Albert v. Thomas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-30008-MAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 2:36 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Douglas Albert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Astor +1 413 781 1144 +1 413 747 8044 rhastor@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Chicopee, City of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Rooke +1 413 731 9000 +1 413 731 1302 tjrlaw@verizon.net
No Logo Michael, Thomas, Defendant
Unknown Role, H Power Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by omcp-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernard T. O'Connor, Jr. +1 413 781 5311 +1 413 746 2707 boconnor@omcp-law.com
Office Springfield
Filed 1/12/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hampden
Terminated 10/5/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Douglas Albert, Michael Thomas, Chicopee, City of. (Lindsay, Maurice)
    LREF
    Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. THIRTY-DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
      LREF
      Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution ProviderCourt Filing
      REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman). Case is settled. 30-Day Settlement Order to issue. (Healy, Bethaney)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Terminated Case
        Civil Case Terminated. (Healy, Bethaney)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
          REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider (CMJ Kenneth Neiman). "There was progress. The parties will report to the court on October 4, 2006, whether they have finalized a settlement."(Healy, Bethaney)
            LREF
            Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Notice of ADR ConferenceCourt Filing
            Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ORDER with respect to Mediation, ENTERED, cc:cl. Mediation set for 9/25/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. In accord with the court's order, counsel shall submit confidential mediation memoranda under seal by no later than 9/20/06. (Healy, Bethaney)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: [35] Joint Memorandum of the parties modified to remove Kenneth Neiman as a filing party. Magistrate Judge Neiman was selected for the filing in error. (Healy, Bethaney)
                LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Pretrial Memorandum
                Parties JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Douglas Albert, Michael Thomas, Chicopee, City of filed. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 6/28/2006 (Healy, Bethaney).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Order Referring Case to ADR
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution, ENTERED. Case referred to Honorable Kenneth P. Neiman for mediation. Clerk will contact attorneys to secure a date for mediation.(Healy, Bethaney)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Michael A Ponsor : FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER entered, As follows: A joint final pretrial memoranda due 6/23/06, Motions in limine, voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions due by 11/6/2006. and Jury Trial set for 11/13/2006 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. cc/cl(Lindsay, Maurice)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                      Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered. Re Defendants' Expert. If Dft's wish to prepare to offer expert testimony, they will provide Ptf's with a full report pursant to rule 26 by 6/30/06 and Ptf. may take depo of Dft. by 7/31/06. See the attached order for complete details. cc/cl (Lindsay, Maurice)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Pretrial Conference - Final
                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Michael A Ponsor : Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/13/2006. (Court Reporter Alice Moran.) (French, Elizabeth)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : endorsedORDER entered granting [31] Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/13/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 5/24/2006 Motion to Continue
                            Pltf's Assented to MOTION to Continue the pretial conf. set for 6/08/2006 to 6/13/2006 at 3:00 P.M. by Douglas Albert filed.(Finn, Mary)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Pretrial Conference RESET FROM 5/25/06 AT 3:30 To 6/8/2006 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Order on Motion to Strike
                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying [27] Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Expert Witness, Defendants having adequately explained the delay in producing an expert report, provided, however, that should Plaintiff wish to take said expert's deposition, the stenographic costs thereof shall be borne by Defendants. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference RESET FROM 4/26/06 AT 2:00 P.M. TO 5/25/2006 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Motions Referred
                                    [27] MOTION to Strike REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Reopen Document
                                      Reopen Document [27] MOTION to Strike. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                        District Judge Michael A Ponsor. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [28] Motion to Vacate court's March 10, 2006 Order granting without opposition Motion to Strike ENTERED, cc:cl. ALLOWED. The court's ruling on the Motion to Strike is hereby vacated, and the motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Neiman. So ordered. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                          Judge Michael A Ponsor : Electronic ORDER entered granting [30] Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/7/06 at 3:00 p.m. to 4/26/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. (French, Elizabeth)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                            Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006, Terminated: 3/22/2006 Motion to Continue
                                              Deft. Michael Thomas' MOTION to Continue the pretrial conf. set for 4/07/2006 to 4/26/2006 at 2:00 P.M. by Michael Thomas filed.(Finn, Mary)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                Ptf's Opposition to Dft's [28] MOTION to Vacate Order to strike Dft's Expert Witness filed by Douglas Albert. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Motion to Vacate
