Smith v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10014-NMG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:46 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Teresa Smith, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by catallen.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo P. Catanzaro +1 508 881 4566 +1 508 231 0975 apc@catallen.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Bookbinder +1 617 748 3112 +1 617 748 3960 adam.bookbinder@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Barnstable
Terminated 7/14/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angelo P Catanzaro at 100 Waverly Street #101 Ashland MA 01721 (Elefther, Elizabeth)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Response
    Response by Teresa Smith to [4] Response to 2255 Motion. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER of Dismissal entered. (Nicewicz, Craig)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "Petitioner's Motion Under 28 USC 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Docket No. 1) is DENIED; Petitioner's Motion to Amend Motion under 28 USC Section 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Docket No. 5) is DENIED; and the petition for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED."(Elefther, Elizabeth)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Terminated Case
          Civil Case Terminated. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
            APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re [5] MOTION to Amend [1] Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Teresa Smith. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 Motion to Amend
              MOTION to Amend [1] Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Teresa Smith.(Elefther, Elizabeth)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Response to 2255 Motion
                Government's Opposition RESPONSE to [1] Motion to Amend Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Elefther, Elizabeth)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Response
                  Response by United States of America to [1] Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Flaherty, Elaine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to United States of America. 2255 Service Ordre issued. (Nicewicz, Craig)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/10/2005 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
                      MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) , filed by Teresa Smith.(Barrette, Mark)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 1/10/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Barrette, Mark)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?