Emblad v. Logue et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-10063-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Emblad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilman & Pastor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pastor +1 617 742 9700 +1 617 742 9701 dpastor@pastorlawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Arthur L. Goldstein, Defendant
No Logo Charles R. Lamantia, Defendant
No Logo David P. Gruber, Defendant
No Logo Diana C. Walsh, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Tenley E. Albright, Defendant
No Logo Franklin Advisors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gregory L. Summe, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Kennett F. Burnes, Defendant
No Logo Linda A. Hill, Defendant
No Logo Nader F. Darehshori, Defendant
No Logo Richard P. Sergel, Defendant
No Logo Robert E. Weissman, Defendant
No Logo Ronald E. Logue, Defendant
No Logo Ronald L. Skates, Defendant
No Logo SSGA Funds Management, Inc., Defendant
State Street Corporation State Street Corporation, Defendant
No Logo State Street Research & Management Company, Defendant
No Logo Tenley E. Albright, Defendant
No Logo Truman S. Casner, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 1/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause JS 44 Sec. IV - no matching citation currently in database
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/9/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Pastor (Pastor, David)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
    NOTICE of Change of Address by David Pastor (Pastor, David)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Johnson, Jay)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #5 NOTICE corrected because: WRONG EVENT. The filer should have used the Notice of voluntary dismissal event. (no fix, FYI) (Johnson, Jay)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE by David Emblad of Dismissal (Pastor, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE by David Emblad OF DISMISSAL OF SEPARATE DEFENDANT STATE STREET RESEARCH & MANAGMENT COMPANY (Pastor, David)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Affidavit of Service
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by David Emblad. State Street Corporation served on 1/27/2005, answer due 2/16/2005. Acknowledgement filed by David Emblad. (Johnson, Jay)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                MOTION to Transfer Case and Consolidate Case w/MDL, by Franklin Advisors, Inc..(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 1/26/2005 (Johnson, Jay).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against David P. Gruber, Linda A. Hill, Charles R. Lamantia, Richard P. Sergel, Ronald L. Skates, Gregory L. Summe, Diana C. Walsh, Robert E. Weissman, State Street Corporation, SSGA Funds Management, Inc., State Street Research & Management Company, JOhn Does 1-100, Ronald E. Logue, Tenley E. Albright, Kennett F. Burnes, Truman S. Casner, Nader F. Darehshori, Arthur L. Goldstein Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 61345, filed by David Emblad. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                    If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Johnson, Jay)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Summons Issued
                      Summons Issued as to David P. Gruber, Linda A. Hill, Charles R. Lamantia, Richard P. Sergel, Ronald L. Skates, Gregory L. Summe, Diana C. Walsh, Robert E. Weissman, State Street Corporation, SSGA Funds Management, Inc., State Street Research & Management Company, JOhn Does 1-100, Ronald E. Logue, Tenley E. Albright, Kennett F. Burnes, Truman S. Casner, Nader F. Darehshori, Arthur L. Goldstein. (Johnson, Jay)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 87 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?