                                                  Defts' MOTION to Vacate endorsed order on Motion to Strike expert witness, David Standen by Michael Thomas, Chicopee, City of filed. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Finn, Mary)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                    Judge Michael A Ponsor : ORDER entered granting, without opposition, the Pltf's [27] Motion to Strike Deft's expert witness David Standen; cc/cl. (Finn, Mary)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006, Terminated: 4/24/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                      Pltf's MOTION to Strike Deft's expert witness David Standen by Douglas Albert filed.(Finn, Mary) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2006 - Exhibits A - C added.(Finn, Mary).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                        Dft's SELECTION OF AN EXPERT AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF by Michael Thomas, and City of Chicopee. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
                                                          Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Defendant Michael Thomas' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Defendant's expert's report shall be provided by February 17, 2006. There shall be no further extensions. The court's Further Scheduling Order of December 2, 2005, shall otherwise remain in effect. So ordered. (Neiman, Kenneth)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Motion to Amend
                                                            MOTION to Amend [23] Scheduling Order by Michael Thomas.(Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                              District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial ENTERED, cc:cl. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2006 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Michael A Ponsor. See Procedural Order for further details. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER setting all remaining non-expert depos compl by 12/30/05; expert discl by 2/3/06; expert depos compl by 3/10/06; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2006 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Michael A Ponsor, ENTERED, cc:cl. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by Douglas Albert as to Joseph Brunelle only, filed. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Case Management Conference
                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Astor, Rooke, O'Connor) appear for Case Management Conference held on 12/1/2005. Colloquy re: status of case. Scheduling Order to issue. (Digital Recording #FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                      Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [21] Motion to Continue Case Management Conference to 12/1/05 at 2:00 p.m., ENTERED, cc:cl. The 10/26/05 conference is cancelled. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                        MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Joseph Brunelle.(Joyce, Austin)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                          NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING ISSUED, cc:cl. Case Management Conference continued to 10/26/2005 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert H. Astor (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Michael Thomas.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard T. O'Connor, Jr on behalf of Michael Thomas (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney William J. O'Grady terminated. (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rooke on behalf of Chicopee, City of (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Michael Thomas, Chicopee, City of.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Douglas Albert.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Joseph Brunelle. (Joyce, Austin)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Judge Kenneth P. Neiman : SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Parties shall complete their automatic disclosures by 8/15/2005. Intg's and req. for production shall be served by 5/16/2005. Non-expert depos. to be completed by 10/14/2005. Counsel to appear for a case management conf. on 10/21/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; cc/cl.(Finn, Mary)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. Counsel (Attys Astor, O'Grady, Akerson) appear for Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2005. Colloquy re: appearances for Deft Brunelle. Attys Akerson, Vigliotti and Gambaccini added to docket. Schedule established with order to issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Joint submission
                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Douglas Albert, Michael Thomas, Joseph Brunelle, Chicopee, City of.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005, Terminated: 2/22/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                  (Assented to) MOTION to Continue scheduling conference to 3/21/05 by Douglas Albert.(Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman. ELECTRONIC ORDER granting [10] Motion to Continue SAcheduling Conference ENTERED, cc:cl. ALLOWED. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/21/05 at 10:00 a.m. in Courroom Three. Joint statement due by 3/17/05. (Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference ISSUED, cc:cl. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman; joint statement and LR 16.1 certifications due by no later than 3/8/05.(Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        District Judge Michael A Ponsor. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman Referred for: full pretrial management (no dispositive motions)(Healy, Bethaney)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Thomas.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by William J. O'Grady on behalf of Michael Thomas (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Chicopee, City of.(Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rooke on behalf of Chicopee, City of (Lindsay, Maurice)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Brunelle.(Joyce, Austin)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Austin M. Joyce on behalf of Joseph Brunelle (Joyce, Austin)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Michael Thomas, Joseph Brunelle, Chicopee, City of Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 305822, filed by Douglas Albert. L.R. 4.1, CF/CL.(Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Michael Thomas, Joseph Brunelle, Chicopee, City of. (Stuckenbruck, John)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?