Zaino v. Edwards Boat Yard, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10037-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frank P. Zaino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Kaplan/Bond Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Kaplan +1 617 261 0080
No Logo Edwards Boat Yard, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Edwards Boat Yard, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clinton & Muzyka, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M. Chiarello +1 617 723 9165 +1 617 720 3489 KCHIARELLO@CLINMUZYKA.COM
Space Thomas J Muzyka +1 617 723 9165 +1 617 720 3489 tmuzyka@clinmuzyka.com
No Logo Frank P. Zaino, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Kaplan/Bond Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B. Kaplan +1 617 261 0080
Office Boston
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Barnstable
Terminated 1/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Filo, Jennifer)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Edwards Boat Yard, Inc.. (Muzyka, Thomas)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Amended Complaint
        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Edwards Boat Yard, Inc., filed by Frank P. Zaino.(Kaplan, David)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion to Amend. (Simeone, Maria)
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion to Amend
            MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint Unopposed by Frank P. Zaino. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A; Amended Complaint)(Kaplan, David)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Status Conference
              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Status Conference held on 10/25/2006.; Counsel state the status of the case regarding discovery; discovery is still ongoing; counsel discuss the possibility of mediation and request a referral to the courts mediation program to MJ Bowler not before 12/1/06;court extends the discovery deadlines to 11/30/06; fact Discovery to be completed by 11/30/2006. (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time; ALLOWED. Counsel are to appear for a status conference in this case set for 10/25/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for deadlines contained in the Joint Scheduling Statement for a period of two (2) months by Edwards Boat Yard, Inc..(Muzyka, Thomas)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Order
                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. The Court adopts the Proposed Joint Schedule as the Order of the Court. Accordingly the conference set for January 17, 2006 is unnecessary and hereby cancelled. Counsel are to appear for a status conference in this case on July 28, 2006 at 2:00 p.m. (Simeone, Maria)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                      JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Chiarello, Kenneth)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order
                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. The court has reset the scheduling conference for failure of plaintiffs counsel to appear. The Scheduling conference has been reset for January 17, 2006 at 2:15pm in courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Sorokin. Plaintiffs Counsel is Expected to appear. So Ordered.(Simeone, Maria)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Scheduling Conference
                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2005. Counsel for plaintiffs do not appear; Court contacts pltfs office twice; office reports pltfs counsel on the way; Deft orally moves to dismiss the case without prejudice for pltfs failure to appear; Court orally denies the motion without prejudice to renewing the motion; Court requests a joint statement to be filed with the court and resets the scheduling conference; Pltfs counsel is expected to appear; The Scheduling Conference has been reset for 1/17/2006 02:15 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Digital Recording #d.) (Simeone, Maria)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                            JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference (Proposed Scheduling Order). (Kaplan, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Frank P. Zaino.(Kaplan, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Edwards Boat Yard, Inc..(Chiarello, Kenneth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Frank P. Zaino.(Kaplan, David)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference The Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/12/2005 11:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                      Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Referred for: Full Pretrial Proceedings(Filo, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Answer
                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Frank P. Zaino by Edwards Boat Yard, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Outstanding Invoice)(Muzyka, Thomas)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Muzyka on behalf of Edwards Boat Yard, Inc. (Muzyka, Thomas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Chiarello on behalf of Edwards Boat Yard, Inc. (Chiarello, Kenneth)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Edwards Boat Yard, Inc. served on 1/18/2005, answer due 2/7/2005. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against Edwards Boat Yard, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61273, filed by Frank P. Zaino. (Attachments: # (1) Category Sheet# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to New Magistrate Judge. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Summons Issued
                                                    Summons Issued as to Edwards Boat Yard, Inc.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?