U.S. Trust Company, N.A. v. Fagans
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10013-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:46 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo U.s. Trust Company, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hardcastleshober.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cintra S. Shober +1 617 423 9990 +1 617 423 0671 css@hardcastleshober.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ober, Kaler, Grimes & Shriver, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph F. Hardcastle +1 617 423 9990 +1 617 423 0671 jfh@hardcastleshober.com
v.
No Logo Gary Beck, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $106000
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/16/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 6/30/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff. (Paine, Matthew)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
    Judge William G. Young : ElectronicORDER entered GRANTING [33] MOTION for Default Judgment (Renewed) as to Gary Beck. (Paine, Matthew)
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
      REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Lovett, Jarrett)
        LREF
        Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion for Default Judgment
        MOTION for Default Judgment (Renewed) as to Gary Beck by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Judgment)(Hardcastle, Joseph)
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Fagans by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
            LREF
            Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
            NOTICE of ADR Conference: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 5/18/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander.(Lovett, Jarrett)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
              Electronic Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Magistrate Judge Joyce L. Alexander appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling.(Tyler, Rebecca)
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Order Referring Case to ADR
                REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Paine, Matthew)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Scheduling Conference
                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young : Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2006. The court explains the requirements of the session and inquires as to whether the parties want to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case to go to ADR as of MAY,07 Final Pretrial Conference set for NO SOONER THAN 5/7/2007 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set on RUNNING TRIAL LIST AS OF 6/4/2007 09:00 AM before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Andrea Peraner-Sweet by Karl P. Fagans.(Greaney, Jennifer)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Karl P. Fagans.(Greaney, Jennifer)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re [26] JOINT STATEMENT is SO ORDER AS MODIFIED as the Case Manangement Scheduling Order. DISCOVERY DUE January 31, 2007 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE March 16, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Joseph F. Hardcastle by U.S. Trust Company, N.A..(Hardcastle, Joseph)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Gloria Pollack by U.S. Trust Company, N.A..(Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Filed Pursuant to Order Dated July 14, 2006 by Karl P. Fagans.(Greaney, Jennifer)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for MON. 9/11/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. cc/cl(Smith, Bonnie)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
                                      Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered re [18] Motion to Set Aside Default. "The Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED and the Default Removed. The Defendant Fagans Shall Answer or Otherwise Respond Within 20 Days of the Date of This Order." (Paine, Matthew)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Karl P. Fagans in Support re [18] MOTION to Set Aside Default and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default Judgment filed by Karl P. Fagans. (Peraner-Sweet, Andrea)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [18] MOTION to Set Aside Default and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default Judgment filed by Karl P. Fagans. (Peraner-Sweet, Andrea)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 7/14/2006 Motion to Set Aside Default
                                            MOTION to Set Aside Default and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default Judgment by Karl P. Fagans.(Peraner-Sweet, Andrea)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Peraner-Sweet on behalf of Karl P. Fagans (Peraner-Sweet, Andrea)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Case Reopened
                                                  Case Reopened. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Order
                                                    Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. re [16] DEFAULT JUDGMENT is VACATED as it Was Entered Before the 14 Day Period for Opposition to the Motion for Default Had Expired. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Affidavit in Support
                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [12] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Fagans and Beck (Joseph F. Hardcastle). (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Affidavit in Support
                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [12] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Fagans and Beck (Jennifer Sparrow). (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. Document received: Form of Default Judgment. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006, Terminated: 6/30/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to Fagans and Beck by U.S. Trust Company, N.A..(Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Karl P. Fagans.(Greaney, Jennifer)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Greaney on behalf of Karl P. Fagans (Greaney, Jennifer)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                  Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on Motions for Default Judgment. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Karl P. Fagans and Gary Beck. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Request for notice of default
                                                                      Request for notice of default. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                                        Motions terminated: [6] MOTION for Entry of Default filed by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.,. (Paine, Matthew)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                          MOTION for Entry of Default by U.S. Trust Company, N.A..(Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Reassignment
                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Robert E. Keeton no longer assigned to case. From this date forward the case number on all pleadings should be followed by the initials WGY. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                              Letter(non-motion) from Karl Fagans. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. Gary Beck served on 4/7/2005, answer due 4/27/2005. Acknowledgement filed by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Karl P. Fagans waiver sent on 2/25/2005, answer due 4/26/2005. (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph F. Hardcastle (Hardcastle, Joseph)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Karl P. Fagans, Gary Beck Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61190, filed by U.S. Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Karl P. Fagans, Gary Beck. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?