Floro v. Metabolife International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10048-REK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:46 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lauren Floro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane A. D. Noel +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 dnoel@burnslev.com
Space Paul R. Mastrocola +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 pmastrocola@burnslev.com
Space Robert J. O'Regan +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 RoRegan@burnslev.com
v.
No Logo Metabolife International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Alexander +1 617 737 8863 +1 617 342 4921 nalexander@morrisonmahoney.com
Space Michael J. Racette +1 617 439 7500 +1 617 342 4917 mracette@morrisonmahoney.com
Walgreen Company Walgreen Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Walgreen Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Alexander +1 617 737 8863 +1 617 342 4921 nalexander@morrisonmahoney.com
Space Michael J. Racette +1 617 439 7500 +1 617 342 4917 mracette@morrisonmahoney.com
No Logo Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Alexander +1 617 737 8863 +1 617 342 4921 nalexander@morrisonmahoney.com
Space Michael J. Racette +1 617 439 7500 +1 617 342 4917 mracette@morrisonmahoney.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/10/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Middlesex
Terminated 11/9/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 MDL Conditional Transfer Order Received
Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-16 in MDL Case 1598 received from District of Southern District of New York requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Folan, Karen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Folan, Karen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
      Judge Robert E. Keeton : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. "...For the foregoing reasons, it is ORDERED: (1) Defendant's Motion for Leave to Allow Defendants to Serve Answers late (Docket No. 6) is ALLOWED." (Folan, Karen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Scheduling Conference
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert E. Keeton : Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2005. Colloquy RE: [6] Defendants' Motion for Leave to Allow Defendants to Serve Answers Late. Plaintiff speaks. Defendant speaks. Plaintiff responds. REK takes matter under advisement. Colloquy RE: Scheduling. REK states that he will not set schedule now, because he would rather let the MDL case proceed. REK states that if another assessment of the situation by the court is needed, the parties may bring it to the court's attention.(Court Reporter Marzilli.) (Caffrey)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Lauren Floro.(Folan, Karen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Metabolife International, Inc..(Folan, Karen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
              JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Folan, Karen)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Response
                Opposition by Lauren Floro to defenadants' motion for leave to allow defendants to serve answers late. (Folan, Karen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 state court record
                  STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Folan, Karen)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Answer
                    ANSWER to amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co..(Folan, Karen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Answer
                      ANSWER to amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Metabolife International, Inc..(Folan, Karen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Michael J. Racette on behalf of Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Metabolife International, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Folan, Karen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. Racette. (Folan, Karen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Memorandum of Law
                            MEMORANDUM in support by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Metabolife International, Inc., Walgreen Co. to [6] Response in opposition to request for entry of default. (Folan, Karen)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Response
                              Response in opposition by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Metabolife International, Inc., Walgreen Co. to [4] Request for notice of default. (Folan, Karen)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of Paul Mastrocola re [4] Request for notice of default by Lauren Floro. (Folan, Karen)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Request for notice of default
                                  Request for notice of default. (Folan, Karen)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2005 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert E. Keeton. (Folan, Karen)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co.. (Folan, Karen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice of Removal
                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Middlesex Superior Court, case number 2004-03651-B. $ 150, receipt number 61299, filed by Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Metabolife International, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B and C# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(Folan, Karen)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?