Lang v. Potter
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10052-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Janice E. Lang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary H. Goldberg +1 508 797 1018 +1 508 798 2521 garyhgoldberg@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo John E. Potter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
Office Boston
Filed 1/10/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Middlesex
Terminated 6/9/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by John E. Potter. (Wilmot, Damian)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Upon Request of Counsel, the Parties Have Until August 18, 2006, An Additional Week, to File the Settlement Papers. (Paine, Matthew)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 ~Notice (other)
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE The parties have an additional 2 weeks to file the final settlement papers.(Smith, Bonnie)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006 ~Notice (other)
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE The court grants the parties an additional 2 weeks to effectuate the settlement of the case.(Smith, Bonnie)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE Upon request of counsel, the parties have an additional 2 weeks within which to file the settlement papers. (Smith, Bonnie)
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
            Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL cc/cl(Smith, Bonnie)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Terminated Case
              Civil Case Terminated. (Smith, Bonnie)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Smith, Bonnie)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
                  REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Settlement Conference
                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : Settlement Conference held on 4/28/2006. ADR Report to issue. (Not Recorded) (Russo, Noreen)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Motion Hearing
                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young : Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2006 re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John E. Potter,, Motions terminated: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John E. Potter,. After hearing the Motion is DENIED. (Court Reporter Womack.) (Smith, Bonnie)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John E. Potter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I)(Wilmot, Damian)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Opposition to Motion
                          Opposition to defendant's concise statement of material facts and submission of additional material facts re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janice E. Lang. Attorney Goldberg reports that he will submit exhibits on paper to Clerk's Office. (Attorney Gary Goldberg attempted but was unable to electronically file this document). (Hurley, Virginia)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janice E. Lang. (Goldberg, Gary)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) filed by John E. Potter. (Wilmot, Damian) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2006 (Paine, Matthew).
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered denying [12] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Smith, Bonnie)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Opposition is due by 4/10/06. Reply brief, if any, is due by 4/17/06. cc/cl(Smith, Bonnie)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Statement of Facts
                                    STATEMENT of facts re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Wilmot, Damian)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John E. Potter. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20)(Wilmot, Damian)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by John E. Potter.(Wilmot, Damian)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006, Terminated: 4/20/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by John E. Potter.(Wilmot, Damian)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                            Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. Motion [10] for Extension of Deadlines on Dispositive Motions is DENIED. "Dispositive Motions May, However, Be Filed at Any Time Within 20 Days of the Date of This Order." (Paine, Matthew)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by John E. Potter.(Wilmot, Damian)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Notice of hearing(other)Court Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION set for 4/28/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider
                                                  Electronic Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings appointed. The Court will contact counsel with regard to scheduling.(Tyler, Rebecca)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Order Referring Case to ADR
                                                    REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for January, 2006.(Bell, Marie)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young : Scheduling Conference held on 5/9/2005. The court explains requirements of the session and inquires as to whether the parties want to proceed before magistrate judge. Final Pretrial Conference set for NO SOONER THAN 5/1/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young. Jury Trial set for RUNNING TRIAL LIST AS OF 6/5/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young. Case to go to ADR as of Jan., 06 (Smith, Bonnie)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re [5] Joint statement of counsel. SO ORDERED AS MODIFIED AS THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 12/10/2005. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2005. Opposition due 14 days thereafter. cc/cl.(Bell, Marie)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION In accordance with Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Gary H. Goldberg on behalf of all Plaintiffs. (Bell, Marie)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                                                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.1. (Wilmot, Damian)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION PURSUANT TO RULE 16.1(D)(3) by Damian W. Wilmot on behalf of John E. Potter. (Wilmot, Damian)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Answer
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by John E. Potter.(Wilmot, Damian)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against John E. Potter Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61328, filed by Janice E. Lang. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Marie)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge New Magistrate Judge. (Bell, Marie)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                        Summons Issued as to John E. Potter, Postmaster General (Bell, Marie)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?