American Process Equipment Company, Inc. v. Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10029-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Process Equipment Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adkins, Kelston and Zavez, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Kelston +1 617 367 1040 +1 617 742 8280 dkelston@akzlaw.com
Space Noah N. Rosmarin +1 617 367 1040 +1 617 742 8280 nrosmarin@akzlaw.com
v.
No Logo Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies, Defendant

Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Office Boston
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand $400000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Plymouth
Terminated 1/20/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by American Process Equipment Company, Inc., Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies. (Nicewicz, Craig)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2005 03:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Conference was originally scheduled for 3:45p.m.(Nicewicz, Craig)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Bauer, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2005 03:45 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies. (Bauer, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies.(Bauer, John)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Bauer on behalf of Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies (Bauer, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies waiver sent on 2/7/2005, answer due 4/8/2005. (Barrette, Mark)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61260, filed by American Process Equipment Company, Inc.(Barrette, Mark) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2005 (Barrette, Mark).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Atlantic Atlantic Mutual Insurance Companies. (Barrette, Mark)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Barrette, Mark)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 86 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?