Mervin v. Barry
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10044-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James F. Mervin, Sr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Steve Barry, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/3/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE in accordance with this Court's Order dated January 13, 2005 (Docket No. 2) directing the Plaintiff to file a complaint accompanied either by the filing fee or a fee waiver application, and advising that failing to do so, this action was subject to dismissal without prejudice. (Morse, Barbara)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
    Set Deadlines/Hearings: If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action he shall file a complaint accompanied by either the filing fee or fee-waiver application by 2/18/2005. (Morse, Barbara)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he is directed to file a complaint accompanied by either the $150.00 filing fee or a fee waiver application within thirty-five (35) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, or this action will be dismissed. The Clerk sent plaintiff (1) a copy of "Step by Step: A Simple Guide to Filing a Civil Action;" and (2) an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees.(Morse, Barbara)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Steve Barry Filing fee: $ 0.00, receipt number 0.00, filed by James F. Mervin, Sr.(Jenness, Susan)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Jenness, Susan)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Remark
            Case filed without payment of the filimg fee or submission of an application to waive the filing fee. (Jenness, Susan)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 151 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?