Town of Wrentham v. Matthew and Leah McEvoy and John Zizza
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10042-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Town of Wrentham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Cloherty, III +1 617 350 0950 +1 617 350 7760 jcloherty@piercedavis.com
v.
No Logo Leah McEvoy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by seiglaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Seigenberg +1 781 784 8800 +1 781 784 8820 drs@seiglaw.com
No Logo Matthew McEvoy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by seiglaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Seigenberg +1 781 784 8800 +1 781 784 8820 drs@seiglaw.com
No Logo John Zizza, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Cloherty, III +1 617 350 0950 +1 617 350 7760 jcloherty@piercedavis.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/7/2005
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Norfolk
Terminated 5/4/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Case transferred to Norfolk Superior Court (Nici, Richard)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER OF REMAND entered. Case remanded to Norfolk County Superior Court.(Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Scheduling Conference
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 4/12/2005. Plaintiff will not press motion to amend (filed in state court); plaintiff has effectively waived 1983 claim; case is remanded to state court. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 4/11/2005 Motion to Continue
          Assented to MOTION to Continue 04/12/05 to 04/12/05 at 3:00 p.m. by Town of Wrentham, John Zizza.(Cloherty, John)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion to Continue scheduling conference. TIME CHANGE ONLY: 4/12/05 AT 3:00 P.M. (Rynne, Michelle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
              JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Nici, Richard)
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of Town of Wrentham, John Zizza. (Nici, Richard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION with Third Party Defendant John Zizza by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of John Zizza. (Cloherty, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION with Town Administrator Steven C. Boudreau by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of Town of Wrentham. (Cloherty, John)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Mail Returned
                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel R. Seigenberg (Nici, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion to Continue Scheduling conference. Scheduling conference reset for 4/12/05 at 2:30 P.M. (Rynne, Michelle)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 3/7/2005 Motion to Continue
                          Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to April 12, 2005 by Town of Wrentham, John Zizza.(Cloherty, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 state court record
                              STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2# (2) Part 3# (3) Part 4)(Nici, Richard)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Removal
                                Opposition to NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Wrentham, John Zizza , filed by Town of Wrentham, John Zizza. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Nici, Richard)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Answer
                                  Opposition to Notice of Removal by Leah McEvoy, Matthew McEvoy.(Nici, Richard)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 state court record
                                    STATE COURT Record. (Nici, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of Town of Wrentham, John Zizza (Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice of Removal
                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Zizza from Superior Court of Massachusetts, case number 03-2018. $ 150, receipt number 61306, filed by John Zizza.(Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2005 (Nici, Richard). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Nici, Richard)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 658 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?