Boston Warehouse Trading Corp. v. Alliance Shippers, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10022-GAO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 2:27 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boston Warehouse Trading Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Boston Warehouse Trading Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James B. Conroy +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 jbc@dcglaw.com
v.
No Logo Alliance Shippers, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul F. Fitzpatrick +1 978 741 4555 +1 781 623 1299 paulfitzpatrick@verizon.net
Office Boston
Filed 1/5/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Norfolk
Terminated 8/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp., Alliance Shippers, Inc.. (Meixel, Jill)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Lyness, Paul)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Settlement Order of Dismissal
      Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL- It is ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action within 30 days if settlement is not consumated. (Lyness, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly. (Lyness, Paul)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp.. (Pickett, Karen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp.. (Pickett, Karen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alliance Shippers, Inc. c/s. (Edge, Eugenia)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Alliance Shippers, Inc.c/s.(Edge, Eugenia)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                  Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 63022 regarding Pro Hac Vice fee for Kevin McGrath (Edge, Eugenia)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Stipulation
                    STIPULATION to Enlarge Time by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp., Alliance Shippers, Inc.. (Meixel, Jill)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION to Enlarge Time by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp., Alliance Shippers, Inc.. (Meixel, Jill)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Affidavit of Service
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp.. Alliance Shippers, Inc. served on 2/7/2005, answer due 2/28/2005. Acknowledgement filed by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Meixel, Jill)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION to Enlarge Time by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp., Alliance Shippers, Inc.. (Meixel, Jill)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Alliance Shippers, Inc., filed by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp..(Meixel, Jill)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against Alliance Shippers, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61252, filed by Boston Warehouse Trading Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Catagory Sheet)(Roland, Lisa)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Alliance Shippers, Inc.. (Edge, Eugenia)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                  If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Roland, Lisa)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?