Estes Innovative and Warehousing v. Hometex Design, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10036-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Estes Innovative and Warehousing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley S. Chused +1 617 951 2800
v.
No Logo Hometex Design, Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $14000
Nature of Suit 450 - Commerce ICC Rates Etc.
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/11/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Writ Issued
WRIT of First Execution issued (Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Mail Returned
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hometex Design (Filo, Jennifer)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
      Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff (Filo, Jennifer)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Bill of Costs
        BILL OF COSTS by Estes Innovative and Warehousing. (Chused, Wesley)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Estes Innovative and Warehousing. Document received: Judgment. (Chused, Wesley)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
            NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hometex Design, Inc...counsel shall submit a proposed order of Judgment on or before 3/28/05. (Molloy, Maryellen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff (Military Affidavit as to Defendant) by Estes Innovative and Warehousing. (Chused, Wesley)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Affidavit in Support
                AFFIDAVIT in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment. (Chused, Wesley)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005, Terminated: 3/11/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to Hometex Design, Inc. by Estes Innovative and Warehousing.(Chused, Wesley)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Request for notice of default
                    Request for notice of default of Defendant Hometex Design, Inc.. (Chused, Wesley)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Hometex Design, Inc. served on 1/18/2005, answer due 2/7/2005. (Chused, Wesley)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Estes Innovative and Warehousing. (Filo, Jennifer)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against Hometex Design, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61272, filed by Estes Innovative and Warehousing. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Civil Cover Sheet # (5) Category Sheet)(Filo, Jennifer)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued as to Hometex Design, Inc.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to New Magistrate Judge. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?