, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Dellostritto, Defendant
No Logo Law Firm of Fisher, Foley, Brennan & Sousa, Defendant
No Logo Law Firm of Fuller, Rosenberg, Palmer & Beliveau, Defendant
No Logo Loring P. Lamoureaux, Defendant
No Logo Madaline R. Arn, Defendant
No Logo Mark Tivan, Defendant
No Logo Richard N. Bradley, Defendant
No Logo Susan A. Garvin, Defendant
No Logo The Law Firm of Attorney Alan Mason, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Beliveau, Defendant
No Logo Thomas R. Hoover, Defendant
Office Worcester
Filed 1/7/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Worcester
Terminated 3/16/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [7] Notice of Appeal, filed by George Benyamin, [9] Notice of Appeal, filed by George Benyamin. Having reviewed the record and appellant's duplicate appeals from the district court's dismissal with prejudice of his pro se prisoner complaint for failure to state a claim, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B)(ii) and 1915 (A) (b) (1). Benyamin seeks to proceed in forma pauperis. the district court has certified that the appeal is taken in good faith...Appellant has filed the present motion challenging that certification. We agree with the certification. Having reviewed the record and appellant's brief, we conclude that no substantial question is presented by these appeals. Therefore, the district court's Order of Dismissal dated March 16, 2005 is AFFIRMED. (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 USCA Order
    CORRECTED ORDER of USCA as to [7] Notice of Appeal, filed by George Benyamin, [9] Notice of Appeal, filed by George Benyamin. In an order entered on April 28, 2005 in civil action no. 05-40004-FDS (D. Mass.), the district court certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3) that plaintiff George Benyamin's appeal is not taken in good faith. Accordingly, the orders entered on April 19, 2005 and April 27, 2005 permitting appellant to pay the filing fee in installments pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 are hereby vacated. If appellant seeks to challenge the district court's certification, he may do so by filing a motion pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). The time for appellant to pay the docketing fees of $255.00 for each appeal to the District Court of Massachusetts is enlarged to and including July 1, 2005. By that date the appellant must either file a motion in this court Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3) or pay the full filing fee for each of these appeals. *This order corrects the order issued on 6/2/05 to reflect that a copy has been sent to appellant's custodian and to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 USCA Order
      ORDER of USCA as to [7] Notice of Appeal, filed by George Benyamin. The appellant listed above is a prisoner seeking to appeal in forma pauperis and has applied to proceed without prepayment of the $105 filing fee under the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(2). Appellant has completed and filed a consent form permitting appropriate prison officials to calculate and collect in installments the $255.00 filing fee from appellant's prison trust account in accordance with the terms of 28 U.S.C. 1915 (b) (1) and (2). (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
        Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [7] Notice of Appeal, [9] Notice of Appeal, document number 11 (Ramos, Jeanette)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
          Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered: Certification by District Judge that appeal in not taken in good faith. re: [9] Notice of Appeal. (Castles, Martin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [9] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette).
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [6] Order Dismissing Case, [4] Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by George Benyamin. Filing Fee not submitted NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/21/2005. (Jones, Sherry)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [7] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005, Terminated: 11/22/2005 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [6] Order Dismissing Case by George Benyamin. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/12/2005. No filing fee submitted. (Jones, Sherry)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                    Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Castles, Martin)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Notice - re payment of fee (prisoner filer)
                      NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at N.C.C.I. Gardner. (Castles, Martin)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                        Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV: Electronic MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, denying [3] Motion for Preliminary Injunction and dismissing case. (Castles, Martin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                          EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by George Benyamin.(Hassett, Kathy)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Benyamin.(Hassett, Kathy)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against Alan Mason, Jamie Milot, Jessica Barry, Ann Egnitz, Thomas R. Hoover, David Holden, Cahill, David Moore, Donald Richard, City of Worcester, Frank Tabori, Ian M. Bennie, Madaline R. Arn, Loring P. Lamoureaux, Kathleen Dellostritto, Susan A. Garvin, Joseph Brennan, Eileen Finneran, Mark Tivan, James Donohue, Richard N. Bradley, Law Firm of Fisher, Foley, Brennan & Sousa, Law Firm of Fuller, Rosenberg, Palmer & Beliveau, The Law Firm of Attorney Alan Mason, Thomas Beliveau Filing fee: $ 0.0, receipt number NA, filed by George Benyamin. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2# (2) Exhibits)(Hassett, Kathy)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?